CARLETON v. LIBERTY et al
Plaintiff: RYAN T CARLETON
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY, ERIC BEARCE, MARIE LANDRY, ROBERT YOUNG, PISCATAQUIS COUNTY JAIL, PISCATAQUIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2022cv00308
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by RYAN T CARLETON (tcs)
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by RYAN T CARLETON (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(tcs)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 17, 2022 Filing 10 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by RYAN T CARLETON in support of #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
October 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RYAN T CARLETON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Order for Discovery.The Court has not completed its preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. sections 1915 and 1915A. The Court, therefore, has not issued a scheduling order. If the Court concludes Plaintiff has alleged an actionable claim and the Court issues a scheduling order authorizing discovery, Plaintiff can request information from the defendants and request a subpoena to request discovery from any non-parties. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Produce Discovery by RYAN T CARLETON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 12, 2022 Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment due by 10/26/2022. (MFS)
October 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by RYAN T CARLETON (bfa)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by RYAN T CARLETON (bfa)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER to submit additional complaint by RYAN T CARLETON. (bfa)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIC BEARCE, MARIE LANDRY, RANDALL LIBERTY, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, PISCATAQUIS COUNTY JAIL, PISCATAQUIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ROBERT YOUNG, filed by RYAN T CARLETON. (Service of Process Deadline 1/5/2023) (Attachments: #1 statement of case, #2 blank waiver of service, #3 blank waiver, #4 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARLETON v. LIBERTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN T CARLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC BEARCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIE LANDRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PISCATAQUIS COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PISCATAQUIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?