COLLINS et al v. LIBERTY et al
Plaintiff: SAMUAL COLLINS
Defendant: PHILIP HODGDON, ERIC MCVAY, RANDALL LIBERTY, BOB WALDEN, DR ROBERT CLINTON, ALEXANDER RICHARDS, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, DR ELIZABETH LAMSON, DR DANA WEBSTER, BARBARA WAKEEN and KURT DYER, SR
Undetermined: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2018cv00435
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/6/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/13/2019. Motions due by 5/28/2019. Ready for Trial on 8/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELIZABETH LAMSON, DANA WEBSTER. (HATCH, ROBERT)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELIZABETH LAMSON, DANA WEBSTER.(HATCH, ROBERT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by BARBARA WAKEEN Responses due by 1/2/2019. (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by BARBARA WAKEEN. (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by BARBARA WAKEEN.(TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER C. TAINTOR on behalf of BARBARA WAKEEN (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 15, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELIZABETH LAMSON & DANA WEBSTER - Per Order #10: Answer due by 12/17/2018. (mnw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to December 17, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by KURT DYER, SR, PHILIP HODGDON, RANDALL LIBERTY, ERIC MCVAY, ALEXANDER RICHARDS, BOB WALDEN.(FORTIN, JAMES)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELIZABETH LAMSON, DANA WEBSTER Responses due by 12/6/2018. (HATCH, ROBERT)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C. HATCH on behalf of ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELIZABETH LAMSON, DANA WEBSTER (HATCH, ROBERT)
November 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for Robert Walden, Alexander Richards, Philip Hodgon, and Kurt Dyer Sr. Defendants were served on October 25, 2018: Answer due by 11/15/2018. (mjlt)
November 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for Eric McVay Eriv McVay was served on October 28, 2018: Answer due by 11/19/2018. (mjlt)
November 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for Randall Liberty Randall Liberty was served on October 31, 2018: Answer due by 11/21/2018. (mjlt)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMUAL COLLINS. ERIC MCVAY served on 10/28/2018. (NOBLE, ELIZABETH)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMUAL COLLINS. RANDALL LIBERTY served on 10/31/2018. (NOBLE, ELIZABETH)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMUAL COLLINS. ROBERT CLINTON served on 10/25/2018; CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS served on 10/25/2018; KURT DYER, SR served on 10/25/2018; PHILIP HODGDON served on 10/25/2018; ELIZABETH LAMSON served on 10/25/2018; ALEXANDER RICHARDS served on 10/25/2018; BOB WALDEN served on 10/25/2018; DANA WEBSTER served on 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed as to Dr Dana Webster, #2 Summons Returned Executed Alexander Richards #3 Summons Returned Executed Dr. Elizabeth Lamson, #4 Summons Returned Executed as to Philip Hodgon, #5 Summons Returned Executed Kurt Dyer, Sr. #6 Summons Returned Executed Robert Clinton, #7 Summons Returned Executed Correction Care Solution)(NOBLE, ELIZABETH) Modified on 11/15/2018 to add the names of the defendants served (mjlt).
October 19, 2018 Filing Fee Received from SAMUAL COLLINS: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 0100-1917258. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Civil Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 10/19/2018 (slg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, KURT DYER, SR, PHILIP HODGDON, ELIZABETH LAMSON, RANDALL LIBERTY, ERIC MCVAY, ALEXANDER RICHARDS, BARBARA WAKEEN, BOB WALDEN, DANA WEBSTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Liberty Summons (Attachments: #1 Walden Summons, #2 Hodgdon Summons, #3 Webster Summons, #4 Wakeen Summons, #5 Richards Summons, #6 McVay Summons, #7 Lamson Summons, #8 Dyer Summons, #9 Clinton Summons, #10 Correct Care Solutions Summons)(slg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, KURT DYER, SR, PHILIP HODGDON, ELIZABETH LAMSON, RANDALL LIBERTY, ERIC MCVAY, ALEXANDER RICHARDS, BARBARA WAKEEN, BOB WALDEN, DANA WEBSTER with Jury Demand filed by SAMUAL COLLINS. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/17/2019) Fee due by 10/22/2018.(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS et al v. LIBERTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP HODGDON
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC MCVAY
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB WALDEN
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR ROBERT CLINTON
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER RICHARDS
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR ELIZABETH LAMSON
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR DANA WEBSTER
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA WAKEEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAINTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT DYER, SR
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUAL COLLINS
Represented By: ELIZABETH D. NOBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?