Cervantes v. CRST International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Cervantes and Mike Cross
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, CRST International, Inc, CRST Expedited, Inc and CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Cervantes, Mike Cross re #102 Amended Complaint, #103 Summons Issued (Sweeney, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 103 Summons Issued as to CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
September 18, 2020 Filing 102 SECOND AMENDED Complaint against CRST International, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc., and CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., filed by Anthony Cervantes and Mike Cross. (Martin, Susan) Modified text on 9/18/2020 (skm).
September 10, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing of Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing of Consent to Sues (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 99 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward Tuddenham (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3280827): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Edward Tuddenham is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Mr Tuddenham must register for E-Filing with the Northern District of Iowa through PACER by 9/23/2020). Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2020. (pac)
September 8, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing of Consent to Sues (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward Tuddenham ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3280827) by Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing of Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 MOTION to Set Deadline for Filing Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings. Amended Complaint due by 9/18/2020; Responsive pleadings due by 10/19/2020; and Scheduling Report due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/20/2020. (jag)
August 20, 2020 Filing 94 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J.D. Sweeney (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3268590): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Michael JD Sweeney is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2020. (pac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Set Deadline for Filing Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings by CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc. Unresisted (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanson, James) Modified event and text on 8/20/2020 (pac).
August 19, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing Consent to Sue Form (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J.D. Sweeney ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3268590) by Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Filing Consent to Sue Forms (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 89 *TEXT ORDER granting #86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan Martin, #87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Kroll, and #88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael M. Licata on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds these motions should be granted (registration with IAND through PACER due by 8/27/2020). Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020 (eMartin, eKroll, eLicata). (skm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael M. Licata ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3264541) by Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Kroll ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3264538) by Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan Martin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3264532) by Plaintiff Anthony Cervantes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L Bonnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bonnett, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 84 *TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth M Bolka (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3262566), #80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James H Hanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3262569), #81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam C Smedstad (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3262572), and #82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James T Spolyar (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3262578): Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds these motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Elizabeth M Bolka, James H Hanson, Adam C Smedstad, and James T Spolyar are authorized to appear on behalf of Defendants CRST International, Inc and CRST Expedited, Inc (Attorneys Bolka, Smedstad, and Spolyar must register for E-Filing with the Northern District of Iowa through PACER by 8/24/2020). Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (pac)
August 7, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James T. Spolyar ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3262578) by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Visser, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam C. Smedstad ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3262572) by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Visser, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James H. Hanson ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3262569) by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Visser, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth M. Bolka ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3262566) by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Visser, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Visser on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc, CRST International, Inc. (Visser, Kevin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE to Attorney(s) Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa (eAttys) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #1 Receipt Confirmations) (des).
August 5, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
August 5, 2020 Filing 76 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10106. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 8/5/2020 (des)
August 5, 2020 Filing 75 Case transferred to to Northern District of Iowa. Original file with documents numbered 1-74, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Baker, Casey) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 74 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF TRANSFER entered. (Baker, Casey) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 73 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.CRST's motion to transfer venue [Docket No. #38 ] is ALLOWED and the case will be transferred to the Northern District of Iowa. CRST's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [Docket No. #36 ] is DENIED AS MOOT.SO ORDERED.(Baker, Casey) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 72 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 71 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 70 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Consent to Sue, #4 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 69 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2020 re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CRST International, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc., #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. filed by CRST International, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2020 ORDERED: Motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and to transfer venue are taken under advisement. Parties shall submit a Joint Proposed Pretrial Statement, including a Joint Discovery Plan and Schedule for Filing of Motions, on or before August 7, 2020. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing 16.b Scheduling Conference and Motion hearing will go forward by VIDEO-CONFERENCEThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.MEDIA/PUBLIC:Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference/and Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2020 02:30 PM will go forward by Video-conference before Judge Patti B. Saris(Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 67 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 66 PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL SCHEDULE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (Proposed Pretrial Schedule) by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2020 (Lara, Miguel). