Amrhein v. Regency Management Services, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Idrees Ahmad, Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr., Herb Moran, Timothy T Boyd, Rosita T. Carpinitieri, Jacqueline McClure, Carol Ann Kudisch, Drema Dunn-Smith, Richelle Parsons, Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks, Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson, Robert Boxwell, Angela Payton Martin, Keith C Burks, Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri, Latreasa Easley, Leo Herman Bourne, III, Paul Blair, Shafik Massis, Samuel E. Guilford, Linda A. Gunter, Martin Guzman, Quinton Richards, Ivan Patrick Stanback, Brian Champagne, Margot R. Loys, Marissa Drury-Jenkins, Julisa D Ellington, Mary Ann Landon, Celdrick Woodruff, Michael Burnell, Jonathan E. Eyring, Gene Pettit, Rene Romero, Sharon Martin, Karlos C. Reynolds, Kelly L. Fullerton-Kay, William Medley, Jr., Anthony Burdelas, Jr, Sylvia Jarrett, James L Morrow, Justin Lawrence, Anthony L. Morris, Gustavo C. Carruitero, Vincent Loving, Yvette Easter, Mark Miley, Dorothy Renee Sloop, Geraldine Williams, Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson, Julia K. Walsh, Derron Manning, Thomas Morris, Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III, Carmelita A Jackson, Deborah Amrhein, Jeremy R Bowers, Roumen N Dimitrov, Norman Colvin, Robin Baker, Charles L. Bouder, Mark Mazzetta, Clyde Ray Shank, Jr, Anderson Williams, Maxine Gianoulos, Janet Ruth, Brenda O'Brien, John R. Burgess, Naomi Blake, Hany Madkour, Jessica Lynn Frye, Shanti Reid, Carrie L DiPaula, Roger E. Black, Anthony A. Brooks, Margaret R. Barz, Richard Patrick Wrobel, George Haley, Noreen Harris, Judy Wells, Bahram S. Kia, Brandon Jones, Julie Oden, Elizabeth A Cain, John S Bridges, Patrick M. Ishii, Juan Ramon Abrego, Margie E Boswell, Luis F Mendez, Dana J Beatley, Aaron Leventhal, Jessica Blue, Michael Needam, Anthony J Parham, Philip Deans, Esomnna Onyeneho, Alfredo Mallard, Kinnard Wright, Jean K Manning, James Kelly, Jack Ikpe, Charles Richardson, Catherina Williams, Daryl Sisson, Steffen A Milbry, Richmond Lee Coleman, Timothy Mercer, Kenneth Bryant, Jose Andara, Luke J Baugh, Jr, Harry N. Ulu, Maria J. Osegueda, Jennifer Seltzer, Deena E. Wise, Michaela Lintz, Christopher Walker, Gail S. Hebron, Mohamed R. Khan, Patricia J Morris, Aaron Johnson, Bode O. Coker, Byron Julius Palmer, Kenneth Dias, Crystal Mays, Hal Byron Hawkins, Andrea Decatur, Ralph James Richardson, Hans-Herman Mindermann, Michael L Miller, Haley C. Williams, William E Bennet, Daniel Mendez, Jr, Alfreda Newton, Walter Goerling, Ronnya McIver, Kevin M. Beere, Alexander M. Goodwin, Terrance Jenkins, Douglas Ritchie, Herbert Thomas, Kelly N Wilt, Gregory Gaines, Robert L. Johnson, Thomas W. Brown, Richard L. Ericson, Oswald Copeland, Hector M Garcia, Katherine Marie Klemkowski, Jack W Smith, Anthony E. Ezenyi, Quinton Hill, Elizabeth Spessard, Mari A Gussin, Andrew M. Remavege, Carmelita A. Jackson, Samuel Steve Johnson, Remigius C. Ozor, Quinn L. Johnson, Daniel P. Broadus, Fayzeh S Alhuniti, Teresa Rodgers, Fairaz Raja, Jackie Harrison, Michelle Talerico, Archie L Parker, Mary Dolores Kradz, Randall E Taylor, Kirk Phelps, Tawni Thompson-Hudson, Ebony Michelle Ford, Jeffrey L. Carmon, Paul D. Atkisson, Chelsea Branch, George Brown, Jamar A. Fenwick, Gail A Foltz, Damon M. Warren, Kevin Gaddy, Kevin Harris, Shawnkia Savoy, Niesha D. Lewis, Matthew Jamison, William Campbell, Judy Fioravante, Aide Luna, Gayle L. Carmichael, Thomas E Nelson and Arnoldo Gomez
Defendant: Adbul Ayyad, Regency Management Services, LLC, Regency Furniture, Inc. and Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Sheron Terry, Kevin Peoples, Terry Anistead and Jeff Bailey
Case Number: 1:2013cv01114
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Harford
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER denying as moot #290 Motion for Leave to Disclose Settlement Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 3/4/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 29, 2016 Filing 291 RESPONSE to Motion re #290 MOTION for Other Relief Leave to Disclose Settlement Information filed by Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. Replies due by 3/17/2016. (Hemmendinger, Eric)
February 29, 2016 Filing 290 MOTION for Other Relief Leave to Disclose Settlement Information by Juan Ramon Abrego, Idrees Ahmad, Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri, Fayzeh S Alhuniti, Deborah Amrhein, Jose Andara, Terry Anistead, Paul D. Atkisson, Jeff Bailey, Robin Baker, Margaret R. Barz, Luke J Baugh, Jr, Dana J Beatley, Kevin M. Beere, William E Bennet, Roger E. Black, Paul Blair, Naomi Blake, Jessica Blue, Margie E Boswell, Charles L. Bouder, Leo Herman Bourne, III, Jeremy R Bowers, Robert Boxwell, Timothy T Boyd, Chelsea Branch, John S Bridges, Daniel P. Broadus, Anthony A. Brooks, George Brown, Thomas W. Brown, Kenneth Bryant, Anthony Burdelas, Jr, John R. Burgess, Keith C Burks, Michael Burnell, Elizabeth A Cain, William Campbell, Gayle L. Carmichael, Jeffrey L. Carmon, Rosita T. Carpinitieri, Gustavo C. Carruitero, Brian Champagne, Bode O. Coker, Richmond Lee Coleman, Norman Colvin, Oswald Copeland, Philip Deans, Andrea Decatur, Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks, Carrie L DiPaula, Kenneth Dias, Roumen N Dimitrov, Marissa Drury-Jenkins, Drema Dunn-Smith, Latreasa Easley, Yvette Easter, Julisa D Ellington, Richard L. Ericson, Jonathan E. Eyring, Anthony