BRADFORD v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, et al.
Plaintiff: MERLE WEST and JANICE E BRADFORD
Defendant: DEZURIK INC, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, P I C CONTRACTORS INC, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, PACKINGS & INSULATIONS CORPORATION, GOULD PUMPS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO, VELAN VALVE CORP, CIANBRO CORPORATION, SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, VIACOM INC, FW WEBB COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GARDNER-DENVER INC, TRANE CO, GRINNELL LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, THE WM. POWELL COMPANY, NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY, NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC, HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY, MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, S D WARREN COMPANY, CRANE CO, SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, S D WARREN COMPANY doing business as SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC and BSM PUMP CORP
Cross Defendant: CRANE COMPANY, WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL INC, THE GAGE COMPANY, ECR INTERNATIONAL INC, ALBANY INTERNATIONAL, BELL & GOSSETT, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES INC, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, JANICE BRADFORD WEST, BSM PUMP CORP., ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC, EATON CORPORATION, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, PEERLESS PUMPS INC, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, NATIONAL AUTO PARTS ASSOCIATION, CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, ALBANY INTERNATIONAL INC, DANA INCORPORATED and BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC
Cross Claimant: CBS CORPORATION, ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, RAINBIRD CORPORATION and DCO LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00128
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #518 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
April 7, 2022 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 4/28/2022. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting 516 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
April 1, 2022 Filing 516 Consent MOTION to Dismiss by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. No PDF attached to this entry. To view PDF see ECF #515 (clp)
March 31, 2022 Filing 515 STIPULATION of Dismissal Consented-to by all parties by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DWYER, PAUL)
March 31, 2022 Filing 514 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (CORRECTED) by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
March 31, 2022 Filing 513 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
February 9, 2022 Set Deadlines per directive of Chief U.S. District Judge Jon D. Levy: Stipulation of Dismissal due by 4/4/2022 (as 4/3/2022 date requested in motion No. 511 is a Sunday). (clp)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting #511 Motion to Amend Procedural Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to April 3, 2022 By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
February 7, 2022 Filing 511 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Procedural Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to April 3, 2022 by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 2/28/2022. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
January 26, 2022 Filing 510 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by DCO LLC. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
January 10, 2022 Filing 509 NOTICE of Settlement by Counsel for the Defendant and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on January 10, 2022 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 2/9/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #507 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
January 5, 2022 Filing 507 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC Responses due by 1/26/2022. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #505 Motion to Dismiss as to CRANE CO By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 24, 2021 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as to CRANE CO by CRANE CO Responses due by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCONNELL, DAVID)
November 24, 2021 Filing 504 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID B. MCCONNELL on behalf of CRANE CO (MCCONNELL, DAVID)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting #502 Motion for Clarification - General Electric Co. may proceed by attaching only the exhibits it intends to cite in its Motion for Summary Judgment and which are not duplicative of exhibits attached elsewhere in the Stipulated Record. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 4, 2021 Filing 502 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order and Report of Conference dated September 13, 2021 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY Responses due by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Court's Order and Report of Conference dated September 13, 2021))(MOHAN, CATHERINE)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting #500 Motion to Extend Time to File Dismissal of Claims against Defendant CBS. Time is extended to January 5, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 28, 2021 Reset Deadlines CORRECTED : Dismissal of Claims against Defendant CBS due by 1/5/2022. (aks)
October 28, 2021 Reset Deadlines : Dismissal of Claims against Defendant CBS due by 1/5/2021. (aks)
October 27, 2021 Filing 500 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Dismissal of Claims Against CBS by CBS CORPORATION Responses due by 11/17/2021. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER AND REPORT OF CONFERENCE - Set Deadlines: Stipulated Record due by 1/3/2022. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2022. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY (aks)
September 1, 2021 Filing 498 Minute Entry for video proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Local Rule 56 Pre-Filing Conference held. Counsel shall notify the Clerk's Office by 9/7/2021 whether or not they would like to schedule a settlement conference. Written Order Re: Conference to issue. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (lrt)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE of Settlement by CBS CORPORATION and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 7/29/2021 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the Plantiff and Defendant CBS CORPORATION, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff and Defendant CBS CORPORATION shall complete the settlement of this matter within ninety (90) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of Defendant CBS CORPORATION with prejudice and without costs. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 10/28/2021. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mlm)
July 29, 2021 Filing 496 LOCAL RULE 56(h) Pre-Filing Conference Memorandum by DCO LLC. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
July 29, 2021 Filing 495 NOTICE of Settlement and Intent to Dismiss by CBS CORPORATION (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
July 29, 2021 Filing 494 LOCAL RULE 56(h) Pre-Filing Conference Memorandum by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 PROCEDURAL ORDER Re Local Rule 56(h): Pre-Filing Conference Memo due by 7/29/2021. Local Rule 56(h) Pre-Filing Conference set for 9/1/2021 11:30 AM via ZOOM Video Conference before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY(aks)
July 15, 2021 Filing 492 NOTICE of Hearing: Local Rule 56(h) Pre-Filing Conference set for 9/1/2021 11:30 AM via ZOOM Video Conference before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #486 Motion to Dismiss Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting #488 Motion of Attorney Tara A. Sheldon to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 7, 2021 Filing 489 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #487 Joint MOTION for Order on Motion to Dismiss : This entry has been modified to replace "Motion for Order" with "Proposed Order" and has been terminated as a motion on the CM/ECF System. (aks)
July 7, 2021 Filing 488 MOTION by Attorney Tara A. Sheldon to Withdraw as Attorney by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY Responses due by 7/28/2021. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
July 7, 2021 Filing 487 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY Responses due by 7/28/2021. (OSWALD, JAMES) Modified on 7/7/2021 to replace "Motion for Order" with "Proposed Order" (aks).