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 65 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Jan Wiltgen, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes re #33 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Withdrawal of Consent to Sue) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 61 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 7/8/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa., #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing reset for 7/8/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 58 Deadlines set as to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa., #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Replies due by 6/22/2020. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 57 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #54 Motion for Leave to File Replies ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 56 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 55 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 54 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss and Transfer, to Set the Deadline for Filing Their Replies, and to Continue the Hearing Date on the Motions by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc..(Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 53 EXHIBIT re #51 Opposition to Motion,,,,,, (Exhibit A-3 CRST STI Business Entity Report for 2018-2019) by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 52 Opposition re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. filed by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - ARISE, #2 Ex. 2 - Definition of In Connection With by Merriam-Webster (002), #3 Ex. 3 - MacMillan Dictionary, #4 Ex. 4 - American Heritage Dictionary Entry_ in connection with, #5 Ex. 5 - Declaration of Chris Fink, #6 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 51 Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sweeney - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1 CRST-Media-Kit-2018-1, #3 Exhibit A-2 2020 Biennial Report of CRST International, #4 Exhibit A-3 CRST STI Business Entity Report for 2018-2019, #5 Exhibit A-4 2020 Biennial Report of CRST Expedited, #6 Exhibit A-5 management team - crst international, #7 Exhibit A-6 about us - crst international, #8 Exhibit A-7 opportunities - crst international, #9 Exhibit A-8 services - crst international, #10 Exhibit A-9 expedited team service - crst international, #11 Exhibit A-10 high value _ white glove - crst international, #12 Exhibit A-11 malone_ inc. - crst international, #13 Exhibit A-12 history - crst international, #14 Exhibit A-13 CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc 2018 Biennial Report, #15 Exhibit A-14 CRST_Map, #16 Exhibit A-15 warehouse_operations specialist _ sterling corporation lowell_ ma, #17 Exhibit A-16 Complaint in CRST v 5 Star, #18 Exhibit A-17 crst_com_career_benefit, #19 Exhibit B Declaration of Anthony Cervantes, #20 Exhibit C Declaration of Adam St. Amour, #21 Exhibit D Declaration of David Joseph, #22 Exhibit E Declaration of Jeffrey Walters, #23 Exhibit F Declaration of Darius Shines, #24 Exhibit G Declaration of Dvante Mathews, #25 Exhibit H Declaration of Jeremy Lauren, #26 Exhibit I Declaration of Thomas Inglehart, #27 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 50 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 49 Reset Deadlines as to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa., #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 5/29/2020. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 48 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 47 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/29/2020 to File Answer re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/29/2020 to Respond to Defendants Motions to Dismiss and Transfer ( Responses due by 5/26/2020) by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 46 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 45 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa., #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 42 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa., #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 5/18/2020. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/18/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chad Brueck, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Anthony Cervantes' January 3, 2018 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Anthony Cervantes' March 14, 2018 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Adam St. Amour's April 15, 2015 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Gannon, #6 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jan Wiltgen, #7 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa. by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chad Brueck, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Anthony Cervantes' January 3, 2018 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Anthony Cervantes' March 14, 2018 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chad Brueck - Adam St. Amour's April 15, 2015 Independent Contractor Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Gannon, #6 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jan Wiltgen, #7 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 32 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam C. Smedstad. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 31 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CRST Expedited, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020; CRST International, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam C. Smedstad Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8173111 by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Adam C. Smedstad)(Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2020 to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc..(Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue (Dkt. 16-1, Page 2) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Cervantes. CRST Expedited, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; CRST International, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt-In Consent Forms)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J.D. Sweeney. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J.D. Sweeney Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8102003 by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J.D. Sweeney)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Anthony Cervantes of Opt-In Consent Form Filing (Attachments: #1 Opt-In Consent Form)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles Andrewscavage. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James H. Hanson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles Andrewscavage Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8081752 by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Charles Andrewscavage)(Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James H. Hanson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8081745 by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of James H. Hanson)(Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Sonneborn on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc. (Sonneborn, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Licata. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Susan Martin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Licata Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8064494 by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Licata)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan Martin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8064478 by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Susan Martin)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., DOES 1 through 10. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8061344 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anthony Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervantes v. CRST International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST International, Inc
Represented By: Adam C. Smedstad
Represented By: James H Hanson
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Represented By: James T Spolyar
Represented By: Elizabeth M Bolka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc
Represented By: Adam C. Smedstad
Represented By: James H Hanson
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Represented By: James T Spolyar
Represented By: Elizabeth M Bolka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cervantes
Represented By: Michael M. Licata
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Susan Martin
Represented By: Jennifer Kroll
Represented By: Daniel L Bonnett
Represented By: Edward Tuddenham
Represented By: Michael JD Sweeney
Represented By: Michael M Licata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Cross
Represented By: Susan Martin
Represented By: Daniel L Bonnett
Represented By: Edward Tuddenham
Represented By: Jennifer Kroll
Represented By: Michael M Licata
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Michael JD Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?