Hongo v. Goodwin et al
Plaintiff: Hongo and Ronnie K Hongo
Defendant: Goodwin, LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Scott Cottrell, Warden Dauzat, Mr Atkins, Tommy Garrett, Jerry Goodwin, Chris Evans, Warden Rachel, Warden Huff, Cory B Leone and James M LeBlanc
Case Number: 5:2017cv00015
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Filing 16 USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie K Hongo that under FED R. APP. P. 42(b), the appeal is DISMISSED as of December 19, 2017, pursuant to appellant's motion. (USCA #17-30850) (crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 26, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-30850 for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie K Hongo. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re #12 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/25/2017. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 19, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Ronnie K Hongo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 19, 2017 Filing 13 FEE LETTER requesting payment of appeal filing fee sent to Ronnie K Hongo re #12 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 19, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Ronnie K Hongo. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On 10/4/2017 Plaintiff filed an "Objection to Report and Recommendation." Final Judgment was rendered on 9/20/2017 and the case is closed. The Plaintiff may appeal the Court's judgment by following the proper procedure for an appeal, but the Court declines to construe the "Objection to Report and Recommendation" as a notice of appeal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/10/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 4, 2017 Filing 10 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendations by Ronnie K Hongo. Response to Objection to R&R due by 10/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronnie K Hongo. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's complaint is hereby DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/20/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Mr Atkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/30/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 24, 2017 Filing 7 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Mr. Atkins by Ronnie K Hongo. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 3, 2017 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Ronnie K Hongo. Response to Objection to R&R due by 7/17/2017 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 22, 2017 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronnie K Hongo, RECOMMENDING that the complaint be DENIED and DISMISSED as frivolous and for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 24, 2017 Confirmation of receipt of payment from RONNIE HONGO in the amount of $5.34. Transaction posted on 2/15/2017. Receipt number 0536-3290952 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Keller ADI, J)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $5.34. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/10/2017. (crt,Haik, K)
January 9, 2017 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 5, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 5, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie K Hongo. (crt,Adams, K)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atkins, Scott Cottrell, Dauzat, Chris Evans, Tommy Garrett, Jerry Goodwin, Huff, James M LeBlanc, Cory B Leone, LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Rachel filed by Ronnie K Hongo. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hongo v. Goodwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie K Hongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dauzat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Rachel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory B Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?