July 7, 2021 Filing 486 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY Responses due by 7/28/2021. (OSWALD, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting #484 Motion to Dismiss Armstrong Pumps Inc By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
May 12, 2021 Filing 484 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC Responses due by 6/2/2021. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Dismiss Defendant New York Boiler Company By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 20, 2021 Filing 482 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John A. Heller filed by CATHERINE A. MOHAN on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2480547.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
April 16, 2021 Filing 481 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #480 Additional Attachments (Proposed Order): This entry is being marked as filed in error in accordance with Section (k)(1) of Appendix IV of the Local Rules. The Court will be in contact if a proposed order is requested. (mlm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 480 **FILED IN ERROR* ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY re #476 Motion to Dismiss : Attachment--PROPOSED ORDER.. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 4/16/2021 to indicate error (mlm).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #478 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 15, 2021 Filing 478 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by RAINBIRD CORPORATION Responses due by 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting #473 Motion by Attorney Dawn M. Harmon to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 13, 2021 Filing 476 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT NEW YORK BOILER COMPANY by NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY Responses due by 5/4/2021. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 13, 2021 Filing 475 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CARON on behalf of CRANE CO (CARON, JASON)
April 13, 2021 Filing 474 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #472 Notice of Appearance : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the system. The attached document references a different case and defendant. (aks)
April 13, 2021 Filing 473 MOTION by Attorney Dawn M. Harmon to Withdraw as Attorney by CRANE CO Responses due by 5/4/2021. (HARMON, DAWN)
April 13, 2021 Filing 472 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CARON on behalf of CRANE CO (CARON, JASON) Modified on 4/13/2021 (aks).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting #469 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The time to file the Stipulation of Dismissal is extended to July 12, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 13, 2021 Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff and Defendants, Armstrong Pumps and Milwaukee Valve Co. due by 7/12/2021. (aks)
April 12, 2021 Filing 470 STIPULATION of Dismissal of New England Insulation Inc. Only With Prejudice by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC. (HOOVER, MARK)
April 12, 2021 Filing 469 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to July 12, 2021 by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 5/3/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting #466 Motion to Dismiss Defendant, DeZurik, Inc. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #465 Motion to Dismiss Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 7, 2021 Filing 466 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, DeZurik, Inc. by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 4/28/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
April 7, 2021 Filing 465 Amended Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss re #459 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 4/28/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH) Modified on 4/8/2021 to replace "Motion to Amend" with "Motion to Dismiss" and add "Amended" (aks).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting #462 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting #461 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 7, 2021 Filing 462 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY Responses due by 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 7, 2021 Filing 461 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by VELAN VALVE CORP Responses due by 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER The Plaintiff has filed a consented-to motion for dismissal of all claims against Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (ECF No. 459). However, neither the motion nor the proposed order that the Plaintiff submitted to the Court address Warren Pumps' cross-claims against all other Defendants. The Plaintiff and Warren Pumps are therefore ORDERED to inform the Court, within 7 days, whether Warren Pumps is pursuing its cross-claims. If Warren Pumps is not pursuing its cross-claims, the parties shall submit a revised proposed order that addresses them. Set Deadlines: Notice/Revised Proposed Order (1) due by 4/9/2021. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 1, 2021 Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 4/22/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting #457 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
March 3, 2021 Filing 457 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION Responses due by 3/24/2021. (MCKINLEY, KENT)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #455 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mlm)
February 9, 2021 Filing 455 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by GARDNER-DENVER INC Responses due by 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEAN, HEIDI) Modified on 2/9/2021 to remove extra text(jgd).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting #453 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Time to file stipulation of dismissal is extended to April 20, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 21, 2021 Filing 453 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Procedural Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to April 20, 2021 by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 2/11/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
January 21, 2021 Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff and Defendant New Yorker Boiler Co. Inc. due by 4/20/2021. (aks) Modified on 3/8/2021 to remove Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(aks). Modified on 4/7/2021 to remove Velan (aks). Modified on 4/8/2021 to remove Warren Pumps and DeZurik (aks). Modified on 4/13/2021 to remove New England Insulation, Inc. (aks). Modified on 4/13/2021 to remove Armstrong Pumps and Milwaukee Valve Co. (aks). Modified on 4/15/2021 to remove Rainbird Corporation (aks). Modified on 4/22/2021 to remove Gardner Denver, Inc. - defendant terminated 2/16/21 (aks).
January 12, 2021 Filing 452 Stipulation of Dismissal between the Plaintiff and DeZurik, Inc. due by 2/8/2021.(aks)
January 12, 2021 Filing 451 Stipulation of Dismissal between the Plaintiff and Warren Pumps LLC due by 2/8/2021.(aks)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Time to file stipulation of dismissal is extended to February 8, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting #447 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Time to file stipulation of dismissal is extended to February 8, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 11, 2021 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Procedural Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to February 8, 2021 by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 2/1/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
January 11, 2021 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Procedural Order to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to February 8, 2021 by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 2/1/2021. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #445 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Time to file stipulation of dismissal is extended to February 26, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 8, 2021 Filing 445 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Procedural Order to file Stipulation of Dismissal by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC Responses due by 1/29/2021. (HOOVER, MARK)
January 8, 2021 Set Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff and NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC due by 2/26/2021. (aks)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #443 Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Time is extended to February 3, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 24, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff and NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY due by 2/3/2021. (tcs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY Responses due by 1/13/2021. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #441 Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Time is extended to February 11, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 23, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff and AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION due by 2/11/2021. (aks)
December 22, 2020 Filing 441 MOTION to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION Responses due by 1/12/2021. (MCKINLEY, KENT) Modified on 12/23/2020 to remove duplicative text (aks).
