MCCANN et al v. YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: ERIN MCCANN and MICHAEL MCCANN
Defendant: YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, JULIE MCCANN and TIMOTHY MCCANN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00336
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT Responses due by 11/6/2018. (PARK, KASIA)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT (PARK, KASIA)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT (HEWEY, MELISSA)
September 13, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT : Answer due by 10/23/2018. (akr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 8/24/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 12, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for TIMOTHY MCCANN and JULIE MCCANN : Answer due by 10/23/2018. (akr)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JULIE MCCANN waiver sent on 8/24/18. (NOFSINGER, JODI)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TIMOTHY MCCANN waiver sent on 8/24/2018. (NOFSINGER, JODI)
August 28, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1891991.), filed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JULIE MCCANN, TIMOTHY MCCANN, YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Timothy McCann summons, #2 York School Department summons)(bfa)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JULIE MCCANN, TIMOTHY MCCANN, YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHAEL MCCANN, ERIN MCCANN. (Service of Process Deadline 11/23/2018) Fee due by 8/27/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCANN et al v. YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN MCCANN
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCCANN
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?