PATEL v. UNITED STATES et al
Plaintiff: RAJ K PATEL
Defendant: UNITED STATES, PRESIDENT JOE BIDEN, PUERTO RICO, VICE PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS, ALL BIDEN CABINET OFFICERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK GARLAND, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES XAVIER BECERRA, SURGEON GENERAL DR VIVEK MURTHY and UNITED NATIONS AMBASSADOR LINDA THOMASGREENFIELD
Case Number: 2:2024cv00044
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER mooting #15 Motion to Expedite By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite by RAJ K PATEL (mmy)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration re 11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by RAJ K PATEL. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by RAJ K PATEL (mmy)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by RAJ K PATEL (mmy)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED because Plaintiff's complaint presents clearly frivolous claims. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Report and Recommendations by RAJ K PATEL (mmy)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: M. York (mmy)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE adopting Report and Recommended Decision re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Emergency Pro Se Petition for Writ of Mandamus By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by RAJ K PATEL. (mmy)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by RAJ K PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Email)(jwr)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Emergency Pro Se Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE: Recently RAJ K PATEL filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties, which was provided to Plaintiff via email on 2/14/2024. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (mmy)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by RAJ K PATEL (mnd)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Emergency Pro Se Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by RAJ K PATEL (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL v. UNITED STATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJ K PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICE PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL BIDEN CABINET OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURGEON GENERAL DR VIVEK MURTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED NATIONS AMBASSADOR LINDA THOMASGREENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?