In re: Alliance, Franklin Templeton, Bank of America, Pilgrim Baxter
Plaintiff: Robert K. Finnell, Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County, Jackie Williams, Reiko Gagnon, Jean Iezza, Jeffrey Cohen, Steven Burda, Pamela Yameen, Jose Diaz, Robert J. Saelens, D.M. Griffith, Milberg Weiss Bershad & Schulman LLP, Gary Goldberg Financial, Harriet Surks, Katherine Simpkins, Nancy Ann Antoniello, James W. Burns, Anthony Antoniello, John E. Morrissey, Thomas C. Burns, A Plaintiff, Patricia Solvibile, Settling Plaintiffs, Jean L. Taylor, Julie Parisi, Ryan McAlvey, Dolores Banas, Linda D. Ames-Weiner, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Rena Jarolawicz, Frances Hait, Kathleen Fitzgerald, Barbara R Anding, Virginia Wilcox, Heidi Hertz, Katrina McKoy, Gail Craven, Pat Iezza, Jennifer Taylor, Mun Hung, Linda Cohen, Elaine F. Platt, Jean Striffer, Mike Sayegh, Camille Logue, Simcha Lyons, Risa B. Schneps, Thomas F. Bednarek, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, George Swam, Silvana Della Camera, Joseph Banner, Simon J. Denenberg, Korshed J. Jungalawala, Joseph Shanis, Philip L. Erickson, James Cohen, Martin S. Goldberg, Harry Schipper, Dr. Seigel Morton, City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan, JoAnne Schneider, Lead Class Plaintiffs, William Solvibile, Evon Yameen, William Marcus, Retirement and Design Management, Inc., Nadine Geller, Chuck Hall, Richard Busch, Felicia Bernstein and Martine Stansbery, Jr.
Defendant: PBHG Mid-Cap Fund, PBHG Focused Fund, PBHG Small Cap Value Fund, PBHG Large Cap Fund, PBHG Small Cap Fund, PBHG Select Growth Fund, Templeton Global Investment Trust, Edmund P. Bergen, Daniel G. Calugar, Franklin High Income Fund, Peter J. Tobin, NY Intermediate Term Tax Free Income Fund, Alliance Capital Management, L.P., Franklin Rising Dividends Securities Fund, PBHG IRA Capital Preservation Fund, Foreign Equity Series - Primary Shares, Stephens Inc., Franklin Global Trust, Natural Resources Fund, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Pritchard Capital Partners LLC, MN Insured Tax Free Income Fund, Fiduciary High Income Fund, Canary Investment Management, LLC, Benjamin D. Holloway, NJ Tax Free Income Fund, Northeast Securities Inc., Franklin Zero Coupon Funds - 2005, 2010, JP Morgan Chase and Co., Kaplan & Company Securities, Inc., Donald H. Brydon, PBHG Large Cap Value Fund, Peter J. Powers, Paul Fulton, Pritchard Capital Partners, LLC, Signalert Corporation, Franklin Investment Advisory Services, LLC, Templeton Developing Markets Securities Fund, AllianceBernstein Growth & Income Fund, Inc., Canary Capital Partners Ltd, OH Insured Tax Free Income Fund, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Denis Duverne, Mutual Discovery Fund, LA Tax Free Income Fund, Technology Fund, AllianceBernstein Investment Research and Management, Inc., Rupert H. Johnson, Jr., Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., MD Tax Free Income Fund, Conservative Target Fund, Blue Chip Fund, Fiduciary Small Capitalization Equity Fund, PBHG Select Equity Fund, Franklin Income Securities Fund, Nations Funds Trust, Dynatech Fund, Old Mutual Fund Services, Hank Brennan, Canary Capital Partners, Ltd., Adjustable U.S. Govt Securities Fund, Franklin Strategic Mortgage Portfolio, Templeton Global Growth Fund, Wilshire Associates Incorporated, Templeton Global Bond Fund, Franklin Templeton Global Trust, Fund Defendants, AllianceBernstein Technology Fund, Inc., Headstart Advisers Ltd., Michael Laughlin, Alliance Capital Management Holding, L.P., PBHG Technology & Communications Fund, Wall Street Discount Corporation, Franklin Templeton Variable Ins. Prod Trust, FL Tax Free Income Fund, Rosalie J. Wolf, Global Communications Fund, PBHG Large Cap Growth Fund, Templeton Investment Counsel, LLC, AllianceBernstein Mid-Cap Growth Fund, Inc., Alfred Harrison, Utilities Fund, Corefolio Allocation Fund, Ronald Townsend, James H. Hance, Jr., John R. Bartholdson, Alliane Capital Management Corporation, Marshall C. Turner, Jr., TN Municipal Bond Fund, Walter E. Massey, Martin Flanagan, Albert A. Miller, Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, Edward J Stern, Emerging Markets Series, Templeton Intl Smaller Companies Fund, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Franklin Value Investors Trust, Templeton Global Long-Short Fund, Transsierra, Franklin Real Estate Fund, PBHG Emerging Growth Fund, Franklin Templeton, AllianceBernstein Premier Growth Fund, Inc., Aurum Securities Corp., Small Cap Growth Fund, W. H. Henderson, Jettie M. Edwards, Prudential Securities, Inc., Alliance Capital Management L.P., Frank Savage, Intermediate Term Tax Free Income Fund, Charles B. Walker, Salomon Smith Barney Inc., Franklin Strategic Series, PBHG Clipper Focus Fund, Fiduciary Large Capitalization Growth & Income Fund, Large Cap Growth Fund, Theodore C. Sihpol, III, Rydex Investments, Mutual Qualified Fund, Howard E. Hassler, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc., Frank Dowd, IV, Richard M. DeMartini, AllianceBernstein Family of Funds, PBHG Intermediate Fixed Income Fund, NC Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Money Fund, Edmund L. Benson, III, Floating Rate Daily Access Fund, MO Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Franklin Gold & Precious Metals Fund, Columbia Funds Series Trust, Alliance Global Investors Services, Inc., Franklin Advisers, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Jemmco Advisers, CA High Yield Municipal Fund, Microcap Value Fund, Old Mutual Asset Management, Franklin Federal Money Fund, Fiduciary International, Inc., Templeton China World Fund, Foreign Equity Series - Service Shares, John Does 1-10, Clearing Defendants, Appalachian Trails, L.P., Michael J. Laughlin, Ruth Block, Franklin Templeton Fund Allocator Series, PBHG Large Cap 20 Fund, William Kristol, AL Tax Free Income Fund, Templeton Income Trust, KY Tax Free Income Fund, W. Edwin Jarmain, Franklin Natural Resources Securities Fund, Bank of America N.A., Templeton Pacific Growth Fund, A. Max Walker, Mutual Financial Services Fund, Charles B. Johnson, Franklin High Income Trust, NY Limited Term Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Templeton Defendants, TX Tax Free Income Fund, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Frank Perfetuo, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Thomas B. Stiles, James M. Hester, Foreign Smaller Companies Series, Banc of America Securities LLC, Charles H. Ferguson, Ritchie Capital Management, Inc., John D. Carifa, Franklin-Templeton Non-US Core Equity Series, William H. Foulk, Robert H. Gordon, Templeton Pacific Growth Securities Fund, Gordon S. Macklin, Reba Williams, Franklin Resources, Inc., Puerto Rico Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Tax Exempt Money Fund, High Yield Tax Free Income Fund, Income Fund, Templeton Foreign Fund, DCIP, L.P., Bank of America Corp., Canary Capital Partners LLC, U.S. Long Short Fund, Lewis A. Sanders, Harris J. Ashton, Tak-Lung Tsim, Franklin Small Cap Fund, William H. Grigg, PA Tax Free Income Fund, Minor M Shaw, Harold J. Baxter, Prudential Financial, Inc., Templeton Global Opportunities Trust, Franklin Templeton Non-US Dynamic Core Equity Fund, AllianceBernstein Small Cap Growth Fund, Inc., Franklin Templeton Services, LLC, Growth Fund, Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., David H. Williams, Templeton Foreign Smaller Companies Fund, Franklin Mutual Discovery Securities Fund, Michael G. Christiani, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Canary, CCP Ltd., Hard Currency Fund, Virgil Williams, Franklin Tax Free Trust, AXA Financial, Inc., Gregory E. Johnson, Invesco Funds Group, Inc., Double Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin CA Tax Free Trust, William P. Carmichael, Peter D. Noris, NY Tax Exempt Money Fund, Franklin Templeton Intl Trust, Columbia Management Group, LLC, Peter W. Huber, Cornelius J. Pings, Charles Schaffran, Michael Hegarty, Moderate Target Fund, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Franklin Value Securities Fund, Mark A. Perry, Irwin Engelmann, PBHG Disciplined Equity Fund, Insured Tax Free Income Fund, Andrew L. Gangolf, Templeton Asset Strategy Fund, Franklin Investors Securities Trust, Golden Gate Financial Group, LLC, Mark D. Gersten, The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., MI Insured Tax Free Income Fund, Charles D. Bryceland, Franklin Mutual Shares Securities Fund, Richard D. Martini, Alan Lederfeind, Franklin Rising Dividends Fund, CA Growth Fund, Robert B. Carroll, AllianceBernstein High Yield Fund, Inc., William H. Foulk, Jr., Stanley B. Tulin, PBHG Funds, Bacap Distributors, LLC, Mutual European Fund, Large Cap Value Fund, Jackie M. Ward, PBHG Fund Distributors, Salomon Smith Barney, Donald J. Robinson, Equity Income Fund, Franklin Aggressive Growth Securities Fund, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Lincoln Financial Advisors Corporation, Franklin NY Tax Free Trust, James Guzy, Templeton World Fund, MA Insured Tax Free Income Fund, VA Tax Free Income Fund, TS&W Small Cap Value Fund, LLC, Stig Host, Donald E. Guinn, Veras Investment Partners, LLC, Franklin Mutual Series Fund, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Inc., Franklin Real Estate Securities Trust, Christopher M. Condron, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., C. Steven McMillan, Alliance Capital Management Holdings L.P., Charles W. Coker, Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States, AXA S.A., Franklin Templeton Money Trust Fund, David K. Storrs, Global Analytical Capital, Franklin Strategic Income Securities Fund, Franklin Technology Securities Fund, AllianceBernstein Americas Government Income Trust, Inc., James Ermer, A Defendant, Franklin U.S. Govt Fund, Investec (US) Incorporated, Virgil R. Williams, BTS Asset Management, Columbia Funds Master Investment Trust, LLC, PBHG Growth Fund, Templeton International (Ex Em) Fund, Schield Management Company, John R. Belk, Franklin Global Health Care Securities Fund, Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Canary Investment Management LLC, Citigroup, Inc., Templeton Institutional Funds Inc., Franklin Large Cap Growth Securities Fund, Gerald Murphy, Short-Intermediate U.S. Govt Securities Fund, Robert Gordon, Alan Stoga, D. James Guzy, Fiduciary Core Plus Fixed Income Fund, Bruce W. Calvert, Bank of America Corporation, David H. Dievler, Federal Term Tax Free Income Fund, Mutual Shares Fund, PBHG Focused Value Fund, Northeast Securities, Inc., Charles H. P. Duell, Lorie A. Slutsky, Broker Defendants John Does 1-25, Aggressive Growth Fund, Old Mutual, Plc, Chronos Asset Management, Templeton Foreign Securities Fund, Franklin Managed Trust, Samaritan Asset Management, Franklin Capital Growth Fund, Thomas S. Word, Jr., Bear, Stearns Securities Corp., PBHG Strategic Small Company Fund, William Post, FL Insured Tax Free Income Fund, The Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States, Clifford L. Michel, SEI Investments Distribution Company, Money Fund, Kaplan & Co. Securities, Inc., John Does 1-100, Market Timing Defendants, PBHG Mid-Cap Value Fund, AllianceBernstein Real Estate Investment Fund, Inc., Gary L. Pilgrim, Limited Term Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin S & P 500 Index Fund, Edward J. Stern, PBHG Cash Reserves Fund, CT Tax Free Income Fund, Bank of America Corporation Benefits Committee, Franklin Templeton Asset Strategies, LLC, ACMC LP, Templeton Developing Markets Trust, RS Investment Management, Inc., OR Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Growth & Income Securities Fund, Wayne D. Lyski, Convertible Securities Fund, CPTR, LLC, Strategic Income Fund, Small-Mid Cap Growth Fund II, Richard W. Couper, Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Franklin's Age High Income Fund, AllianceBernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc., Robert C. Alexander, NY Insured Tax Free Income Fund, Henri Decastries, James B. Sommers, Aurum Capital Management Corp., Canary Capital Partners, LLC, Michael Christiani, Franklin Municipal Securities Trust, Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc., Kenneth D. Lewis, Banc of America Advisors, LLC, Templeton Intl Securities Fund, Shelby White, O. Temple Sloan, Jr., Security Brokerage, AllianceBernstein Trust, Mutual Beacon Fund, Roger Hertog, Templeton Global Smaller Companies Fund, Inc., Fiduciary International Small Companies Growth Fund, Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, LLC, Carl E. Mundy, Jr., Templeton Capital Accumulator Fund, PBHG Fund Services, John H. Dobkin, Bank of America, N.A., Ritchie Capital Management, LLC, Balance Sheet Investment Fund, Patricia E. Mitchell, Franklin Strategic Income Fund, Franklin Global Communications Securities Fund, Securities Brokerage Inc., Meredith R. Spangler, Franklin Money Market Fund, William N Post, Templeton Global Asset Allocation Fund, Banc of America Capital Management LLC, Capital Growth Fund, Templeton Funds, Inc., Federal Intermediate Term Tax Free Income Fund, Total Return Fund, Kathy S. Dugan, Fiduciary European Smaller Companies Fund, Richard S. Dziadzio, Small Cap Value Fund, Templeton Growth Fund Inc., Kathleen F. Feldstein, Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc., Robert C. White, Emerging Fixed Income Markets Series, AXA Financial Inc., Tax Exempt Money Fund, Gerald Malone, Founding Funds Allocation Fund, Thomas F. Keller, Fiduciary Core Fixed Income Fund, AZ Tax Free Income Fund, Templeton Global Income Securities Fund, Tandem Financial Services, Security Trust Company, N.A., CO Tax Free Income Fund, Marc O. Mayer, PBHG Reit Fund, John Does 1 through 100, Growth Target Fund, Brenton W. Harries, Daniel Calugar, Franklin Small Cap Value Securities Fund, Robert H. Joseph, Jr., Alliance Global Investor Services, Inc., Templeton Growth Securities Fund, Security Brokerage, Inc., Franklin Federal Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin NY Tax Free Income Fund, Franklin Mutual Advisers, LLC, Franklin VA Tax Free Income Fund, Inc., Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd., GA Tax Free Income Fund, The AllianceBernstein Portfolios, Global Health Care Fund, Herve Hatt, Pentagon Asset Management and Flex Cap Growth Fund
Petitioner: Individual Fund Plaintiffs, The Individual Fund Plaintiffs, The Perkins Proposed Lead Plaintiffs, The Illinois Police/Firefighter's Public Pension Fund Group, The Ruby Oman Testamentary Trust Proposed Lead Plaintiffs and Steven S. Scholes
Not Yet Classified: Ira Newman
Interested Party: City of Highland, Kansas, Preston E. Beck, Georgia Nell Johnson Wyatt and Nan and Bruce Hiran
Amicus Curiae: AVZ, Inc., Rochelle Meyer, Amvescap Retirement, Inc., Amvescap National Trust Company and Amvescap PLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Steven Goldstein
Case Number: 1:2004md15862
Filed: April 9, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
Presiding Judge: J Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2017 Filing 1483 Correspondence from Veryl C. Currence re: settlement (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 ORDER approving Distribution. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/13/13. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2013 Filing 1481 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion for Class Distribution Order by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 4/29/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Distribution, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Julie Swanson in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 PAPERLESS ORDER Approving (1478 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Letter requesting that Robert Gotlieb be withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/23/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 ORDER Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/16/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Filing 1478 NOTICE by Signalert Corporation , Re: Letter From Robert W. Gottlieb, To The Hon. J. Frederick Motz, Dated 1/16/2013, Requesting Removal From The ECF System And Docket, filed by (Gottlieb, Robert)
December 5, 2012 Filing 1477 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track by Lead Class Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/26/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track, #2 Memorandum in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track, #3 Affidavit of Eric S. Schachter in Support of Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track)(Luse, Jaime)
October 4, 2012 Filing 1476 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Chad Johnson (Luse, Jaime)
September 24, 2012 Filing 1475 Correspondence from Charles E. Silky re: claim. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1474 ORDER Administratively closing the listed cases. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/17/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM, et al(cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/20/2012 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 ORDER that unless counsel show good cause to the contrary within 30 days, the cases listed will be administratively closed. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/18/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, et al(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2012 Filing 1472 Correspondence from Sharon L. Brown re: claim of late sister Gail P. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1471 Correspondence from Douglas D. Holmes re: settlement (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 ORDER APPROVING Distribution Plan. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/9/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00882-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2012 Filing 1469 Correspondence from Helga G. Sandvoss re: Claim (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING(1465 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 24 in 1:04-cv-01624-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/15/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1467 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 3/2/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion (Proposed Order), #2 Memoradum in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan, #3 Declaration of Jason Zuena in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan, #4 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, C)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1466 Correspondence re: Stipulation of Dismissal Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1465 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER Confirming the matter discussed during the conference held on January 30, 2012; Setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/2/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2012 Miscellaneous Hearing held on 1/30/2012 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1463 The conference call scheduled for today has been rescheduled to January 30, 2012 at 4 pm.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 19, 2012 Filing 1462 A telephone conference to discuss the matters raised in your recent letters to the court will be held at 3:00 pm on Friday, January 20, 2012. I ask counsel for plaintiff to make the arrangements for the call. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 19, 2012 Filing 1461 Correspondence re: J.Lifshitz to The Honorable J. Frederick Motz seeking an Order granting plaintiff's unconditional right to a voluntary dismissal with prejudice Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Isbister, John)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1460 Correspondence re: Request for Telephone Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1459 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heidi Hertz (Isbister, John)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1458 Correspondence re: Request for Telephone Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING (1456 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/22/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2011 Filing 1456 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Franklin Templeton Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT Approving Settlements and the Stipulation and Releases and Dismissing Actions against the Defendants. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/9/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER Approving Plan of Allocation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/9/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORDER Awarding fees and expenses to plaintiffs' counsel and the plaintiff's award in connection with the settlements and the stipulation and releases in the Franklin Templeton sub-track. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/9/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2011 Filing 1452 Correspondence requesting status report. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 2, 2011 Filing 1451 MOTION to Withdraw (125 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1449 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) the Sweeney objection Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1450 Correspondence from Leslie Dean Guhl re: appearance and plea for more information. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2011 Filing 1449 Correspondence re: objection of Pamela Sweeney Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1448 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10-25-2011, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gail Simpkins, Telephone number 410-962-4536. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 11/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (gak, Court Reporter)
October 25, 2011 Filing 1447 Settlement Approval Hearing held on 10/25/2011 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (Court Reporter: Gail Simpkins) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1446 Correspondence re: submitting enclosed amended Proposed Order and Final Judgment, Order Approving Plan of Allocation, and Order Awarding Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Order and Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Order and Judgment-redlined against version previously submitted, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation-redlined against version previously submitted, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Awarding Fees and Expenses, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Awarding Fees and Expenses-redlined against version previously submitted)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1445 REPLY to Response to Motion re (112 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM) MOTION for Settlement Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion In Support Of Final Approval Of Stipulation And Releases And Third Party Settlements, Plan Of Allocation, Class Certification, And Award Of Attorneys Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, And Reimburse ment of Expenses, And Response To The Objections Of Fred And Frances Smith Of The Competitive Enterprise Institute, Pamela Sweeney, And Don Sturek filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1444 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1443 Correspondence re: settlement from Patricia A. Sachtjen Sweeney (Attachments: #1 Redacted Proof of Claim form, #2 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1442 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1441 Correspondence re: settlement from Fred L. and Frances B. Smith (Attachments: #1 Redacted statement)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 13, 2011 Filing 1440 Correspondence re: settlement from Don Sturek (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 13, 2011 Filing 1439 (FILED IN ERROR - ATTY TO REFILE) Correspondence re: settlement from Pamela A. Sachtjen Sweeney (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet) Modified on 10/14/2011 (bf2, Deputy Clerk).
October 13, 2011 Filing 1438 (FILED IN ERROR - ATTY TO REFILE) Correspondence re: settlement from Fred L. and Frances B. Smith Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet) Modified on 10/14/2011 (bf2, Deputy Clerk).
