Baker et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Plaintiff: SHERRY JACKSON, LUTRICIA CLAY, M.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON, KAMIA EDWARDS, J.G. BY NEXT FRIEND JALISA WASH, A.H. BY NEXT FRIEND KEISHA HILL, S.W. 3 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS, OPHELIA WALKER, KEISHA HILL, LAZON JACKSON, K.L. 1 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER, JALISA WASH, K.L.2 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER, T.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON, K.R. BY NEXT FRIEND NNEKA SIMMONS, NNEKA SIMMONS, TAMMIE MOORE, D.M. BY NEXT FRIEND KEISHA HILL, K.F. BY NEXT FRIEND KEMIQUA FUNCHES, LLOYD WILLIAMS, DUANE SNELLING SR., D.G. BY NEXT FRIEND JALISA WASH, D.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON, NAYESA WALKER, MARTRICE JOHNSON, D.J. BY NEXT FRIEND KAMIA EDWARDS, CATHERINE JOHNSON, KEMIQUA FUNCHES, IMANI SIMMONS, LORENZO JACKSON, C.C. BY NEXT FRIEND LUTRICIA CLAY, M.W. BY NEXT FRIEND KEMIQUA FUNCHES, KEVIN POWELL, J.J. BY NEXT FRIEND TAMMIE MOORE, B.E. BY NEXT FRIEND KAMIA EDWARDS, J.H. BY NEXT FRIEND SHERRY JACKSON, SHERRIE BAKER, SHANNON WILLIAMS, S.W. 1 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS, K.L. 3 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER, WILLIE MAE MOORE, MARCELL WASHINGTON, SR., M.C. BY NEXT FRIEND LUTRICIA CLAY, TONONA PARKER, RANA PERSON, S.W. 2 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS, NICOLE HALL, D.D. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON, A.J. BY NEXT FRIEND SHERRY JACKSON, KR, SW 1, SW 2, JJ, MW, KF, Duane Snelling Sr, DG, JH, AJ, TB, DM, BE, CC, JG, KL 1, Marcell Washington, Sr, MC, DJ, DD, KL 3, AH, DB, KL 2, MB and SW 3
Defendant: HALSTAB, LLC, HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS, LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, HALOX, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., The Chemours Company, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Halstab LLC and Halox LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00429
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker Notice of Reply to Hammond Defendants' Opp. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Reply to Hammond Defendants' Opp to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 9, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams re #128 Memorandum of Law (Other) Notice of Reply to DuPont Co. and The Chemours Co. Opp to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply to DuPont Co. and The Chemours Co. Opp. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 9, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams re #129 Notice (Other), Notice of Reply to Atlantic Richfield's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply to Atlantic Richfield's Opp to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 2, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC re #127 Notice (Other),, Notice of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLCs Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLCs Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate in Holiday)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
November 2, 2020 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #127 Notice (Other),, Opposition of The DuPont Company and The Chemours Company to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 19, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams of Motion to Consolidate Holiday, Barbee and Baker cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holiday Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING #125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court ORDERS that the appearance of attorney Jesse M Feitel on behalf of defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/15/20. (ksp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Feitel PHV, Jesse)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Court EXTENDS Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the pending motions to dismiss to the later of 15 days after a ruling on the motion to consolidate, or if no motion is filed, 11/03/2020. The Court REMINDS Plaintiffs that Local Rule 42-2 requires that a motion to consolidate be filed "in the case with the earliest docket number" with "a notice of the motion in all the other cases." N.D. Ind. L.R. 42-2(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 09/24/2020. (jat)
September 23, 2020 Filing 123 BRIEF in Opposition to #122 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #117 MOTION re #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice, #111 MOT filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Baker - Oppn to Second Motion to Extend Deadline - Ex. A, #2 Baker - Oppn to Second Motion to Extend Deadline - Ex. B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
September 23, 2020 Filing 122 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #117 MOTION re #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice, #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Finding the terms proper pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the Court GRANTS the relief requested in Plaintiff's #82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company and DISMISSES all claims against Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company. The Court ORDERS that the objecting parties have reserved their rights under Indiana Code 34-51-2-14 to name Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company as a non-party. Party Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/4/20. (kjp)
August 28, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise R Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiffs to respond to the pending motions to dismiss #109 , #111 , #114 by 9/28/2020. Defendants may file replies within 21 days after the corresponding responses are filed. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/28/2020. No pdf attached.(sa)
August 26, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties, #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #13 Amended Complaint,,, by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Flora, Colin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION re #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Evidence, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Hearing re #115 Brief in Support, #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 115 BRIEF in Support of #114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Support of #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Support of #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 7, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: The Court LIFTS the stay entered in this case and SETS the deadline for Defendants to file answers to the First Amended Complaint for 8/7/20. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/13/20. (nal)