December 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff and Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. due by 1/27/2021. (aks)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #438 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Time to file stipulation of dismissal or motion to dismiss is extended to January 27, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting #424 Motion to Dismiss Ford Motor Company By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
December 21, 2020 Filing 438 Consent MOTION to Amend Procedural Order To Extend Time to File Dismissal by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY Responses due by 1/11/2021. (OSWALD, JAMES)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #421 Motion to Dismiss F.W. Webb Company By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
December 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal as to plaintiff and defendants ARMSTRONG PUMPS, RAINBIRD CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORP, THE WM. POWELL COMPANY due by 1/27/2021. (aks)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #435 Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal/Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to January 27, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 18, 2020 Filing 435 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal/Motion to Dismiss by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC, RAINBIRD CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORP Responses due by 1/8/2021. (FORSSBERG, BRITA) Modified on 12/18/2020 to change motion type (jwr).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Spencer (aks)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Bayer CropScience, Inc. By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Spencer (aks)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HONEYWELL'S MOTION TO DISMISS re #418 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
December 8, 2020 Filing 431 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: cross-claims for contribution per Docket No. 430 by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER Defendant Ford Motor Company has moved for dismissal of all claims against it under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (ECF No. 424). However, neither Ford's motion nor the proposed order it submitted to the Court address Ford's cross-claims against all other Defendants. Ford Motor Company is therefore ORDERED to inform the Court, within 7 days, whether it is pursuing its cross-claims for contribution. If Ford Motor Company is not pursuing those cross-claims, it will submit a revised proposed order that addresses them. Status Report/Revised Proposed of Order (1) due by 12/15/2020. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting #428 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
December 2, 2020 Filing 428 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION Responses due by 12/23/2020. (SOUZA, KRISTEN)
December 2, 2020 Filing 427 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #426 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" per the filer and terminated on the system. (aks)
December 2, 2020 Filing 426 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION Responses due by 12/23/2020. (SOUZA, KRISTEN) Modified on 12/2/2020 (aks).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER re #421 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Court has revised the parties' proposed order to include the specific conditions of dismissal set forth in the motion. Objections to this Order are due 12/13/2020. If no Objections are filed, the Order will be final. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 30, 2020 Filing 424 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by FORD MOTOR COMPANY Responses due by 12/21/2020. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER - Pursuant to the Court's prior order granting defendant Wm. Powell Company's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 417) and at the request of defendant Wm. Powell Company, Wm. Powell Company's cross-claims against all other defendants are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 24, 2020 Filing 422 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: dismissal of cross claims without prejudice by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (HADDOW, JAMES)
November 23, 2020 Filing 421 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant F.W. Webb Company by FW WEBB COMPANY Responses due by 12/14/2020. (DICKMAN, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER - Defendant Wm. Powell Company moved for dismissal of all claims against it under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (ECF No. 414). However, Wm. Powell's motion did not address its cross-claims for indemnification against all other Defendants. The Court has granted Wm. Powell's motion (ECF No. 417), leaving no claims pending against Wm. Powell. Accordingly, within 7 days from the issuance of this Order, Wm. Powell is hereby ORDERED to inform the Court whether it is pursuing its cross-claims for indemnification, failing which the cross-claims will be dismissed. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. The WM. Powell Company to Inform the Court re Cross-Claims by 11/27/2020.(tcs)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Justin Shireman and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to Defendant NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/19/2021 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within forty-five (45) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 1/4/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 18, 2020 Filing 418 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC Responses due by 12/9/2020. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #414 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #406 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #402 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
November 13, 2020 Filing 414 MOTION to Dismiss by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY Responses due by 12/4/2020. (HADDOW, JAMES)
November 13, 2020 Filing 413 NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to defendants DEZURIK INC, NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC and WARREN PUMPS: A continued settlement conference having been held this date and counsel having notified the Court that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within sixty (60) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 1/12/2021. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 412 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Settlement Conference held. Settlement achieved with defendants Dezurik, Inc., New England Insulation, Inc., and Warren Pumps. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (jwr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 411 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Settlement Conference held. Settlement discussions ongoing. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (jwr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT of defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc: A settlement conference having been held this date and counsel having advised the Court on 11/12/20 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within forty-five (45) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/28/2020. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 409 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Oswald and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to defendant MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/12/2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within forty-five (45) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/28/2020. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Jeff Goldman and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to defendants GRINNELL LLC and GOULD PUMPS ONLY: Counsel having advised the Court on November 12, 2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/14/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK:. (aks)
November 11, 2020 Filing 407 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorneys Brita Fossberg and Richard Dighello, Jr. as to defendants ARMSTRONG PUMPS, RAINBIRD CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORP, THE WM. POWELL COMPANY and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/10/2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within forty-five (45) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/28/2020. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
November 10, 2020 Filing 406 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in light of settlement, as explained in text, by BELL & GOSSETT Responses due by 12/1/2020. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 405 NOTICE of Settlement by Counsel for Allied Glove Corporation and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION ONLY: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/9/2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/10/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Spencer(aks)
November 10, 2020 Filing 404 MOTION to Dismiss by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC Responses due by 12/1/2020. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
November 9, 2020 Filing 403 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Adams and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to Defendant BAYERCROPSCIENCE INC ONLY: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/09/2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/9/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Maggie Melanson. (mtm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 402 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION Responses due by 11/30/2020. (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
November 6, 2020 Filing 401 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 400 Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement: This docket entry was modified to reflect the settlement was as to defendant GARDNER-DENVER INC ONLY. (jwr)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Bean and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT as to Defendant GARNDER-DENVER INC ONLY: Counsel having advised the Court on 11/6/2020 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within ninetyy (90) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 2/4/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) Modified on 11/6/2020 to indicate settling defendant name (jwr).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting #396 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Setting Video Settlement Conference for 11/12/2020 and 11/13/2020 (if necessary) starting each day at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. In Camera Settlement Papers due by 11/10/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 397 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by IMO INDUSTRIES INC re #396 Motion to Dismiss . Main Document: Proposed Order. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
September 23, 2020 Filing 396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by IMO INDUSTRIES INC Responses due by 10/14/2020. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 395 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (MFS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 394 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. Counsel have been provided the call-in information.(jwr)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #389 Motion to Dismiss as to Eaton Corporation By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
August 19, 2020 Filing 392 Proposed Order filed by JANICE E BRADFORD re #389 Motion to Dismiss Assented-to as to Eaton Corporation.. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH) Modified on 8/19/2020 to replace "Additional Attachments" with "Proposed Order" (aks).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting #390 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
August 14, 2020 Filing 390 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC Responses due by 9/4/2020. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Assented-to as to Eaton Corporation by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 9/2/2020. (CIRILANO, JOSEPH)
August 11, 2020 Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. DICKMAN on behalf of FW WEBB COMPANY (DICKMAN, MICHAEL)
August 11, 2020 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. DICKMAN on behalf of DCO LLC (DICKMAN, MICHAEL)
August 10, 2020 Filing 386 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by DCO LLC (DICKMAN, MICHAEL)
August 10, 2020 Filing 385 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by FW WEBB COMPANY (DICKMAN, MICHAEL)
August 10, 2020 Filing 384 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY (SOUZA, KRISTEN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN R. SOUZA on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY (SOUZA, KRISTEN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 382 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC (ADAMS, KIP)
August 10, 2020 Filing 381 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (HADDOW, JAMES)
August 10, 2020 Filing 380 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 379 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by RAINBIRD CORPORATION (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 378 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by VELAN VALVE CORP (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 377 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by WARREN PUMPS (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 376 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (MCKINLEY, KENT)
August 10, 2020 Filing 375 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION (SOUZA, KRISTEN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 374 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 373 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by ITT Corp, incorrectly named as by BELL & GOSSETT (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 10, 2020 Filing 372 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by GARDNER-DENVER INC (BEAN, HEIDI)
August 7, 2020 Filing 371 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC (HOOVER, MARK)
August 7, 2020 Filing 370 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
August 7, 2020 Filing 369 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 7, 2020 Filing 368 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
August 7, 2020 Filing 367 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
August 7, 2020 Filing 366 NOTICE of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Need for Pre-Filing Conference per Local Rule 56(h) by DEZURIK INC (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
June 30, 2020 Filing 365 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by GARDNER-DENVER INC. (BEAN, HEIDI)
June 30, 2020 Filing 364 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Murray Boiler LLC (formerly Trane U.S. Inc.) by TRANE CO. (BEAN, HEIDI)
June 30, 2020 Filing 363 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendant Aldrich Pump LLC (formerly Ingersoll-Rand Company) by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY. (BEAN, HEIDI)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #361 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to July 29, 2020; deadline to file notice of intent to file motion for summary judgment is extended to August 10, 2020. All other terms of the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 1, 2020 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines : Discovery due by 7/29/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/10/2020. (aks)
May 26, 2020 Filing 361 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Discovery Deadline by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 6/16/2020. (SHIPP, JASON)
May 12, 2020 Filing 360 Witness List by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC . (WHITING, STEPHEN)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER. The deadline to file a notice of intent to file a motion for summary judgment is extended to June 10, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 27, 2020 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/10/2020. (MFS)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #357 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company with prejudice and without costs. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
April 8, 2020 Filing 357 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY Responses due by 4/29/2020. (KAYATTA, KATHERINE)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 : Discovery due by 5/29/2020. (aks)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #355 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
February 18, 2020 Filing 355 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Albany International Corp. by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 3/10/2020. (SHIPP, JASON)
February 12, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney A. Bernard Guekguezian must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/19/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (akr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 354 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Bernard Guekguezian filed by KATHERINE S. KAYATTA on behalf of MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2167177.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KAYATTA, KATHERINE)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #352 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntarily Dismissal of her claims against Defendant Cianbro Corporation is GRANTED with prejudice and without costs. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
January 30, 2020 Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Cianbro Corporation by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 2/20/2020. (SHIPP, JASON)
January 14, 2020 Filing 351 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set/Reset Deadlines, : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and the deadline has been terminated. (akr)
January 14, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney TARA SHELDON must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 1/21/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (akr) Modified on 1/14/2020 (akr).
