Parker v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Dawn D. Parker
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00099
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Target Corporation. (Wormsley, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/13/2018. (bp)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Iowa District Court for Des Moines County, case number LALA005085. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3621312., filed by Target Corporation. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 EXH A - Petition, #2 EXH B - Service, #3 EXH C - Answer)(Wormsley, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn D. Parker
Represented By: Steven J Crowley
Represented By: Edward J Prill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Scott Wormsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?