July 10, 2020 Filing 107 MANDATE of USCA: The judgment of the District Court is REVERSED, with costs, and the case is REMANDED, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Final Judgment)(shk)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #105 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc and ORDERING Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos PHV WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/15/2020. (lhc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
June 2, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
June 2, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Connor on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Connor, Thomas)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING #99 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas M. Connor for George James Tzanetopoulos by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. and #100 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner for Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., with leave to re-file in compliance with applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/1/2020. (lhc)
June 1, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline R Sheridan on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
May 29, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner for Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas M. Connor for George James Tzanetopoulos by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 97 STATUS REPORT by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 96 USCA Case Number 19-3160 for #92 Notice of Appeal, filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rmf)
October 31, 2019 Filing 95 USCA Case Number 19-3159 for #91 Notice of Appeal, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. (rmf)
October 30, 2019 Filing 94 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re #92 Notice of Appeal. Appeal filing fees paid in the amount of $505 - Receipt #0755-4047853. (mrm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 93 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re #91 Notice of Appeal. Appeal filing fees paid in the amount of $505 - Receipt #0755-4047527. (mrm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, filed by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0755-4047853. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, filed by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0755-4047527. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING #89 MOTION to Stay re #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, and GRANTING #86 MOTION to Stay re #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. The Court agrees with Defendants that all parties would be best served with staying the case. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 10/21/19. (ksp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Stay re #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 88 MINUTE ENTRY: Certified copies of the docket sheet and the #85 Opinion and Order are withheld from being mailed to the Lake County Superior Court 4 pending resolution on Defendants #86 Motion to Stay. (jss)
October 1, 2019 Filing 87 BRIEF in Support of #86 MOTION to Stay re #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Stay re #85 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' and the DuPont Defendants' requests for judicial notice #43 , #63 . As for the #41 Motion to Remand, the Atlantic and DuPont Defendants have failed to establish a 1442 jurisdiction. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is now remanded to the Lake County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/30/2019. (cert copy of order and docket sheet sent to Lake County Court) (jss)
May 22, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
April 1, 2019 Filing 83 OBJECTION by Hammond Group, Inc. to Voluntary Dismissal of Def "Tesoro". (Abrahamson, Harold)
March 26, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Tesoro Refining and Markeeting Company by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams (Flora, Colin) Modified kjp text on 3/26/2019 (kjp).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court ORDERS that the appearance of Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson for Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN. The Court STRIKES the Motion to Withdraw at DE #80 , relating to cause number 2:17-CV-414-JVB-JEM, as inadvertently filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/14/19. (nal)
March 13, 2019 Filing 80 *Stricken* MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Hutchinson PHV, Kathryn) Modified on 3/15/2019 to strike per #81 order. (nal)
March 13, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Hutchinson PHV, Kathryn)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, with leave to refile an appropriate motion to withdraw consistent with Local Rule 83-8. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/7/19. (ksp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #74 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Diana E Reiter PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and for BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2018. (mtr)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jesse M Feitel PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and for BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2018. (mtr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 74 Application for Attorney Diana E. Reiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3735996(Reiter PHV, Diana)
November 16, 2018 Filing 73 Application for Attorney Jesse M. Feitel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3735966(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
July 31, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Pavlack, Eric)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Honor R Costello PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/29/18. (ksc)
June 29, 2018 Filing 69 Application for Attorney Honor Rose Costello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3609699 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Costello PHV, Honor)
March 29, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Pavlack, Eric)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shreya A Fadia PHV WITHDRAWN on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/26/2018. (smb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin E Flora on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flora, Colin)
February 19, 2018 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
February 5, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Fadia PHV, Shreya)
January 29, 2018 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE DUPONT COMPANYS #62 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS #41 MOTION FOR REMAND by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Decree (U.S. v. ARCO))(Sooy PHV, Kathleen) Modified text to match document's caption on 1/31/2018 (mc).