January 13, 2020 Filing 350 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colin N. Holmes filed by KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (MCKINLEY, KENT)
January 13, 2020 Filing 349 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #347 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the system. Counsel to re-file at the request of the Clerk's Office to correct the Applicant's electronic signature. (akr)
January 13, 2020 Filing 348 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tara A. Sheldon filed by CATHERINE A. MOHAN on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2145445.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
January 13, 2020 Filing 347 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colin N. Holmes filed by KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2145291.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (MCKINLEY, KENT) Modified on 1/13/2020 (akr).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #345 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline to complete fact discovery, including the depositions of fact witnesses, is extended to April 30, 2020; the deadline to file a notice of intent to file a motion for summary judgment is extended to May 10, 2020; the deadline to file Daubert and Kumho motions is extended to 45 days after the completion of expert witness depositions. All other terms of the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 26, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - per Order No. 346: Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/10/2020. (lrc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 345 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by VELAN VALVE CORP Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FORSSBERG, BRITA)
December 16, 2019 Filing 344 NOTICE of Interested Parties , Supplemental by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (HADDOW, JAMES)
December 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney JAMES J. BEDORTHA must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 12/18/2019. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (akr)
December 3, 2019 Filing 343 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James J. Bedortha filed by JASON T. SHIPP on behalf of JANICE E BRADFORD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2118425.) (SHIPP, JASON)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL re: #333 Motion to Seal By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mjlt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER mooting #322 Motion to Dismiss. The Court granted Plaintiff's subsequent motion for voluntary dismissal. (Order, ECF No. 340.) Accordingly, this motion is dismissed as moot. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (akr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER ON MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL granting #335 Motion to Dismiss By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (akr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER OF PARTIAL STAY By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (akr)
October 2, 2019 Filing 338 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Notice Pursuant to this Courts Order of September 20th, 2019 (ECF NO. 336) by JANICE E BRADFORD (SHIPP, JASON)
October 2, 2019 Filing 337 New England Insulation Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaim against All Defendants by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC.(HOOVER, MARK)
October 1, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 20TH, 2019 by JANICE E BRADFORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New England Insulation, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss)(SHIPP, JASON)
October 1, 2019 Filing 335 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Voluntarily)(SHIPP, JASON)
October 1, 2019 Filing 334 NOTICE of Interested Parties by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (HADDOW, JAMES)
October 1, 2019 Filing 333 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties by THE WM. POWELL COMPANY Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties - Unredacted)(HADDOW, JAMES)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 PROCEDURAL ORDER. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 331 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (OSWALD, JAMES)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #324 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Oswald is substituted as counsel for Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 329 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL INC. (BEAN, HEIDI)
September 18, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of ALBANY INTERNATIONAL INC (BEAN, HEIDI)
September 18, 2019 Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (MFS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 326 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristen R. Souza filed by JAMES R. OSWALD on behalf of ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2080105.) (OSWALD, JAMES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. OSWALD on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER LLC (OSWALD, JAMES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 324 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by FOSTER WHEELER LLC Responses due by 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance of James R. Oswald)(OSWALD, JAMES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 323 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (DWYER, PAUL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 322 MOTION to Dismiss - Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 10/7/2019. (SHIPP, JASON)
September 16, 2019 Filing 321 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 3:00 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information. (MFS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 320 Milwaukee Valve Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY.(OSWALD, JAMES)
September 13, 2019 Filing 319 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY. (OSWALD, JAMES)
September 12, 2019 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. OSWALD on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY (OSWALD, JAMES)
September 11, 2019 Filing 317 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (MCKINLEY, KENT)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER TO FILE. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 315 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by CIANBRO CORPORATION. (SAUCIER, MICHAEL)
September 3, 2019 Filing 314 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by TRANE CO. (BEAN, HEIDI)
September 3, 2019 Filing 313 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY. (BEAN, HEIDI)
September 3, 2019 Filing 312 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CIANBRO CORPORATION. (SAUCIER, MICHAEL)
August 29, 2019 Filing 311 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RAINBIRD CORPORATION. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #308 Motion to Extend Time By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
August 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (akr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 309 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Amended) by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 308 MOTION to Extend Time One week to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAINBIRD CORPORATION Responses due by 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #303 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims and Counterclaims By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mlm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 306 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRANE CO. (HARMON, DAWN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 305 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 304 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 303 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims and Counterclaims by KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP, S D WARREN COMPANY, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA, SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC Responses due by 9/17/2019. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 302 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC. (ADAMS, KIP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 301 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (REICHL, NOLAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 300 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRANE CO. (BEAN, HEIDI)
August 20, 2019 Filing 299 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY. (BEAN, HEIDI)
August 19, 2019 Filing 298 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EATON CORPORATION. (BEAN, HEIDI)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #296 Motion of Eric V. Skelly to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 15, 2019 Filing 296 MOTION by Attorney Eric V. Skelly to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Flowserve Corporation by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION Responses due by 9/5/2019. (SKELLY, ERIC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 295 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GARDNER-DENVER INC. (BEAN, HEIDI)
August 15, 2019 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN F. TABASKY on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER - Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2019 By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER - Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice due by 8/27/2019 By JUDGE JON D. LEVY (akr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 291 STATUS REPORT Status Report by JANICE E BRADFORD. (SHIPP, JASON)
August 6, 2019 Filing 290 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brad Graham filed by KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2059110.) (MCKINLEY, KENT)
August 6, 2019 Filing 289 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Felice filed by KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2059098.) (MCKINLEY, KENT)
August 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney BRAD W. GRAHAM shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/13/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr) Modified on 8/6/2019 to add counsel's name (akr).
