YOUNG v. SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. YOUNG and ROBERT R YOUNG
Defendant: SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00320
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/11/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/18/2019. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC.(SCOTT, K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC re #6 State Court Record (Corrected Filing). Main Document: Docket Record from State Court. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summary Sheet)(SCOTT, K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC re #6 State Court Record .. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summary Sheet)(SCOTT, K.) Modified on 8/22/2018 to indicate filed in error (slg).
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC. (SCOTT, K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1889239.), filed by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC.(SCOTT, K.)
August 21, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1888837.), filed by ROBERT R. YOUNG.(BENNETT, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/22/2018 - Charge has been reversed/cancelled (akr).
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC (SCOTT, K.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/24/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
August 17, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC : Answer due by 8/24/2018. (bfa)
August 17, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2018. (bfa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel (bfa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-313. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/15/2018) Fee due by 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 notice to state court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. YOUNG
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R YOUNG
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAW'S SUPERMARKETS INC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?