Hartfield et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Plaintiff: Chantal Hartfield, Heidi Niego, Richard Jackson, Tyler Bunch, Courtney Widup, Kimra Smith, Jimmy Smith, Brandon DeLong, Lisa Garrett and Michael Scarberry
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC and Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery
Case Number: 1:2023cv00409
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants are AFFORDED to and including 11/28/2023, to file: a supplemental jurisdictional statement that adequately articulates Defendant Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC's citizenship, and an amended disclosure statement that fully complies with Rule 7.1. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their own disclosure statement in accordance with Rule 7.1 on or before 11/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/17/2023. (jdb)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins re #13 First Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Chantal Hartfield. Telephonic Motion Hearing SET for 11/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the hearing, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the hearing start time. Text entry order. (lns)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OBJECTION by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC to #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mills, Courtney)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #7 Motion to Remand, filed by Jimmy Smith, Chantal Hartfield, Brandon DeLong, Courtney Widup, Richard Jackson, Kimra Smith, Heidi Niego, Tyler Bunch, Lisa Garrett, Michael Scarberry as outlined. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 11/13/2023. (mrm)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dfts are directed to file a response to #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Discovery Requests by 11/16/2023. Text entry order.(mr)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Chantal Hartfield. (Crossen, Trevor)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Mills, Courtney)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crossen, Trevor)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Chantal Hartfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Crossen, Trevor)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mills, Courtney)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC.(Mills, Courtney) Modified on 10/3/2023 to edit text (mlc).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Tyler Bunch, Brandon DeLong, Lisa Garrett, Chantal Hartfield, Richard Jackson, Heidi Niego, Michael Scarberry, Jimmy Smith, Kimra Smith, Courtney Widup. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crossen, Trevor)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of All Defendants (Jenkins, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC. (Mills, Courtney)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney D Mills on behalf of All Defendants (Mills, Courtney)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5362238.), filed by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D)(Mills, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartfield et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantal Hartfield
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Niego
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bunch
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Widup
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimra Smith
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon DeLong
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Garrett
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scarberry
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of Fort Wayne by Landmark Recovery
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?