Vaughn v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Karen S. Vaughn
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00415
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 05:5514
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Karen S. Vaughn (Marks, Samuel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Target Corporation. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Quill, Gavin)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/21/2020. (don)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Polk County, IA, case number SCSC646764. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4014355., filed by Target Corporation. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Quill, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gavin Francis Quill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen S. Vaughn
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?