Bensley v. Pate et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Bensley
Defendant: Jamie Fitzgerald and Paul Pate
Case Number: 4:2020cv00329
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Jean Bussanmas on behalf of Jamie Fitzgerald (Bussanmas, Julie)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jamie Fitzgerald. Responses due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gavin, Meghan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jessica Bensley; Jamie Fitzgerald waiver served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Downey, Glen)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Thompson on behalf of Paul Pate (Thompson, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Statler on behalf of Jessica Bensley (Statler, Paul)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jessica Bensley; Paul Pate waiver served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Downey, Glen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4284362., filed by Jessica Bensley. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/24/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2021.(Downey, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bensley v. Pate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Meghan L. Gavin
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pate
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bensley
Represented By: Glen Stephen Downey
Represented By: Paul Statler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?