October 7, 2011 Filing 1437 Correspondence from Steven Ray Sawyer re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2011 Filing 1436 MOTION for Settlement Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion In Support Of Final Approval Of Stipulation And Releases And Third Party Settlements, Plan Of Allocation, Class Certification, And Award Of Attorneys Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, And Reimbursement Of Expenses, in the Franklin Templeton Sub-Track by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 10/11/2011 (Attachments: #1 Class Lead Plaintiffs Memorandum In Support Of Final Approval Of Stipulation And Releases And Third Party Settlements, Plan Of Allocation, Class Certification, And Award Of Attorneys Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, And Reimbursement Of Expenses, #2 Declaration of Chet B. Waldman, Esq. In Support Of Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion In Support Of Final Approval Of Stipulation And Releases And Third Party Settlements, Plan Of Allocation, Class Certification, And Award Of Attorneys Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, And Reimbursement Of Expenses, and Exhibits 1-7 thereto)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 ORDER Directing that all proceedings in the Fund Derivative action are stayed until 30 days after determination by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals; granting (1426) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15862-JFM; granting (40) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-cv-01274-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/25/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1434 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/25/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2011 Filing 1433 REPLY to Response to Motion re (40 in 1:04-cv-01274-JFM) MOTION to Stay Proceedings in the Fund Derivative Action in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack filed by Dolores Banas, Joseph Banner, Thomas F. Bednarek, Felicia Bernstein, Silvana Della Camera, Simon J. Denenberg, Reiko Gagnon, Frances Hait, William Marcus, Ryan McAlvey, John E. Morrissey, Robert J. Saelens, Harry Schipper, Jean Striffer, Harriet Surks, George Swam, Evon Yameen, Pamela Yameen, Ryan McAlvey. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Mathews, Timothy)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT re settlement in the Derivative Action and on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Plaintiff's Counsel. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/10/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00859-JFM(das, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2011 Filing 1431 Fairness Hearing - RE: Track IV held on 8/10/2011 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (CR: C. Asif) (CRD: bma)
August 3, 2011 Filing 1430 Correspondence re: no objections filed to proposed settlement (Isbister, John)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1429 RESPONSE in Opposition re (40 in 1:04-cv-01274-JFM) MOTION to Stay Proceedings in the Fund Derivative Action in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
July 21, 2011 Filing 1428 Correspondence from Kasdore Ramkissoon re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2011 Filing 1427 Correspondence from Peter J. Smith re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2011 Filing 1426 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in the Fund Derivative Action in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Dolores Banas, Joseph Banner, Thomas F. Bednarek, Felicia Bernstein, Silvana Della Camera, Simon J. Denenberg, Reiko Gagnon, Frances Hait, John E. Morrissey, Robert J. Saelens, Harry Schipper, Jean Striffer, Harriet Surks, George Swam, Evon Yameen, William Marcus, Ryan McAlvey, Pamela Yameen Responses due by 8/1/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Mathews, Timothy)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1425 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by A Plaintiff Responses due by 7/28/2011 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Derivative Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Karen L. Morris Attaching Documents in Support of Final Approval of Proposed Settlement, award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Isbister, John)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1424 FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by A Plaintiff Responses due by 7/28/2011 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Derivative Plaintiffs Motion For Final Approval of Proposed Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Isbister, John) Modified on 7/11/2011 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2011 Filing 1423 Correspondence re: Letter Advising Your Honor Of Status Report Concerning Bar Order Issued In the Fund Derivative Action (Sinaiko, Stephen)
June 15, 2011 Filing 1422 Correspondence from counsel for Franklin Templeton to the court re: schedule Derivative Plaintiffs' proposed stay motion and Franklin Templeton's proposed summary judgment motion (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2011 Filing 1421 Correspondence from Daniel A Pollack re: Notice of Withdrawal Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING (110 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1419 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) the Stipulation and Releases and Settlements of Class Action and Settlement of Derivative Action with respect to the Canary and Bas Defendants and Establishing Notice Procedures. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/9/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2011 Filing 1419 Supplemental to (1413 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) MOTION for Settlement Approval - Preliminary Approval of Stipulation and Releases with Franklin Defendants, and Third Party Settlements, and Establishing Notice Procedures filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County : [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving the Stipulation and Releases and Settlements of Class Action and Settlement of Derivative Action With Respect to the Canary and BAS Defendants and Establishing Notices Procedures - with dates inserted as approved at June 8, 2011 Preliminary Approval Hearing. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 6, 2011 Filing 1418 Correspondence re: Letter Advising Your Honor Of Canary's Position Respecting The Entry Of A Settlement Bar Order In Connection With The Fund Derivative Action (Sinaiko, Stephen)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER re (1415 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Notice filed by plaintiff. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/27/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00859-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1416 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Steven Goldstein Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00859-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1415 NOTICE by A Plaintiff [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order (Isbister, John)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 STIPULATION AND ORDER permitting the intervention of Mr. Steven Goldstein. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/25/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00859-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1413 MOTION for Settlement Approval - Preliminary Approval of Stipulation and Releases with Franklin Defendants, and Third Party Settlements, and Establishing Notice Procedures by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 6/10/2011 (Attachments: #1 Class Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Stipulation and Releases and Third Party Settlements and Establishing Notice Procedures, #2 Text of Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving the Stipulation and Releases and Settlements of Class Action and Settlement of Derivative Action With Respect to the Canary and BAS Defendants and Establishing Notice Procedures, #3 Exhibit A to Preliminary Approval Order: Summary Postcard Mailed Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Preliminary Approval Order: Publication Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Preliminary Approval Order: Long Form Notice, #6 Exhibit D to Preliminary Approval Order: Proof of Claim and Release Form, #7 Appendix Appendix Cover - additional Exhibits 1-6B, #8 Appendix Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and Releases (Franklin Defendants) dated March 14, 2011 and Exhibits A and B thereto, #9 Appendix Exhibit 2-A - Master Agreement of Settlement with Bear Stearns Defendants, #10 Appendix Exhibit 2-B - Master Agreement of Settlement with Banc of America Securities LLC, #11 Appendix Exhibit 2-C - Master Agreement of Settlement with Canary Defendants, #12 Appendix Exhibit 3-A - Franklin-Templeton/Bear Stearns Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, and amendment thereto, #13 Appendix Exhibit 3-B - Franklin-Templeton/BAS Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #14 Appendix Exhibit 3-C - Franklin-Templeton/Canary Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, and amendment thereto, #15 Appendix Exhibit 4 - Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #16 Appendix Exhibit 5 - Order Awarding Fees And Expenses, #17 Appendix Exhibit 6-A - Final Order And Judgment - Version "A", #18 Appendix Exhibit - 6-B - Final Order And Judgment - Version "B")Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1412 Correspondence re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Stipulation and Releases with the Franklin Defendants and Third Party Settlements and Establishing Notice Procedures Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 21, 2011 Filing 1411 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 5/9/2011 (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit D to Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit E to Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Isbister, John)
April 1, 2011 Filing 1410 STIPULATION and Releases (Franklin Defendants) by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Transmittal of Chet Waldman to Hon. J. Frederick Motz)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
March 29, 2011 Filing 1409 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Denise Davis Schwartzman As Counsel for Plaintiffs (Schwartzman, Denise)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1408 STATUS REPORT regarding Franklin Templeton Sub-Track by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1407 Status Report Submitted in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 14, 2011 Filing 1406 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas W Baruch (Baruch, Douglas)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1405 Status Report Submitted in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 ORDER APPROVING (33 in 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01451-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01452-JFM, 1403 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01453-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Martin Flanagan, Gregory Johnson, Charles B. Johnson,. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/1/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01451-JFM, 1:04-cv-01452-JFM, 1:04-cv-01453-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2011 Filing 1403 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Martin Flanagan, Charles B. Johnson, Gregory Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01451-JFM, 1:04-cv-01452-JFM, 1:04-cv-01453-JFM(Pollack, Daniel) Modified on 2/1/2011 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 ORDER APPROVING (1399 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM, amd 1:04-cv-01310-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal of Gregory Johnson without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/26/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 ORDER APPROVING (in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant William N. Post, II without prejudice (1400 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM). Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/26/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/26/2011 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
January 25, 2011 Filing 1400 STIPULATION of Dismissal by William N Post. (Taylor, Thomas)
January 25, 2011 Filing 1399 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gregory E. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
January 12, 2011 Filing 1398 Correspondence re: Mutual Fund Settlement from B.Victorino on behalf of Plaintiff G.Victorino (Isbister, John)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 ORDER CONFIRMING telephone conference re: status report to be provided; SUSPENDING all deadlines in the interim. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/22/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(das, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Scheduling. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/21/10 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2010 Filing 1397 Correspondence from Bernard S. Victorino re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2010 Filing 1394 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
December 15, 2010 Filing 1393 Correspondence re: Objections to the Settlement from plaintiff Victorino (Isbister, John)
December 9, 2010 Filing 1392 Correspondence re: scheduling conference Franklin Templeton Subtrack Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 ORDER Defendants motion for partial summary judgment is granted; Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is denied; and Judgment is entered in favor of defendants Franklin Resources Inc., Franklin Advisers Inc., Fanklin/Templeton Distributors Inc., Franklin Alternative StrategiesInc., Franklin Strategic Series Inc., Gregory E. Johnson, and William N. Post II as tothe claims for non-arranged market timing in case 1:04-md-15862-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/9/10Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 1390 OPINION Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/9/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2010 Filing 1388 Correspondence re: Notice in Alliance Sub-Track from Dallas Haines (Luse, Jaime)
November 15, 2010 Filing 1389 Correspondence from James R. Beck re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2010 Filing 1387 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/21/2010, before Judge Judges Blake and Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M. Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 11/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM et al.(mmz, Court Reporter)
November 2, 2010 Filing 1386 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/21/2010, before Judge Judges Blake and Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M. Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 11/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(mmz, Court Reporter)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING Attorneys' fees and litigation expenses in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Appalachian Trails. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to the Canary Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to the Bear Stearns Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Banc of America Securities. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Pilgrim Baxter Advisor Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Pilgrim Baxter Funds Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING Attorneys' fees and expenses in the Alliance Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds in the Alliance Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to the Canary Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Security Brokerage parties. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Bear Stearns Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER re: "Investor Class Action", "Fund Derivative Action", and "ERISA Class Action", all of the Alliance Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation for use in Canary Severed Settlement in Nations Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in the Bank of America/Nations Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 REVISED FINAL ORDER and JUDGMENT as to Bank of America Related Defendants and Certain other Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 FINAL ORDER and JUDGMENT as to the Canary Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 22, 2010 Filing 1366 Supplemental to Plaintiffs' Motions for (a) Final Approval of Settlements (b) Final Approval of Plan of Allocation and (c) Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PB Advisor Defendants, #2 Text of Proposed Order PB Funds Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order BAS Defendants, #4 Text of Proposed Order Bear Stearns Defendants, #5 Text of Proposed Order Canary Defendants, #6 Text of Proposed Order Appalachian Trails Defendants, #7 Text of Proposed Order Plan of Allocation, #8 Text of Proposed Order Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1365 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Final Judgment and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment With Respect to Banc of America Securities LLC, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment With Respect to Bear Stearns Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Security Brokerage Parties, #4 Text of Proposed Order Orders\5 - Alliance - Order and Final Judgment With Respect to the Canary Defendants, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order Awarding Attorneys_ Fees and Expenses)(Newcomer, Michelle)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1364 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements Proposed Plan of Allocation Order (Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1363 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel, #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements Proposed Fee Order (Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1362 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel, #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements Proposed Revised Nations Judgment (Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1361 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel, #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements Proposed Canary Judgment (Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 20, 2010 Filing 1360 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions (Isbister, John)
October 19, 2010 Filing 1359 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1334 Memorandum, #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements / [PROPOSED] FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT AS TO THE CANARY DEFENDANTS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 18, 2010 Filing 1358 STIPULATION Amendment and Agreement Resolving Objection by Elena M. David, Arlene J. Stach, David G mackenzie. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM et al.(Rosen, Samuel)
October 15, 2010 Filing 1357 Correspondence from Walter and Judy Scott re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1356 Supplemental to ECF Docket Nos. 1343 (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements and Plan of Allocation in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track), 1344 (Plaintiffs Counsels Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track). (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Appendix, #7 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, #8 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, #9 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, #10 Exhibit 4 to Appendix, #11 Exhibit 5 to Appendix, #12 Exhibit 6 to Appendix, #13 Exhibit 7 to Appendix, #14 Exhibit 8 to Appendix)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1355 Supplemental to #1339 MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK) MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK), #1340 MOTION for Attorney Fees (MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK) MOTION for Attorney Fees (MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK) filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Luse, Jaime)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1353 Reply to Response to Motion,,, (Sucharow, Lawrence)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1353 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements, #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 12 Part 2, #15 Text of Proposed Order - Nations Judgment, #16 Text of Proposed Order - Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #17 Text of Proposed Order - Plan of Allocation)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 29, 2010 Filing 1352 Correspondence re: Settlement - From M. Kinzel (Luse, Jaime)
September 27, 2010 Filing 1351 Correspondence from Ann C. Robin re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2010 Filing 1350 Correspondence from Darlene Holtel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2010 Filing 1349 Correspondence from Gary M. Blackwell re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2010 Filing 1347 Correspondence from Helen Wood re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2010 Filing 1346 Correspondence re: Objection of ERISA Class Members Elena M. David, Arlene J. Stach, and David G. MacKenzie to Proposed Class Action Settlement Known as the "Nations Settlement" (Porter, Gregory)
September 20, 2010 Filing 1348 Correspondence from Genevieve L. Mensch re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2010 Filing 1345 NOTICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan re (1344 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THEPILGRIM BAXTER SUB-TRACK, (1343 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Joint MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion fo Final Approval of the Settlements and Plan of Allocation in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit 4-B Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM et al.(Johnson, C)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1344 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THEPILGRIM BAXTER SUB-TRACK by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 BLB&G Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to BLB&G Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to BLB&G Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to BLB&G Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4-A to BLB&G Declaration, #7 (FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE) Exhibit 4-B of BLB&G Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4-C to BLB&G Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to BLB&G Declaration, #10 Derivative Counsel Declaration (filed as a courtesy for Derivative Counsel, #11 Derivative Counsel Affidavit (filed as a courtesy for Derivative Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 14, 2010 Filing 1343 Joint MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion fo Final Approval of the Settlements and Plan of Allocation in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 BLB&G Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to BLB&G Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to BLB&G Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to BLB&G Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4-A to BLB&G Declaration, #7(FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE) Exhibit 4-B to BLB&G Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4-C to BLB&G Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to BLB&G Declaration, #10 Derivative Counsel Declaration (filed as a courtesty for Derivative Counsel), #11 Derivative Affidavit (filed as a courtesy for Derivative Counsel))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 14, 2010 Filing 1342 MOTION for Attorney Fees (PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1341 MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS AND PLANS OF ALLOCATION) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1340 MOTION for Attorney Fees (MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1339 MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. re #1336 Memorandum, #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel, #1334 Memorandum, #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements, #1337 Affidavit,, (Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1337 AFFIDAVIT re #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements, #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 - Part 1, #8 Exhibit 5 - Part 2, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1336 Memorandum re #1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc.. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1335 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Plaintiffs' Counsel by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1334 Memorandum re #1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements filed by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc.. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1333 MOTION for Settlement / Final Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative, and ERISA Settlements by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Sucharow, Lawrence)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1332 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Tydings & Rosenberg LLP for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred as Plaintiffs' Liaison and Chief Administrative Counsel by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John B. Isbister (including Affidavit Exhibits 1, 2, 3), #3 Exhibit B - Summary of Settlements)(Isbister, John)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1331 Correspondence re: Settlement (from Stephen Cotanch) (Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1330 Correspondence re: Settlement (from A. McKenney) (Luse, Jaime)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1323 Motion to Seal Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/13/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2010 Filing 1328 Correspondence from James G. McDaniel re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2010 Filing 1327 Correspondence from Bernard S. Victorino re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1325 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County re (1324 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Reply to Response to Motion, Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1324 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re (85 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1288 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1323 MOTION to Seal Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of the Class by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 9/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of the Class Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 21, 2010 Filing 1326 Correspondence from Lead class counsel re: status report concerning the steps taken to assist potential class members who do not have mutual fund holding information. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1322 Correspondence from James and Wesley Dinsick re: Objection to settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1321 Status Report Submitted Re: Update on Settlement Administration in the Nations Subtrack by Retirement and Design Management, Inc. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1320 Status Report Submitted Re: Update on Settlement Administration in the Alliance Subtrack by A Plaintiff (Luse, Jaime)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1319 Correspondence re: Update on Settlement Administration (Johnson, C)
August 9, 2010 Filing 1318 Correspondence by George Wyatt re: Texas Residential Lease Agreement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1317 Correspondence from Ellison Marie Pidot re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1316 Correspondence from Audry J. Doshi re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1315 Correspondence from James D. Hopkins re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1314 Correspondence from George Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2010 Filing 1313 Correspondence from Kenneth O. Walker re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2010 Filing 1312 Correspondence from George Wyatt Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2010 Filing 1311 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Zeiss on behalf of Gary Goldberg Financial, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. (Zeiss, Nicole)
July 21, 2010 Filing 1310 Correspondence from John H. Lawrence re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2010 Filing 1308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Templeton Defendants re #1307 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Pollack, Daniel)
July 21, 2010 Filing 1307 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #1288 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Replies due by 8/9/2010. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
July 21, 2010 Filing 1306 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Franklin Templeton Defendants Responses due by 8/9/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
July 19, 2010 Filing 1309 Correspondence from Thomas E. Shaw re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1294 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael R Bromwich terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/19/10 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1304 RESPONSE in Support re #1277 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by William N Post. Replies due by 8/2/2010. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Templeton Defendants re #1302 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Pollack, Daniel)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1302 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #1265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anthony Zaccaria with Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 227, #3 Exhibit 228, #4 Exhibit 229, #5 Exhibit 230, #6 Exhibit 231, #7 Exhibit 232, #8 Exhibit 233, #9 Exhibit 234, #10 Exhibit 235, #11 Exhibit 236, #12 Exhibit 237, #13 Exhibit 238, #14 Exhibit 239, #15 Exhibit 240, #16 Exhibit 241, #17 Exhibit 242, #18 Exhibit 243, #19 Exhibit 244, #20 Exhibit 245, #21 Exhibit 246, #22 Exhibit 247, #23 Exhibit 248, #24 Exhibit 249, #25 Exhibit 250, #26 Exhibit 251)(Pollack, Daniel)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1301 MOTION to Seal the Reply Memorandum in Support of Franklin Templeton's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents by Franklin Templeton Defendants Responses due by 8/2/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1300 Correspondence re: Settlement Administration Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM et al.(Johnson, C)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1299 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 9, 2010 Filing 1298 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Georgia Nell Johnson Wyatt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2010 Filing 1297 Correspondence by Preston E. Beck re: Request that the court not approve the proposed settlement as the investors will recieve little or no benefit as the settlement is written. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1296 Correspondence by Nan And Bruce Hiran re: they would like more information, clarification and copywork regarding referenced claim before making a decision to opt in or out of class settlement. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)(originally filed 6/25/10)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1295 Correspondence by The City of Highland Kansas re: wishes to be participate in the class action (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk) (originally filed 6/25/10)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1294 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael R. Bromwich by Ritchie Capital Management, Inc. Responses due by 7/19/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bromwich, Michael)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1293 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W Baruch on behalf of Ritchie Capital Management, Inc. (Baruch, Douglas)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1267 Motion to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents by Franklin Templeton Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/16/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2010 Filing 1291 MOTION to Seal Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Franklin Templeton Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Accompanying Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman (together with Exhibits 1-147 thereto) by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 6/21/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Franklin Templeton Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Accompanying Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman, Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 4, 2010 Filing 1290 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County re (1289 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Memorandum,, (1288 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) of Filing Lengthy Exhibit (Under Seal): Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 1-147 thereto Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet) (SEALED EXHIBITS REC'D 6/7/10) Modified on 6/11/2010 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2010 Filing 1289 -SEALED-Memorandum re (85 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1288 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), (1265 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Franklin Templeton Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 4, 2010 Filing 1288 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 6/21/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying the Franklin Templeton Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Granting Lead Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 PRELIMINARY ORDER for notice and hearing in connection with settlement proceedings in the Alliance sub-track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 PRELIMINARY ORDER for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER providing for notice and hearing in connection with proposed class, derivative and ERISA settlements. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 (FILED IN ERROR) PRELIMINARY ORDER for notice and hearing in connection with settlement proceedings in the Alliance sub-track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/1/2010 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2010 Filing 1283 Correspondence re: In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation, Franklin Templeton Subtrack (Motz, J.)
