Ebeyer v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Britnee Ebeyer
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Dustin Wasson and Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery
Not Classified By Court: Richard McDevitt
Case Number: 3:2023cv01026
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #25 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance is granted. The appearance of Attorney Alexis R Jenkins is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Defendants, Landmark Recovery of Carmel, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, and Dustin Wasson. Text entry order.(mr)
January 20, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Beau Browning on behalf of Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson (Browning, Beau)
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. (Jenkins, Alexis)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Protective Order by Defendants Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. Defendants have no obligation to respond to the Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories served by Plaintiff on 12/7/2023. Plaintiff may re-serve the Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories onDefendants now that the parties have held their Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/16/2024. (mrm)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 02/14/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 03/29/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 08/31/2024; and from Defendants by 09/30/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 03/18/2024; as to Defendants is 05/20/2024. Deadline for filing dispositive motions is 04/21/2025. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. The parties have agreed upon Honorable Richard McDevitt as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 01/16/2024. (jdb)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by atty Gina Koeneman. Dfts appeared by atty Courtney Mills. The #20 Report of Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date) and hereby made an Order of the Court. Honorable Richard McDevitt appointed as mediator. Counsel to notify mediator by letter. The presiding judge will hold a status conference to set a final pretrial conference and trial. To facilitate this status conference and a prompt trial date, the last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. No motion to extend discovery or to continue other pretrial deadlines will be approved after this motion deadline, except upon a showing of extraordinary reasons directed to the presiding judge. Good cause will not be sufficient to constitute an extraordinary reason. Accordingly, the parties are advised to complete timely discovery and, if necessary, file any motion to continue pretrial deadlines, motion to compel, or such motions that may impact the schedule well in advance of this motion deadline to permit any necessary briefing and time for the court to rule. (FTR 1st Floor.) (ash)
January 12, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mills, Courtney)
January 11, 2024 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mills, Courtney)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. (Mills, Courtney)
December 29, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Britnee Ebeyer. (Crossen, Trevor)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mills, Courtney)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Britnee Ebeyer. (Crossen, Trevor)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dustin Wasson, Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. (Mills, Courtney)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Dustin Wasson. (Mills, Courtney)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from all further proceedings in this case. As this case is related to previously assigned cases before this Court, the Clerk is ORDERED to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Susan L. Collins for the purpose of conducting all non-dispositive pretrial proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and the General Orders of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/5/2023. (mrm)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Dustin Wasson (Jenkins, Alexis)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney D Mills on behalf of Dustin Wasson (Mills, Courtney)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC (Jenkins, Alexis)
December 1, 2023 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nae)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC (Jenkins, Alexis) ***FILING ERROR; REFILED AT #8 *** Modified on 12/1/2023 (ace).
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC. (Mills, Courtney)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney D Mills on behalf of Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC (Mills, Courtney)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5426089.), filed by Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC, Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mills, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebeyer v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britnee Ebeyer
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel, LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Louisville, LLC
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Beau Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Beau Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Wasson
Represented By: Beau Browning
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of South Bend by Landmark Recovery
Represented By: Beau Browning
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?