FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE and SUSAN B ANTHONY LIST
Defendant: DIANE FOLEY, MD, OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ALEX M AZAR, II
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE, STATE OF ALABAMA, INSTITUTE FOR POLICY INTEGRITY, STATE OF ARKANSAS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSOURI, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF TENNESSEE, MEMBERS OF CONGRESS, STATE OF OHIO and STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00100
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: New HHS Rule by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MERRITT, ROBERT)
April 26, 2019 Filing 65 WITHDRAWAL of : #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of E.D. Washington 4-25-19)(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Motion Hearing held re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE, J DOE, DO, MPH. Matter taken under advisement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (jwr)
April 23, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE. (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney SARAH E. PITLYK and ADAM S. HOCHSCHILD shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/26/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
April 19, 2019 Filing 61 AMICUS BRIEF by SUSAN B ANTHONY LIST. (WHITING, STEPHEN) Modified on 4/19/2019 to clean up docket text (jwr).
April 19, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by SUSAN B ANTHONY LIST Responses due by 5/10/2019. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SUSAN B ANTHONY LIST. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. Pitlyk filed by STEPHEN C. WHITING on behalf of Susan B. Anthony List (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2008097.) (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam S. Hochschild filed by STEPHEN C. WHITING on behalf of Susan B. Anthony List (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2008069.) (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 18, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS on behalf of STATE OF KANSAS (FLOWERS, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Rachel Nicole Morrison shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/24/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 54 BRIEF Amicus Brief by AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE Responses due by 5/8/2019. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Nicole Morrison filed by STEPHEN C. WHITING on behalf of AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2007031.) (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per 12 Order: Reply due by 4/23/2019. (jwr)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief Supporting United States in Opposing Preliminary Injunction By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALEX M AZAR, II, DIANE FOLEY, MD, OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Reply due by 4/29/2019. (MERRITT, ROBERT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Cortman filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of MEMBERS OF CONGRESS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005818.) (BABER, BRETT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elissa M. Graves filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of MEMBERS OF CONGRESS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005817.) (BABER, BRETT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Denise M. Burke filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of MEMBERS OF CONGRESS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005816.) (BABER, BRETT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin H. Theriot filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of MEMBERS OF CONGRESS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005815.) (BABER, BRETT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by MEMBERS OF CONGRESS Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A- Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae)(BABER, BRETT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief Supporting United States in Opposing Preliminary Junction by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF KANSAS Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
April 15, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF KANSAS (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
April 15, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin M. Flowers filed by BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS on behalf of STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE and STATE OF TEXAS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005538.) (FLOWERS, BENJAMIN) Modified on 4/15/2019 to clean-up docket text (jwr).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief ; granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 38 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE re #33 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attachment A. Main Document: Daniel W. Richards, Attachment A, pro hac vice certification. (DRUM, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 37 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE re #32 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attachment A. Main Document: Douglas H. Hallward- Driemeier, Attachment A, pro hac vice certification. (DRUM, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 36 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE re #30 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attachment A. Main Document: Catherine J. Djang, Attachment A, pro hac vice certification. (DRUM, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 35 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE re #29 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attachment A. Main Document: Thomas N. Bulleit, Attachment A, pro hac vice certification. (DRUM, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE re #28 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attachment A. Main Document: Lisa H. Bebchick, Attachment A, pro hac vice certification. (DRUM, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Attorney Lisa Bebchick shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/18/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Certifications for Admission Pro Hac Vice, : Attorney Thomas Bulleit, Catherine Djang, Haley Eagon, Douglas Hallward-Driemeier and Daniel Richards shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/18/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel W. Richards filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004659.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004658.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004657.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine J. Djang filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004656.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas N. Bulleit filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004655.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa H. Bebchick filed by PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004654.) (DRUM, PETER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, #26 Amicus Brief : These docket entries have been modified to include AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE and SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE as filers of these documents. (jwr)
April 11, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Attorney MADISON CONDON and JASON SCHWARTZ shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/18/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 AMICUS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE and SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE . (DRUM, PETER) Modified on 4/11/2019 to include all filers(jwr).
April 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE and SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE Responses due by 5/2/2019. (DRUM, PETER) Modified on 4/11/2019 to include all filers(jwr).
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Institute for Policy Integrity. (BUCHANAN, BRENDA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madison Condon and Jason Schwartz filed by BRENDA M. BUCHANAN on behalf of Institute for Policy Integrity (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2004343.) (Attachments: #1 Jason Schwartz certification of PHV)(BUCHANAN, BRENDA) Modified on 4/11/2019 to include Jason Schwartz(jwr).
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY INTEGRITY Responses due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(BUCHANAN, BRENDA)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal Declaration By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by BRINTON LUCAS on behalf of All Defendants (LUCAS, BRINTON)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Joint Notice of Blanket Consent to the Filing of Amicus Briefs by All Plaintiffs (NESTLER, EMILY)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Declaration, #3 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED MOTION(Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal certain documents filed by ALEX M AZAR, II, DIANE FOLEY, MD, OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Reply due by 4/17/2019. (MERRITT, ROBERT)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE Responses due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memoraundum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of G. Hill, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of E. Kieltyka, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of M. Bailey, Ph.D, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of M. Winnia, M.D., #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of J. Lindo, Ph.D., #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of J. Jenkins)(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / Rule 7.1 Statement by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE. (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Declaration by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE Responses due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Nurse Practitioner)(O'MEARA, RICHARD) Modified on 3/25/2019 to change motion type (jwr).
