MCCANN et al v. MCQUILLAN et al
Plaintiff: ERIN MCCANN and MICHAEL MCCANN
Defendant: YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE, TIMOTHY MCCANN, TOWN OF YORK and MARK MCQUILLAN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00018
Filed: January 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by ERIN MCCANN, MICHAEL MCCANN. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
June 27, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. COTTER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (COTTER, ANDREW)
June 27, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. CLIFFORD on behalf of ERIN MCCANN, MICHAEL MCCANN (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #26 Motion to Continue. The May 9th hearing will be continued for approximately 60 days to allow Plaintiffs time to retain new counsel. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
May 2, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION by Attorney FRANK K.N. CHOWDRY to Withdraw as Attorney and MOTION to Continue Hearing by ERIN MCCANN, MICHAEL MCCANN Responses due by 5/23/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK). Added MOTION to Continue on 5/2/2018 (akr).
April 5, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and #18 MOTION to Dismiss **HEARING LOCATION CHANGE ONLY** : Oral Argument set for 5/9/2018 at 2:00 PM will now take place in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mnw)
April 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #18 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss :Hearing on Motions set for 5/9/2018 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (lrc)
March 23, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE. (PARK, KASIA)
March 16, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ERIN MCCANN, MICHAEL MCCANN. Reply due by 3/30/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK) Modified on 3/19/2018 to remove link to ECF #13 (akr).
March 13, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ERIN MCCANN, MICHAEL MCCANN. Reply due by 3/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CHOWDRY, FRANK) Modified on 3/19/2018 to remove link to ECF #18 (akr).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting without objection #19 Objection to Scheduling Order. The pretrial deadlines contained in the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 17, are hereby stayed pending the court's resolution of the defendants' pending motion to dismiss, ECF No. 18. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 9, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed OBJECTION to #17 Scheduling Order, and Consented to Proposed Discovery Plan filed by MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE. Responses due by 3/30/2018. (PARK, KASIA)
February 26, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by TOWN OF YORK Responses due by 3/19/2018. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
February 22, 2018 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default as to TOWN OF YORK on 8/1/2018. (akr)
February 22, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of MARK MCQUILLAN, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE (HEWEY, MELISSA)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/11/2018. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/18/2018. Motions due by 8/1/2018. Ready for Trial on 10/1/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib)
February 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY M. KENLAN on behalf of TIMOTHY MCCANN (KENLAN, TIMOTHY)
February 21, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by TIMOTHY MCCANN.(NOFSINGER, JODI)
February 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK MCQUILLAN, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE Responses due by 3/13/2018. (PARK, KASIA)
February 16, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for TIMOTHY MCCANN : Answer due by 2/26/2018. (akr)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant McCann shall respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint by February 26, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 16, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by TIMOTHY MCCANN Responses due by 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NOFSINGER, JODI)
February 14, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for TIMOTHY MCCANN, MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE : Answer due by 2/20/2018. (akr)
February 5, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for TIMOTHY MCCANN, MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE : Answer due by 2/19/2018. (akr)
February 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE served on 1/29/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK)
February 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. TIMOTHY MCCANN served on 1/29/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK)
February 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. TOWN OF YORK served on 1/29/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK)
February 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. MARK MCQUILLAN served on 1/29/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal. The original complaint, ECF No. 1, is sealed because it contains personal identifier information; the plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint, ECF No. 5, redacting the personal identifier information. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 17, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1790223.), filed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN.(CHOWDRY, FRANK)
January 17, 2018 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND WITH EXHIBITS against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. (Service of Process Deadline 4/17/2018)(CHOWDRY, FRANK)
January 17, 2018 Filing 4 (Document sealed from public view) First MOTION to Seal Original Complaint and Original Exhibits by MICHAEL MCCANN Responses due by 2/7/2018. (CHOWDRY, FRANK)
January 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TIMOTHY MCCANN, MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Timothy McCann, #2 Summons Issued as to Town of York, #3 Summons Issued as to York School Committee)(sfw)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED per Order #6**COMPLAINT against TIMOTHY MCCANN, MARK MCQUILLAN, TOWN OF YORK, YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. Fee due by 1/16/2018. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Maine Department of Education Model Policy for Bullying & Cyberbullying, #2 York High School - School Handbook, #3 Exhibit C: Section 504 Plan, #4 Exhibit D: Photograph, #5 Exhibit E: McQuillan Demand, #6 Exhibit F: Timothy McCann Demand, #7 Exhibit G: Town of York Tort Claims Notice, #8 Exhibit H: York School Committee Tort Claims Notice)(sfw) Modified on 1/12/2018 to preliminarily seal complaint because it contains personal identifiers. (sfw). Modified on 1/24/2018 to seal all exhibits per Order #6(jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCANN et al v. MCQUILLAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK SCHOOL COMMITTEE
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY MCCANN
Represented By: JODI L. NOFSINGER
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. KENLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF YORK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MCQUILLAN
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN MCCANN
Represented By: FRANK K.N. CHOWDRY
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCCANN
Represented By: FRANK K.N. CHOWDRY
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?