May 12, 2010 Filing 1282 Supplemental to #1276 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE PLAN, AND CERTIFICATION OF CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES MOTION to Certify Class filed by A Plaintiff Revised [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Alliance Sub-Track. (Attachments: #1 Short Form Notice, #2 Long Form Notice, #3 Proof of Claim)(Luse, Jaime)
May 12, 2010 Filing 1281 Supplemental to (1274 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track, Approval of Notice and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes filed by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan [Updated] Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Updated]Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class Actions, Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #2 Exhibit [Updated]Long-Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions, Motions For Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #3 Exhibit [Updated] Proof of Claim and Release, #4 Exhibit [Updated]Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements in the In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation and Settlement Fairness Hearing)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
May 12, 2010 Filing 1280 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. of Revised Proposed Judgment and Revised Proposed Preliminary Approval Order Providing for Notice and Hearing in Connection With Proposed Class, Derivative and ERISA Settlements (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
May 5, 2010 Filing 1279 Correspondence re: Friday, May 7, 2010, Hearing Dial-In Information (Isbister, John)
April 30, 2010 Filing 1278 ANSWER to (1255 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM) Amended Complaint, by Franklin Templeton Defendants.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
April 29, 2010 Status Conference held on 4/29/2010 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2010 Status Conference held on 4/29/2010 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2010 Filing 1277 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A Defendant Responses due by 5/13/2010 (Taylor, Thomas)
April 22, 2010 Filing 1276 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALLIANCE SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE PLAN, AND CERTIFICATION OF CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, MOTION to Certify Class by Ira Newman, Martine Stansbery, Jr Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Notice and Hearing, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing, #5 Exhibit 1.1 - Notice of Pendency Short Form, #6 Exhibit 1.2 - Notice of Pendency Long Form, #7 Exhibit 1.3 - Summary Notice, #8 Exhibit 1.4 - Proof of Claim and Release, #9 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation of Settlement with the Alliance Settling Entities, #10 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Final Order for Alliance Settling Entites, #11 Exhibit 4 - Bear Stearns Severed Agreement, #12 Exhibit 5 - Bear Stearns Master Agreement, #13 Exhibit 6 - Bear Stearns Proposed Final Order, #14 Exhibit 7 - Canary Severed Agreement, #15 Exhibit 8 - Canary Master Agreement, #16 Exhibit 9 - Canary Proposed Final Order, #17 Exhibit 10 - BAS Severed Agreement, #18 Exhibit 11 - BAS Master Agreement, #19 Exhibit 12 - BAS Proposed Final Order, #20 Exhibit 13 - Sec. Brokerage Severed Agreement, #21 Exhibit 14 - Sec. Brokerage Master Agreement, #22 Exhibit 15 - Sec. Brokerage Proposed Final Order, #23 Exhibit 16 - List of Class Funds)(Luse, Jaime)
April 21, 2010 Filing 1275 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS by Settling Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
April 21, 2010 Filing 1274 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track, Approval of Notice and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track, Approval of Notice, and Certification of a Class for Settlement Purposes, #2 Appendix to Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track, #4 Exhibit 1.1 - Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class Actions, Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #5 Exhibit 1.2 - Long-Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions, Motions For Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #6 Exhibit 1.3 - Proof of Claim and Release, #7 Exhibit 1.4 - Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements in the In re Mutual FundsInvestment Litigation and Settlement Fairness Hearing, #8 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Pilgrim Baxter Advisor Defendants), #9 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Pilgrim Baxter Funds Defendants), #10 Exhibit 4 - Pilgrim Baxter/Canary Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #11 Exhibit 5 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Canary Defendants, #12 Exhibit 6 - Pilgrim Baxter/Bear Stearns Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #13 Exhibit 7 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Bear Stearns Defendants, #14 Exhibit 8 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Appalachian Trails, #15 Exhibit 9 - Pilgrim Baxter/BAS Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #16 Exhibit 10 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Banc of America Securities LLC, #17 Exhibit 11 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Pilgrim Baxter Advisor Defendants, #18 Exhibit 12 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Pilgrim Baxter Funds Defendants, #19 Exhibit 13 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to the Canary Defendants, #20 Exhibit 14 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Bear Stearns Defendants, #21 Exhibit 15 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Appalachian Trails, #22 Exhibit 16 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Banc of America Securities)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
April 21, 2010 Filing 1273 MOTION for Settlement / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class, Derivative and ERISA Settlements by Robert K. Finnell, D.M. Griffith, Katrina McKoy, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Lawrence A. Sucharow, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit E-1, #9 Exhibit E-2, #10 Exhibit E-3, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, #18 Certificate of Service)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
April 21, 2010 Filing 1272 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasand Patric Mock on behalf of Banc of America Securities LLC (Mock, Jasand)
March 30, 2010 Filing 1271 Correspondence re: MDL-1586 In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Motz, J.)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1261 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/25/10 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER denying (1212) Motion to Intervene in case 1:04-md-15862-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/25/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00867-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2010 Filing 1268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Templeton Defendants re #1266 Memorandum,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Zaccaria, Anthony)
March 24, 2010 Filing 1267 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents by Franklin Templeton Defendants Responses due by 4/12/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
March 24, 2010 Filing 1266 -SEALED-Memorandum re #1265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Franklin Templeton Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas P. Johnson, #2 Affidavit of Alison Baumann, #3 Transmittal Affidavit of Daniel A. Pollack with Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56, #60 Exhibit 57, #61 Exhibit 58, #62 Exhibit 59, #63 Exhibit 60, #64 Exhibit 61, #65 Exhibit 62, #66 Exhibit 63, #67 Exhibit 64, #68 Exhibit 65, #69 Exhibit 66, #70 Exhibit 67, #71 Exhibit 68, #72 Exhibit 69, #73 Exhibit 70, #74 Exhibit 71, #75 Exhibit 72, #76 Exhibit 73, #77 Exhibit 74, #78 Exhibit 75, #79 Exhibit 76, #80 Exhibit 77, #81 Exhibit 78, #82 Exhibit 79, #83 Exhibit 80, #84 Exhibit 81, #85 Exhibit 82, #86 Exhibit 83, #87 Exhibit 84, #88 Exhibit 85, #89 Exhibit 86, #90 Exhibit 87, #91 Exhibit 88, #92 Exhibit 89, #93 Exhibit 90, #94 Exhibit 91, #95 Exhibit 92, #96 Exhibit 93, #97 Exhibit 94, #98 Exhibit 95, #99 Exhibit 96, #100 Exhibit 97, #101 Exhibit 98, #102 Exhibit 99, #103 Exhibit 100, #104 Exhibit 101, #105 Exhibit 102, #106 Exhibit 103, #107 Exhibit 104, #108 Exhibit 105, #109 Exhibit 106, #110 Exhibit 107, #111 Exhibit 108, #112 Exhibit 109, #113 Exhibit 110, #114 Exhibit 111, #115 Exhibit 112, #116 Exhibit 113, #117 Exhibit 114, #118 Exhibit 115, #119 Exhibit 116, #120 Exhibit 117, #121 Exhibit 118, #122 Exhibit 119, #123 Exhibit 120, #124 Exhibit 121, #125 Exhibit 122, #126 Exhibit 123, #127 Exhibit 124, #128 Exhibit 125, #129 Exhibit 126, #130 Exhibit 127, #131 Exhibit 128, #132 Exhibit 129, #133 Exhibit 130, #134 Exhibit 131, #135 Exhibit 132, #136 Exhibit 133, #137 Exhibit 134, #138 Exhibit 136, #139 Exhibit 137, #140 Exhibit 138, #141 Exhibit 139, #142 Exhibit 141, #143 Exhibit 142, #144 Exhibit 143, #145 Exhibit 144, #146 Exhibit 145, #147 Exhibit 146, #148 Exhibit 147, #149 Exhibit 148, #150 Exhibit 149, #151 Exhibit 150, #152 Exhibit 151, #153 Exhibit 152, #154 Exhibit 153, #155 Exhibit 154, #156 Exhibit 155, #157 Exhibit 156, #158 Exhibit 157, #159 Exhibit 158, #160 Exhibit 159, #161 Exhibit 160, #162 Exhibit 161, #163 Exhibit 162, #164 Exhibit 163, #165 Exhibit 164, #166 Exhibit 165, #167 Exhibit 166, #168 Exhibit 167, #169 Exhibit 168, #170 Exhibit 169, #171 Exhibit 170, #172 Exhibit 171, #173 Exhibit 172, #174 Exhibit 173, #175 Exhibit 174, #176 Exhibit 175, #177 Exhibit 176, #178 Exhibit 177, #179 Exhibit 178, #180 Exhibit 179, #181 Exhibit 180, #182 Exhibit 181, #183 Exhibit 182, #184 Exhibit 183, #185 Exhibit 184, #186 Exhibit 185, #187 Exhibit 186, #188 Exhibit 187, #189 Exhibit 188, #190 Exhibit 189, #191 Exhibit 190, #192 Exhibit 191, #193 Exhibit 192, #194 Exhibit 193, #195 Exhibit 194, #196 Exhibit 195, #197 Exhibit 196, #198 Exhibit 197, #199 Exhibit 198, #200 Exhibit 199, #201 Exhibit 200, #202 Exhibit 201, #203 Exhibit 202, #204 Exhibit 203, #205 Exhibit 204, #206 Exhibit 205, #207 Exhibit 206, #208 Exhibit 207, #209 Exhibit 208, #210 Exhibit 209, #211 Exhibit 210, #212 Exhibit 211, #213 Exhibit 212, #214 Exhibit 213, #215 Exhibit 214, #216 Exhibit 215, #217 Exhibit 216, #218 Exhibit 217, #219 Exhibit 218, #220 Exhibit 219, #221 Exhibit 220, #222 Exhibit 221, #223 Exhibit 222, #224 Exhibit 223, #225 Exhibit 224, #226 Exhibit 225, #227 Exhibit 226)(Pollack, Daniel)
March 24, 2010 Filing 1265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Franklin Templeton Defendants Responses due by 4/12/2010 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Documents Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 Paperless ORDER granting re #1263 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by A Defendant. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 03/10/2010. (Motz, J.)
March 5, 2010 Filing 1263 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1262 -SEALED- ANSWER to #1255 Amended Complaint, Answer to Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by William N Post.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1261 MOTION for Other Relief To File Under Seal Answer To Second Amended Class Action Complaint by William N Post Responses due by 3/12/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1251 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/17/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2010 Filing 1259 Correspondence re: MDL No. 1586 (Williams, Amy)
January 26, 2010 Filing 1258 Correspondence re: MDL-15862-JFM-In Re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Porter, Gregory)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 Paperless ORDER granting document 1253 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM - Stipulation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/14/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 Paperless ORDER granting document 1254 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM - Stipulation filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/14/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1255 -SEALED- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Franklin Advisers, Inc., Franklin Resources, Inc., Franklin Strategic Series, Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., Gregory E. Johnson, William Post, filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 12, 2010 Filing 1254 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scheduling by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 12, 2010 Filing 1253 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scheduling. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Mathews, Timothy)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1252 NOTICE of Filing Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Under Seal by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Redacted] Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1251 MOTION to Seal Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 1/28/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 Paperless ORDER granting #1248 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 01/06/2010. (Motz, J.)
January 4, 2010 Filing 1249 Correspondence re: MDL-1586 - In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Motz, J.)
December 24, 2009 Filing 1248 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion to Establish a Qualified Settlement Fund Under Treasury Regulation Section 1.468B-1 by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 1/11/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bien Willner, Jerald)
December 14, 2009 Settlement Hearing held in open Court on 12/14/2009 held before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2009 Filing 1247 Correspondence confirming the matters discussed during the conference call. (Motz, J.)
November 3, 2009 Filing 1246 Correspondence re: November 10 status conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (1214) Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint in case 1:04-md-15862-JFM; granting in part and denying in part (60) Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint in case 1:04-cv-01310-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/22/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2009 Filing 1244 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/22/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (1231) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15862-JFM; granting (68) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-01310-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/21/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1239 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John A Trocki, III; Stephen Michael Colangelo and Laurie A Hand terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/19/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 Paperless ORDER approving re (1240 in 1:04-md-15862-JFM and 72 in 1:04-md-1310) Stipulation filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/19/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Motz, J.)
October 16, 2009 Filing 1240 STIPULATION (Amended) and [Proposed] Order Setting Expert Discovery Schedule by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 12, 2009 Filing 1239 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nations Funds Trust, Columbia Funds Series Trust, Columbia Funds Master Investment Trust, LLC, Thomas S. Word, Jr, James B. Sommers Responses due by 10/29/2009 (Hand, Laurie)
October 6, 2009 Filing 1238 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
October 6, 2009 Filing 1237 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1236 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ira Lee Sorkin Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Sorkin, Ira)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Requested Data Maintained by Boston Financial Data Services. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/1/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2009 Filing 1234 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Requested Data Maintained by Boston Financial Data Services, Inc. by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 24, 2009 Case reassigned to Judge J. Frederick Motz. Judge Andre M Davis no longer assigned to the case. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1232 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert A Gaumont terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/23/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2009 Filing 1232 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC, Bacap Distributors, LLC, Banc of America Capital Management LLC, Columbia Wanger Asset Management, L.P., Bank of America, NA Responses due by 10/9/2009 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gaumont, Robert)
September 21, 2009 Filing 1231 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, and Reply Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint [Re-filing Sept. 17, 2009 Motion to File Under Seal as Separate Docket Entry] by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 10/8/2009 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 17, 2009 Filing 1230 REPLY to Response to Motion re (60 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM) MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint [Redacted] filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Attachments: #1 Reply Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint [Redacted], #2 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, #3 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2009: #5 Sealed Reply, #6 Sealed Affidavit) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/21/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 ORDER re (65 in 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1228 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Charles B. Johnson and Rupert H. Johnson, Jr. w filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/4/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2009 Filing 1228 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Charles B. Johnson and Rupert H. Johnson Without Prejudice by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 21, 2009 Filing 1227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1214 MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, With Proposed Complaint and Red-Lined Version (Filed Under Seal) Attached as Exhibits Thereto MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, With Proposed Complaint and Red-Lined Version (Filed Under Seal) Attached as Exhibits Thereto MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, With Proposed Complaint and Red-Lined Version (Filed Under Seal) Attached as Exhibits Thereto MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, With Proposed Complaint and Red-Lined Version (Filed Under Seal) Attached as Exhibits Thereto filed by Franklin Templeton. Replies due by 9/4/2009. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Addendum A Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order denying Plaintiff's Motion)(Pollack, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2009: #3 Sealed Addendum A) (cag, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/24/2009 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
August 21, 2009 Filing 1226 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Production of Requested Trading Data by the Franklin Templeton Defendants by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 24, 2009 Filing 1225 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory Y Porter (Porter, Gregory)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1224 Correspondence re: Extension of Time for Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 13, 2009 Filing 1223 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1212 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24 filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gregory Y. Porter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Porter, Gregory)
July 7, 2009 Filing 1222 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Isenman on behalf of Columbia Funds Master Investment Trust, LLC, Thomas S. Word, Jr, James B. Sommers (Isenman, Michael)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1221 AFFIDAVIT re (15 in 1:04-cv-00867-JFM) Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00867-JFM(Williams, Amy)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1220 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1212 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Intervene filed by Bank of America Corporation. Replies due by 7/13/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00867-JFM(Williams, Amy)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1219 RESPONSE re (1212 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Intervene Declaration of Samuel K. Rosen in Opposition to Motion of Elena M. David, Arlene J. Stach, & Victor M. Hernandez to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 24 filed by Katrina McKoy, Katrina McKoy. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Rosen, Samuel)
June 24, 2009 Filing 1218 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel A Pollack (Pollack, Daniel)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1217 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Isenman on behalf of Columbia Funds Series Trust (Isenman, Michael)
June 17, 2009 Filing 1216 Correspondence re: Letter to Judge Davis in response to June 16, 2009 letter of Daniel A. Pollack (Waldman, Chet)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1215 Correspondence re: Letter to Judge Davis (Pollack, Daniel)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1214 MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, With Proposed Complaint and Red-Lined Version (Filed Under Seal) Attached as Exhibits Thereto by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 7/6/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Chet B. Waldman in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2009: #4 Sealed Second Amended Complaint, #5 Sealed Red-Lined Version of Second Amended Complaint) (cag, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/18/2009 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
June 16, 2009 Filing 1213 MOTION to Seal Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County Responses due by 7/6/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1212 MOTION to Intervene by A Plaintiff Responses due by 6/29/2009 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Gregory Porter in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Porter, Gregory)
June 9, 2009 Filing 1211 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Expert Discovery Schedule by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1210 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pritchard Williams on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Virgil R. Williams, Kathy S. Dugan, Meredith R. Spangler, Paul Fulton, O. Temple Sloan, Jr, Kenneth D. Lewis, Bank of America Corporation Benefits Committee (Williams, Amy)
May 27, 2009 Filing 1209 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Y Porter on behalf of A Plaintiff Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00867-JFM(Porter, Gregory)
May 14, 2009 Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2009 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER DISMISSING all Claims against SEI Investments Distribution Co., Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/12/09Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 ORDER DISMISSING all claims against Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/12/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 ORDER DISMISSING all claims against JP Morgan Chase & Co. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/12/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2009 Filing 1205 Correspondence re: Proposed order for dismissal of SEI Investments Distribution Co. (Smith Klocek, Erica)
May 4, 2009 Filing 1204 Correspondence re: Proposed Investor Class Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McClammy, James)
April 20, 2009 Filing 1203 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas L Taylor, III (Taylor, Thomas)
April 1, 2009 Filing 1202 NOTICE by Old Mutual, Plc, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc. Counsel of Withdrawal of Appearance (Rosensweig, Richard)
March 30, 2009 Filing 1201 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Theodore C. Sihpol, III (Margolis, Daniel)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER DISMISSING with prejudice the Amended Verified Derivative Complaint. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 3/13/09Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00850-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 INVESTOR CLASS ORDER. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 3/11/09Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00575-JFM, 1:04-cv-00578-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2009 Filing 1198 Correspondence re: Proposed Order for Dismissal of Citigroup Defendants Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00575-JFM, 1:04-cv-00578-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Madsen, Stephen)
March 4, 2009 Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2009 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
February 26, 2009 Filing 1197 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs of Issuance of Third-Party Subpoena for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 12, 2009 Filing 1196 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Malcolm Davis (Davis, Joshua)
February 3, 2009 Telephone Conference held on 2/3/2009 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
January 22, 2009 Filing 1195 Correspondence re: January 27, 2009 hearing in the RS Subtrack (Isbister, John)
January 7, 2009 Filing 1194 RESPONSE in Support Notice of Filing of Document Under Seal (Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA) filed by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph Shanis, Joseph Shanis. Replies due by 1/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Wayne, Richard)
January 7, 2009 Filing 1193 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2009 Filing 1192 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Support Notice of Filing of Document Under Seal (Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA) filed by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph Shanis, Joseph Shanis. Replies due by 1/20/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Wayne, Richard) Modified on 1/7/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
January 5, 2009 Filing 1191 ANSWER to #300 Amended Complaint,,, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF FRANKLIN DEFENDANTS TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Franklin Templeton.(Pollack, Daniel)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1190 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third-Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1189 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1188 NOTICE of Change of Address by U Seth Ottensoser (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ottensoser, U)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1187 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Revised Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 17, 2008 Filing 1186 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs of Issuance of Third-Party Subpoena for Deposition and for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1185 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1184 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1183 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1182 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1181 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Notice of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena (Pollack, Daniel)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 STIPULATION and Order Concerning Confidential Material for the December 10 and 11, 2008 Hearing by A Plaintiff. (Isbister, John)
December 8, 2008 Filing 1179 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions for the December 10 and 11 Hearing (Isbister, John)
December 5, 2008 Filing 1178 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of Issuance of Third Party Subpoena Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
December 3, 2008 Filing 1177 NOTICE by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust to Seal Corrected Exhibits and Redlined Memoranda Pages (Abramson, Glen)
December 3, 2008 Filing 1176 MOTION to Seal Corrected Exhibits and Redlined Memoranda Pages ( Responses due by 12/22/2008) by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abramson, Glen)
December 2, 2008 Filing 1175 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiffs Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA and exhibits thereto) by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph Shanis Responses due by 12/19/2008 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD(Wayne, Richard) Modified on 12/2/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
December 1, 2008 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Second Request for Production of Documents (Pollack, Daniel)
