Lohnes v. Buncich et al
Plaintiff: |
James Andrew Lohnes |
Defendant: |
Sheriff Buncich, Adm Davies, Deputy Warden Gore, HCU Administrator and Jane Doe |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00259 |
Filed: |
June 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Rudy Lozano |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P Rodovich |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 19, 2021 |
Filing
178
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 175 Motion to Alter or Amend a Judgment. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/19/2021. (bas)
|
July 19, 2021 |
Filing
173
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 131 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 145 Motion to Deny Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 165 Amended Motion to Deny Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Nurse Practitioner (K) Cathy and Defendant Michelle and against Plaintiff James Andrew Lohnes. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/19/21. (mlc)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
19
OPINION AND ORDER re 17 the court: GRANTS James Andrew Lohnes leave to proceed on an Eighth Amendment claim for money damages against Nurse Practitioner Michelle and Nurse Practitioner Cathy, in their individual capacities for denying Lohnes trea tment for his Hepatitis C since June 2017; GRANTS James Andrew Lohnes leave to proceed on an Eighth Amendment claim for injunctive relief against Nurse Practitioner Michelle and Nurse Practitioner Cathy, in their individual capacities in connection w ith treating his Hepatitis C; DISMISSES all other claims; DISMISSES Sheriff John Buncich, Health Care Unit Administrator, Deputy Warden Gore and Administrator Davies; DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshal Service to issue and serve process on Nurse Practitioner Michelle and Nurse Practitioner Cathy, with a copy of this order and the amended complaint; ORDERS that Nurse Practitioner Michele and Nurse Practitioner Cathy, respond only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 11/28/2017. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(lpw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?