Rickard v. BASF Corporation
Plaintiff: SCOTT RICKARD
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00069
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Court GRANTS #11 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Plaintiff to initiate the call. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/6/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Scott Rickard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Cummings, Paul)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/26/2019. (tc)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/5/2019. (tc)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/5/2019. (tc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial by BASF Corporation.(Siepman, Kenneth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H Jackson on behalf of BASF Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B Siepman on behalf of BASF Corporation (Siepman, Kenneth)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per #4 BASF Corporation answer due 9/4/2019. (rmc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 08/14/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Scott Rickard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 17, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Cummings on behalf of SCOTT RICKARD (Cummings, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BASF Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3950870.), filed by SCOTT RICKARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickard v. BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Susan H Jackson
Represented By: Kenneth B Siepman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT RICKARD
Represented By: Paul J Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?