Dembry v. U.S. Probation Office et al
Petitioner: Edward Keith Dembry
Respondent: B.O.P., U.S. Probation Office and BOP
Case Number: 4:2020cv00354
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Keith Dembry regarding notice of service. (slg)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of BOP, U.S. Probation Office against Edward Keith Dembry. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 12/3/2020. (kjw)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/1/2020. (mem)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Keith Dembry. (kjw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/18/2020 fixed envelope that was sideways) (kjw).
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B.O.P., U.S. Probation Office, filed by Edward Keith Dembry. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/14/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/14/2021. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dembry v. U.S. Probation Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Keith Dembry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B.O.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?