Jones v. Wexford Medical et al
Plaintiff: Brandon L Jones
Defendant: IDOC, John R Harvil, D Lewis, Dr Liaw, Jackson, Indiana Department of Correction, Wexford Medical and Warden
Not Yet Classified: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00552
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff by D Lewis.(Bitner, Douglass)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Jackson, D Lewis.(Bitner, Douglass)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Jackson, D Lewis.(Bitner, Douglass)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass R Bitner on behalf of Jackson, D Lewis (Bitner, Douglass)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D Lewis. D Lewis waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Bitner, Douglass)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyubov Gore on behalf of Warden (Gore, Lyubov)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Warden. Warden waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda E Fiorini on behalf of Warden (Fiorini, Amanda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Dr. Jackson, D. Lewis, and the Warden of the Westville Correctional Facility. Waiver of Service due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Brandon L. Jones leave to proceed on an Eighth Amendment claim for money damages against Dr. Jackson and D. Lewis for acting with deliberate indifference to serious medical needs in relation to his sciatic nerve condition, DIRECTS the clerk to add the Warden of the Westville Correctional Facility as a defendant, GRANTS Brandon L. Jones leave to proceed on an injunctive relief claimagainst the Warden of the Westville Correctional Facility in his official capacity to obtain treatment for his sciatic nerve condition as required by the Eighth Amendment, DISMISSES Wexford Medical, the Indiana Department of Correction, John R. Harvil and Dr. Liaw, DISMISSES all other claims, DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Dr. Jackson, D. Lewis, and the Warden of the Westville Correctional Facility at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the complaint ECF #1 as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) and ORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), Dr. Jackson, D. Lewis, and the Warden of the Westville Correctional Facility to respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claims for which Brandon L. Jones, has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/26/19. (nal)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandon L Jones. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Brandon L. Jones, IDOC # 968087, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/25/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon L Jones. (nae)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 (unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against John R Harvil, IDOC, Jackson, D Lewis, Dr Liaw, Wexford Medical, filed by Brandon L Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) Modified on 7/22/2019 (nae).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (Westville) by Brandon L Jones (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wexford Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Harvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lewis
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Represented By: Lyubov Gore
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?