Great Lakes Communication Corporation v. AT&T Corp
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Communication Corporation
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Case Number: 5:2013cv04117
Filed: December 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Donald E OBrien
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OPINION and ORDER: Denying 232 Motion to Vacate Primary Jurisdiction Referral and Stay: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/20/18. (kfs)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order denying in its entirety 212 Motion to Reconsider 183 Memorandum Opinion and Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certificate of Appealability and for Stay Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Great Lakes Communication Corporation. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/7/2015. (des)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Referral To The FCC Under The Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine. See order text for details. This case is stayed, and the jury trial, currently set to begin on July 13, 2105, is stricken. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/29/2015. (src)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Accepting 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Great Lakes' 17 MOTION to Dismiss is denied in part and granted in part. AT&T is directed to file an amended counterclaim curing its failure to plead sufficient facts no later than 20 days after entry of this Order. Great Lakes' 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. See text of Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E OBrien on 3/3/15. (djs)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommend 17 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Great Lakes Communication Corporation be granted in part and denied in part (See Order Text). Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/24/2014. (des)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Communication Corporation v. AT&T Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Communication Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Paul Bowser
Represented By: Ross Allen Buntrock
Represented By: George David Carter, Jr
Represented By: Jeana L Goosmann
Represented By: Anthony Lee Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Richard W Lozier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?