January 29, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Highlighted Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Decree (U.S. v. ARCO))(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply to be filed by 2/20/2018.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/29/2017. No pdf attached.(cp)
December 29, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 Response to Motion,,,,, by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying with leave to refile #58 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for failure to comply with Local Rule 6-1(a)(3) requiring representation as to opposing counsels' agreement. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/29/2017. No PDF attached. (cp)
December 28, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 Response to Motion,,,,, by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Continue briefing on motion to remand. Reply to be filed by 2/20/2018. Response to be filed by 1/29/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/28/2017. No pdf attached. (cp)
December 28, 2017 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of K. Austin Kerr, Ph.D., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54)(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #39 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Suzanne M Alton de Eraso PHV for Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, and Hammond Group, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/22/17. (mtr)
December 22, 2017 ***Rule 16(b) conference per DE 52 terminated. (jld)
December 22, 2017 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Continue /Extend Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #37 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/17. (mtr)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting unopposed #50 Defendants' Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Vacate Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. The Preliminary R16B Conference on 1/25/2018 @11:00 AM and related ddl within which to file a joint proposed discovery plan are each VACATED to be reset if necessary after ruling on the MOTION to Remand. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2017. (smb)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting unopposed #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting unopposed #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants The DuPont Company, Chemours Company, Hammond Group Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox LLC shall have up to 30 days after the Court issues a ruling on Plaintiffs' motion for remand to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2017. (smb)
December 20, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Vacate #33 Order,, Set Hearings, Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
December 18, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint,,, #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
December 18, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint,,, Unopposed by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 30 days after Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' pending motion to remand. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/15/2018. no attachment. (cpb)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #36 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tracy A Roman PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/15/17. (mtr)
December 14, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint,,, #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos PHV for Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, and Hammond Group, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/14/17. (mtr)
December 14, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION Judicial Notice re #42 Brief in Support,, #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
December 14, 2017 Filing 42 BRIEF in Support of #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Duane Snelling Sr, Kevin Powell, Catherine Johnson, Tonona Parker, KL 1, Lutricia Clay, AH, Sherrie Baker, Sherry Jackson, Rana Person, DB, DG, MB, Lorenzo Jackson, MW, JH, Imani Simmons, Tammie Moore, JJ, CC, MC, AJ, TB, DD, KR, SW 1, Shannon Williams, JG, Martrice Johnson, BE, Lloyd Williams, SW 3, Willie Mae Moore, DJ, Keisha Hill, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, KF, KL 3, Nicole Hall, Nneka Simmons, SW 2, Ophelia Walker, Kemiqua Funches, Nayesa Walker, DM, Lazon Jackson, KL 2, Kamia Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Sathya V. Yalvigi in Barbee et al. vs. Atlantic Richfield Co. et al.)(Pavlack, Eric)
December 14, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs AH, AJ, BE, Sherrie Baker, CC, Lutricia Clay, DB, DD, DG, DJ, DM, Kamia Edwards, Kemiqua Funches, Nicole Hall, Keisha Hill, JG, JH, JJ, Lazon Jackson, Lorenzo Jackson, Sherry Jackson, Catherine Johnson, Martrice Johnson, KF, KL 1, KL 2, KL 3, KR, MB, MC, MW, Tammie Moore, Willie Mae Moore, Tonona Parker, Rana Person, Kevin Powell, SW 1, SW 2, SW 3, Imani Simmons, Nneka Simmons, Duane Snelling Sr, TB, Nayesa Walker, Ophelia Walker, Jalisa Wash, Marcell Washington, Sr, Lloyd Williams, Shannon Williams. (Pavlack, Eric)
December 13, 2017 Filing 40 Application for Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc.;Hammond Lead Products, LLC; Halstab, LLC; Halox, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3434386(Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
December 13, 2017 Filing 39 Application for Attorney Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Halox, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3434351(Alton de Eraso PHV, Suzanne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2017: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (mtr).
December 6, 2017 Filing 38 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D04-1710-CT-202. (nal)
December 4, 2017 Filing 37 Application for Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3425922 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Cox, Dina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2017: #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 SCOTUS Certificate of Good Standing) (mtr).
December 4, 2017 Filing 36 Application for Attorney Tracy A. Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3425903 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Cox, Dina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2017: #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 SCOTUS Certificate of Good Standing) (mtr).