August 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Attorney BRAD W. GRAHAM shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/13/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS VOLUNTARILY granting #269 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #285 Motion by Michelle Byers to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #283 Motion by Ryan Murphy to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 285 MOTION by Attorney Michelle M. Byers to Withdraw as Attorney by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION Responses due by 8/16/2019. (BYERS, MICHELLE)
July 26, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (MCKINLEY, KENT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 283 MOTION by Attorney Ryan M. Murphy to Withdraw as Attorney by AURORA PUMP COMPANY Responses due by 8/16/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DCO LLC. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 281 DCo LLC's ANSWER to #264 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DCO LLC.(BJORNLUND, KYLE)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #279 Motion by Attorney Craig R. Waksler to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 279 MOTION by Attorney Craig R. Waksler to Withdraw as Attorney by AURORA PUMP COMPANY Responses due by 8/14/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. WRIGHT on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER terminating without prejudice #275 Order to Show Cause By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Order re: Order to Show Cause: Status Report due by 8/9/2019. (jwr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 276 RESPONSE TO #275 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by THE GAGE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A)(akr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/22/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (tcs)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 AMENDED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS SAPPI NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION granting #262 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS SAPPI NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION granting #262 Joint MOTION to Dismiss By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (tcs)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #270 Consent MOTION Related to Fifth Amended Complaint. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (tcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 271 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #270 Title changed from "MOTION Consent Motion" to "Consent MOTION" (tcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 270 Consent MOTION Related to Fifth Amended Complaint by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHIPP, JASON) Modified on to clean up title 7/1/2019 (tcs).
June 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #269 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants Voluntarily As directed by Judge Jon D. Levy, Responses due by 7/8/2019. Reply due by 7/12/2019. (tcs) Modified on 6/28/2019 to include full name(tcs).
June 27, 2019 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants Voluntarily by JANICE E BRADFORD Responses due by 7/18/2019. (SHIPP, JASON)
June 27, 2019 Filing 268 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Plaintiff's 5th Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION.(OSWALD, JAMES)
June 27, 2019 Filing 267 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #264 Fifth Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, Answer to All Cross Claims, and Demand for Jury Trial, by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(ROSENTHAL, DANIEL) Modified on 6/27/2019 to clean up docket text (akr).
June 26, 2019 Filing 266 Summons Issued as to DCO LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (akr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 265 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #263 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants Voluntarily : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the CM/ECF system. (akr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 264 Fifth AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dco, LLC, filed by JANICE BRADFORD WEST. (Service of Process Deadline 9/23/2019)(SHIPP, JASON)
June 25, 2019 Filing 263 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants Voluntarily by JANICE BRADFORD WEST Responses due by 7/16/2019. (SHIPP, JASON) Modified on 6/25/2019 (akr).
June 21, 2019 Filing 262 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP, S D WARREN COMPANY, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA Responses due by 7/12/2019. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting without objection #246 Motion to Amend Complaint;granting without objection #246 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before June 28, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 14, 2019 Filing 260 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by GRINNELL LLC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 259 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by BELL & GOSSETT. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 258 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Amended) by GOULD PUMPS. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by J. YASMIN TAYYAB on behalf of KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP (TAYYAB, J.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 255 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #254 Additional Discovery Documents per Court Order : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the CM/ECF System. (akr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 254 ***FILED IN ERROR*** (Access to document is restricted to case participants only) ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS PER COURT ORDER filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A - Documents)(WHITING, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/12/2019 (akr).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #213 Attorneys Harten and Aprea's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 252 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brendan J. Gaughan filed by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2027998.) (BEAN, HEIDI) Modified on 5/31/2019 to replace Brenda with Brendan (tcs).
May 31, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (BEAN, HEIDI)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #248 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Waksler is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Murphy is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 31, 2019 set Deadlines : Attorney BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 6/7/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (tcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION by Attorney Craig R. Waksler to Withdraw as Attorney by DEZURIK INC Responses due by 6/20/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 247 MOTION by Attorney Ryan M. Murphy to Withdraw as Attorney by DEZURIK INC Responses due by 6/20/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 246 MOTION to Amend Complaint and, MOTION to Substitute Party by JANICE BRADFORD WEST Responses due by 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifth Amended Complaint)(SHIPP, JASON)
May 29, 2019 Filing 245 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by WARREN PUMPS. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 244 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 243 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by DEZURIK INC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cetrulo is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 241 MOTION by Attorney Lawrence Cetrulo to Withdraw as Attorney by FW WEBB COMPANY Responses due by 6/19/2019. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwyer is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Belardo is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 238 MOTION by Attorney Paul E. Dwyer, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by VELAN VALVE CORP Responses due by 6/18/2019. (DWYER, PAUL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 237 MOTION by Attorney John P. Belardo, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by VELAN VALVE CORP Responses due by 6/18/2019. (BELARDO, JOHN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 236 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kendra A. Bergeron filed by DAWN M. HARMON on behalf of ECR INTERNATIONAL INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2025068.) (HARMON, DAWN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 235 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Goldman filed by DAWN M. HARMON on behalf of CRANE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2025065.) (HARMON, DAWN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 234 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Blei filed by DAWN M. HARMON on behalf of CRANE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2025058.) (HARMON, DAWN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN M. HARMON on behalf of ECR INTERNATIONAL INC (HARMON, DAWN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN M. HARMON on behalf of CRANE COMPANY (HARMON, DAWN)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Attorney Kendra A. Bergeron, David A. Goldman, and Nicholas J. Blei shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 5/31/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (tcs)
May 23, 2019 Filing 231 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC. (HOOVER, MARK)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #225 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daly is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matteo is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 228 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
May 23, 2019 Filing 227 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant New England Insulation Company by NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC. (HOOVER, MARK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION by Attorney Nicole M. Matteo to Withdraw as Attorney by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY Responses due by 6/13/2019. (DALY, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2019 Filing 225 MOTION by Attorney Michael J. Daly to Withdraw as Attorney by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY Responses due by 6/12/2019. (DALY, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2019 Filing 224 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 223 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 22, 2019 Filing 222 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WARREN PUMPS. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 22, 2019 Filing 221 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEZURIK INC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN) Modified on 5/23/2019 (akr).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #215 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zabbo is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 22, 2019 Filing 219 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant ITT LLC by BELL & GOSSETT. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 218 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GRINNELL LLC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 217 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GOULD PUMPS. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 216 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 215 MOTION by Attorney Timothy M. Zabbo to Withdraw as Attorney by SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC Responses due by 6/12/2019. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #211 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cetrulo is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 21, 2019 Filing 213 MOTION by Attorney Stephen Harten and Anthony Aprea to Withdraw as Attorney by THE GAGE COMPANY Responses due by 6/11/2019. (APREA, ANTHONY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITA J. FORSSBERG on behalf of SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
May 21, 2019 Filing 211 MOTION by Attorney Lawrence Cetrulo to Withdraw as Attorney by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC Responses due by 6/11/2019. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 210 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Merle West by JANICE BRADFORD WEST. (SHIPP, JASON) Modified on 5/21/2019 to remove MERLE WEST as filer (akr).
