El-Amin v. McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Ajamu M El-Amin
Defendant: William McCarthy, Naggar, Scott, Rehor, Williams and Fritz
Case Number: 4:2018cv00438
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2018 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Naggar; Naggar waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scott; Scott waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Fritz; Fritz waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rehor; Rehor waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William McCarthy; William McCarthy waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Williams; Williams waiver served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Gavin, Meghan)
December 19, 2018 10 WAIVER to Of Service of Summons by William McCarthy. (Gavin, Meghan)
November 27, 2018 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SGT. NAGGAR on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 27, 2018 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SGT. SCOTT on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 27, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SGT. FRITZ on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 27, 2018 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to LT. REHOR on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 27, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to MAJOR WILLIAMS on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 27, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SHERIFF WILLIAM MCCARTHY on 11/27/2018 by Ajamu M El-Amin. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver) (slg)
November 26, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Defendants to file a Reply to the Complaint within 60 days. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 11/26/2018. (ptb)
November 9, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ajamu M El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Form C) (slg)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Fritz, William McCarthy, Naggar, Rehor, Scott, Williams, filed by Ajamu M El-Amin. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Amin v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McCarthy
Represented By: Meghan L. Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naggar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajamu M El-Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?