Courville v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Chase M Courville
Defendant: Smith, Bass and Walker
Case Number: 3:2016cv00684
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 54 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment, 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ordered that this matter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge to hold an evidentiary hearing on exhaustion and on the merits, and thereafter, to issue findings to the court, via report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 6, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court *VACATED* JUDGMENT ADOPTING 54 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is Further Ordered that this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge to hold an evidentiary hearing on exhaustion and on the merits, and to issue findings to the court, via report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/6/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 11/7/2017 to indicate Judgement vacated(Crawford, A).
June 7, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Have Mark Hunter Produce Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/7/2017. (crt,Williams, L)
December 14, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendation 13 . IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs claim for failure to provide medical care, as well as any and all claims against Defendant Major Walker, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/14/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courville v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase M Courville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?