December 4, 2017 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case. (jss)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(e),the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this case to Judge Van Bokkelen. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 12/4/2017. (jss)
December 1, 2017 Filing 34 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2018 11:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/2017. (smb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/2017. (smb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nancy G Milburn PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company,and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/17. (mtr)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean O Morris PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/17. (mtr)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shreya A Fadia PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/17. (mtr)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/17. (mtr)
November 30, 2017 Filing 27 Application for Attorney Shreya A. Fadia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3422696(Fadia PHV, Shreya)
November 30, 2017 Filing 26 Application for Attorney Nancy G. Milburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3422688(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
November 30, 2017 Filing 25 Application for Attorney Sean O. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3422672(Morris PHV, Sean)
November 30, 2017 Filing 24 Application for Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn W. Hutchinson. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3422639(Hutchinson PHV, Kathryn)
November 27, 2017 Filing 23 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D04-1710-CT-00202. (nal)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer(s) to First Amended Complaint from Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammond Lead Products LLC, and Hammond Group, Inc. due 12/20/2017. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/27/2017. no pdf attached. (cpb)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company answer due 12/20/2017; The Chemours Company answer due 12/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/22/2017. (cpb)
November 22, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint,,, by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Abrahamson, Harold)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 12/20/2017; BP West Coast Products LLC answer due 12/20/2017. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/21/2017, no pdf attached. (cpb)
November 21, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company of Related Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holiday Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Barbee Complaint)(Cox, Dina)
November 21, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint,,, Unopposed by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/20/2017. (smb)
November 20, 2017 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Abrahamson, Harold)
November 20, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Abrahamson on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Abrahamson, Harold)
November 16, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S Pavlack on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pavlack, Eric)
November 16, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent DowDuPont, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Cox, Dina)
November 16, 2017 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc for The Chemours Company.. (Cox, Dina)
November 16, 2017 Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE PENDING MOTION) (mlc)
November 15, 2017 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Cox, Dina)
November 15, 2017 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
November 15, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company in Support of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Du Pont, #3 Exhibit C - Summons to The Chemours Co, #4 Exhibit D - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Yalvigi Affidavit, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Record)(Cox, Dina)
November 15, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M Cox on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company (Cox, Dina)
November 15, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Defendants ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
November 15, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent BP America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY; Corporate Parent BP Products North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP West Coast Products LLC.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC (DeLaney, Kathleen)
November 15, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3410378.) from LAKE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT 4, Cause No. 45D04-1710-CT-00202, filed by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - War Supply Contracts Vol 2 1945, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY JACKSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTRICIA CLAY
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMIA EDWARDS
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G. BY NEXT FRIEND JALISA WASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.H. BY NEXT FRIEND KEISHA HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.W. 3 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPHELIA WALKER
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISHA HILL
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAZON JACKSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L. 1 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JALISA WASH
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.2 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.R. BY NEXT FRIEND NNEKA SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNEKA SIMMONS
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE MOORE
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M. BY NEXT FRIEND KEISHA HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.F. BY NEXT FRIEND KEMIQUA FUNCHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD WILLIAMS
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE SNELLING SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.G. BY NEXT FRIEND JALISA WASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.B. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAYESA WALKER
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTRICE JOHNSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J. BY NEXT FRIEND KAMIA EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE JOHNSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEMIQUA FUNCHES
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMANI SIMMONS
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENZO JACKSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C. BY NEXT FRIEND LUTRICIA CLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W. BY NEXT FRIEND KEMIQUA FUNCHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN POWELL
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J. BY NEXT FRIEND TAMMIE MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.E. BY NEXT FRIEND KAMIA EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H. BY NEXT FRIEND SHERRY JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRIE BAKER
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.W. 1 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L. 3 BY NEXT FRIEND NAYESA WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE MAE MOORE
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCELL WASHINGTON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C. BY NEXT FRIEND LUTRICIA CLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONONA PARKER
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANA PERSON
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.W. 2 BY NEXT FRIEND SHANNON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE HALL
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.D. BY NEXT FRIEND RANA PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J. BY NEXT FRIEND SHERRY JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KR
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SW 1
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SW 2
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJ
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MW
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KF
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Snelling Sr
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JH
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TB
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DM
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BE
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CC
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JG
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KL 1
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcell Washington, Sr
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJ
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DD
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KL 3
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AH
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KL 2
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MB
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SW 3
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALSTAB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALOX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Group, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Shreya A Fadia PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Shreya A Fadia PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammon Lead Products LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halstab LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halox LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?