May 20, 2019 Filing 209 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Ford Motor Company by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 208 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #193 Motion to Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 206 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. (WHITING, STEPHEN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. WHITING on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 204 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cianbro Corporation by CIANBRO CORPORATION. (SAUCIER, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2019 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/10/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. (MFS)
May 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Costa is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 202 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (SKELLY, ERIC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 201 MOTION by Attorney Kenneth R. Costa to Withdraw as Attorney by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION Responses due by 6/7/2019. (SKELLY, ERIC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 200 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 199 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VELAN VALVE CORP. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE L. JOHNSON, ESQ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (JOHNSON, SUZANNE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 197 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J. Cirilano filed by JASON T. SHIPP on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SHIPP, JASON)
May 10, 2019 Filing 196 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Shipp filed by JASON T. SHIPP on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SHIPP, JASON)
May 10, 2019 Filing 195 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY. (SHIREMAN, JUSTIN)
May 9, 2019 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
May 8, 2019 Filing 193 Consent MOTION Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by FORD MOTOR COMPANY Responses due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
May 7, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE - Per Local Rule 83.1(c)(1) counsel to have associated with them... a member of the Bar of this Court, etc. due by 5/21/2019. Counsel shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 5/21/2019. Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/21/2019.(akr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. SAUCIER on behalf of CIANBRO CORPORATION (SAUCIER, MICHAEL)
May 2, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK J. HOOVER on behalf of NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC (HOOVER, MARK)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ruggieri is withdrawn as counsel By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 25, 2019 Filing 188 MOTION by Attorney James A. Ruggieri to Withdraw as Attorney by INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY Responses due by 5/16/2019. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 24, 2019 Filing 187 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by FW WEBB COMPANY. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #183 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Romano is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Urbanski is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #179 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wheelock is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 23, 2019 Filing 183 MOTION by Attorney Alex A. Romano to Withdraw as Attorney by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC Responses due by 5/14/2019. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 23, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION by Attorney T. Dos Urbanski to Withdraw as Attorney by ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC Responses due by 5/14/2019. (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 23, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW ALTIERI on behalf of MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY (ALTIERI, MATTHEW)
April 23, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. CAHALANE, III on behalf of FW WEBB COMPANY (CAHALANE, MICHAEL)
April 22, 2019 Filing 179 First MOTION by Attorney as counsel for Rain Bird to Withdraw as Attorney by RAINBIRD CORPORATION Responses due by 5/13/2019. (WHEELOCK, JENNIFER)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roman is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roman is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roman is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION by Attorney Marisa K. Roman, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by GARDNER-DENVER INC Responses due by 5/7/2019. (BEAN, HEIDI)
April 16, 2019 Filing 174 MOTION by Attorney Marisa K. Roman, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by WARREN PUMPS Responses due by 5/7/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION by Attorney Marisa K. Roman, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO INDUSTRIES INC Responses due by 5/7/2019. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. The parties will submit proposed Scheduling Order(s) by May 1, 2019. (Court Reporter: Julie Edgecomb) (MFS)
April 16, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. OSWALD on behalf of NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC (OSWALD, JAMES)
April 16, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. OSWALD on behalf of ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION (OSWALD, JAMES)
April 15, 2019 Filing 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FW WEBB COMPANY. (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE E. BJORNLUND on behalf of FW WEBB COMPANY (BJORNLUND, KYLE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITA J. FORSSBERG on behalf of RAINBIRD CORPORATION (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITA J. FORSSBERG on behalf of INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITA J. FORSSBERG on behalf of ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITA J. FORSSBERG on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORP (FORSSBERG, BRITA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 163 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Keough filed by DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005163.) (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
April 12, 2019 Filing 162 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christian J. Singewald filed by DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005118.) (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
April 12, 2019 Filing 161 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael F. McVinney (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 119000182.) filed by ERIC V. SKELLY on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (SKELLY, ERIC) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add payment receipt info (mtm).
April 12, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC V. SKELLY on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (SKELLY, ERIC)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lyons is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 12, 2019 sET Deadlines : Attorney CHRISTIAN J. SINGEWALD and TIMOTHY J. KEOUGH shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/19/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney J. YASMIN TAYYAB shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/19/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 158 MOTION by Attorney Thomas W. Lyons, III to Withdraw as Attorney by CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC Responses due by 5/2/2019. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
April 11, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. WRIGHT on behalf of DEZURIK INC (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #148 Motion to Excuse Attendance of Maine Counsel at Hearing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fielding is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Feeney is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Felice is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 10, 2019 Filing 152 MOTION by Attorney John R. Felice to Withdraw as Attorney by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION Responses due by 5/1/2019. (BYERS, MICHELLE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of GARDNER-DENVER INC (BEAN, HEIDI)
April 10, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #149 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, : This entry has been modified to add INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION as a Filer. (akr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 149 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul E. Dywer, Esquire filed by PAUL E. DWYER on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORP, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2003669.) (DWYER, PAUL) Modified on 4/10/2019 to add INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION as filer (akr).
April 9, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION To Excuse Attendance of Maine Counsel at April 16, 2019 Hearing by BELL & GOSSETT, GOULD PUMPS, GRINNELL LLC, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA Responses due by 4/30/2019. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of GOULD PUMPS (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vellucci is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION by Attorney Margreta Vellucci to Withdraw as Attorney by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY Responses due by 4/30/2019. (CARON, JASON)
April 9, 2019 Filing 144 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin S. Shireman filed by CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN on behalf of NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2003016.) (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 9, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN on behalf of NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 9, 2019 Filing 142 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Yasmin Tayyab filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of BELL & GOSSETT, GRINNELL LLC, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2002993.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shannon is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #138 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : These entries have been modified to replace "Notice/Correspondence" with "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney." Pursuant to local rule 83.2, "No attorney may withdraw an appearance in any action except by leave of Court." (akr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #138 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (akr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 138 MOTION of Attorney Brian A Fielding to Withdraw as Attorney by TRANE CO (BEAN, HEIDI) Modified on 4/8/2019 "Notice/Correspondence" with "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney." (akr).
