Hostetler et al v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Plaintiff: Amos Hostetler, Debbie Hostetler, Rita Chairez, Becky Null and Maria Tovar
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc and Tocon Holdings LLC
Cross_claimant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Cross_defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Counter_claimant: Johnson Controls Inc
Counter_defendant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00226
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 397 MOTION to exclude Dr. Torry's Opinions. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/13/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(mrm)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Johnson Controls' Motion to exclude Dr. Keramida's opinions 393 . The Court excludes Dr. Keramida's calculations as to vapors from the plant and parking areas, and her upper-bound calculation as to TCE from the neighborhood groundwater. The Court otherwise denies the motion, however, so Dr. Keramida may present her calculations as modified to reflect the vapor concentrations from the neighborhood groundwater (with the site-specific attenuation factor) and the sewer pipes. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/8/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 OPINION AND ORDER granting 394 Motion to exclude these three experts' opinions that the Plaintiffs are at an increased risk of adverse health effects. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 09/16/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 383 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of (1) Jeffrey Rechtin and Joseph Giddens, (2) Kristen Stout, and (3) Adam Stepanek by Defendant Johnson Controls Inc., Johnson Controls Inc. As t o Mr. Rechtin and Mr. Giddens, the Court excludes Opinion 1 and testimony on the medical impact of asbestos, but otherwise denies the motion. The Court grants the motion to exclude as to Ms. Stout but denies the motion as to Dr. Stepanek. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/21/2020. (lhc)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 301 Motion for Class Certification. Johnson Controls' 313 Motion to Strike Dr. Keramida's Opinions is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The remaining 310 , 325 , 327 Motions to Strike and the 323 Motion for an evidentiary hearing are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/15/2018. cc: Tocon Holdings LLC (tc)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 222 MOTION To Strike Plaintiff's Third Motion to Remand re 216 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Renewed) by Defendant Johnson Controls Inc and DENYING 216 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Renewed) by Plaintiffs Rita Chairez, Amos Hostetler, Debbie Hostetler, Becky Null, Maria Tovar. DENYING as moot, 245 MOTION To Strike The Expert Report Of Dr. Joseph Kadane by Defendant Johnson Controls Inc. The Court declines to impose an award of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/28/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OPINION AND ORDER: DENIES 178 MOTION For Entry Of A Lone Pine Case; REMINDS the parties of their ongoing obligation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e); ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report by 2/8/2017 as outlined in Order; DIRECTS the Cler k to file a copy of this order in Schmucker v. Johnson Controls, Inc., 3:14-cv-1593-JD-MGG; SETS fact discovery deadline for 6/30/2017; and ORDERS the parties to submit a revised case management plan no later than 5/1/2017 as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/25/2017. (lhc)(cc: Tocon Holdings LLC)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 21 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Rita Chairez, Amos Hostetler, Debbie Hostetler, Becky Null, Maria Tovar; GRANTING 50 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Malcolm S. Cohen and Laura Steiner by Defendant Johnson Control s Inc.; DENYING 90 MOTION for Leave to File Newly Discovered Evidence in Support of Remand by Plaintiffs Rita Chairez, Amos Hostetler, Debbie Hostetler, Becky Null, Maria Tovar; DENYING 115 MOTION for Leave to File/Submit Order of the Bankruptcy Court in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand by Defendant Johnson Controls Inc. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/11/16. (cc: Tocon Holdings LLC). (cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hostetler et al v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Hostetler
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Represented By: John D Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Hostetler
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Represented By: John D Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Chairez
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Represented By: John D Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Null
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Represented By: John D Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Tovar
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Melissa A Gardner
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Represented By: John D Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Kelly J Hartzler
Represented By: Jennifer L Ilkka
Represented By: Robert A Roth
Represented By: Edward V Walsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lesa C Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lesa C Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Kelly J Hartzler
Represented By: Jennifer L Ilkka
Represented By: Robert A Roth
Represented By: Edward V Walsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Kelly J Hartzler
Represented By: Jennifer L Ilkka
Represented By: Robert A Roth
Represented By: Edward V Walsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tocon Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kristin D Caldwell
Represented By: Lesa C Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?