November 26, 2008 Filing 1173 NOTICE to Take Deposition of George Calamari. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 26, 2008 Filing 1172 Correspondence re: First Set of Interrogatories to Fund Defendants Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 26, 2008 Filing 1171 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents from the Bear Stearns Companies, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 24, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 11/24/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
November 19, 2008 Filing 1170 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs of Issuance of Third-Party Subpoena for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 6, 2008 Filing 1169 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of Amended Third-Party Subpoena Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 4, 2008 Filing 1168 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of Issuance of Subpoena to Alphonso W. LeBlanc (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 4, 2008 Filing 1167 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Revised Notice of Deposition of Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau Pursuant 30(b)(6) (Pollack, Daniel)
October 31, 2008 Filing 1166 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton Revised Notice of Deposition of Deferred Compensation Plan (Nassau County) Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (Pollack, Daniel)
October 28, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
October 17, 2008 Filing 1165 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton of Deposition of Plaintiff Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (Pollack, Daniel)
October 13, 2008 Filing 1164 NOTICE by Kathie A. Phillips [Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice] Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00803-JFM(Dove, Thomas)
October 13, 2008 Filing 1163 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Dove on behalf of Kathie A. Phillips Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00803-JFM(Dove, Thomas)
October 8, 2008 Filing 1162 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1086 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Strider Dickson terminated (Judge Davis)
October 8, 2008 Filing 1161 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1143 Motion to Seal (Judge Davis)
October 8, 2008 Filing 1160 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barbara J Van Gorder terminated (Judge Davis)
October 7, 2008 Filing 1159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Barbara Van Gorder by Old Mutual, Plc, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 10/24/2008 (Van Gorder, Barbara)
October 6, 2008 Filing 1158 Correspondence re: Letter dated October 6, 2008 from the Alliance Defendants to the Hon. Judge Andre M. Davis, requesting the Court to reschedule the teleconference currently scheduled for October 7, 2008, at 4:30pm to October 14, 2008 at 4:30pm (Holland, Mark)
September 16, 2008 Filing 1157 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition of Gregory E. Johnson Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 9, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis. (bma, CRD)
September 9, 2008 Filing 1156 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Completion of Fact Discovery by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 28, 2008 Filing 1155 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton of Franklin Templeton Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Lead Plaintiff (Pollack, Daniel)
August 28, 2008 Filing 1154 NOTICE by Franklin Templeton of Franklin Templeton Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff The Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County (Pollack, Daniel)
July 31, 2008 Filing 1153 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of Third Party Depositions Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 28, 2008 Filing 1152 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of issuance of Third-Party Subpoena. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Walsh, Kenneth)
July 22, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 7/22/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
July 22, 2008 Filing 1151 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of issuance of Third-Party Subpoena. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Walsh, Kenneth)
July 16, 2008 Filing 1150 Correspondence re: Index of Exhibits to Investor Class Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Support of Motions for Class Certification Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits)(Abramson, Glen)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1149 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Gerard Walsh Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Walsh, Kenneth)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1148 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Lead Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant William N. Post II's First Set of Interrogatories Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1147 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Lead Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant William N. Post II's First Request for Production of Documents Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 7, 2008 Filing 1146 Memorandum re (50 in 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 52 in 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 49 in 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 139 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1227 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 50 in 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 77 in 1:04-cv-01288-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class, (2969 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23, (2973 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class re Filing of Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Class Certification Under Seal filed by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Luse, Jaime)
July 7, 2008 Filing 1145 Memorandum re (50 in 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 52 in 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 49 in 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 139 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1227 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 50 in 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 77 in 1:04-cv-01288-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Luse, Jaime)
July 3, 2008 Filing 1144 Correspondence re: Proposed order for dismissal of SEI Investments Distribution Co. (Smith Klocek, Erica)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1143 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abramson, Glen)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1142 NOTICE by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust Filing of Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Class Certification Under Seal (Abramson, Glen)
June 30, 2008 Filing 1141 Correspondence re: prior letter regarding dismissal of Pentagon Asset Management (Linker, Arthur)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER re #1137 Miscellaneous Correspondence, #896 Miscellaneous Correspondence (Judge Davis)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 ORDER re #1136 Miscellaneous Correspondence (DISMISSAL OF PRUDENTIAL SECURITIES, INC. and PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC.) (Judge Davis)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 STIPULATION AND ORDER (Judge Davis)
June 26, 2008 Filing 1137 Correspondence re: proposed Order for dismissal of Pentagon Asset Management (Linker, Arthur)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1136 Correspondence re: Proposed order for dismissal of Prudential defendants (Thier, Jonathan)
June 16, 2008 Filing 1135 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 9, 2008 Filing 1134 Correspondence re: Corrected Cover Letter to Stipulation for Extension of Fact Discovery filed earlier this day Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
June 9, 2008 Filing 1133 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery and cover letter by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 29, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis. (bma, CRD)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1132 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney -- Notice Of Withdrawal Of Appearance by Marshall N Perkins -- Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Perkins, Marshall)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Randal L. Golden. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 22, 2008 Filing 1130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William N. Post, II. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 8, 2008 Filing 1129 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Letter to Judges Motz, Davis and Blake confirming extension of time for all summary judgment motions and all class certification motions filed no later than July 2, 2008 (Isbister, John)
May 8, 2008 Filing 1128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel T. O'Lear. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 10, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2008 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
April 8, 2008 Filing 1127 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. of Cross-Track Deposition of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Perry, Mark)
March 5, 2008 Filing 1126 NOTICE by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County of Deposition of Tom Johnson Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 25, 2008 Filing 1125 STATUS REPORT re Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 21, 2008 Filing 1124 NOTICE by Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Amended Notice of Deposition of A.G. Edwards, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM(Genth, Geoffrey)
February 20, 2008 Filing 1123 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File John Isbister and Mark Perry to Judges regarding request that the June 7, 2007 "Order Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery in MDL 1586" be modified (Isbister, John)
February 15, 2008 Filing 1122 NOTICE by Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Amended Notice of Deposition of Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM(Genth, Geoffrey)
February 15, 2008 Filing 1121 Status Report Submitted per Your Honor's request to further apprise the Court of the status of In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation/Bank of America-Nations Funds Sub-Track by Retirement and Design Management, Inc. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
February 9, 2008 Filing 1120 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard D Greenfield (Greenfield, Richard)
February 7, 2008 Filing 1119 NOTICE by A Defendant of Postponement of Deposition of Michael Parness Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 4, 2008 Filing 1118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Parness. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 4, 2008 Filing 1117 NOTICE by Jemmco Advisers of Withdrawal of Helen B. Kim with Certificate of Service (Powers, Marc)
February 1, 2008 Filing 1116 STATUS REPORT re Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1115 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Eric Abatemarco of UBS Financial Services (Paul, Russell)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1114 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Parness of Oppenheimer & Co., Inc. (Paul, Russell)
January 18, 2008 Filing 1113 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff Thomas J. Cash's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses by A Plaintiff Responses due by 2/4/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schneider, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2008 Filing 1112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Aurum Securities Corp. and Aurum Capital Management Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6). Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
January 9, 2008 Filing 1111 NOTICE of Change of Address by Priya Chaudhry Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Chaudhry, Priya)
December 19, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2007 held before Judge Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
December 11, 2007 Filing 1110 NOTICE by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan, City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Amended Notice of Deposition of Cross-Track Defendant Edward Stern Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
December 10, 2007 Filing 1109 Correspondence regarding completion of cross-track discovery. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 6, 2007 Filing 1108 RESPONSE re (1095 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) Notice (Other), (907 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM) Notice (Other), (1008 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB) Notice (Other), (2558 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Responses and Objections of Defendants Edward J. Stern, Canary Capital Partners, LLC, Canary Investment Management, LLC, and Canary Capital Partners, LTD. to the Fund Defendants' Request for Production of Documents filed by Edward J Stern, Canary Capital Partners Ltd, Canary Capital Partners LLC, Canary Investment Management LLC, Edward J. Stern, Canary Capital Partners Ltd,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Frankel, David)
November 30, 2007 Filing 1107 STATUS REPORT re Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 29, 2007 Filing 1106 NOTICE by Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Postponement of Cross-Track Deposition of Aurum Securities Corp. and Aurum Capital Management Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
November 27, 2007 Filing 1105 NOTICE by Aurum Securities Corp., Aurum Capital Management Corp. RE DEPOSITION OF AURUM SECURITIES CORP. AND AURUM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT CORP. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Lyon, Alexander)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 AMENDED ORDER staying the actions against Banc of America Securities LLC in contemplation of settlement. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, Judge Andre M. Davis and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/26/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1103 NOTICE by Amvescap PLC, Invesco Funds Group, Inc., AIM Distributors, Inc, Invesco Institutional (N.A.), Inc, Invesco Distributors, Inc, Invesco Global Assets Management (N.A.), Invesco Assets Management Limited, AIM Advisors, Inc. re (980 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB) Notice (Other) / Amended Notice of Cross-Track Deposition of Edward Stern, filed on behalf of all Fund Defendants Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1102 NOTICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan, City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Notice of Cross-Track Deposition of Edward Stern Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1101 NOTICE by Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Rescheduling of Cross-Track Deposition of Trautman, Wasserman & Company, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1100 NOTICE by Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Rescheduling and Change of Location for Cross-Track Deposition of Aurum Securities Corp. and Aurum Capital Management Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1099 NOTICE by A Plaintiff in the Putnam sub-track regarding third party subpoenas of cross-track witnesses (Attachments: #1 A.G. Edwards Schedule A & B#2 Banc of America Schedule A & B#3 Bear Stearns Schedule A & B#4 Fiserv Schedule A & B#5 JB Oxford Schedule A & B#6 Oppenheimer Schedule A & B#7 Paine Webber Schedule A & B#8 Smith Barney Schedule A & B#9 Stern Agee Schedule A & B#10 Bank of New York Schedule A & B)(Paul, Russell)
November 15, 2007 Filing 1098 Correspondence re: Amended Order Staying the Actions against Banc of America Securities LLC in Contemplation of Settlement (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Isbister, John)
November 14, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
November 14, 2007 Filing 1097 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Notice of Serving First Set of Omnibus Requests for Production and Interrogatories to the Defendants (Schneider, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2007 Filing 1096 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, Inc. of Fund Defendants' Request for Production of Documents from Security Trust Company (Baucus, Zeno)
November 6, 2007 Filing 1095 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, Inc. of Fund Defendants' Request for Production of Documents from Canary (Baucus, Zeno)
November 5, 2007 Filing 1094 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Trautman, Wasserman & Co, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) - Cross Track Deposition (REFILED). Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1093 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Aurum Securities Corp. and Aurum Capital Management Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) - Cross Track Deposition. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Vassos, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1092 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Trautman, Wasserman & Co, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) - Cross Track Deposition. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Vassos, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1091 STATUS REPORT re Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1090 Correspondence re: Status of Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track in Advance of November 5, 2007 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
November 1, 2007 Filing 1089 Correspondence re: substantive legal issues (Isbister, John)
October 31, 2007 Filing 1088 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Perry, Mark)
October 30, 2007 Filing 1087 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer R Cowan on behalf of Gary L. Pilgrim Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Cowan, Jennifer)
October 29, 2007 Filing 1086 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC, Bacap Distributors, LLC, Bank of America N.A., Banc of America Capital Management LLC, Banc of America Securities, LLC, Columbia Wanger Asset Management, L.P., Bank of America Securities, LLC, Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, NA. Responses due by 11/15/2007 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Dickson, Strider)
October 29, 2007 Filing 1085 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Gaumont on behalf of Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC, Bacap Distributors, LLC, Bank of America N.A., Banc of America Capital Management LLC, Banc of America Securities, LLC, Columbia Wanger Asset Management, L.P., Bank of America Securities, LLC, Bank of America, NA Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gaumont, Robert)
October 25, 2007 Filing 1084 Correcting Earlier Submission Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Genth, Geoffrey)
October 25, 2007 Filing 1083 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Resident Agents for: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Investec-Ernst & Co., Lehman Brothers, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., and Wachovia Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Citigroup Schedule A#2 Appendix Citigroup Schedule B#3 Appendix Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Schedule A#4 Appendix Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Schedule B#5 Appendix Investec-Ernst & Co. Schedule A#6 Appendix Investec-Ernst & Co. Schedule B#7 Appendix Lehman Brothers, Inc. Schedule A#8 Appendix Lehman Brothers, Inc. Schedule B#9 Appendix Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Schedule A#10 Appendix Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Schedule B#11 Appendix Bear Stearns Schedule A#12 Appendix The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc. Schedule B#13 Appendix Wachovia Securities LLC Schedule A#14 Appendix Wachovia Securities LLC Schedule B)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Genth, Geoffrey)
October 17, 2007 Filing 1082 NOTICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Notice of Deposition of Amy Yuter Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Thorpe, David)
October 9, 2007 Filing 1081 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Moylan on behalf of CPTR, LLC, Michael G. Christiani, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P. (Moylan, Daniel)
October 4, 2007 Filing 1080 NOTICE by Fund Defendants / Notice of Cross-Track Deposition of Grant Seeger Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
October 4, 2007 Filing 1079 NOTICE by Fund Defendants / Notice of Cross-Track Deposition of Edward Stern Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
October 3, 2007 Filing 1078 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions for the October 5, 2007 Hearing Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Isbister, John)
October 2, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1077 NOTICE by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., PBHG Fund Services, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. PBHG Fund Defendats' Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Jungalawala (Martin, Thomas)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1076 NOTICE by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., PBHG Fund Services, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. PBGH Fund Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan (Martin, Thomas)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1075 NOTICE by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., PBHG Fund Services, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. PBHG Defendant's Notice of Depositions of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan (Martin, Thomas)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1074 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa A DeSimone on behalf of Gary L. Pilgrim (DeSimone, Vanessa)
October 1, 2007 Filing 1073 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Notice of Attorney Name Change - Michelle M. Newcomer Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Backes, Michelle)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1072 STATUS REPORT by Defendants PBHG in Anticipation of the Court's October 1, 2007 Conference Call by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., PBHG Fund Services, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Martin, Thomas)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1071 STATUS REPORT in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1070 Correspondence re: Status of Proceedings in Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
September 27, 2007 Filing 1069 NOTICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Notice of Depositions (Thorpe, David)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1068 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey H Genth on behalf of Scudder Distributors Inc, Investment Company Capital Corp., Deutsche Asset Management Investment Services Ltd., Deutsche Asset Management, Inc., Deutsche Investment Management Americas, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Genth, Geoffrey)
September 17, 2007 Filing 1067 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas L Taylor, III (Taylor, Thomas)
September 14, 2007 Filing 1066 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R DeFosse on behalf of PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Old Mutual Fund Services, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. (DeFosse, Jonathan)
September 14, 2007 Filing 1065 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley W Walker on behalf of PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Old Mutual Fund Services, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. (Walker, Ashley)
September 11, 2007 Filing 1064 Correspondence re: Revised - Seeking Final Order of Dismissal (Metts, Amanda)
September 11, 2007 Filing 1063 Correspondence re: Seeking Final Order of Dismissal (Metts, Amanda)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1062 AFFIDAVIT re (855 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 2412 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 922 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1033 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Dismiss //Declaration of Maeve O'Connor of Debevoise & Plimpton in Support of Omnibus Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing and for a Determination of Applicable Law Under Fed.R.Civ.P.23 (on behalf of AMVESCAP PLC, INVESCO Funds Group Inc., INVESCO Institutional (N.A.), Inc., INVESCO Assets Management Limited, INVESCO Global Assets Management (N.A.), INVESCO Distributors, Inc., AIM Advisors, Inc., AIM Distributors Inc., et al) by Invesco Funds Group, Inc., AIM Distributors, Inc, Invesco Institutional (N.A.), Inc, Invesco Distributors, Inc, Amvescap PLC, Invesco Global Assets Management (N.A.), Invesco Assets Management Limited, AIM Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1061 REPLY to Response to Motion re (855 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 2412 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 922 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1033 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Dismiss //Omnibus Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing and for a Determination of Applicable Law under Fed.R.Civ.P.23 (on behalf of AMVESCAP PLC, INVESCO Funds Group, Inc., INVESCO Institutional (N.A.), Inc., INVESCO Assets Management Limited, INVESCO Global Assets Management (N.A.), INVESCO Distributors, Inc., AIM Advisors, Inc., AIM Distributors, Inc., et al filed by Invesco Funds Group, Inc., AIM Distributors, Inc, Invesco Institutional (N.A.), Inc, Invesco Distributors, Inc, Amvescap PLC, Invesco Global Assets Management (N.A.), Invesco Assets Management Limited, AIM Advisors, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1060 REPLY to Response to Motion re (855 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 2412 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 922 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1033 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Dismiss re Standing Under Section 36(b) of the Investment Company Act (on behalf of Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust, et al.) filed by Putnam, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1059 RESPONSE in Support re (44 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 917 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack Of Standing filed by Christopher David Chung, William Brian Savino.Replies due by 9/14/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Chaudhry, Priya)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1058 RESPONSE in Support re (1032 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Memorandum Of Defendant Bear Stearns Joining In Arguments Set Forth In Reply Memorandum In Support Of Fund Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Article III Standing And For A Determination Of Applicable Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Liman, Lewis)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1057 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1029 MOTION for Joinder in Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Declaration on Rule 23 Issues filed by CPTR, LLC, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., Michael Christiani. (Daniels, David)
August 30, 2007 Filing 1056 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1030 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Incorporated Memorandum filed by Pritchard Capital Partners LLC. (Potter, Thomas)
August 24, 2007 Filing 1055 STATUS REPORT re Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 24, 2007 Filing 1054 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Status Report in the Pilgrim Baxter Sub-track in Advance of the August 27, 2007 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
August 21, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 8/21/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
August 10, 2007 Filing 1053 AFFIDAVIT re (1052 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 2451 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 868 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 942 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB) Response in Opposition to Motion,, [Declaration of Jerald D. Bien-Willner in Support of Lead Investor Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing and for a Determination of Applicable Law Under FRCP 23 and Sec. 36(b) of the 1940 Act] by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
August 10, 2007 Filing 1052 RESPONSE in Opposition re (855 in 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 2412 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 922 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1033 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION to Dismiss [Lead Investor Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing and for a Determination of Applicable Law Under FRCP 23 and Sec. 36(b) of the 1940 Act filed by A Plaintiff.Replies due by 8/24/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
