FRAZIER v. CARTER et al
Plaintiff: JASPER L. FRAZIER
Defendant: STEPHEN HUNT, DANIEL BEDWELL, RICHARD BROWN, B. CROLEY, DR. RAJOLI, SHERIFF ROBERT E. CARTER, AMY STRADER, BRIANNA TRIMBLE, JOHN SCHILLING, A. JACKSON, BRITTNEE SMITH, MIKE ELLIS, PITCHER, GLEN, LISA BOK, KEVIN GILMORE, A. WALLACE, LT. GARDNER and MCKIM
Case Number: 2:2019cv00321
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 RECEIPT #IP066448 for Partial Filing fee in the amount of $10.00, paid by Plaintiff. (AKH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Inform re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(DMW)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 RECEIPT #IP066386 for Partial Filing fee in the amount of $12.00, paid by Plaintiff. (AKH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Submission of Information re Exhaustion of Grievance, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DMW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (DMW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(DMW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIPT #IP066232 for partial filing fee in the amount of $20.00, paid by Plaintiff. (DJH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by Jasper Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (LBT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Submission of Information, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LBT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Submission of Information Regarding Filing Fee Payments, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (LBT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Assistance with Recruitment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (LBT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff has already paid $10.00. Accordingly, the plaintiff shall have through September 9, 2019, in which to pay $32.00 to the clerk of the district court. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019. (RSF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE, re #6 Order, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT #IP065914 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $10.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by JASPER L. FRAZIER. Copy provided. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet) (DMW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(DMW)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is DENIED as presented. He shall have until August 9, 2019, in which to renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on July 3, 2019. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/15/2019. (DMW)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by JASPER L. FRAZIER. Copy provided. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet) (DMW)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JASPER L. FRAZIER. (MAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DANIEL BEDWELL, LISA BOK, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, B. CROLEY, MIKE ELLIS, GARDNER, KEVIN GILMORE, GLEN, STEPHEN HUNT, A. JACKSON, MCKIM, PITCHER, RAJOLI, JOHN SCHILLING, BRITTNEE SMITH, AMY STRADER, BRIANNA TRIMBLE, A. WALLACE, filed by JASPER L. FRAZIER. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waiver of Service). (MAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by JASPER L. FRAZIER located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by JASPER L. FRAZIER to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRAZIER v. CARTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN HUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BEDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. CROLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. RAJOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF ROBERT E. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIANNA TRIMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SCHILLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTNEE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA BOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. GARDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASPER L. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?