ADAMS v. MAGNUSSON et al
Plaintiff: JON R ADAMS
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY, MATTHEW MAGNUSSON, THOMAS AVERILL and MATTHEW LECLAIR
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 Objection. After careful review of Mr. Adams' Objection, the Objection is Denied. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE: The Court has completed its preliminary review and ordered the complaint to be served as to Defendants Thomas Averill and Matthew LeClair. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the Clerk of Court and the Maine Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. The Maine Attorney General shall file notice of acceptance or declination of acceptance of service within 30 days. (Deadline to File Acceptance or Declination of Acceptance of Service is 2/24/2020) (jwr)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OBJECTION to #11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by JON R ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE #8 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JON R ADAMS (Attachments: #1 Letter from Attorney Clifford, #2 Envelope)(lrc)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #8 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by JON R ADAMS. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed with Notice of Removal, Objections to R&R due by 1/10/2020 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by JON R ADAMS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Vacate Answer Deadline. The current deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is vacated. The Court will establish a deadline for the response to the complaint if, after the Court completes its review under 28 U.S.C. section 1915A, the Court determines that Plaintiff is entitled to proceed on his claim. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by RANDALL LIBERTY. (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Plaintiff filed 10/31/19, #4 Mot. to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #5 Certificate of Account [Redacted], #6 Affidavit by Plaintiff filed 11/6/19, #7 Copy of Medical Record [Redacted], #8 Pl's Motion for Counsel and Memo in Support, #9 Order Granting Motion to Proceed without prepayment, #10 Summary Sheet)(O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate Answer Deadline by RANDALL LIBERTY Responses due by 12/30/2019. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 12/9/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Superior Court, case number ROCSC-CV-2019-00036. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RANDALL LIBERTY. (Service of Process Deadline 3/2/2020) Fee due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - complaint, #2 Exhibit B - letter dated 11/3/19, #3 Exhibit C - docket Record, #4 Exhibit D - notice of filing)(bfa)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for RANDALL LIBERTY : Answer due by 12/9/2019. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS v. MAGNUSSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MAGNUSSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS AVERILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW LECLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON R ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?