August 10, 2007 Filing 1051 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1029 in 1:04-md-15862-AMD) MOTION for Joinder in Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Declaration on Rule 23 Issues, (31 in 1:04-cv-01151-JFM) MOTION for Joinder in Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Declaration on Rule 23 Issues and RESPONSE in Opposition to Memorandum of Bear Stearns Joining Fund Defendants' Omnibus Motion filed by A Plaintiff.Replies due by 8/24/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
August 10, 2007 Filing 1050 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1033 MOTION to Dismiss FUND DERIVATIVE PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO FUND DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III STANDING AND FOR A DETERMINATION OF APPLICABLE LAW UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 23 AND SECTION 36(b) OF THE 1940 ACT filed by A Plaintiff.Replies due by 8/24/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rifkin, Mark)
August 9, 2007 Filing 1049 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Francis Madden on behalf of Securities Brokerage Inc., Daniel G. Calugar (Madden, Matthew)
August 9, 2007 Filing 1048 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elisabeth Gardner on behalf of DCIP, L.P., Security Brokerage, Daniel Calugar (Gardner, Mary)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1047 NOTICE by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc. Request for Production of Documents from Philip L. Erickson (Liman, Lewis)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1046 NOTICE by Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation Request for Production of Documents from Deferred Compensation Plan for Nassau County (Liman, Lewis)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1045 NOTICE by Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation Request for Production of Documents from Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Liman, Lewis)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1044 NOTICE by Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation OF DEPOSITION OF OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN PURSUANT TO RULE 30(B)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Liman, Lewis)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1043 NOTICE by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc. OF DEPOSITION OF PHILIP L. ERICKSON PURSUANT TO RULE 30 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Liman, Lewis)
August 7, 2007 Filing 1042 NOTICE by Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation OF DEPOSITION OF DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN FOR NASSAU COUNTY PURSUANT TO RULE 30(B)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Liman, Lewis)
August 2, 2007 Filing 1041 Correspondence re: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Liman, Lewis)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying the Order Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery. Signed by Judges Catherine C. Blake, Andre M. Davis and J. Frederick Motz on 7/30/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2007 Filing 1039 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Modifying the Order Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery in MDL 1586 by A Plaintiff. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Isbister, John)
July 24, 2007 Filing 1038 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Thorpe on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Thorpe, David)
July 20, 2007 Filing 1037 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Status Report in Pilgrim Baxter Sub-Track in Advance of the July 23, 2007 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
July 20, 2007 Filing 1036 STATUS REPORT in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 20, 2007 Filing 1035 STATUS REPORT in advance of 7/23/2007 Conference Call by CPTR, LLC, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., Michael Christiani. (Connolly, John)
July 20, 2007 Filing 1034 STATUS REPORT IN ANTICIPATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 23, 2007 CONFERENCE CALL by Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Shally, Joanna)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1033 MOTION to Dismiss FUND DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III STANDING AND FOR A DETERMINATION OF APPLICABLE LAW UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 23 AND SECTION 36(B) of the 1940 Act by Strong Investor Services, Inc., Strong Investments, Inc., Strong Capital Management, Inc., Strong Financial Corporation. Responses due by 7/20/2007 (Attachments: #1 1586 Fund Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Determination of Applicable Law#2 Declaration of Maeve O'Connor in Support of Fund Defendants Motion to Dismiss and for Determination of Applicable Law#3 Exhibit A to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#4 Exhibit B to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#5 Exhibit C to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#6 Exhibit D to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#7 Exhibit E to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#8 Exhibit F to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#9 Exhibit G to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#10 Exhibit H to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#11 Exhibit H-1 to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#12 Exhibit H-2 to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#13 Exhibit I to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#14 Exhibit I-1 to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor#15 Exhibit I-2 to supporting Declaration of Maeve O'Connor)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1032 NOTICE by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation of Memorandum Joining in Arguments Set Forth in Fund Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing and for Declaration of Applicable Law under F.R.C.P. 23 and Section 36(b) of the 1940 Act. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Liman, Lewis)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1031 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing by Christopher David Chung. Responses due by 7/20/2007 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-cv-00804-JFM, 1:04-cv-00909-JFM, 1:04-cv-00932-JFM, 1:04-cv-00933-JFM, 1:04-cv-00934-JFM, 1:04-cv-00935-JFM, 1:04-cv-01288-JFM, 1:04-cv-01296-JFM, 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 1:04-cv-01455-JFM, 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 1:04-cv-02283-JFM, 1:04-cv-02285-JFM, 1:04-cv-02286-JFM, 1:04-cv-02287-JFM, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 1:05-cv-02875-JFM(Chaudhry, Priya)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1030 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Incorporated Memorandum by Pritchard Capital Partners, LLC. Responses due by 7/20/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Potter, Thomas)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1029 MOTION for Joinder in Fund Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Declaration on Rule 23 Issues by CPTR, LLC, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., Michael Christiani. Responses due by 7/20/2007 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Joinder)(Daniels, David)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1028 NOTICE by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Omnibus Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Served electronically in accordance with paragraph 2 of Order governing discovery between Bear Stearns Defendants and Plaintiffs) (Liman, Lewis)
June 29, 2007 Filing 1027 REPLY to Response to Motion re #956 MOTION for Other Relief MOTION CONFIRMINING VIABILITY OF STATE LAW CLAIMS IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT'S HOLDING IN MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC. V. DAVIT Sur-Reply to Liberty Ridge Capital Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by A Plaintiff. (Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2007 Filing 1026 REPLY to Response to Motion re #987 Cross MOTION to Dismiss /The Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint Sur-Reply to Individual Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by A Plaintiff. (Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2007 FILED IN ERROR - Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD) Modified on 7/17/2007 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
June 25, 2007 Filing 1025 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2007 Filing 1024 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule (Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2007 Filing 1023 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Security Brokerage, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2007 (Killacky, John)
June 13, 2007 Filing 1022 Correspondence confirming the hearing scheduled for October 5, 2007. (Motz, J.)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, Judge Andre M. Davis and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/11/07 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/11/2007 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
June 8, 2007 Filing 1020 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Status Update in Advance of the June 11, 2007 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
June 8, 2007 Filing 1019 STATUS REPORT (re 6/11/2007 Conference Call) by CPTR, LLC, Michael G. Christiani, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P.. (Connolly, John)
June 8, 2007 Filing 1018 STATUS REPORT /Fund Defendants' Status Report in Anticipation of the Court's June 11, 2007 Conference Call. Filed on behalf of Liberty Ridge Capital, Inc. (f/k/a Pilgrim Baxter & Associates, Ltd.), Old Mutual Investment Partners (f/k/a PBHG Fund Distributors), Old Mutual Fund Services (f/k/a PBHG Fund Services), Old Mutual Shareholder Services, Inc. (f/k/a PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc. by A Defendant. (Shally, Joanna)
June 7, 2007 Filing 1017 Correspondence re: Revised Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Revised Scheduling Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
June 5, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
June 5, 2007 Filing 1016 Correspondence re: Letter to the Court Regarding Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: (Proposed) Order Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery in MDL 1586)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
June 1, 2007 Filing 1015 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on May 23, 2007 (Cross-Track Conference Call) (CR: M Zajac) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2007 Filing 1014 REPLY to Response to Motion re #987 Cross MOTION to Dismiss /The Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Harold J. Baxter, Gary L. Pilgrim. (Bierbauer, Erik)
May 25, 2007 Filing 1013 REPLY to Response to Motion re #987 Cross MOTION to Dismiss /The Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Shally, Joanna)
May 22, 2007 Filing 1012 Correspondence re: May 23, 2007 Teleconference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Isbister, John)
May 21, 2007 Filing 1011 Correspondence re: Letter to Court regarding Fund Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: (Proposed) Order Governing Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery in MDL 1586#2 Exhibit B: Blackline against Plaintiffs' (Proposed) Uniform Scheduling Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(O Connor, Maeve)
May 21, 2007 Filing 1010 Correspondence re: Uniform Pre-Trial Scheduling and Cross-Track Discovery Procedures in MDL 1586 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Order#2 Exhibit Redline Comparison of Competing Proposed Orders)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Isbister, John)
May 11, 2007 Filing 1009 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judge Davis in the Pilgrim Baxter Subtrack on April 30, 2007 (CR: M Zajac) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2007 Filing 1008 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judge Davis in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack on April 30, 2007 (CR: M Zajac) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2007 Filing 1007 Correspondence re: Joint Letter Rescheduling May 10 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
May 4, 2007 Filing 1006 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Martin on behalf of PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Old Mutual Fund Services, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd. (Martin, Thomas)
April 30, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (Court Reporter M. Zajac) (bma, CRD)
April 30, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis. (Court Reporter M. Zajac) (bma, CRD)
April 30, 2007 Filing 1005 REPLY to Response to Motion re #956 MOTION for Other Relief MOTION CONFIRMINING VIABILITY OF STATE LAW CLAIMS IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT'S HOLDING IN MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC. V. DAVIT Reply to Liberty Ridge Capital Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion Confirming Viability of State Law Claims and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Liberty Ridge Capital Inc.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by A Plaintiff. (Schneider, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2007 Filing 1004 REPLY to Response to Motion re #987 Cross MOTION to Dismiss /The Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint Reply to Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Viability of State Law Claims and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by A Plaintiff. (Schneider, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2007 Filing 1003 Correspondence re: Defendants and Lead Class Plaintiffs Letters regarding 36(b) claims (Chimicles, Nicholas)
April 27, 2007 Filing 1002 STATUS REPORT /Fund Defendants' Status Report in Anticipation of the Court's April 30, 2007 Conference Call. Filed on behalf of Liberty Ridge Capital, Inc. (f/k/a Pilgrim Baxter & Associates, Ltd.), Old Mutual Investment Partners (f/k/a PBHG Fund Distributors), Old Mutual Fund Services (f/k/a PBHG Fund Services), Old Mutual Shareholder Services, Inc. (f/k/a PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc. by A Defendant. (Attachments: #1)(Shally, Joanna)
April 27, 2007 Filing 1001 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Status Update in Advance of the April 30, 2007 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
April 27, 2007 Filing 1000 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's response to Defendants' letter regarding Section 36(b) claim Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 27, 2007 Filing 999 STATUS REPORT [Corrected] in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 27, 2007 Filing 998 STATUS REPORT in Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 25, 2007 Filing 997 REPLY to Response to Motion re (38 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM) MOTION for Reconsideration re 862 Order in 1:04-md-15861-CCB filed by Christopher David Chung, William Brian Savino. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Chaudhry, Priya)
April 24, 2007 Filing 996 MEMORANDUM to counsel re: status reports in advance of conference calls. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, Judge Andre M. Davis and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2007 Filing 995 NOTICE of Appearance by Marion C Passmore on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Passmore, Marion)
April 18, 2007 Filing 994 Correspondence concerning uniform schedules. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, Judge Andre M. Davis and Judge J. Frederick Motz Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM (cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2007 Filing 993 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule (Schneider, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2007 Filing 992 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Plaintiffs' First Set of Omnibus Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to the Bear Stearns Defendants (Served electronically via CM/ECF in accordance with para. 2 of Order Governing Discovery Between Bear Stearns and Plaintiffs [04-15861 Docket No. 879]) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER Governing Discovery between Bear Stearns and Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, Judge Andre M. Davis and Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/13/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2007 Filing 990 Correspondence re: cross-track discovery (Isbister, John)
April 10, 2007 Filing 989 Correspondence re: proposed order to goven cross-track discovery of Bear Stearns (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isbister, John)
April 2, 2007 Filing 988 Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson (Backes, Michelle)
March 19, 2007 Filing 987 Cross MOTION to Dismiss /The Individual Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint by Harold J. Baxter, Gary L. Pilgrim. Responses due by 4/5/2007 (Attachments: #1 The Individual Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Viability of State Law Claims and in Support of Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint#2 Declaration of Erik C. Bierbauer in Support of the Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Viability of State Law Claims and Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint#3 Exhibit A to Declaration#4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Bierbauer, Erik)
March 19, 2007 Filing 986 RESPONSE re #956 MOTION for Other Relief MOTION CONFIRMINING VIABILITY OF STATE LAW CLAIMS IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT'S HOLDING IN MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC. V. DAVIT / Declaration of Joanna Shally in Support of Liberty Ridge Capital's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to confirm Viability of State Law Claims and Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by A Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Shally, Joanna)
March 19, 2007 Filing 985 RESPONSE in Opposition re #956 MOTION for Other Relief MOTION CONFIRMINING VIABILITY OF STATE LAW CLAIMS IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT'S HOLDING IN MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC. V. DAVIT /Liberty Ridge Capital's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to confirm Viability of State Law Claims and Cross-Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by A Defendant.Replies due by 4/2/2007. (Shally, Joanna)
March 16, 2007 Filing 984 Correspondence re: Your Honor's request to further apprise the Court of the status of In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation/Bank of America-Nations Funds Sub-Track. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER granting (856) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15861-CCB; granting (979) Motion to Stay; granting (980) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15862-AMD; granting (2335) Motion to Stay; granting (2336) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (817) Motion to Stay; granting (818) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15864-JFM Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2007 Filing 982 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam R. Gonnelli Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gonnelli, Adam)
March 8, 2007 Filing 981 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion Confirming Viability of Plaintiff's State Law Claims in light of the Supreme Court's Ruling in Dabit (Schneider, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2007 Filing 980 Joint MOTION to Stay Actions Against Banc of America Securities LLC in Contemplation of Settlement by Banc of America Securities LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2007 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00575-JFM, 1:04-cv-00576-JFM, 1:04-cv-00577-JFM, 1:04-cv-00578-JFM, 1:04-cv-00579-JFM, 1:04-cv-00580-JFM, 1:04-cv-00581-JFM, 1:04-cv-00582-JFM, 1:04-cv-00583-JFM, 1:04-cv-00585-JFM, 1:04-cv-00586-JFM, 1:04-cv-00587-JFM, 1:04-cv-00588-JFM, 1:04-cv-00589-JFM, 1:04-cv-00590-JFM, 1:04-cv-00592-JFM, 1:04-cv-00593-JFM, 1:04-cv-00594-JFM, 1:04-cv-00803-JFM, 1:04-cv-00828-JFM, 1:04-cv-00857-JFM, 1:04-cv-00860-JFM, 1:04-cv-00862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00882-JFM, 1:04-cv-00892-JFM, 1:04-cv-00900-JFM, 1:04-cv-00901-JFM, 1:04-cv-00902-JFM, 1:04-cv-00904-JFM, 1:04-cv-01148-JFM, 1:04-cv-01149-JFM, 1:04-cv-01150-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM, 1:04-cv-01153-JFM, 1:04-cv-01156-JFM, 1:04-cv-01158-JFM, 1:04-cv-01163-JFM, 1:04-cv-01271-JFM, 1:04-cv-01272-JFM, 1:04-cv-01273-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01275-JFM, 1:04-cv-01280-JFM, 1:04-cv-01282-JFM, 1:04-cv-01286-JFM, 1:04-cv-01287-JFM, 1:04-cv-01288-JFM, 1:04-cv-01289-JFM, 1:04-cv-01293-JFM, 1:04-cv-01294-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1:04-cv-01450-JFM, 1:04-cv-01451-JFM, 1:04-cv-01452-JFM, 1:04-cv-01453-JFM, 1:04-cv-01459-JFM, 1:04-cv-01460-JFM, 1:04-cv-01461-JFM, 1:04-cv-01462-JFM, 1:04-cv-01463-JFM, 1:04-cv-01464-JFM, 1:04-cv-01465-JFM, 1:04-cv-01622-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM, 1:04-cv-01883-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 1:05-cv-02899-JFM, 1:05-cv-03205-JFM(Winograd, Michael)
March 5, 2007 Filing 979 Joint MOTION to Stay Actions Against Banc of America Securities LLC in Contemplation of Settlement by Bank of America Securities, LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2007 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-cv-00804-JFM, 1:04-cv-00909-JFM, 1:04-cv-00932-JFM, 1:04-cv-00933-JFM, 1:04-cv-00934-JFM, 1:04-cv-00935-JFM, 1:04-cv-01296-JFM, 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 1:04-cv-01455-JFM, 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 1:04-cv-02283-JFM, 1:04-cv-02285-JFM, 1:04-cv-02286-JFM, 1:04-cv-02287-JFM, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM, 1:05-cv-02875-JFM(Winograd, Michael)
February 27, 2007 Filing 978 MOTION to Amend/Correct Fund Derivative Complaint by Interlineation by Silvana Della Camera, Reiko Gagnon, Jean Striffer, Evon Yameen, Robert J. Saelens, Frances Hait, Felicia Bernstein, Harry Schipper, Harriet Surks, Pamela Yameen, George Swam, John E. Morrissey, Thomas F. Bednarek, Dolores Banas, Joseph Banner, Simon J. Denenberg, Ryan McAlvey, William Marcus, Ryan McAlvey. Responses due by 3/16/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amendments by Interlineation#2 Memorandum of Law#3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM(Mathews, Timothy)
February 26, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2007 in the Pilgrim Baxter Subtrack before Judge Andre M Davis. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2007 in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack before Judge Andre M Davis. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2007 Telephone Conference as to Pilgrim Baxter held on 2/26/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
February 26, 2007 Telephone Conference as to Franklin Templeton held on 2/26/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
February 26, 2007 Filing 977 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cases)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
February 26, 2007 Filing 976 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' letter written in advance of the upcoming February 26, 2007 telephone status conference accurately describes events that have transpired since the last status conference and the status of discovery in the Pilgram Baxter sub-track. (Shally, Joanna)
February 23, 2007 Filing 975 STATUS REPORT Regarding Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 22, 2007 Filing 974 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Status Update in Advance of February 26, 2007 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
February 20, 2007 Filing 973 NOTICE by J.C. Bradford & Co., UBS Wealth Management USA, UBS Painewebber Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Davidow, Charles)
February 5, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 2/5/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2007 Filing 972 Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson (Backes, Michelle)
January 30, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2007 held before Judge Andre M Davis (Court Reporter L. Bankins) (bma, CRD)
January 27, 2007 Filing 971 Status Report Submitted by CPTR, LLC, Michael G. Christiani, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., Appalachian Trails, L.P. (Connolly, John)
January 26, 2007 Filing 970 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
January 26, 2007 Filing 969 STATUS REPORT / Fund Defendants' Status Report, with August 14, 2006, Status Report attached as Exhibit A by Gary L. Pilgrim. (Bierbauer, Erik)
January 26, 2007 Filing 968 Correspondence re: Status Report (Sucharow, Lawrence)
January 23, 2007 Filing 967 Correspondence re: Opposing Request for Supplemental Briefing (Winograd, Michael)
January 23, 2007 Filing 966 Correspondence re: Requesting Supplemental Briefing Schedule (Gross, Deborah)
January 10, 2007 Filing 965 Request for Conference (Winograd, Michael)
December 20, 2006 Filing 964 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Kelly Potter, III Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Potter, Thomas)
December 20, 2006 Filing 963 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Kelly Potter, III Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Potter, Thomas)
November 20, 2006 Filing 962 Correspondence re: an order resolving the omnibus motion to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Shally, Joanna)
November 16, 2006 Filing 961 Correspondence re: Response to Certain Defendants' Correspondence and Proposed Order of 11/13/06 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
November 16, 2006 Filing 960 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Notice of Change of Firm Name from The Furth Firm LLP to Furth Lehmann & Grant LLP, and Certificate of Service (Cirillo, Henry)
November 15, 2006 Filing 959 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. Responses due by 12/4/2006 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Gans, Robert)
November 15, 2006 Filing 958 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. Responses due by 12/4/2006 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Schulman, Alan)
November 13, 2006 Filing 957 NOTICE by Charles Schwab & Co. , Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Salomon Smith Barney, Inc. (n/k/a Citigroup Global Markets Inc.), Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Securities, Inc., Investec (US) Incorporated, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., SEI Investments Distribution Company, and JP Morgan Chase and Co. of Proposed Investor Class Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Zeller, Stephanie)
November 10, 2006 Filing 956 MOTION for Other Relief MOTION CONFIRMINING VIABILITY OF STATE LAW CLAIMS IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT'S HOLDING IN MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC. V. DAVIT by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 11/27/2006 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-00543-JFM, 1:04-cv-00545-JFM, 1:04-cv-00546-JFM, 1:04-cv-00575-JFM, 1:04-cv-00576-JFM, 1:04-cv-00577-JFM, 1:04-cv-00578-JFM, 1:04-cv-00579-JFM, 1:04-cv-00580-JFM, 1:04-cv-00581-JFM, 1:04-cv-00582-JFM, 1:04-cv-00583-JFM, 1:04-cv-00585-JFM, 1:04-cv-00586-JFM, 1:04-cv-00587-JFM, 1:04-cv-00588-JFM, 1:04-cv-00589-JFM, 1:04-cv-00590-JFM, 1:04-cv-00592-JFM, 1:04-cv-00593-JFM, 1:04-cv-00594-JFM, 1:04-cv-00624-JFM, 1:04-cv-00625-JFM, 1:04-cv-00803-JFM, 1:04-cv-00822-JFM, 1:04-cv-00828-JFM, 1:04-cv-00847-JFM, 1:04-cv-00854-JFM, 1:04-cv-00857-JFM, 1:04-cv-00860-JFM, 1:04-cv-00862-JFM, 1:04-cv-00867-JFM, 1:04-cv-00879-JFM, 1:04-cv-00882-JFM, 1:04-cv-00892-JFM, 1:04-cv-00895-JFM, 1:04-cv-00896-JFM, 1:04-cv-00900-JFM, 1:04-cv-00901-JFM, 1:04-cv-00902-JFM, 1:04-cv-00904-JFM, 1:04-cv-01148-JFM, 1:04-cv-01149-JFM, 1:04-cv-01150-JFM, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM, 1:04-cv-01153-JFM, 1:04-cv-01156-JFM, 1:04-cv-01158-JFM, 1:04-cv-01163-JFM, 1:04-cv-01271-JFM, 1:04-cv-01272-JFM, 1:04-cv-01273-JFM, 1:04-cv-01274-JFM, 1:04-cv-01275-JFM, 1:04-cv-01280-JFM, 1:04-cv-01282-JFM, 1:04-cv-01286-JFM, 1:04-cv-01287-JFM, 1:04-cv-01288-JFM, 1:04-cv-01289-JFM, 1:04-cv-01293-JFM, 1:04-cv-01294-JFM, 1:04-cv-01310-JFM, 1:04-cv-01450-JFM, 1:04-cv-01451-JFM, 1:04-cv-01452-JFM, 1:04-cv-01453-JFM, 1:04-cv-01459-JFM, 1:04-cv-01460-JFM, 1:04-cv-01461-JFM, 1:04-cv-01462-JFM, 1:04-cv-01463-JFM, 1:04-cv-01464-JFM, 1:04-cv-01465-JFM, 1:04-cv-01622-JFM, 1:04-cv-01624-JFM, 1:04-cv-01883-JFM, 1:04-cv-02668-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 1:05-cv-02237-JFM, 1:05-cv-02899-JFM(Schneider, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2006 Filing 955 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harold J. Baxter, filed by A Plaintiff.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD et al.(Schneider, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2006 Filing 954 NOTICE of Appearance by C Chad Johnson on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Johnson, C)
November 6, 2006 Filing 953 Correspondence re: cancellation of monthly all-track teleconferences (Isbister, John)
November 1, 2006 Filing 952 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Administrative Chair Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Motz, J.)