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion for #17 Preliminary Injunction set for 4/24/2019 09:00 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr) Modified on 3/25/2019 to include link to #17 (jwr). Modified on 4/23/2019 to change the location (jwr).
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C. MERRITT on behalf of All Defendants (MERRITT, ROBERT)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding 12 Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits for Preliminary Injunction Motion : Preliminary Injunction Motion due by 3/25/2019. Response due by 4/15/2019. Reply due by 4/23/2019. (jwr)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits for Preliminary Injunction Motion By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits for Preliminary Injunction Motion by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE Responses due by 4/8/2019. (NESTLER, EMILY)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily S. Ullman and Jennifer H. Saperstein filed by RICHARD L. O'MEARA on behalf of J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1990294.) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer H. Saperstein for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL M. RIESS on behalf of All Defendants (RIESS, DANIEL)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily B. Nestler, Molly R. Duane and Arielle Humphries filed by RICHARD L. O'MEARA on behalf of J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE. See Docket Entry NO. 6 for receipt information. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Molly R. Duane for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Arielle Humphries for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(O'MEARA, RICHARD) Modified on 3/7/2019 to reference receipt in ECF No. 6 (jgd).
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice: This docket entry has been modified to indicate certificates are to be re-filed with signatures at the request of the Clerk's Office. (jgd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ***To be re-filed***CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily B. Nestler, Molly R. Duane and Arielle Humphries filed by RICHARD L. O'MEARA on behalf of J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1985703.) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Molly R. Duane for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Arielle Humphries for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(O'MEARA, RICHARD) Modified on 3/7/2019 to indicate certificates to be re-filed with signatures (jgd).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Sealed Motion to Proceed under Alias; granting #3 Motion to Seal Certain Documents. The plaintiffs' motions to proceed by alias for the natural plaintiff and to seal certain documents are granted, without prejudice to the filing of a motion for reconsideration by one or more defendants once served. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 6, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1985516.), filed by FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE, J DOE, DO, MPH.(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALEX M AZAR, II, DIANE FOLEY, MD, OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Office of Population Affairs summons, #2 Diane Foley, MD summons, #3 Alex M. Azar II summons)(bfa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER ALIAS, MOTION to Seal certain documents by J DOE, DO, MPH, FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE (Attachments: #1 Richard L. OMeara declaration, #2 J. DOE declaration)(bfa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR, II, DIANE FOLEY, MD, OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE, J DOE, DO, MPH. (Service of Process Deadline 6/4/2019) Fee due by 3/8/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE FOLEY, MD
Represented By: DANIEL M. RIESS
Represented By: BRINTON LUCAS
Represented By: ROBERT C. MERRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS
Represented By: DANIEL M. RIESS
Represented By: BRINTON LUCAS
Represented By: ROBERT C. MERRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: DANIEL M. RIESS
Represented By: BRINTON LUCAS
Represented By: ROBERT C. MERRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR, II
Represented By: DANIEL M. RIESS
Represented By: BRINTON LUCAS
Represented By: ROBERT C. MERRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J DOE, DO, MPH
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: EMILY S. ULLMAN
Represented By: EMILY B. NESTLER
Represented By: MOLLY R. DUANE
Represented By: JENNIFER H. SAPERSTEIN
Represented By: ARIELLE HUMPHRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION OF MAINE
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: EMILY S. ULLMAN
Represented By: EMILY B. NESTLER
Represented By: MOLLY R. DUANE
Represented By: JENNIFER H. SAPERSTEIN
Represented By: ARIELLE HUMPHRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN B ANTHONY LIST
Represented By: SARAH E. PITLYK
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Represented By: ADAM S. HOCHSCHILD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: LISA H. BEBCHICK
Represented By: HALEY EAGON
Represented By: DANIEL W. RICHARDS
Represented By: THOMAS N. BULLEIT
Represented By: CATHERINE J. DJANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE
Represented By: PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: LISA H. BEBCHICK
Represented By: HALEY EAGON
Represented By: DANIEL W. RICHARDS
Represented By: THOMAS N. BULLEIT
Represented By: CATHERINE J. DJANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INSTITUTE FOR POLICY INTEGRITY
Represented By: BRENDA M. BUCHANAN
Represented By: JASON SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MADISON CONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH MEDICINE
Represented By: PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: LISA H. BEBCHICK
Represented By: HALEY EAGON
Represented By: DANIEL W. RICHARDS
Represented By: THOMAS N. BULLEIT
Represented By: CATHERINE J. DJANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: LISA H. BEBCHICK
Represented By: HALEY EAGON
Represented By: DANIEL W. RICHARDS
Represented By: THOMAS N. BULLEIT
Represented By: CATHERINE J. DJANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS UNITED FOR LIFE
Represented By: RACHEL NICOLE MORRISON
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: PETER WHITTINGTON DRUM
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: LISA H. BEBCHICK
Represented By: HALEY EAGON
Represented By: DANIEL W. RICHARDS
Represented By: THOMAS N. BULLEIT
Represented By: CATHERINE J. DJANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEMBERS OF CONGRESS
Represented By: ELISSA GRAVES
Represented By: DENISE M. BURKE
Represented By: DAVID A. CORTMAN
Represented By: KEVIN H. THERIOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?