DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207 et al v. RAIMONDO et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, IAMAW MAINE LOBSTERING UNION LOCAL, DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC and FRANK THOMPSON
Defendant: GINA M RAIMONDO, JANET COIT and NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Intervenor Defendant: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION and DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Amicus Curiae: MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION and LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF MAINE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00275
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of USCA as to #42 Notice of Appeal, #45 Notice of Appeal. Check for Receipt of Mandate on 12/17/2021. (mmy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 65 Opinion of USCA Re: #42 Notice of Appeal, #45 Notice of Appeal. Check for Receipt of Mandate on 12/17/2021. (mmy)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' AND INTERVENORS' EMERGENCY MOTIONS FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL denying #43 Motion to Stay; denying #46 Motion to Stay By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (FULLER, ERICA)
November 3, 2021 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO. (FINNEGAN, ALISON)
November 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, #43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal : Replies due by 11/5/2021. (mlm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON. Reply due by 11/16/2021. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
November 2, 2021 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON. Reply due by 11/16/2021. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
October 27, 2021 Filing 59 USCA Case Number 21-1874 for #45 Notice of Appeal, filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (bfa)
October 27, 2021 Filing 58 USCA Case Number 21-1873 for #42 Notice of Appeal, filed by NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JANET COIT, GINA M RAIMONDO. (tcs)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re: #43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and #46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Responses due by 11/2/2021, Reply due by 11/5/2021. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 56 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #45 Notice of Appeal. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 55 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #45 Notice of Appeal. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 54 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #42 Notice of Appeal. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 53 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #42 Notice of Appeal. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 51 CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Objection to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Intervene. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 MOTION to Enlarge Page Limits. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, #46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Counsel to meet and confer on an expedited briefing schedule and inform the Court as to a proposed schedule by 4:00PM on 10/27/2021. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #45 Notice of Appeal.(mmy)
October 26, 2021 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #42 Notice of Appeal. (mmy)
October 26, 2021 COPIES of Notice of Appeal Sent to Counsel Re: #42 Notice of Appeal filed by NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JANET COIT, GINA M RAIMONDO and #45 Notice of Appeal filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (mmy)
October 25, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 10/15/21 before Judge Lance E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Julie Edgecomb, Telephone Number: 207-745-1836. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2022. (mlm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 46 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE Responses due by 11/15/2021. (FULLER, ERICA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #41 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Order,,, by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number AMEDC-2568108.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (FULLER, ERICA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 44 Emergency MOTION to Enlarge Page Limits and for Expedited Consideration of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO Responses due by 11/15/2021. (FINNEGAN, ALISON)
October 25, 2021 Filing 43 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO Responses due by 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Colleen Coogan), #2 Exhibit 2 (excerpts of Final Envtl Impact Stmt, Vol III))(FINNEGAN, ALISON)
October 25, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #41 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Order,,, by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (FINNEGAN, ALISON)
October 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #10 Motion for TRO; granting #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying Plaintiffs' request to immediately impose specific conditions. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
October 15, 2021 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Oral Argument held re #10 (Corrected) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Julie Edgecomb) (mmy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Objection to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO Responses due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of C. Coogan), #2 Exhibit B (Corrected Objection to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion))(FINNEGAN, ALISON)
October 14, 2021 Filing 38 BRIEF Amicus Curiae by MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION. (ADAMS, KIP)
October 14, 2021 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing (Proposed Intervenors' Objection) filed by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
October 14, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing (Reply to Defendants' Opposition) filed by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Virginia Olsen)(FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
October 14, 2021 Filing 35 BRIEF Amicus Curiae by LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF MAINE. (DILWORTH, GEORGE)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION; granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by The Legislative Council of Maine. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by The Legislative Council of Maine Responses due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF MAINE)(DILWORTH, GEORGE)
October 14, 2021 Set Deadlines Regarding Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney RYAN P. STEEN must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 10/18/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mmy)
October 13, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary Anne Mason filed by KIP J. ADAMS on behalf of MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2562098.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (ADAMS, KIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan P. Steen filed by KIP J. ADAMS on behalf of MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2562097.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (ADAMS, KIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jane C. Luxton filed by KIP J. ADAMS on behalf of MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2562096.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (ADAMS, KIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION Responses due by 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae by Maine Lobstermen's Association)(ADAMS, KIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by KIP J. ADAMS on behalf of MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION (ADAMS, KIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. OSBORN on behalf of All Defendants (OSBORN, JOHN)
October 12, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Reply due by 10/14/2021. (mmy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. Reply due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(FULLER, ERICA)
October 12, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing filed by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO. Reply due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of FEIS Volume 1 & 2, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record of Decision, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2021 Biological Opinion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Final Rule, #5 Exhibit 5 - NOAA Technical Memorandum NMFS-NE-247, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from M. Pentony to P. Keliher, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Michael Asaro)(MAYHALL, TAYLOR)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File In Excess of Page Limit By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RESERVING FINAL RESOLUTION OF MOTON TO INTERVENE; GRANTING MOVANTS LEAVE TO OPPOSE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF #13 Motion to Intervene By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File In Excess of Page Limit by JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO Responses due by 10/27/2021. (MAYHALL, TAYLOR)
October 5, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Oral Arguments #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing : Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2021 09:00 AM in VIDEO HEARING before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristen Monsell filed by JANE P. DAVENPORT on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (DAVENPORT, JANE)
October 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #15 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice. This filing was marked as Filed in Error due to an incorrect document attached. (mmy)
October 5, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing: Responses due by 10/12/2021. Reply due by 10/14/2021. (mmy)
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON C. FINNEGAN on behalf of JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO (FINNEGAN, ALISON)
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jane P. Davenport filed by EMILY GREEN on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Conservation Law Foundation, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2558061.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (GREEN, EMILY)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erica A Fuller filed by EMILY GREEN on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Conservation Law Foundation, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2558060.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (GREEN, EMILY)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristen Monsell filed by EMILY GREEN on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Conservation Law Foundation, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2558056.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (GREEN, EMILY) Modified on 10/5/2021 to indicate incorrect document attached. (mmy).
