Baker v. Buchanan County, Iowa et al

Plaintiff: Duane Baker
Defendant: Rex Nielson, Buchanan County, Iowa and Russell West
Case Number: 6:2019cv02036
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David E Schrock on behalf of Buchanan County, Iowa, Rex Nielson, Russell West. (Schrock, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duane Baker. Russell West served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (O'Brien, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duane Baker. Rex Nielson served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (O'Brien, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duane Baker. Buchanan County, Iowa served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (des)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Buchanan County, Iowa, Rex Nielson, Russell West. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
June 13, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2959187) filed by Duane Baker. Scheduling Report due by 9/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Buchanan County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Baker
Represented By: David A O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Nielson
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchanan County, Iowa
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell West
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?