October 31, 2006 Filing 951 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Administrative Chair (Schulman, Alan)
October 11, 2006 Filing 950 Correspondence re: Cancellation of October 12, 2006, monthly teleconference (Isbister, John)
October 10, 2006 Filing 949 Request for Conference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Schulman, Alan)
October 6, 2006 Filing 948 NOTICE of Appearance by William C Fredericks on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Fredericks, William)
October 6, 2006 Filing 947 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Henry Wierzbowski on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan, Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-cv-01151-JFM(Wierzbowski, Adam)
October 3, 2006 Filing 946 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Lee Sorkin on behalf of Kaplan & Co. Securities, Inc. (Sorkin, Ira)
September 13, 2006 Filing 945 Correspondence re: Cancellation of September 14, 2006, teleconference (Isbister, John)
September 1, 2006 Filing 944 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the court on August 23, 2006 before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2006 Cases associated: Create association to 1:04-md-15861-CCB. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2006 Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2006 held before Judge Andre M Davis; Judge Catherine C. Blake and Judge J. Frederick Motz. (Court Reporter: Mary Zajac) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2006 Filing 943 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #821 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting #867 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Judge Davis)
August 18, 2006 Filing 942 Correspondence re: 8/23/06 teleconference of motion to dismiss hearing (Isbister, John)
August 18, 2006 Filing 941 Correspondence re: Case Management Issues (Perry, Mark)
August 14, 2006 Filing 940 RESPONSE re #938 Status Report, filed by CPTR, LLC, Michael G. Christiani, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P.. (Connolly, John)
August 14, 2006 Filing 939 STATUS REPORT of FUND DEFENDANTS Liberty Ridge Capital, Inc. (f/k/a Pilgrim Baxter & Associates, Ltd.), Old Mutual Investment Partners (f/k/a PBHG Fund Distributors), Old Mutual Fund Services (f/k/a BPHG Fund Services), Old Mutual Shareholder Services, Inc. (f/k/a PHBH Shareholder Services, Inc.), Old Mutual plc, Old Mutual (U.S.) Holdings, Inc., Gary L. Pilgrim and Harold J. Baxter by Gary L. Pilgrim. (Bierbauer, Erik)
August 10, 2006 Filing 938 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report -- In re Pilgrim Baxter by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. (Schulman, Alan)
August 10, 2006 Filing 937 STATUS REPORT Of Plaintiffs' Administrative Chair And Liaison Counsel Concerning Matters That Impact Multiple Tracks by A Plaintiff. (Schulman, Alan)
August 10, 2006 Filing 936 STATUS REPORT Joint - Report Regarding Franklin Templeton Subtrack by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Waldman, Chet)
August 10, 2006 Filing 935 Status Report Submitted on behalf of Class Plaintiffs' counsel, Derivative Plaintiffs' counsel, ERISA Plaintiffs' counsel, and all Alliance Defendants' counsel by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson (Backes, Michelle)
August 10, 2006 Filing 934 Correspondence re: Your Honor's request to apprise the Court of the status of In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation/Bank of America-Nations Funds Sub-Track. (Sucharow, Lawrence)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER Staying the Actions against the Alliance Settling Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 8/7/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2006 Filing 932 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #758 Motion to Withdraw, granting #865 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Herrington Kuglar; Sarah Fern Meil; James John Restivo; Theodore J Sawicki; Heather Marla Tashman; Julie McCurdy Williamson; Jayme L Butcher and Efrem M Grail terminated, granting #866 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Herrington Kuglar; Sarah Fern Meil; James John Restivo; Theodore J Sawicki; Heather Marla Tashman; Julie McCurdy Williamson; Jayme L Butcher and Efrem M Grail terminated, granting #873 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Herrington Kuglar; Sarah Fern Meil; James John Restivo; Theodore J Sawicki; Heather Marla Tashman; Julie McCurdy Williamson; Jayme L Butcher and Efrem M Grail terminated, granting #878 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Herrington Kuglar; Sarah Fern Meil; James John Restivo; Theodore J Sawicki; Heather Marla Tashman; Julie McCurdy Williamson; Jayme L Butcher and Efrem M Grail terminated, granting #930 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Herrington Kuglar; Sarah Fern Meil; James John Restivo; Theodore J Sawicki; Heather Marla Tashman; Julie McCurdy Williamson; Jayme L Butcher and Efrem M Grail terminated (Judge Davis)
July 31, 2006 Filing 931 Correspondence re: Cancellation of August 10, 2006 teleconference (Isbister, John)
July 26, 2006 Filing 930 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 8/14/2006 (Backes, Michelle)
July 12, 2006 Filing 929 Correspondence re: J.Isbister to counsel canceling July 13, 2006 teleconference (Isbister, John)
June 29, 2006 Filing 928 Correcting Earlier Submission (Powers, Marc)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 927 MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING #762 Stipulation of voluntary dismissal of Stephens, Inc. filed by Robert K. Finnell,. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 6/19/06. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 926 ORDER from the MDL Panel Transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2006 Filing 925 Correspondence re: canceling June 14, 2006 teleconference (Isbister, John)
June 8, 2006 Filing 924 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Response to Franklin Templeton Defendants' Objection to Proposed Implementing Order and attached text of Revised Proposed Implementing Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Chet)
June 5, 2006 Filing 923 Correspondence re: Requesting permission to submit a short sur-reply to respond to inaccuracies and mischaracterizations in the June 2, 2006 letters submitted by the Fund Derivative and Investor Class Plaintiffs. (Shally, Joanna)
June 2, 2006 Filing 922 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulman, Alan)
June 2, 2006 Filing 921 Correspondence re: Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Reply to Pilgrim Baxter Defendants' Objections to Proposed Order (Chimicles, Nicholas)
June 2, 2006 Filing 920 MOTION to Stay Corrected and Amended Joint Motion to Stay Actions Against the Alliance Settling Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 6/19/2006 (Isbister, John)
June 2, 2006 Filing 919 Correspondence re: Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Reply to Franklin/Templeton Defendants' Objections to Proposed Order (Schwartzman, Denise)
June 2, 2006 Filing 918 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Response to Defendant William Post's objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Implementing Order (Waldman, Chet)
June 2, 2006 Filing 917 Correspondence re: commensurate request for one week extension to respond to Franklin Templeton Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Implementing Order (Waldman, Chet)
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER APPROVING extension of time to file proposed counter-implementing orders. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/26/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2006 Filing 915 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Daniel)
May 30, 2006 Filing 914 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Reply to William Post's Objection to Proposed Order in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack (Mathews, Timothy)
May 26, 2006 Filing 913 Correspondence re: Proposed Implementing Orders (Connolly, John)
May 26, 2006 Filing 912 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 #2)(Rosenthal, Lisa)
May 26, 2006 Filing 911 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Taylor, Thomas)
May 26, 2006 Filing 910 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Taylor, Thomas)
May 26, 2006 Filing 909 Correspondence re: Objection to the proposed implementing orders that Fund Derivative Plaintiffs and Investor Class Plaintiffs submitted in the Pilgrim Baxter subtrack on May 11 and 12, 2006, respectively. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Counter-Proposed] Fund Derivative Order#2 Exhibit B - [Counter-Proposed] Investor Class Order)(Shally, Joanna)
May 26, 2006 Filing 908 Correspondence re: Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc. and Old Mutual plc's Objections to Proposed Dismissal Orders (Rosensweig, Richard)
May 25, 2006 Filing 907 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Proposed Counter-Implementing Orders on Behalf of Franklin Templeton Defendants (Unopposed) (Pollack, Daniel)
May 25, 2006 Filing 906 Correspondence re: Proposed Investor Class Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Revised Proposed] Investor Class Order)(Killacky, John)
May 23, 2006 Filing 905 Correspondence re: plaintiffs' request for supplemental briefing on defendants' motion to dismiss the Bank of America parent derivative action (Winograd, Michael)
May 19, 2006 Filing 904 Correspondence re: Intent to File Objections to Proposed Orders (Taylor, Thomas)
May 18, 2006 Filing 903 Correspondence re: Second Rescheduling of June Teleconference (Isbister, John)
May 16, 2006 Filing 902 NOTICE by Theodore C. Sihpol, III of change of attorney affiliation (Felder, Barry)
May 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER in 04-1310 APPROVING Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Martin L. Flanagan without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/16/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2006 Filing 900 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Trocki, III on behalf of Nations Funds Trust (Trocki, John)
May 12, 2006 Filing 899 Correspondence re: Lead Plaintiff's Proposed Investor Class Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulman, Alan)
May 12, 2006 Filing 898 Correspondence re: Fund Class and Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Proposed Implementing Orders re Franklin Templeton Subtrack (Zaccaria, Anthony)
May 12, 2006 Filing 897 Correspondence re: Alliance Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 12, 2006 Filing 896 Correspondence re: attached Proposed Implementing Order in Franklin Templeton Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Implementing Rulings on Motions to Dismiss)(Waldman, Chet)
May 12, 2006 Filing 895 Correspondence re: Investor Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Order in the Alliance Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tashman, Heather)
May 12, 2006 Filing 894 Correspondence re: Proposed Order in Parent Derivative Action in Bank of America Subtrack (Winograd, Michael)
May 11, 2006 Filing 893 Correspondence re: Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Proposed Order in the Franklin Templeton Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chimicles, Nicholas)
May 11, 2006 Filing 892 Correspondence re: Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Proposed Order in the PBHG Funds Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chimicles, Nicholas)
May 11, 2006 Filing 891 MOTION to Stay re #888 Joint MOTION to Stay Actions Against the Alliance Settling Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement Corrected Joint Motion to Stay Actions Against the Alliance Settling Defendants In Contemplation of Settlement by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 5/30/2006 (Isbister, John)
May 10, 2006 Filing 890 Correspondence re: Cancellation and Rescheduling of May 11, 2006 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
May 10, 2006 Filing 889 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Gordon S. Macklin without Prejudice in 04-1310 Sharkey IRO/IRA v Franklin Resources, et al. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/10/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2006 Filing 888 Joint MOTION to Stay Actions Against the Alliance Settling Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement by AXA Financial Inc., AllianceBernstein Investment Research and Management, Inc., Alliance Global Investors Services, Inc., Alliance Capital Management, L.P., Alliance Global Investor Services, Inc., AllianceBernstein Real Estate Investment Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein Mid-Cap Growth Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein Growth & Income Fund, Inc., AXA S.A., AXA Financial, Inc., Alliance Capital Management L.P., Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States, Alliance Capital Management Holdings L.P., AllianceBernstein Premier Growth Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein Small Cap Growth Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein Technology Fund, Inc., AllianceBernstein High Yield Fund, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Holding, L.P.. Responses due by 5/22/2006 (Isbister, John)
April 26, 2006 Telephone Conference held on 4/26/2006 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
April 25, 2006 Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2006 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CRD)
April 24, 2006 Filing 887 Correspondence re: Agenda for Wednesday, April 26, 2006 teleconference call (Isbister, John)
April 7, 2006 Filing 886 Correspondence re: Cancellation of April 13, 2006 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER in Anding v Bank of America, et al APPROVING Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Charles D. Bryceland. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 4/6/06(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2006 Filing 884 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #875 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lead Class Plaintiffs, (Judge Davis)
April 6, 2006 Filing 883 PAPERLESS ORDER re #874 Stipulation filed by Philip L. Erickson,, Nadine Geller, (Judge Davis)
April 3, 2006 Filing 882 Correspondence re: Co-chair of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee not Repleading State Law Claims (Sucharow, Lawrence)
April 3, 2006 Filing 881 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 23, 2006 before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz (call - 2) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2006 Filing 880 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 23, 2006 before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz (call - 1) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2006 Filing 879 Correspondence re: Investor Class Action State Law Claims (Schulman, Alan)
March 23, 2006 Filing 878 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bank of America Corporation, Banc of America Securities LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2006 (Meil, Sarah Fern)
March 22, 2006 Filing 877 Correspondence re: Agenda for March 23, 2006 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER - Instructions regarding electronic filing of documents. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/21/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2006 Filing 875 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation Of Voluntary Dismissal of Bank of America Corporation by Lead Class Plaintiffs. (Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
March 14, 2006 Filing 874 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Allowing Amendment to Consolidated Amended Complaints to Substitute Banc of America Securities, LLC by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson. (Tashman, Heather)
March 14, 2006 Filing 873 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of James E. Murray of Davis Polk & Wardwell by JP Morgan Chase and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2006 (McClammy, James)
March 10, 2006 Filing 872 Correspondence re: Agreement Regarding Claims Against Bank of America Corporation and Banc of America Securities, LLC (Meil, Sarah Fern)
March 9, 2006 Filing 871 Correspondence re: Status of Discovery and Requesting a Formal Scheduling Conference (Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
March 8, 2006 Filing 870 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Acocelli, Jr on behalf of Individual Fund Plaintiffs (Acocelli, Richard)
February 21, 2006 Filing 869 CTO ORDER No. 22 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2006 Filing 868 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake and Motz on February 9, 2006 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2006 Filing 867 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Headstart Advisers Ltd.. Responses due by 3/6/2006 (Restivo, James)
February 15, 2006 Filing 866 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Headstart Advisers Ltd.. Responses due by 3/6/2006 (Grail, Efrem)
February 15, 2006 Filing 865 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Headstart Advisers Ltd.. Responses due by 3/6/2006 (Butcher, Jayme)
February 10, 2006 Filing 864 Correspondence re: March 2006 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
February 8, 2006 Filing 863 Correspondence re: Agenda for February 9, 2006 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
January 27, 2006 Filing 862 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Belter, Sarah)
January 23, 2006 Filing 861 FILED ELECTRONICALLY IN ERROR - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey C. Schneider by A Plaintiff. (Kellogg, Lawrence) Modified on 1/26/2006 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
January 23, 2006 Filing 860 FILED ELECTRONICALLY IN ERROR - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence A. Kellogg by A Plaintiff. (Kellogg, Lawrence) Modified on 1/26/2006 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
January 18, 2006 Filing 859 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judge Blake, Davis and Motz on December 8, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 12, 2006 Filing 858 Correspondence re: Cancelling the January 12, 2006 Monthly Conference Call (Isbister, John)
January 11, 2006 Filing 857 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Kelly Potter, III (Potter, Thomas)
January 3, 2006 Filing 856 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Meil, Sarah Fern)
December 23, 2005 Filing 855 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerald Bien Willner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Bien Willner, Jerald)
December 22, 2005 Filing 854 Correspondence re: transferring 05-3205 Thomas J. Cash v Gary L. Pilgrim to track 04-15862 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2005 Filing 853 Correspondence re: Cash Case and Newly-Transferred Cases (Schulman, Alan)
December 13, 2005 Filing 852 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Wright, Jefferson)
December 12, 2005 Filing 851 Correspondence re: claims to proceed in a timely manner (Kellogg, Lawrence)
December 9, 2005 Filing 850 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Charles D. Bryceland. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Tolling Agreement)(Balber, Scott)
December 7, 2005 Filing 849 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Wright, Jefferson)
December 7, 2005 Filing 848 Correspondence re: December 8, 2005 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
December 1, 2005 Filing 847 Correspondence re: proposed modified schedule for certain defendants to answer certain consolidated amended complaints (Tulumello, Andrew)
November 29, 2005 Filing 846 CTO Order No. 21 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached cases to the District of Maryland (cag, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2005 Filing 845 FILED ELECTRONICALLY IN ERROR - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice In a Case Related to MDL 1586 by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson. (Tashman, Heather) Modified on 1/27/2006 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
November 22, 2005 Filing 844 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Kaplan on behalf of Wilshire Associates Incorporated (Kaplan, Frank)
November 18, 2005 Filing 843 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Request for Interim Order (Perry, Mark)
November 15, 2005 Filing 842 Correspondence re: Wasserman v. Lewis action (Winograd, Michael)
November 9, 2005 Filing 841 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Move to Dismiss by Charles D. Bryceland. (Balber, Scott)
November 3, 2005 Filing 840 Correspondence re: Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings Against the Security Brokerage Defendants (Scholes, Steven)
November 2, 2005 Filing 839 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on October 27, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2005 Filing 838 Correspondence re: Response to Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Opposition to Joint Motion to Stay Actions Against the Security Brokerage Defendants (Rifkin, Mark)
October 27, 2005 Filing 837 (FILED IN ERROR; COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE) Correspondence re: Response to Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Opposition to Joint Motion to Stay Actions Against the Security Brokerage Defendants (Rifkin, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 26, 2005 Filing 836 REPLY to Response to Motion re #829 Joint MOTION to Stay ACTIONS AGAINST THE SECURITY BROKERAGE DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT , Class Plaintiffs' Response To Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Opposition To Joint Motion To Stay Actions Against The Security Brokerage Defendants In Contemplation Of Settlement filed by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan, Jackie Williams, Philip L. Erickson, Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
October 26, 2005 Filing 835 Correspondence re: Agenda for October 27, 2005 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
October 26, 2005 Filing 834 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants AT, L.P.; CPTR, LLC; and Michael G. Christiani (Murphy, William)
October 25, 2005 Filing 833 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants AT, L.P; CPTR, LLC; and Michael G. Christiani (Connolly, John)
October 21, 2005 Filing 832 CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel Transferring the attached cases to the District of Maryland (cag, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2005 Filing 831 RESPONSE in Opposition re #829 Joint MOTION to Stay ACTIONS AGAINST THE SECURITY BROKERAGE DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT filed by A Plaintiff. Replies due by 11/2/2005. (Prussin, H)
October 18, 2005 Filing 830 MOTION for Other Relief to Withdraw as Interim Liaison Counsel for the Trader Defendants by Steven S. Scholes. Responses due by 11/4/2005 (Scholes, Steven)
October 18, 2005 Filing 829 Joint MOTION to Stay ACTIONS AGAINST THE SECURITY BROKERAGE DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT by Philip L. Erickson, Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Responses due by 11/4/2005 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER STAYING ACTIONS AGAINST THE SECURITY BROKERAGE DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT)(Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
October 13, 2005 Filing 828 NOTICE by Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC re #826 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Change of Party Name (Meil, Sarah Fern)
October 12, 2005 Filing 827 Correspondence re: In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Stewart, Charles)
October 12, 2005 Filing 826 NOTICE by Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC Change of Party Name (Meil, Sarah Fern)
October 7, 2005 Filing 825 Correspondence re: Response to Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' counsel's Letter to the Court, dated October 5, 2005. (Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
October 7, 2005 Filing 824 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Move to Dismiss by Charles D. Bryceland. (Balber, Scott)
October 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER APPROVING Defendants' proposed confidentiality order Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/5/05. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 Filing 822 Correspondence re: Response of Fund Derivative Plaintiffs to Letters to the Court from the Federated Defendants, dated September 22, 2005 and September 30, 2005, and Federated Class Plaintiffs. (Prussin, H)
October 5, 2005 Filing 821 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 10/24/2005 (Williamson, Julie)
October 3, 2005 Filing 820 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on September 21, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2005 Filing 819 Correspondence re: Response to Letters to the Court from the Federated Defendants and Fund Derivative Plaintiffs, dated September 22, 2005 and September 23, 2005, on behalf of the Federated Class Plaintiffs. (MacFall, Timothy)
September 30, 2005 Filing 818 NOTICE by Nations Funds Trust, Retirement and Design Management, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Hoffman, Beth)
September 27, 2005 Filing 817 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Arlen Sloane, III on behalf of A Plaintiff (Sloane, Daniel)
September 23, 2005 Filing 816 Correspondence re: Response to Thomas Allen's Letter Regarding Class Plaintiffs and Derivative Plaintiffs Claims Under Section 36(b) of the Investment Company Act (Prussin, H)
September 21, 2005 Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2005 re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants filed by Invesco Funds Group, Inc.,, Amvescap PLC,, Amvescap Retirement, Inc.,, Amvescap National Trust Company,, AVZ, Inc., held before Judge Andre M Davis, Catherine C. Blake, J.Fredick Motz - ARGUED - held subcuria (Court Reporter M. Zajac) (bma, CRD)
September 20, 2005 Filing 815 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry G Felder on behalf of Theodore C. Sihpol, III (Felder, Barry)
September 20, 2005 Filing 814 Correspondence re: Instructions for 09/21/05 Teleconference Hearing (Isbister, John)
September 16, 2005 Filing 813 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on September 8, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2005 Filing 812 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert T Schwartz on behalf of Barbara R Anding (Schwartz, Herbert)
September 12, 2005 Filing 811 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Kelly Potter, III (Potter, Thomas)
September 12, 2005 Filing 810 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Norris Beshany on behalf of Barbara R Anding (Beshany, Yvonne)
September 12, 2005 Filing 809 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H Waller on behalf of Barbara R Anding (Waller, Jonathan)
September 12, 2005 Filing 808 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Clayborn Williams on behalf of Barbara R Anding (Williams, Miles)
September 9, 2005 Filing 807 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Walker Woodson, Jr on behalf of Barbara R Anding (Woodson, Joseph)
September 7, 2005 Filing 806 Correspondence re: Attached decision which is relevant authority on defendants' instant motions to dismiss the ERISA class complaints. (Rosen, Samuel)
September 7, 2005 Filing 805 Correspondence re: September 8, 2005 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
September 6, 2005 Filing 804 RESPONSE in Support re #790 Joint MOTION For Entry of Omnibus Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Joint Motion for Entry of Omnibus Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material filed by A Plaintiff. Replies due by 9/20/2005. (Isbister, John)