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Conservation Law Foundation, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (GREEN, EMILY)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Conservation Law Foundation, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE Responses due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit Sakashita Declaration, #3 Exhibit Bartlett Declaration, #4 Exhibit Mahoney Declaration, #5 Exhibit Patek Declaration, #6 Exhibit Senatore Declaration, #7 Exhibit Young Declaration)(GREEN, EMILY)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by TAYLOR MAYHALL on behalf of All Defendants (MAYHALL, TAYLOR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Enlarge Page Limit for Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ordered that counsel meet and confer regarding an expedited briefing/oral argument schedule and inform the Clerk's Office of a proposal by Wednesday, October 6, 2021 at 3:00 PM.SO ORDERED. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
October 4, 2021 Set Deadlines : Proposed expedited briefing/oral argument schedule due by 10/6/2021 at 3:00 PM. (mmy)
October 3, 2021 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Order for Expedited Briefing (Corrected) by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON Responses due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Hon. Troy Jackson, #2 Exhibit B -- MDMR Lobster to Dollars Study)(FRAWLEY, ALFRED). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 10/4/2021 and MOTION for Order for Expedited Briefing on 10/4/2021 (mlm).
October 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit for Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 8) by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON Responses due by 10/25/2021. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
October 3, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Expedited Briefing Requested) by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC, FRANK THOMPSON Responses due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Hon. Troy Jackson, #2 Exhibit B -- MDMR Lobster to Dollars Study)(FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN BRETT GROSKO on behalf of All Defendants (GROSKO, JOHN)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Janet Coit summons, #2 National Marine Fisheries Service summons, #3 United States Attorney General summons, #4 United States Attorney summons)(bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC. (bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC. (bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207. (bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M RAIMONDO PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, FRANK THOMPSON, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/27/2021) Fee due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2021 BiOp, #2 Exhibit B - Final Rule - 8.31.21, #3 Exhibit C - 12.27.19 Letter from P. Keliher, #4 Exhibit D - 2021 FEIS Volume I)(bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2554246.), filed by DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207, DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC, FRANK THOMPSON, FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC.(FRAWLEY, ALFRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207 et al v. RAIMONDO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT 4 LODGE OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS LOCAL LODGE 207
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: JAY P. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: PAULA D. SILSBY
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAMAW MAINE LOBSTERING UNION LOCAL
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: JAY P. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: PAULA D. SILSBY
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMON FAMILY LOBSTER CO INC
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: JAY P. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: PAULA D. SILSBY
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOX ISLAND LOBSTER COMPANY LLC
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: JAY P. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: PAULA D. SILSBY
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK THOMPSON
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: JAY P. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: PAULA D. SILSBY
Represented By: THIMI R. MINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA M RAIMONDO
Represented By: JOHN BRETT GROSKO
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Represented By: JOHN G. OSBORN
Represented By: TAYLOR MAYHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET COIT
Represented By: JOHN BRETT GROSKO
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Represented By: JOHN G. OSBORN
Represented By: TAYLOR MAYHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: JOHN BRETT GROSKO
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Represented By: JOHN G. OSBORN
Represented By: TAYLOR MAYHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: EMILY GREEN
Represented By: ERICA FULLER
Represented By: JANE P. DAVENPORT
Represented By: KRISTEN MONSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION
Represented By: EMILY GREEN
Represented By: ERICA FULLER
Represented By: JANE P. DAVENPORT
Represented By: KRISTEN MONSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: EMILY GREEN
Represented By: ERICA FULLER
Represented By: JANE P. DAVENPORT
Represented By: KRISTEN MONSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAINE LOBSTERMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JANE CHARLOTTE LUXTON
Represented By: KIP J. ADAMS
Represented By: MARY ANNE MASON
Represented By: RYAN P. STEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF MAINE
Represented By: GEORGE T. DILWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?