April 8, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of TRANE CO (BEAN, HEIDI)
April 8, 2019 Filing 136 MOTION of Attorney Cassandra L Feeney to Withdraw as Attorney by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (BEAN, HEIDI) Modified on 4/8/2019 This entry has been modified to replace "Notice/Correspondence" with "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney."(akr).
April 8, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI A. BEAN on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (BEAN, HEIDI)
April 8, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION by Attorney Anne E. Shannon to Withdraw as Attorney by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY Responses due by 4/29/2019. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
April 5, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE M. BYERS on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (BYERS, MICHELLE)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nelson is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 4, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : This entry has been modified to replace "Notice/Correspondence" with "Motion to Withdraw as Attorney." (akr)
April 4, 2019 Filing 130 MOTION of Monica R. Nelson to Withdraw as Attorney by BAYER CROPSCIENCE (ADAMS, KIP) Modified on 4/4/2019 to replace "Notice" with "Motion" (akr).
April 4, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by KIP J. ADAMS on behalf of BAYER CROPSCIENCE (ADAMS, KIP)
April 4, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID P. GINZER on behalf of CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC (GINZER, DAVID)
April 4, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH G. STOUDER on behalf of CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mee is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION by Attorney Peter J. Mee to Withdraw as Attorney by BELL & GOSSETT, GRINNELL LLC, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA Responses due by 4/23/2019. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 2, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of BELL & GOSSETT, GRINNELL LLC, SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 2, 2019 Filing 123 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Dighello filed by JAMES B. HADDOW on behalf of THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1999662.) (HADDOW, JAMES)
April 2, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES B. HADDOW on behalf of THE WM. POWELL COMPANY (HADDOW, JAMES)
April 2, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. WRIGHT on behalf of WARREN PUMPS (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. WRIGHT on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES INC (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE S. KAYATTA on behalf of MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY (KAYATTA, KATHERINE)
April 2, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by NOLAN L. REICHL on behalf of MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY (REICHL, NOLAN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information.(MFS)
April 2, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY MARTIN MALONE on behalf of ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION (MALONE, KELLY)
April 1, 2019 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (CARON, JASON)
April 1, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CARON on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (CARON, JASON)
March 26, 2019 Filing 113 Case transferred in from District of Rhode Island; Case Number 1:18-cv-00688. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #98 Motion to Transfer Case; granting #112 Motion for Joinder; granting #91 Motion to Transfer Case: In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Court GRANTS Defendants' various Motions to Transfer Case (ECF Nos. 91, 98, and 112). As the Plaintiffs live in Maine and the events relevant to this litigation transpired in Maine, the Court finds that this case could have been brought in Maine and that transferring the case to Maine will serve both the interests of justice and the convenience of the parties. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Maine. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/26/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION for Joinder G.E.'s Motion to Transfer filed by Rainbird Corporation. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Myhre on behalf of P.I.C. Contractors, Inc. (Myhre, Jonathan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Myhre on behalf of Packings & Insulations Corporation (Myhre, Jonathan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Wm. Powell Company.(Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Wm. Powell Company.(Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Wm. Powell Company.(Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint Amended, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Wm. Powell Company.(Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE by Janice Bradford West re #91 MOTION to Transfer Case , #98 First MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maine Joinder of Plaintiffs in Certin Motions to Transfer Case DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER CASE (Shipp, Jason) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 104 Defendant New Yorker Boiler Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim All Pending and Furture Cross-Claims by New Yorker Boiler Company. (Shireman, Justin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 103 Defendant New Yorker Boiler Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by New Yorker Boiler Company.(Shireman, Justin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 102 Defendant New Yorker Boiler Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by New Yorker Boiler Company.(Shireman, Justin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 101 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Yorker Boiler Company identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings Inc. for New Yorker Boiler Company.. (Shireman, Justin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Shireman on behalf of New Yorker Boiler Company (Shireman, Justin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Catherine A. Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1325323 ) filed by General Electric Company. (Shannon, Anne) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Catherine A. Mohan. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/15/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 98 First MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maine filed by CBS Corporation. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Lyons, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company in support of #91 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Daly, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 96 First CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against CBS Corporation, filed by CBS Corporation.(Lyons, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 95 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Fourth, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 94 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Third, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 93 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Second, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by General Electric Company. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Shannon, Anne) (Main Document 91 replaced on 2/5/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Simoncelli, Michael). [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Glove Corporation. (Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Crane Company re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company.(Daly, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint JURY DEMAND by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's 4 Amended by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony) ISSUSED IN ERROR DUE TO CAPTION ON FIRST PAGE Modified on 1/24/2019 (Jackson, Kerrie). [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company. (Daly, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint With Special Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) Docket text Modified on 1/18/2019 (Simoncelli, Michael). [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps.(Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Gardner-Denver Inc..(Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Cross-Claims by Bayer Cropscience.(Nelson, Monica) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCaffrey on behalf of Gould Pumps (McCaffrey, Kevin) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Sappi Fine Paper North America.(Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Sappi Fine Paper North America (Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rainbird Corporation. (Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Waksler, Craig) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Waksler, Craig) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Allied Glove Corporation (Souza, Kristen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 66 Defendant, Cianbro Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint OF THE PLAINTIFFS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cianbro Corporation.(Fielding, Brian) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Fielding on behalf of Cianbro Corporation (Fielding, Brian) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cianbro Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Cianbro Companies for Cianbro Corporation.. (Fielding, Brian) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Harten on behalf of The Gage Company (Harten, Stephen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Aprea on behalf of The Gage Company (Aprea, Anthony) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Gage Company. (Aprea, Anthony) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (McVinney, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Costa, Kenneth) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Costa on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Costa, Kenneth) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell & Gossett. (Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Bell & Gossett.(Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC.. (Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Grinnell LLC.(Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Bell & Gossett (Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Mee, Peter) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Armstrong Pumps, Inc. for Armstrong Pumps, Inc... (Romano, Alex) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dezurik, Inc.. (Murphy, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Murphy, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Murphy, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Murphy, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Wheelock on behalf of Rainbird Corporation (Wheelock, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sid Harvey Industries, Inc.. (Zabbo, Timothy) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Zabbo on behalf of Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. (Zabbo, Timothy) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J Cirilano. