AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC v. RUMFORD et al
Plaintiff: AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC
Defendant: TOWN OF RUMFORD, ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC and JAND INC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00024
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice 31 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. An evidentiary hearing would be premature at this point. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to see if they can reach agreement that remand is appropriate for lack of complete diversity. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 18, 2024, detailing whether they have reached such an agreement or whether limited discovery is necessary to further explore the issue. If the latter, the parties should propose the parameters of the limited discovery. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
March 28, 2024 Set Deadline: Per Order #36, status report due by 4/18/2024. (MGW)
March 27, 2024 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing filed by AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC. Reply due by 4/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Marc G. Hordon)(DILWORTH, EDWARD)
March 25, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #32 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, #33 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney SCARLETT M. RAJBANSHI,AVANA M. EPPERSON-TEMPLE for SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC added to this specific case only. Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Rajbanshi and Epperson-Temple must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 4/1/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrt)
March 25, 2024 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Avana Epperson-Temple, Esq. filed by JOHN J. O'CONNOR on behalf of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2931734.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (O'CONNOR, JOHN)
March 25, 2024 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scarlett M. Rajbanshi, Esq. filed by JOHN J. O'CONNOR on behalf of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2931717.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (O'CONNOR, JOHN)
March 21, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing per Judge Wolf: Responses due by 3/29/2024. No reply permitted. (slg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO #25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by JAND INC. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
March 20, 2024 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO #25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. (O'CONNOR, JOHN)
March 19, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC Responses due by 4/9/2024. No PDF attached. See ECF No. 27.(slg)
March 19, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO #25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by TOWN OF RUMFORD. (FRANCO, MARK)
March 19, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO #25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Laura M. Gregory, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Laura M. Gregory, Esq., #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Laura M. Gregory, Esq.)(GREGORY, LAURA) Modified on 3/19/2024 to clean up text (slg).
March 15, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO #25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC. (DILWORTH, EDWARD)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
March 4, 2024 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TOWN OF RUMFORD. (FRANCO, MARK)
March 1, 2024 Filing 23 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint, #3 2024.01.26 Letter to Attorney Dilworth)(GREGORY, LAURA)
March 1, 2024 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. (O'CONNOR, JOHN)
March 1, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.(O'CONNOR, JOHN)
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by JAND INC.(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
February 26, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE: The Court is NOT tracking a Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement deadline for JAND INC. The Court notes that the filing was previously made on 2/23/24 at pleading # 17. (mlm)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Jand, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 5, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
February 26, 2024 Reset Answer Deadline and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement deadline for JAND INC due 3/5/2024. (mlm)
February 26, 2024 Set Deadlines: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due TOWN OF RUMFORD by 3/4/2024. (slg)
February 26, 2024 Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due from SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC by 3/4/2024. (slg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JAND INC. (ESTES, KAYLA)
February 23, 2024 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by JAND INC Responses due by 3/15/2024. (ESTES, KAYLA)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sedgewick Claims Management Services, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 1, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
February 23, 2024 Reset Answer Deadline for SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC per Order No. 15: Answer due by 3/1/2024. (jad)
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer filed by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. (O'CONNOR, JOHN) Modified on 2/23/2024 to change ECF event from Stipulation to Motion to Extend Time to Answer (mnd).
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. O'CONNOR on behalf of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC (O'CONNOR, JOHN)
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 Defendant, Argonaut's ANSWER to Complaint by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC.(GREGORY, LAURA)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC. by AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC. (DILWORTH, EDWARD) Modified on 2/26/2024 to add "as to Argonaut Insurance Company Inc" text (slg).
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC by AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC. (DILWORTH, EDWARD) Modified on 2/26/2024 to add "as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc" text(slg).
February 20, 2024 Set Answer Deadline for SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC : Answer due by 2/20/2024. (slg)
February 12, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: State Court Record due by 3/15/2024. (slg)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. The state court record shall be filed by March 15, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by TOWN OF RUMFORD.(FRANCO, MARK)
February 12, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK V. FRANCO on behalf of TOWN OF RUMFORD (FRANCO, MARK)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of JAND INC (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File State Court Record by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC Responses due by 3/1/2024. (GREGORY, LAURA) Modified on 2/12/2024 to clean up docket text (slg).
February 8, 2024 Reset Answer Deadline for ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC previous deadline set in error: Answer due by 2/20/2024. (slg)
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (GREGORY, LAURA)
February 5, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC. (DILWORTH, EDWARD)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/12/2024. By DEPUTY CLERK: C. Derrah. (cjd)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2024) Fee due by 1/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(cjd)
January 29, 2024 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2906655.), filed by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC.(GREGORY, LAURA)
January 29, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings : (Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 2/5/2024.), Set Answer Deadline : (Answer due by 2/5/2024.) (cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC v. RUMFORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTOMATIC6ACQUISITIONS LLC
Represented By: EDWARD L. DILWORTH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF RUMFORD
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Represented By: LAURA GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Represented By: AVANA EPPERSON-TEMPLE
Represented By: JOHN J. O'CONNOR
Represented By: SCARLETT M. RAJBANSHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAND INC
Represented By: JOSHUA E. BIROCCO
Represented By: THOMAS S. MARJERISON
Represented By: KAYLA ESTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?