August 26, 2005 Filing 803 Request for Hearing/Trial on Issues Related to Section 36(b) Claims Under the ICA (Chimicles, Nicholas)
August 23, 2005 Filing 802 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Move to Dismiss by Charles D. Bryceland. (Balber, Scott)
August 23, 2005 Filing 801 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Balber on behalf of Charles D. Bryceland (Balber, Scott)
August 22, 2005 Filing 800 Cross MOTION for Protective Order Joint Cross Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order by Nations Funds Trust, Thomas S. Word, Jr, James B. Sommers. Responses due by 9/8/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Cross Motion#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B)(Hand, Laurie)
August 19, 2005 Filing 799 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P. re #798 Reply to Response to Motion (Holland, Mark)
August 19, 2005 Filing 798 REPLY to Response to Motion re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants filed by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Holland, Mark)
August 19, 2005 Filing 797 REPLY to Response to Motion re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants OMNIBUS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ERISA CLASS COMPLAINTS, together with supporting DECLARATION OF MAURA K. MONAGHAN. N.B.: These papers are filed by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP on behalf of the ERISA DEFENDANTS filed by Invesco Funds Group, Inc., Amvescap National Trust Company, Amvescap PLC, Amvescap Retirement, Inc., AVZ, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maura K. Monaghan in Support)(Monaghan, Maura)
August 19, 2005 Filing 796 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Prussin, H)
August 16, 2005 Filing 795 Joint MOTION to Stay the Nations Class Action, the Nations Fund Derivative Action, and the Bank of America ERISA Action in Contemplation of Settlement by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 9/2/2005 (Meil, Sarah Fern)
August 15, 2005 Filing 794 CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (cag, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2005 Filing 793 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Winston Riehl on behalf of Gary L. Pilgrim (Riehl, Carl)
August 12, 2005 Filing 792 CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel transferring the attached cases to the District of Maryland (cag)
August 10, 2005 Filing 791 Correspondence re: Cancellation of 08/11/05 Teleconference (Isbister, John)
August 8, 2005 Filing 790 Joint MOTION For Entry of Omnibus Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material by A Plaintiff. Responses due by 8/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support of Motion#2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Schwartzman, Denise)
August 8, 2005 Filing 789 Correspondence re: Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Eaton Vance Mutual Funds Opinion#2 Dull v. Arch Opinion#3 Mutchka v. Harris Opinion#4 Jacobs v. Bremner Opinion)(Perry, Mark)
August 4, 2005 Filing 788 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Christopher Bierbauer on behalf of Gary L. Pilgrim (Bierbauer, Erik)
August 4, 2005 Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by John Sheridan Kiernan on behalf of Gary L. Pilgrim (Kiernan, John)
August 4, 2005 Filing 786 Correspondence re: Defendants to respond to July 27th Submission (Shally, Joanna)
August 1, 2005 Filing 785 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Paine, William)
July 27, 2005 Filing 784 Supplemental to Oral Arguments on Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lorusso, James)
July 22, 2005 Filing 783 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Baer Borstein on behalf of Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. (Borstein, Leon)
July 15, 2005 Filing 782 NOTICE of Change of Address by Karen L Morris (Morris, Karen)
July 15, 2005 Filing 781 NOTICE of Change of Address by Karen L Morris (Morris, Karen)
July 14, 2005 Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2005 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, CourtClerk)
July 13, 2005 Filing 780 Correspondence re: canceling 7/14/05 teleconference (corrected letter) (Isbister, John)
July 13, 2005 Filing 779 Correspondence re: canceling of 7/14/05 teleconference (Isbister, John)
July 8, 2005 Filing 778 Correspondence re: Criminal Trial of Theodore Sihpol, III (Stewart, Charles)
July 6, 2005 Filing 777 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on June 17, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2005 Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before Judges Blake, Davis and Motz on June 16, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2005 Filing 775 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants . Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss The ERISA Class Complaints filed by Martine Stansbery, Jr, Katrina McKoy. (Rosen, Samuel)
June 30, 2005 Filing 774 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants . Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss The ERISA Class Complaints filed by Martine Stansbery, Jr, Katrina McKoy. (Rosen, Samuel)
June 30, 2005 Filing 773 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants . Supplemental Memorandum of Martine Stansbery Jr. In Further Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss The ERISA Class Complaints filed by Martine Stansbery, Jr. (Rosen, Samuel)
June 30, 2005 Filing 772 STIPULATION To Respond to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss by Katrina McKoy. (Rosen, Samuel)
June 20, 2005 Filing 771 CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2005 Filing 770 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions for June 16 and 17 Hearing (Isbister, John)
June 13, 2005 Filing 769 Correspondence re: Theodore C. Sihpol, III (Stewart, Charles)
June 10, 2005 Telephone Conference held on 6/10/2005 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, Court Clerk)
June 7, 2005 Filing 768 Correspondence re: Filing of Attached Affidavit of Re-Service of Defendant Headstart Advisers Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Re-Service of Defendant Headstart Advisers Limited)(Waldman, Chet)
May 27, 2005 Filing 767 RESPONSE in Support re #636 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint, the Consolidated Fund Derivative Complaint, and the Verified Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by Richard M. DeMartini. Replies due by 6/10/2005. (Fischer, Benjamin)
May 27, 2005 Filing 766 RESPONSE in Support re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions The Fund Derivative Complaint, And The Derivative Complaint Brought On Behalf Of The Bank Of America Or, In The Alternative, To Strike Certain Allegations From The Class Action Complaint filed by Robert H. Gordon. Replies due by 6/10/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Certificate of Service)(Morris, David)
May 27, 2005 Filing 765 REPLY to Response to Motion re #648 MOTION to Dismiss the Derivative Complaint and the Class Action Complaint in the Bank of America Sub-Track filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Meil, Sarah Fern)
May 26, 2005 Filing 764 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copies (Schwartz, Seth)
May 26, 2005 Filing 763 REPLY to Response to Motion re #639 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Putnam Investment Management, LLC. (Schwartz, Seth)
May 26, 2005 Filing 762 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Stephens, Inc. and Signed Tolling Agreement with Fund Derivative Plaintiffs and Stephens, Inc. by Robert K. Finnell. (Rifkin, Mark)
May 25, 2005 Filing 761 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants (Supplemental) filed by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moloney, Thomas)
May 24, 2005 Filing 760 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants (Supplemental Reply Memorandum) filed by Charles Schwab & Co.. (Rains, Darryl)
May 24, 2005 Filing 759 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Inc., JP Morgan Chase and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.. (McClammy, James)
May 24, 2005 Filing 758 MOTION to Withdraw of Craig H. Kuglar and Theodore J. Sawicki by A Defendant. Responses due by 6/10/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuglar, Craig)
May 24, 2005 Filing 757 RESPONSE in Support re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions . Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law filed by SEI Investments Distribution Company. Replies due by 6/7/2005. (Smith Klocek, Erica)
May 23, 2005 Filing 756 RESPONSE in Support re #645 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Carey v. Pilgrim Baxter complaint filed by Wall Street Discount Corporation, Alan Lederfeind. Replies due by 6/6/2005. (Rosenthal, Lisa)
May 23, 2005 Filing 755 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions Reply Memorandum of Franklin-Templeton Defendants filed by Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Rupert H. Johnson, Jr, Franklin Strategic Series, Gordon S. Macklin, Martin Flanagan, Gregory E. Johnson, Charles B. Johnson, Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., Franklin Templeton Services, LLC, Franklin Investment Advisory Services, LLC, Templeton Investment Counsel, LLC, Franklin Templeton Asset Strategies, LLC, Franklin Mutual Advisers, LLC, Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, Fiduciary International, Inc., Franklin Advisers, Inc., Franklin Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Causation of Service)(Pollack, Daniel)
May 23, 2005 Filing 754 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants (Supplemental) filed by Investec (US) Incorporated. (Polkes, Jonathan)
May 22, 2005 Filing 753 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions (Corrected Reply Memorandum) filed by Fund Defendants. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 20, 2005 Filing 752 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by Fund Defendants. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 20, 2005 Filing 751 REPLY to Response to Motion re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Omnibus) of the Fund Defendant's filed by Roger Hertog, Tak-Lung Tsim, Marc O. Mayer, Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Holland, Mark)
May 20, 2005 Filing 750 REPLY to Response to Motion re #597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Supplemental) filed by Roger Hertog, Tak-Lung Tsim, Marc O. Mayer, AllianceBernstein Investment Research and Management, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Global Investor Services, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Holland, Mark)
May 20, 2005 Filing 749 REPLY to Response to Motion re #643 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law of Defendant in Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint filed by William Post. (Taylor, Thomas)
May 20, 2005 Filing 748 REPLY to Response to Motion re #641 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law of Defendant In Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by William Post. (Taylor, Thomas)
May 20, 2005 Filing 747 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Supplemental Reply Memorandum [Docket 744] upon Counsel who have Not Registered for Electronic Case Filing by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Salomon Smith Barney Inc.. (Barron, Francis)
May 20, 2005 Filing 746 Correspondence re: Courtesy copies to Hon. Andre Davis (Carlson, James)
May 20, 2005 Filing 745 REPLY re #629 Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Ritchie Capital Management, LLC's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Ritchie Capital Management, LLC. (Bromwich, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
May 20, 2005 Filing 744 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup, Inc., CA Growth Fund, Salomon Smith Barney Inc.. (Barron, Francis)
May 20, 2005 Filing 743 REPLY to Response to Motion re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants (OMNIBUS REPLY BRIEF) filed by A Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Letter Enclosing Courtesy Copies)(Killacky, John)
May 20, 2005 Filing 742 REPLY to Response to Motion re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants on behalf of Daniel Calugar and SBI, Inc. filed by A Defendant. (Carlson, James)
May 20, 2005 Filing 741 REPLY to Response to Motion re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants (SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF OF DANIEL CALUGAR, DCIP, LP, AND SECURITY BROKERAGE, INC. IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) filed by Security Brokerage, Inc., DCIP, L.P., Daniel G. Calugar. (Attachments: #1 Letter Enclosing Courtesy Copies)(Killacky, John)
May 20, 2005 Filing 740 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Thier, Jonathan)
May 20, 2005 Filing 739 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants (Supplemental Reply) filed by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Polkes, Jonathan)
May 20, 2005 Filing 738 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc.. (Wheeler, Stephanie)
May 20, 2005 Filing 737 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants (OMNIBUS) filed by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Polkes, Jonathan)
May 20, 2005 Filing 736 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions / Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the PBHG Fund Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Old Mutual Fund Services, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Harold J. Baxter, Gary L. Pilgrim, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Shally, Joanna)
May 20, 2005 Filing 735 REPLY to Response to Motion re #597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #598 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint (AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) filed by AXA Financial Inc., AXA Financial, Inc., Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States. (Dinielli, David)
May 20, 2005 Filing 734 REPLY to Response to Motion re #597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #598 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint filed by AXA Financial Inc., AXA Financial, Inc., Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States. (Attachments: #1)(Dinielli, David)
May 20, 2005 Filing 733 REPLY to Response to Motion re #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Meil, Sarah Fern)
May 20, 2005 Filing 732 REPLY to Response to Motion re #581 MOTION to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Sub-track filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen R. DiPrima in Support of the Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Sub-track)(Meil, Sarah Fern)
May 20, 2005 Filing 731 REPLY to Response to Motion re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Supplemental) filed by Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc.. (Rosensweig, Richard)
May 20, 2005 Filing 730 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions (Supplemental) filed by Old Mutual, Plc, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc.. (Rosensweig, Richard)
May 20, 2005 Filing 729 REPLY to Response to Motion re #612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief filed by Pritchard Capital Partners LLC. (Belter, Sarah)
May 19, 2005 Filing 728 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deborah R Gross (Gross, Deborah)
May 11, 2005 Filing 727 Correspondence re: canceling 5/12/05 status teleconference (Isbister, John)
May 10, 2005 Filing 726 RESPONSE in Opposition re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by Retirement and Design Management, Inc.. Replies due by 5/24/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form 485APOS dated 10/23/02#2 Exhibit B - Form 485APOS dated 4/21/03#3 Exhibit C - Form 485APOS dated 9/23/03#4 Exhibit D - 2000 Prospectus#5 Exhibit E - 2001 Prospectus#6 Exhibit F - Form 497 dated 1/3/03)(Sucharow, Lawrence)
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Paperless ORDER granting re #719 Stipulation filed by Martine Stansbery, Jr. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/5/05. (Motz, J.)
May 4, 2005 Filing 724 NOTICE by Felicia Bernstein re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Verification of Facts Stated in Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 723 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #708 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorney Daniel Roy Gravelyn and William Kenneth Holmes and Brian J. Masternak terminated Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 5/4/05. (cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/4/2005 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
May 4, 2005 Filing 722 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Korshed J. Jungalawala, Risa B. Schneps, James Cohen, Katherine Simpkins, Chuck Hall re #710 Response in Opposition, (Rifkin, Mark)
May 4, 2005 Filing 721 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert K. Finnell re #717 Response in Opposition, (Rifkin, Mark)
May 4, 2005 Filing 720 STIPULATION To Amend Scheduling Order by Katrina McKoy. (Rosen, Samuel)
May 4, 2005 Filing 719 STIPULATION To Amend Scheduling Order by Martine Stansbery, Jr. (Rosen, Samuel)
May 3, 2005 Filing 718 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan re #715 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Bien Willner, Jerald)
May 2, 2005 Filing 717 RESPONSE in Opposition re #648 MOTION to Dismiss the Derivative Complaint and the Class Action Complaint in the Bank of America Sub-Track, #634 Supplemental,,, #636 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint, the Consolidated Fund Derivative Complaint, and the Verified Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, #612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief by Robert K. Finnell. (Rifkin, Mark)
May 2, 2005 Filing 716 RESPONSE in Opposition re #659 Memorandum,,, #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks, #598 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint, #625 Memorandum,, #612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief by Felicia Bernstein. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 2, 2005 Filing 715 RESPONSE in Opposition re #645 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Carey v. Pilgrim Baxter complaint, #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks, #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants, #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants, #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #604 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss the Pilgrim Baxter Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. Replies due by 5/16/2005. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jerald D. Bien-Willner#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D)(Schulman, Alan)
May 2, 2005 Filing 714 RESPONSE in Opposition re #640 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #609 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process and Failure to State a Claim, #641 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law of Defendant In Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint , and in Opposition to Supplemental Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by the Franklin-Templeton Defendants, the Calugar Defendants and Ritchie Capital Management, LLC filed by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. Replies due by 5/16/2005. (Waldman, Chet)
May 2, 2005 Filing 713 Supplemental to Lead Plaintiff's Appendix of Unreported Cases in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by the Franklin-Templeton Defendants, the Calugar Defendants, William N. Post II, Headstart Advisers Ltd., and Ritchie Capital Management, LLC. (Waldman, Chet)
May 2, 2005 Filing 712 RESPONSE in Opposition re #635 Memorandum,,,, #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks, #642 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint, #643 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law of Defendant in Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint, #612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief -- Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Opposition to All Supplemental Memoranda in the Franklin Templeton Sub-Track by Silvana Della Camera, Reiko Gagnon, Jean Striffer, Evon Yameen, Robert J. Saelens, Frances Hait, Felicia Bernstein, Harry Schipper, Harriet Surks, Pamela Yameen, George Swam, John E. Morrissey, Thomas F. Bednarek, Dolores Banas, Joseph Banner, Simon J. Denenberg, Ryan McAlvey, William Marcus. (Chimicles, Nicholas)
May 2, 2005 Filing 711 AFFIDAVIT of Renee L. Karalian in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by the Franklin-Templeton Defendants, the Calugar Defendants, William N. Post III, Headstart Advisers, Ltd., and Ritchie Capital Management, LLC by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Waldman, Chet)
May 2, 2005 Filing 710 RESPONSE in Opposition re #627 Memorandum,,, #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks, #623 Memorandum, #605 Memorandum -- Fund Derivative Plaintiffs Opposition to All Supplemental Memoranda in the PBHG Sub-Track by Korshed J. Jungalawala, Risa B. Schneps, James Cohen, Katherine Simpkins, Chuck Hall. (Chimicles, Nicholas)
May 2, 2005 Filing 709 RESPONSE in Opposition re #633 Supplemental,, #597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #649 MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks, #598 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint, #625 Memorandum,, #600 Memorandum, #637 Memorandum,, #638 Memorandum, #612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief, #602 Memorandum,,, #657 Memorandum, #631 Memorandum by Nadine Geller, Philip L. Erickson. (Grammer, Thomas)
May 2, 2005 Filing 708 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Security Trust Company, N.A.. Responses due by 5/19/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gravelyn, Daniel)
May 2, 2005 Filing 707 Correspondence re: Agreement for short extension of the briefing schedule between Fund Derivative Plaintiffs and defendant Stephens Inc. (Rifkin, Mark)
April 29, 2005 Filing 706 NOTICE by Investec (US) Incorporated of Change of Firm Affiliation of Jonathan D. Polkes (Polkes, Jonathan)
April 27, 2005 Filing 705 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell re #291 Amended Complaint,, VERIFICATION of facts stated in Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint (Rifkin, Mark)
April 27, 2005 Filing 704 NOTICE by Frances Hait, Felicia Bernstein, Harry Schipper re #291 Amended Complaint,, VERIFICATION of facts stated in Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint (Rifkin, Mark)
April 27, 2005 Filing 703 NOTICE by Robert K. Finnell, Felicia Bernstein, Harry Schipper, Steven Burda re #291 Amended Complaint,, VERIFICATION of facts stated in Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint (Rifkin, Mark)
April 27, 2005 Filing 702 Summons Issued 20 days as to Golden Gate Financial Group, LLC. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2005 Filing 701 RESPONSE in Opposition re #636 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint, the Consolidated Fund Derivative Complaint, and the Verified Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by Julie Parisi. Replies due by 5/11/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kruske, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2005 Filing 700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A Plaintiff re #697 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #698 Affidavit (Rifkin, Mark)
April 25, 2005 Filing 699 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan re #695 Memorandum of Law by Class Plaintiffs in Response to Defendant's Omnibus Briefs in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss (Bien Willner, Jerald)
April 25, 2005 Filing 698 AFFIDAVIT re #697 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Basar Rule 56(f) Affidavit by A Plaintiff. (Rifkin, Mark)
April 25, 2005 Filing 697 RESPONSE in Opposition re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants, #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants, #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Corrected) filed by A Plaintiff. Replies due by 5/9/2005. (Rifkin, Mark)
April 25, 2005 Filing 696 Correspondence re: Request permission from the Honorable J. Frederick Motz to file Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Corrected Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Rifkin, Mark)
April 25, 2005 Filing 694 Correspondence re: short extension of remaining briefing schedule related to defendant-specific motions to dismiss class action complaint (Isbister, John)
April 22, 2005 Filing 695 MEMORANDUM of Law by Class Plaintiffs in response to Defendants' Omnibus Briefs in support of their Motions to Dismiss (David Bershad, Alan Schulman, John Isbister) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/25/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
April 22, 2005 Filing 693 RESPONSE in Opposition re #581 MOTION to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Sub-track filed by William Solvibile, Patricia Solvibile. Replies due by 5/6/2005. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Unreported cases#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16)(Morris, Karen)
April 21, 2005 Filing 692 CTO ORDER 15 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of MD (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2005 Filing 691 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Stanley Frankel (Frankel, David)
April 12, 2005 Filing 690 Correspondence re: Cancellation of April 14, 2005 Conference Call (Isbister, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 689 Correspondence re: Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Tulumello, Andrew)
April 11, 2005 Filing 688 LETTER re: subpoena to ICI. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/11/05(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 687 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on March 31, 2005. (Judge Davis)
March 31, 2005 Filing 686 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Kathy S. Dugan, Virgil Williams, Meredith R. Spangler, Paul Fulton, O. Temple Sloan, Jr, Kenneth D. Lewis, Bank of America Corporation Benefits Committee re #684 Memorandum,, #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants , Notice of Filing of Lengthy Exhibit (Cox, Marie)
March 31, 2005 Filing 685 CTO ORDER 14 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached cases to the District of MD (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2005 Filing 684 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants filed by Bank of America Corporation, Kathy S. Dugan, Virgil Williams, Meredith R. Spangler, Paul Fulton, O. Temple Sloan, Jr, Kenneth D. Lewis, Bank of America Corporation Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration#2 Affidavit #3 Notice of Lengthy Exhibit#4 Certificate of Service)(Cox, Marie)
March 29, 2005 Filing 683 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce W. Calvert, Christopher M. Condron, Robert H. Joseph, Jr re #673 Stipulation (Holland, Mark)
March 29, 2005 Filing 682 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P. re #679 Memorandum,, #680 Affidavit,, (Holland, Mark)
March 29, 2005 Filing 681 NOTICE by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce of Change of Firm Affiliation (Polkes, Jonathan)
March 29, 2005 Filing 680 AFFIDAVIT re #679 Memorandum,, #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants (Declaration) of Wesley R. Powell In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the ERISA Class Complaints by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit Part 1#10 Exhibit)(Holland, Mark)
March 29, 2005 Filing 679 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants (Supplemental) In Support of Motion to Dismiss the ERISA Class Complaints filed by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Holland, Mark)
March 29, 2005 Filing 678 Letter providing instructions regarding filing of copies. (Motz, J.)
