BTC, Inc. v. AT&T Corp.
Plaintiff: BTC, Inc. d/b/a Western Iowa Networks and BTC, Inc
Defendant: AT&T Corp. and AT&T Corp
Interested Party: Iowa Network Services, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv03075
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Abhay Mukund Nadipuram terminated as counsel for BTC, Inc. Attorneys Sarah K. Franklin and John C. Pietila remain as counsel for BTC, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 01/02/2020. (KEM)
December 31, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Defendant BTC, Inc, Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Nadipuram, Abhay)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/13/2019. (jjh)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by AT&T Corp. Discovery completion by 3/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. The final pretrial conference (July 7, 2020) and trial (July 20, 2020) are continued. The parties shall be ready for trial on or after October 12, 2020. The court will reschedule the final pretrial conference and trial by separate order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2019. (jag)
December 6, 2019 Filing 49 JOINT UNRESISTED Motion for Extending Deadlines by Counter Claimant AT&T Corp, Defendant AT&T Corp (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gray, Angela)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying without prejudice #44 Motion to Quash and #45 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/2/2019. (pac)
December 2, 2019 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #44 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order by Iowa Network Services, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Redacted Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit B- Redacted Objections by Aureon, #3 Exhibit C- Amended Certificate of Compliance, #4 Exhibit D- Proposed Order) (Hellstern, David)
November 29, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Seal Document by Interested Party Iowa Network Services, Inc. d/b/a Aureon Network Services (Hellstern, David)
November 29, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order by Interested Party Iowa Network Services, Inc. d/b/a Aureon Network Services (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A- Redacted Notice of Deposition, #3 Exhibit B- Redacted Objections by Aureon, #4 Exhibit C- Certificate of Compliance, #5 Exhibit D- Proposed Order to Quash) (Hellstern, David)
November 29, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hellstern and Dennis L Puckett on behalf of Iowa Network Services, Inc. (Hellstern, David) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (pac).
November 20, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF to re 37 SEALED Motion to Compel filed by BTC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Nadipuram, Abhay)
November 14, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED Response to 37 SEALED Motion to Compel Amended filed by AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J Hunseder, #2 Declaration of John W Habiak) (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (pac).
November 13, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED Response to 37 SEALED Motion to Compel filed by AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Hunseder, #2 Declaration of John W. Habiak) (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (pac).
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #38 Unresisted Motion to file response to motion to compel under seal. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/12/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
November 12, 2019 Filing 38 UNRESISTED Motion for Expedited Relief to File Under Seal by Counter Claimant AT&T Corp, Defendant AT&T Corp. (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (pac).
November 1, 2019 DOCKET Annotation re 37 SEALED Motion to Compel : Received judge's copy of motion and related filings in SC. (kms)
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #35 Motion to Seal motion to compel, declaration and exhibits by Counter Defendant BTC, Inc., Plaintiff BTC, Inc. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/29/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to file under Seal Its Motion to Compel, Declaration and Exhibits by Counter Defendant BTC, Inc, Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Nadipuram, Abhay)
October 8, 2019 Filing 34 BTC Inc. d/b/a Western Iowa Networks' ANSWER to #33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of AT&T Corp. by BTC, Inc.(Nadipuram, Abhay)
October 1, 2019 FEE Receipt: $100.00, receipt number IAN550002201 for Pro Hac Vice fee for Spencer Driscoll appearing on behalf of AT&T Corp. (eAttny Driscoll) (src)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against BTC, Inc by AT&T Corp.(Gray, Angela)
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer D Driscoll: Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is ordered that Attorney Spencer D Driscoll is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant AT&T Corp (Pro Hac Vice Fee due by 9/25/2019. ECF Registration Form due by 9/25/2019). Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019. (pac)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer D. Driscoll by Defendant AT&T Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gray, Angela)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's #14 Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/3/2019. (jjh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/14/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 27 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing: Telephone Conference requested by the parties set for 8/13/2019 at 9:30 AM CENTRAL (Telephonic Hearing - see dial-in instructions for participation) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the "host" (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 08/12/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE Order granting #25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/7/2019. (pac)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Nadipuram, Abhay)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian A McAleenan: Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Brian A McAleenan is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant AT&T Corp. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019. (pac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian A. McAleenan by Defendant AT&T Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gray, Angela)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 08:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2020 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/4/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/3/2019. (des)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 5/24/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 5/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 8/30/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 10/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 1/31/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 6/29/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 5/31/2019. (des)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J Hunseder (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2947870) on behalf of Defendant AT&T Corp. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Michael J Hunseder is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant AT&T Corp. Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2019. (pac)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Hunseder ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2947870) by Defendant AT&T Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Morales, Angela)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 05/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order). (Gollhofer, Jami)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AT&T Corp. (Morales, Angela)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BTC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nadipuram, Abhay)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant AT&T Corp. Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Morales, Angela) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (pac).
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Corp. (Morales, Angela)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Linebaugh on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela J Morales on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Morales, Angela)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Granting #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Scheduling order and discovery plan deadlines filed by BTC, Inc. The deadline for submitting a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan is extended to and including May 17, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/25/2019. (src)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Scheduling order and discovery plan deadlines by Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Nadipuram, Abhay)
March 13, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/5/2019. (pac)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BTC, Inc. AT&T Corp waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Nelson, John)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Carl Nelson, Jr, on behalf of Plaintiff BTC, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/25/2019. (des)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Nelson, Jr. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2856202) by Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Nadipuram, Abhay)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George David Carter, Jr, on behalf of Plaintiff BTC, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/14/2019. (des)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George David Carter, Jr, (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2847788) by Plaintiff BTC, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Nadipuram, Abhay)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BTC, Inc (Franklin, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Reset Deadline due to calculation error: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2019. (pac)
December 31, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/21/2019. (src)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (src)
December 31, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. No conflicts identified with parties, plaintiff's attorneys, LTS and KEM. (src)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against AT&T Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2839195.), filed by BTC, Inc. d/b/a Western Iowa Networks. Scheduling Report due by 3/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Franklin, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BTC, Inc. v. AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Spencer D Driscoll
Represented By: Michael Joseph Hunseder
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Represented By: Angela J Gray
Represented By: Brian A McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BTC, Inc. d/b/a Western Iowa Networks
Represented By: Sarah K Franklin
Represented By: Abhay Mukund Nadipuram
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Franklin
Represented By: John C. Pietila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BTC, Inc
Represented By: Abhay Mukund Nadipuram
Represented By: John Pietila
Represented By: George David Carter, Jr
Represented By: John Carl Nelson, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Iowa Network Services, Inc
Represented By: David J Hellstern
Represented By: Dennis L Puckett
Represented By: Dave Hellstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?