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Shipp. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wm. Powell Company. (Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Dighello, Jr. on behalf of The Wm. Powell Company (Dighello, Richard) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Jason T Shipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1307654 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Joseph J. Cirilano to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1307652 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane Co.. (Fielding, Brian) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company. (Vellucci, Margreta) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Vellucci, Margreta) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Felice, John) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric Company.. (Shannon, Anne) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECR International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BDR Thermea Group, BV for ECR International, Inc... (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Feeney, Cassandra) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex A. Romano on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Romano, Alex) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D. Urbanski on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Urbanski, Theodorus) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 29, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by CBS Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Lyons, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Matteo on behalf of Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company (Matteo, Nicole) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Daly on behalf of Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company (Daly, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience. (Nelson, Monica) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Bayer Cropscience (Nelson, Monica) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 2 of 2)(Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps. (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner-Denver Inc.. (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of Warren Pumps (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of Gardner-Denver Inc. (Roman, Marisa) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of ECR International, Inc. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kimberly-Clark Corp.. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corp. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Insulation, Inc.. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of New England Insulation, Inc. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Company (Goldman, David) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Lyons, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Lyons, III on behalf of CBS Corporation (Lyons, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 18-6293. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1303295, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shannon, Anne) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 3/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADFORD v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAVID A. GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: THE GAGE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY S. APREA
Represented By: STEPHEN P. HARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ECR INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: DAVID A. GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAWN M. HARMON
Represented By: KENDRA A. BERGERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BELL & GOSSETT
Represented By: PETER J. MEE
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: J. YASMIN TAYYAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES R. OSWALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: MARISA K. ROMAN
Represented By: STEVEN F. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Represented By: MARK O. DENEHY
Represented By: JAMES R. OSWALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: SAPPI FINE PAPER NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: PETER J. MEE
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: J. YASMIN TAYYAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN M. MURPHY
Represented By: CRAIG R. WAKSLER
Represented By: STEVEN F. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE
Represented By: MONICA R. NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JANICE BRADFORD WEST
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCONNELL
Represented By: JASON T. SHIPP
Represented By: VINCENT L. GREENE, IV
Represented By: JOSEPH J CIRILANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BSM PUMP CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ARMSTRONG PUMPS INC
Represented By: ALEX A. ROMANO
Represented By: THEODORUS D. URBANSKI
Represented By: BRITA J. FORSSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID A. GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN
Represented By: HEIDI A. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN R. FELICE
Represented By: MICHELLE M. BYERS
Represented By: BRAD W. GRAHAM
Represented By: KENT WILLIAM MCKINLEY
Represented By: COLIN N. HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PEERLESS PUMPS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: LAWRENCE G. CETRULO
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: NATIONAL AUTO PARTS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: HEIDI A. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DANA INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC
Represented By: MONICA R. NELSON
Represented By: KIP J. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEZURIK INC
Represented By: RYAN M. MURPHY
Represented By: CRAIG R. WAKSLER
Represented By: STEVEN F. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: CASSANDRA L. FEENEY
Represented By: HEIDI A. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: PAUL E. DWYER
Represented By: JOHN P. BELARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P I C CONTRACTORS INC
Represented By: MARK T. NUGENT
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MYHRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Represented By: KENNETH R. COSTA
Represented By: MICHAEL F. MCVINNEY
Represented By: ERIC V. SKELLY
Represented By: JONATHAN F. TABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS
Represented By: MARISA K. ROMAN
Represented By: STEVEN F. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACKINGS & INSULATIONS CORPORATION
Represented By: MARK T. NUGENT
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MYHRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS
Represented By: KEVIN C. MCCAFFREY
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: J. YASMIN TAYYAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP
Represented By: DAVID A. GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: J. YASMIN TAYYAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS ROEBUCK & CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP
Represented By: PAUL E. DWYER
Represented By: BRITA J. FORSSBERG
Represented By: JOHN P. BELARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIANBRO CORPORATION
Represented By: BRIAN A. FIELDING
Represented By: MICHAEL E. SAUCIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: TIMOTHY M ZABBO
Represented By: BRITA J. FORSSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: MARGRETA VELLUCCI
Represented By: JASON CARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC
Represented By: DAVID P. GINZER
Represented By: ELIZABETH G. STOUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FW WEBB COMPANY
Represented By: LAWRENCE G. CETRULO
Represented By: KYLE E. BJORNLUND
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CAHALANE, III
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DICKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: ANNE E. SHANNON
Represented By: CATHERINE A. MOHAN
Represented By: JOHN A. HELLER
Represented By: TARA SHELDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER-DENVER INC
Represented By: MARISA K. ROMAN
Represented By: HEIDI A. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE CO
Represented By: BRIAN A. FIELDING
Represented By: HEIDI A. BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: PETER J. MEE
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: J. YASMIN TAYYAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARY C. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. RUGGERI
Represented By: BRITA J. FORSSBERG
Represented By: JAMES A. RUGGIERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WM. POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD M. DIGHELLO, JR.
Represented By: JAMES B. HADDOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORKER BOILER COMPANY
Represented By: JUSTIN J. SHIREMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW ENGLAND INSULATION INC
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: JAMES R. OSWALD
Represented By: MARK J. HOOVER
Represented By: DAVID A. GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER E. WHEELOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY
Represented By: NICOLE M. MATTEO
Represented By: MICHAEL J. DALY
Represented By: MATTHEW ALTIERI
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Represented By: KATHERINE S. KAYATTA
Represented By: A. BERNARD GUEKGUEZIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S D WARREN COMPANY
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO
Represented By: DAVID GOLDMAN
Represented By: NICHOLAS J BLEI
Represented By: DAWN M. HARMON
Represented By: DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Represented By: JASON CARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Represented By: CHRISTIAN J. SINGEWALD
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. KEOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S D WARREN COMPANY doing business as SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSM PUMP CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS W. LYONS, III
Represented By: DAVID P. GINZER
Represented By: ELIZABETH G. STOUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION
Represented By: KRISTEN R. SOUZA
Represented By: JAMES R. OSWALD
Represented By: KELLY MARTIN MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: RAINBIRD CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER E. WHEELOCK
Represented By: BRITA J. FORSSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: DCO LLC
Represented By: KYLE E. BJORNLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERLE WEST
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCONNELL
Represented By: JASON T. SHIPP
Represented By: VINCENT L. GREENE, IV
Represented By: JOSEPH J CIRILANO
Represented By: SUZANNE L. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE E BRADFORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCONNELL
Represented By: JASON T. SHIPP
Represented By: VINCENT L. GREENE, IV
Represented By: JOSEPH J CIRILANO
Represented By: SUZANNE L. JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES J. BEDORTHA
Represented By: JOSEPH CIRILANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?