Schmucker et al v. Johnson Controls Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Schmucker, Sonya Schmucker, Stephen Vandiepenbos, Lori Vandiepenbos and Richard L Stewart
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc and Tocon Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01593
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6972
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment DE 287 is DENIED, Johnson Controls' motion for summary judgment DE 291 is GRANTED as to the subsection (a)(1)(A) claim and DENIED as to the subsection (a)(1)(B) claim, Joh nson Controls motion to exclude Dr. Keramida's opinions DE 271 is DENIED in part and DISMISSED in part with leave to renew at trial, Johnson Controls' first motion to strike Dr. Keramida's supplemental report DE 329 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and its second motion to strike DE 333 is DENIED, Johnson Controls' motion to exclude Dr. Orris opinions DE 273 is DISMISSED with leave to renew at trial, The Plaintiffs' motion to exclude Johnson Controls' ; experts' opinions DE 281 is DENIED, Johnson Controls' motion for leave to file a surreply DE 307 is DENIED, Johnson Controls' motion to strike DE 313 is DENIED, Johnson Controls' motion for leave to supplement its disclosures DE 341 is DENIED and the motion to seal DE 322 is DENIED, so the Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal DE 321 . Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/19/19. (Copy mailed to pro se parties). (nal)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 *ENTERED per DE 215 in 3:15cv226* OPINION AND ORDER: DENIES 178 MOTION For Entry Of A Lone Pine Case; REMINDS the parties of their ongoing obligation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e); ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report by 2/8/2017 as outli ned in Order; DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this order in Schmucker v. Johnson Controls, Inc., 3:14-cv-1593-JD-MGG; SETS fact discovery deadline for 6/30/2017; and ORDERS the parties to submit a revised case management plan no later than 5/1/2017 as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/25/2017. (lhc)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Johnson Controls Inc as to Count I which is dismissed without prejudice and DENIED as to CountII, and DENYING 55 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike or File Sur-Sur-Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Johnson Controls Inc. Plaintiff is granted until 4/6/2015 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/2/2015. (kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmucker et al v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schmucker
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Schmucker
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Vandiepenbos
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Vandiepenbos
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Stewart
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Kelly J Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?