Huff v. Lott et al
Plaintiff: Michael Allen Huff
Defendant: Lott, Haskel, Sanders, Tremble, Wolford and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00503
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Michael Allen Huff regarding witness. (rmc)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Allen Huff. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Account Ledger, #2 Envelope)(rmc) Modified on 9/3/2021 copy sent back to plt(rmc).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (signed) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe, Haskel, Lott, Sanders, Tremble, Wolford, filed by Michael Allen Huff. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jld)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Amended Pleading Deadline terminated. (jld)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Michael Huff requesting reconsideration of #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (kms)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REMINDING Michael Allen Huff that he has until 8/23/2021, to file a signed complaint, in its entirety, and to resolve his filing fee status as described in the courts previous order (ECF #3 ); and CAUTIONING Michael Allen Huff that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/3/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter from Michael Huff re: signature page of complaint. (Attachments: #1 Signature page of Complaint (with signature), #2 Sworn statements, #3 Envelope) (jld)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; with leave to refile; GRANTING Michael Allen Huff until 8/23/2021, to file a signed complaint and to resolve his filing fee status as described above; and CAUTIONING Mr. Huff that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/20/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Michael Allen Huff. (kms)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (Unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT against John Doe, Haskel, Lott, Sanders, Tremble, Wolford, filed by Michael Allen Huff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Huff)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Lott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allen Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haskel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?