March 25, 2005 Filing 677 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal in Martine Stansberry, Jr. v AXA Financial signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 3/25/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2005 Filing 676 TOLLING AGREEMENT Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 3/25/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2005 Filing 675 Memorandum re #674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants filed by Amvescap National Trust Company, Amvescap PLC, Amvescap Retirement, Inc., AVZ, Inc., Invesco Funds Group, Inc.. (Todres, Debbie)
March 25, 2005 Filing 674 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by ERISA Defendants by Amvescap National Trust Company, Amvescap PLC, Amvescap Retirement, Inc., AVZ, Inc., Invesco Funds Group, Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2005 (Todres, Debbie)
March 24, 2005 Filing 673 STIPULATION Of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) by Bruce W. Calvert, Christopher M. Condron, Robert H. Joseph, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Tolling Agreement)(Powell, Wesley)
March 15, 2005 Filing 672 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copies of Fund Defendants' (All tracks) Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Stowe, Matthew)
March 11, 2005 Filing 671 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Templeton (Zaccaria, Anthony)
March 11, 2005 Filing 670 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Zaccaria on behalf of Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Rupert H. Johnson, Jr, Franklin Strategic Series, Gordon S. Macklin, Martin Flanagan, Gregory E. Johnson, Charles B. Johnson, Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., Franklin Templeton Services, LLC, Franklin Investment Advisory Services, LLC, Templeton Investment Counsel, LLC, Franklin Templeton Asset Strategies, LLC, Franklin Mutual Advisers, LLC, Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, Fiduciary International, Inc., Franklin Advisers, Inc., Franklin Resources, Inc. (Zaccaria, Anthony)
March 11, 2005 Filing 669 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Schwab & Co. of Charles Schwab & Co.'s Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints (Zeller, Stephanie)
March 11, 2005 Filing 668 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T McDermott on behalf of Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Rupert H. Johnson, Jr, Franklin Strategic Series, Gordon S. Macklin, Martin Flanagan, Gregory E. Johnson, Charles B. Johnson, Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., Franklin Templeton Services, LLC, Franklin Investment Advisory Services, LLC, Templeton Investment Counsel, LLC, Franklin Templeton Asset Strategies, LLC, Franklin Mutual Advisers, LLC, Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, Fiduciary International, Inc., Franklin Advisers, Inc., Franklin Resources, Inc. (McDermott, Edward)
March 11, 2005 Filing 667 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 1, 2005 before Judges Blake, Davis, Motz and Stamp. Court Reporter: M Zajac (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 666 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Tolling Agreement (Judge Davis)
March 11, 2005 Filing 665 STIPULATION Staying Proceedings between Camille Logue and Calugar Defendants by Camille Logue. (Morris, Karen)
March 11, 2005 Filing 664 STIPULATION Staying Proceedings and Tolling Agreement between Camille Logue and Alliance Defendants by Camille Logue. (Morris, Karen)
March 10, 2005 Filing 663 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Laura Zeller on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co. (Zeller, Stephanie)
March 10, 2005 Filing 662 Memorandum re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions, #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions .Corrected Supplemental Memoraundum of Law. This version supercedes attorney signature line of docket entry # 627. filed by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., PBHG Fund Services, Harold J. Baxter, Gary L. Pilgrim, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Certificate of Service)(Shally, Joanna)
March 10, 2005 Filing 661 Memorandum re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by SEI Investments Distribution Company. (Smith Klocek, Erica)
March 9, 2005 Filing 660 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roger Hertog, Tak-Lung Tsim, Marc O. Mayer, AllianceBernstein Investment Research and Management, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Global Investor Services, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P. re #659 Memorandum,, (Holland, Mark)
March 9, 2005 Filing 659 Memorandum re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Supplemental) In Support of Motions To Dismiss filed by Roger Hertog, Tak-Lung Tsim, Marc O. Mayer, AllianceBernstein Investment Research and Management, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Global Investor Services, Inc., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Holland In Support#2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit Notice of Lengthy Exhibit#4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit)(Holland, Mark)
March 9, 2005 Filing 658 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 23, 2005 before Judges Blake and Motz; Court Reporter: M Zajac (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2005 Filing 657 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Polkes, Jonathan)
March 9, 2005 Filing 656 Correspondence re: Cancellation of March 10, 2005 Teleconference Call (Isbister, John)
March 9, 2005 Filing 655 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Investec (US) Incorporated. (Polkes, Jonathan)
March 9, 2005 Filing 654 NOTICE by Ritchie Capital Management, LLC re #629 Supplemental Certificate of Service (Bromwich, Michael)
March 9, 2005 Filing 653 Correspondence re: Chronos Motion to Dismiss (Metts, Amanda)
March 8, 2005 Filing 652 Correspondence re: Letter dated 3/8/05 to Hon. Andre M. Davis submitting courtesy copies of Supplemental Brief of Defendants Wall Street Discount Corp. and Alan Lederfeind (Rosenthal, Lisa)
March 8, 2005 Filing 651 Correspondence re: courtesy copies to Judge Davis of Supplemental Briefs of Daniel Calugar and SBI, Inc. (Alliance Subtrack) (Carlson, James)
March 8, 2005 Filing 650 NOTICE by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants Correcting Signature Page (Polkes, Jonathan)
March 8, 2005 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER Directing that all filings are to be made in one or more of the four master tracks, i.e., 04-md-15861, 04-md-15862, 04-md-15863 or 04-md-15864. Filings should not be made in the individual cases which are identifiable as having cv in the case number. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/8/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2005 Filing 649 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to Dismiss the Class and Derivative Claims Asserted Against the Bank of America Entities in Non-Bank of America Sub-Tracks by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Meil, Sarah Fern) Modified on 3/11/2005 (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2005 Filing 648 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to Dismiss the Derivative Complaint and the Class Action Complaint in the Bank of America Sub-Track by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael S. Winograd)(Meil, Sarah Fern) Modified on 3/11/2005 (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2005 Filing 647 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copies (Schwartz, Seth)
March 7, 2005 Filing 646 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copies of Supplemental Brief filed by Daniel Calugar, DCIP, L.P. and Security Brokerage, Inc. (Killacky, John)
March 7, 2005 Filing 645 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in further support of MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Carey v. Pilgrim Baxter complaint by Wall Street Discount Corporation, Alan Lederfeind. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Rosenthal, Lisa) Modified on 3/11/2005 (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF)(cag, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2005 Filing 644 Memorandum re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants (Supplemental Memorandum re: Franklin Templeton Subtrack Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint) filed by Security Brokerage, Inc., Daniel Calugar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Killacky, John)
March 7, 2005 Filing 643 Supplemental Memorandum of Law of Defendant in Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint by William Post. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Taylor, Thomas) Modified on 3/11/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk). (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM)
March 7, 2005 Filing 642 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint by William Post. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Taylor, Thomas)
March 7, 2005 Filing 641 Memoradnum of law in support of Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by William Post. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Taylor, Thomas) Modified on 3/11/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk) (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ MEMORANDUM.
March 7, 2005 Filing 640 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by William Post. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Taylor, Thomas)
March 7, 2005 Filing 639 Supplemental Memorandum in support of MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Putnam Investment Management, LLC. (Schwartz, Seth) Modified on 3/11/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk) (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM).
March 7, 2005 Filing 638 Memorandum re #580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants Daniel Calugar and SBI, Inc. filed by A Defendant. (Carlson, James)
March 7, 2005 Filing 637 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants -- Supplemental Memorandum in Support thereof filed by The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns Securities Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moloney, Thomas)
March 7, 2005 Filing 636 MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint, the Consolidated Fund Derivative Complaint, and the Verified Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty by Richard M. DeMartini (Fischer, Benjamin) Modified on 3/11/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk) (FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; ENTRY CORRECTED TO READ MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT)
March 7, 2005 Filing 635 Memorandum re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Franklin Templeton Alternative Strategies, Inc., Rupert H. Johnson, Jr, Franklin Strategic Series, Gordon S. Macklin, Martin Flanagan, Gregory E. Johnson, Charles B. Johnson, Franklin Templeton Distributors, Inc., Franklin Templeton Services, LLC, Franklin Investment Advisory Services, LLC, Templeton Investment Counsel, LLC, Franklin Templeton Asset Strategies, LLC, Franklin Mutual Advisers, LLC, Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, Fiduciary International, Inc., Franklin Advisers, Inc., Franklin Resources, Inc.. (Pollack, Daniel)
March 7, 2005 Filing 634 Supplemental to Motion By Robert H. Gordon To Join In The Fund Defendants' Motions To Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, The Fund Derivative Complaint, And The Derivative Complaint Brought On Behalf Of The Bank Of America And, In The Alternative, To Strike Certain Allegations In The Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Memorandum of Law In Support of Robert H. Gordon's Motions To Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, The Fund Derivative Complaint, And The Derivative Complaint Brought On Behalf Of The Bank Of America#2 Exhibit A#3 Certificate Of Service)(Morris, David)
March 7, 2005 Filing 633 Supplemental to #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by AllianceBernstein Family of Funds. (Gendron, Andrew)
March 7, 2005 Filing 632 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan D. Thier in Support of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints by Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 3#2 Exhibit 4 to 6#3 Exhibit 7 to 9)(Thier, Jonathan)
March 7, 2005 Filing 631 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Thier, Jonathan)
March 7, 2005 Filing 630 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Salomon Smith Barney Inc. re #625 Memorandum, (Barron, Francis)
March 7, 2005 Filing 629 Supplemental to Motion of Defendant Ritchie Capital Management, LLC to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint with Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Bromwich, Michael)
March 7, 2005 Filing 628 MOTION to Dismiss by Stephens Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Hamilton#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4)(Hamilton, David)
March 7, 2005 Filing 627 Memorandum re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions, #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by PBHG Fund Distributors, PBHG Shareholder Services, Inc., Old Mutual Fund Services, Old Mutual Investment Partners, Harold J. Baxter, Gary L. Pilgrim, Pilgrim & Baxter & Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Certificate of Service)(Shally, Joanna)
March 7, 2005 Filing 626 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants Supplemental Memorandum of Law filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence re Courtesy Copy)(Wheeler, Stephanie)
March 7, 2005 Filing 625 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Salomon Smith Barney Inc.. (Barron, Francis)
March 7, 2005 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fund Defendants re #602 Memorandum,, (Holland, Mark)
March 7, 2005 Filing 623 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants filed by JP Morgan Chase and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.. (McClammy, James)
March 7, 2005 Filing 622 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Headstart Advisers Ltd. for Entry of Appearance for J. Restivo, E. Grail, J. Butcher (Butcher, Jayme)
March 7, 2005 Filing 621 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Headstart Advisers Ltd. for Motion and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process and Failure to State a Claim (Butcher, Jayme)
March 7, 2005 Filing 620 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Fraher on behalf of Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc. (Fraher, Laura)
March 7, 2005 Filing 619 Memorandum re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants Supplemental Memorandum of Law Supporting Dismissal of all federal Counts against Charles Schwab & Co. filed by Charles Schwab & Co.. (Rains, Darryl)
March 7, 2005 Filing 618 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Thier on behalf of Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc. (Thier, Jonathan)
March 7, 2005 Filing 617 NOTICE of Appearance by James Irving McClammy on behalf of JP Morgan Chase and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. (McClammy, James)
March 7, 2005 Filing 616 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Northeast Securities Inc..(Lawlor, John)
March 7, 2005 Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Kavaler on behalf of Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc. (Kavaler, Thomas)
March 7, 2005 Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by James John Restivo on behalf of Headstart Advisers Ltd. (Restivo, James)
March 7, 2005 Filing 613 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Northeast Securities, Inc..(Lawlor, John)
March 7, 2005 Filing 612 MOTION to Dismiss and incorporated Supplemental Brief by Pritchard Capital Partners LLC. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaints Naming Pritchard Capital#2 Exhibit B - Declaration#3 Courtesy Copy Correspondence)(Potter, Thomas)
March 7, 2005 Filing 611 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Murray on behalf of JP Morgan Chase and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. (Murray, James)
March 7, 2005 Filing 610 NOTICE of Appearance by Efrem M Grail on behalf of Headstart Advisers Ltd. (Grail, Efrem)
March 7, 2005 Filing 609 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process and Failure to State a Claim by Headstart Advisers Ltd.. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process#2 Affidavit of Nicholas Lim)(Butcher, Jayme)
March 7, 2005 Filing 608 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayme L Butcher on behalf of Headstart Advisers Ltd. (Butcher, Jayme)
March 7, 2005 Filing 607 Memorandum re #606 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chronos Asset Management. (Metts, Amanda)
March 7, 2005 Filing 606 MOTION to Dismiss by Chronos Asset Management. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Metts, Amanda)
March 7, 2005 Filing 605 Memorandum re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (Supplemental) filed by Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc.. (Rosensweig, Richard)
March 7, 2005 Filing 604 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum by Old Mutual, Plc, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Affidavit)(Rosensweig, Richard)
March 7, 2005 Filing 603 NOTICE of Appearance by L Jason Law on behalf of Old Mutual, Plc, Old Mutual (US) Holdings, Inc. (Law, L)
March 4, 2005 Filing 602 Memorandum re #579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions (OMNIBUS) In Support filed by Fund Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wesley R. Powell In Support#2 Declaration Exhibit A#3 Declaration Ex B (Notice of Lengthy Exhibit)#4 Declaration Ex. C#5 Declaration Ex. D#6 Declaration Ex. E#7 Declaration Ex. F#8 Declaration Ex. G#9 Declaration Ex. H#10 Declaration Ex. I)(Holland, Mark)
March 4, 2005 Filing 601 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fund Defendants re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions, #600 Memorandum in support thereof (Shapiro, Jonathan)
March 4, 2005 Filing 600 Memorandum re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions filed by Fund Defendants. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
March 4, 2005 Filing 599 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AXA Financial Inc., AXA Financial, Inc., Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States re #597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and re Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1)(Dinielli, David)
March 4, 2005 Filing 598 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Fund Derivative Complaint by AXA Financial Inc., AXA Financial, Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2005 (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Dinielli, David)
March 4, 2005 Filing 597 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by AXA Financial Inc., AXA Financial, Inc., Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States. Responses due by 3/21/2005 (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Dinielli, David)
March 3, 2005 Filing 596 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Carlson on behalf of A Defendant (Carlson, James)
March 3, 2005 Filing 595 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerri Eden Shick on behalf of John D. Carifa (Shick, Jerri)
March 3, 2005 Filing 594 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L Cantor on behalf of John D. Carifa (Cantor, Daniel)
March 3, 2005 Filing 593 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M McDonald on behalf of CPTR, LLC, Michael G. Christiani, AT, L.P., a/k/a Appalachian Trails, L.P., Michael Christiani (McDonald, Kathleen)
March 3, 2005 Filing 592 NOTICE by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce re #578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants Correcting Signature Page (Polkes, Jonathan)
March 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting #499 Motion of Mr. Sihpol for stay pending resolution of related criminal proceedings; DIRECTING all proceedings in this case are stayed as to Mr. Sihpol until further order of this court. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/3/05. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2005 Filing 590 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fund Defendants re #582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions (Powell, Wesley)
March 2, 2005 Filing 589 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Paul Rains on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co. (Rains, Darryl)
March 2, 2005 Filing 588 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Joseph Wilson on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co. (Wilson, Bryan)
March 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER APPROVING #584 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal in 04-1274, 04-1451 through 04-1453. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 3/2/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2005 Filing 586 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P. re #585 Notice of Appearance (Holland, Mark)
March 2, 2005 Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Holland on behalf of Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Alliance Capital Management L.P. (Holland, Mark)
March 1, 2005 Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2005 re #498 Cross MOTION to Stay re #290 MOTION for Discovery Lifting of PSLRA Stay Defendants' Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Stay filed by A Defendant,, #553 MOTION to Stay re #532 Reply to Response to Motion,, Omnibus Reply Memorandum for the Fund Group Defendants in Support of Their Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Stay filed by A Defendant,, #499 MOTION to Stay - Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Proceedings - filed by Theodore C. Sihpol, III, #290 MOTION for Discovery Lifting of PSLRA Stay filed by A Plaintiff, held before Judges J. Frederick Motz, Frederick P Stamp Jr., Catherine C. Blake and Andre M. Davis - ARGUED - held subcuria. (Court Reporter M. Zajac) (bma, Court Clerk)
March 1, 2005 Filing 584 STIPULATION re #576 Miscellaneous Correspondence Amended Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants by Joseph Banner, Simon J. Denenberg, Ryan McAlvey, William Marcus, Gordon S. Macklin, Harris J. Ashton. (Schwartzman, Denise)
February 28, 2005 Filing 583 Correspondence re: Notice of Supplemental Authority (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 25, 2005 Filing 582 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund Class Action Complaints in these consolidated actions by Fund Defendants. Responses due by 3/14/2005 (Shapiro, Jonathan)
February 25, 2005 Filing 581 MOTION to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Sub-track by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 3/14/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Subtrack#2 Affidavit of Stephen R. DiPrima in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Parent Derivative Actions in the Bank of America Sub-track)(Meil, Sarah Fern)
February 25, 2005 Filing 580 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of Certain Trader Defendants by Security Brokerage, Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum#2 Appendix Table of Contents#3 Appendix No. 1#4 Appendix No. 2#5 Appendix No. 3#6 Appendix No. 4#7 Appendix No. 5#8 Appendix No. 6#9 Appendix No. 7#10 Appendix No. 8#11 Letter Enclosing Courtesy Copies)(Scholes, Steven)
February 25, 2005 Filing 579 MOTION to Dismiss (OMNIBUS) all counts of the Consolidated Amended Fund derivative Complaints in these consolidated actions by Fund Defendants. Responses due by 3/14/2005 (Kirsch, Mark)
February 25, 2005 Filing 578 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action and Derivative Complaints on behalf of the Broker Dealer Intermediary Defendants by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. Responses due by 3/14/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Text of Proposed Order)(Polkes, Jonathan)
February 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER in 04-1274, 04-1451, 04-1452 and 04-1453 APPROVING Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 2/25/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2005 Filing 576 Correspondence re: March 1, 2005 Hearing (Isbister, John)
February 24, 2005 Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey James Chapman on behalf of Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc. (Chapman, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2005 Filing 574 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Glaser Wheeler on behalf of Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc. (Wheeler, Stephanie)
February 24, 2005 Filing 573 Correspondence re: Tolling Agreement and Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants from Franklin Templeton Fund Derivative Actions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Schwartzman, Denise)
February 23, 2005 Filing 572 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. Theodore C. Sihpol, III waiver sent on 11/19/2004, answer due 3/8/2005. (Bien Willner, Jerald)
February 23, 2005 Filing 571 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen B Kim on behalf of Jemmco Advisers (Kim, Helen)
February 22, 2005 Filing 570 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Glenn on behalf of John D. Carifa (Glenn, Martin)
February 22, 2005 Filing 569 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Dennis Powers on behalf of Jemmco Advisers (Powers, Marc)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 568 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #536 Stipulation of Dismissal #549 Stipulation of Dismissal in 04-578 signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 2/18/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation of Dismissal of Harris J. Ashton without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 2/17/05(cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation of Dismissal of Charles D. Bryceland in 04-624 Finnell v Bank of America, et al. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 2/17/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2005 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 10, 2005 before Judges Blake, Motz and Stamp; Court Reporter: Zajac. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION of Dismissal in 04-575 (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 2/17/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/18/2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION of Dismissal of certain defendants in 04-1274 McAlvey v Frankin Resources; 04-1451 Marcus v Franklin Resources; 04-1452 Banner v Franklin Resources; and 04-1453 Denenberg v Franklin Resources. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2005 Filing 562 Correspondence re: March 1st Hearing Time (Motz, J.)
February 17, 2005 Filing 561 Correspondence re: March 1st Hearing Schedule (Motz, J.)
February 16, 2005 Filing 560 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fitzgerald. Theodore C. Sihpol, III served on 2/16/2005, answer due 3/8/2005. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hoffman, Beth)
February 16, 2005 Filing 559 Correspondence re: Tolling Agreement and Voluntary Dismissal of Charles D. Bryceland (Attachments: #1 #2)(Moon, John)
February 15, 2005 Filing 558 Correspondence re: Oral Argument of Theodore C. Sihpol's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Stewart, Charles)
February 14, 2005 Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance by Asa S Hami on behalf of William Post (Hami, Asa)
February 14, 2005 Filing 556 Summons Issued 20 days as to Theodore C. Sihpol, III. (slv2, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2005 Filing 555 REPLY to Response to Motion re #498 Cross MOTION to Stay re #290 MOTION for Discovery Lifting of PSLRA Stay Defendants' Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Stay Supplemental Reply Brief In Support of Motion To Extend Discovery Stay filed by Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Alliance Capital Management, L.P., Alliance Capital Management Corporation. (Powell, Wesley)
February 11, 2005 Filing 554 Correspondence re: ICI Subpoena (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 11, 2005 Filing 553 MOTION to Stay re #532 Reply to Response to Motion,, Omnibus Reply Memorandum for the Fund Group Defendants in Support of Their Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Stay by A Defendant. Responses due by 2/28/2005 (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 11, 2005 Filing 552 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #291 Amended Complaint,, Acknowledgement filed by Robert K. Finnell. (Rifkin, Mark)
February 11, 2005 Filing 551 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1)(Isbister, John)
February 11, 2005 Filing 550 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Harris J. Ashton Without Prejudice by Deferred Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County. (Waldman, Chet)
February 10, 2005 Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2005 held before Judge Andre M Davis (bma, Court Clerk)
February 9, 2005 Filing 549 Correspondence re: Tolling Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Master Tolling Agreement#2 Exhibit B-Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 9, 2005 Filing 548 Correspondence re: Agenda for February 10, 2005 Teleconference Call (Isbister, John)
February 7, 2005 Filing 547 REPLY to Response to Motion re #499 MOTION to Stay - Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Proceedings - filed by Theodore C. Sihpol, III. (Stewart, Charles)
February 4, 2005 Filing 546 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Asa Hami by William Post. (Taylor, Thomas) (FILED ELECTRONICALLY IN ERROR) Modified on 2/8/2005 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
February 3, 2005 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Sinaiko on behalf of Edward J. Stern, Canary Investment Management, LLC, Canary Capital Partners LLC, Canary Capital Partners, Ltd. (Sinaiko, Stephen)
January 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 544 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #538 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Robert J. Jossen and Adam B Rowland terminated. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 1/31/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2005 Filing 543 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Post (Taylor, Thomas)
January 28, 2005 Filing 542 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J Metts on behalf of Chronos Asset Management (Metts, Amanda)
January 28, 2005 Filing 541 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W Pearlstein on behalf of Chronos Asset Management (Pearlstein, Mark)
January 27, 2005 Filing 540 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Taylor, III on behalf of William Post (Taylor, Thomas)
January 27, 2005 Filing 539 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Acknowledgement filed by Roger Hertog, Tak-Lung Tsim. (Kirsch, Mark)
January 27, 2005 Filing 538 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward J Stern, Canary Investment Management LLC, Edward J. Stern, Canary Investment Management, LLC, Canary Capital Partners Ltd, Canary Capital Partners LLC, Canary, CCP Ltd., Canary Capital Partners, Ltd., Canary Capital Partners, LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2005 (Jossen, Robert)
January 26, 2005 Filing 537 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Plan. Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/16/2005. (Bien Willner, Jerald)
January 26, 2005 Filing 536 Correspondence re: Tolling Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Master Tolling Agreement#2 Exhibit B--Voluntary Stip. of Dismissal)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 24, 2005 Filing 535 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Golenbock on behalf of Edward J Stern, Edward J. Stern (Golenbock, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2005 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Golenbock on behalf of Canary Investment Management LLC, Canary Investment Management, LLC, Canary Capital Partners Ltd, Canary Capital Partners LLC, Canary Capital Partners, Ltd., Canary Capital Partners, LLC (Golenbock, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2005 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Preston Ricardo on behalf of Edward J Stern, Edward J. Stern (Ricardo, Shawn)
January 21, 2005 Filing 532 REPLY to Response to Motion re #498 Cross MOTION to Stay re #290 MOTION for Discovery Lifting of PSLRA Stay Defendants' Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Stay, #290 MOTION for Discovery Lifting of PSLRA Stay, #487 Cross MOTION for Protective Order, #492 Cross MOTION for Protective Order on behalf of Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc.; Bear, Stearns Securities Corp.; The Bear Stearns Companies Inc.; J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.; J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.; Kaplan & Co. Securities, Inc.; Pritchard Capital Partners . Class Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Lift PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark Weintraub, Deborah)
January 2