SMITH et al v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: JERALD BROUDE, RICHARD M. REEVES, PATRICK B. COLLINS, TERRANCE D. FLYNN, OLEGARIO PENELOZA-DIAZ, DANNY FLOWERS, ANDRA W. RAGLAND, MATTHEW H. FORGEY, LOWELL B. SMITH, BILLY JOHNSON, WILLIE POWELL and CHRISTOPHER M. OROS
Defendant: TOMAW, BRAD, ROWL, KEYS, TY ROBINS, SAVANAH, BRANDON, JEREMY JONES, JACKSON, LELA SANDERS, CIEARA, JEANENN WALKER, SEAN, WILLSON, STEPHANIE, JODY, CHASITY PLUMMER, DEBBIE, MOLT and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv03248
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss Matt Forgey; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time each plaintiff shall have through February 22, 2021, to notify the Court if he wishes to voluntarily dismiss without prejudice his claims or proceed. If a plaintiff elects to proceed, he shall either pay the filing fee or file an individualized motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by February 22, 2021 and denying #21 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/1/2021 Copies mailed per dist list on this order via US Mail (CBU)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Certify Class Action, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice, filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW H. FORGEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION (Second) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Transaction History, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Transaction History, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TERRANCE D. FLYNN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trust Account Information, #2 Envelope). (MAC)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JERALD BROUDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by PATRICK B. COLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MATTHEW H. FORGEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by OLEGARIO PENELOZA-DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ANDRA W. RAGLAND. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BILLY JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by RICHARD M. REEVES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CHRISTOPHER M. OROS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TERRANCE D. FLYNN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DANNY FLOWERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to all Plaintiff's via US mail. (TMC)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings. Each plaintiff shall have through January 22, 2021, to notify the Court whether he would like to voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice or proceed. If a plaintiff fails to notify the Court in the time provided, the Court may dismiss his claims without further warning or opportunity to show cause. Additionally, any plaintiff that wishes to proceed shall also have through January 22, 2021, to either pay the $402 filing fee or file an individualized motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to take either action in the time provided may result in the plaintiff's claims being dismissed without further notice or opportunity to show cause. Any plaintiff who moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis must attach a record of the transactions associated with his inmate trust account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action on December 18, 2020. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). The clerk is directed to include a form motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with each plaintiff's copy of this Order. Copies to each Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion to Proceed IFP). (MAC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRAD, BRANDON, CIEARA, DEBBIE, JACKSON, JODY, JEREMY JONES, KEYS(Mr., Husband of Ms. Keys), KEYS(Ms., ICI Worker), STANLEY KNIGHT, MOLT, CHASITY PLUMMER, TY ROBINS, ROWL, LELA SANDERS, SAVANAH, SEAN, STEPHANIE, TOMAW, JEANENN WALKER, WILLSON, filed by JERALD BROUDE, DANNY FLOWERS, LOWELL B. SMITH, ANDRA W. RAGLAND, CHRISTOPHER M. OROS, OLEGARIO PENELOZA-DIAZ, MATTHEW H. FORGEY, TERRANCE D. FLYNN, RICHARD M. REEVES, BILLY JOHNSON, PATRICK B. COLLINS, WILLIE POWELL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROWL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TY ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVANAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LELA SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIEARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANENN WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASITY PLUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERALD BROUDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD M. REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK B. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE D. FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLEGARIO PENELOZA-DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRA W. RAGLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW H. FORGEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWELL B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER M. OROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?