Dykes et al v. Jayco, Inc.

Plaintiff: Donna Dykes and Robert Dykes
Defendant: Jayco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00783
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
0 Judge: Michael G Gotsch
1 Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jayco, Inc..(Gasper, Trevor)
September 25, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jayco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Jayco, Inc... (Gasper, Trevor)
September 25, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Jayco, Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
September 24, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
September 24, 2018 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Dykes, Donna Dykes. Jayco, Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Wells, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jayco, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3687415.), filed by Robert Dykes, Donna Dykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wells, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykes et al v. Jayco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Dykes
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dykes
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?