E. Ezenyi, Jamar A. Fenwick, Judy Fioravante, Gail A Foltz, Ebony Michelle Ford, Jessica Lynn Frye, Kelly L. Fullerton-Kay, Kevin Gaddy, Gregory Gaines, Hector M Garcia, Maxine Gianoulos, Walter Goerling, Arnoldo Gomez, Alexander M. Goodwin, Samuel E. Guilford, Linda A. Gunter, Mari A Gussin, Martin Guzman, George Haley, Kevin Harris, Noreen Harris, Jackie Harrison, Hal Byron Hawkins, Gail S. Hebron, Quinton Hill, Jack Ikpe, Patrick M. Ishii, Carmelita A. Jackson, Carmelita A Jackson, Matthew Jamison, Sylvia Jarrett, Terrance Jenkins, Aaron Johnson, Quinn L. Johnson, Robert L. Johnson, Samuel Steve Johnson, Brandon Jones, James Kelly, Mohamed R. Khan, Bahram S. Kia, Katherine Marie Klemkowski, Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson, Mary Dolores Kradz, Carol Ann Kudisch, Mary Ann Landon, Justin Lawrence, Aaron Leventhal, Niesha D. Lewis, Michaela Lintz, Vincent Loving, Margot R. Loys, Aide Luna, Hany Madkour, Alfredo Mallard, Derron Manning, Jean K Manning, Angela Payton Martin, Sharon Martin, Shafik Massis, Crystal Mays, Mark Mazzetta, Jacqueline McClure, Ronnya McIver, William Medley, Jr, Daniel Mendez, Jr, Luis F Mendez, Timothy Mercer, Steffen A Milbry, Mark Miley, Michael L Miller, Hans-Herman Mindermann, Herb Moran, Anthony L. Morris, Patricia J Morris, Thomas Morris, James L Morrow, Michael Needam, Thomas E Nelson, Alfreda Newton, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden, Esomnna Onyeneho, Maria J. Osegueda, Remigius C. Ozor, Byron Julius Palmer, Anthony J Parham, Archie L Parker, Richelle Parsons, Kevin Peoples, Gene Pettit, Kirk Phelps, Fairaz Raja, Shanti Reid, Andrew M. Remavege, Karlos C. Reynolds, Quinton Richards, Charles Richardson, Ralph James Richardson, Douglas Ritchie, Teresa Rodgers, Rene Romero, Janet Ruth, Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III, Shawnkia Savoy, Jennifer Seltzer, Clyde Ray Shank, Jr, Daryl Sisson, Dorothy Renee Sloop, Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson, Jack W Smith, Elizabeth Spessard, Ivan Patrick Stanback, Michelle Talerico, Randall E Taylor, Sheron Terry, Herbert Thomas, Tawni Thompson-Hudson, Harry N. Ulu, Christopher Walker, Julia K. Walsh, Damon M. Warren, Judy Wells, Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr, Anderson Williams, Catherina Williams, Geraldine Williams, Haley C. Williams, Kelly N Wilt, Deena E. Wise, Celdrick Woodruff, Kinnard Wright, Richard Patrick Wrobel Responses due by 3/17/2016 (Wang, Devan)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Approving FLSA Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/21/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2015 Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Order Approving Settlement by Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC Responses due by 1/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Richard P. Neuworth, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Devan Wang, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of James A. Lanier, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Benjamin L. Davis III, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' fees and costs, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemmendinger, Eric)
November 30, 2015 Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2015 Settlement Conference held on 11/30/2015 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PAPERLESS ORDER Notifying Counsel that the Settlement Conference on Monday, November 30, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 7C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/23/2015. (kfs, Chambers)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #284 Motion of defendants to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Scott McIntyre and Nathan A Schacht terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/9/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER consolidating 13-1114, 14-3242, and 15-2321 for all proceedings; granting in part and denying in part #280 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/2/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2015 Filing 284 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC Responses due by 11/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Michael)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PAPERLESS ORDER cancelling the telephone conference scheduled for October 29, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/28/2015. (daws, Chambers)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 PAPERLESS ORDER Notifying Counsel that the Settlement Conferences previously set for November 18, 2015 and March 9, 2016 will be consolidated and RESCHEDULED to Monday, November 30, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Ex parte letters are now due November 16, 2015. Counsel are advised to follow the instructions as set forth in the original Order Scheduling Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01114-JMC, 8:14-cv-03242-JMC, 8:15-cv-02321-JMC(kfs, Chambers)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling telephone conference between Judge Coulson and parties for 10:00 a.m. on October 29, 2015. Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate call. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/27/2015. (daws, Chambers)
October 24, 2015 Filing 280 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Scheduling Order by Juan Ramon Abrego, Idrees Ahmad, Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri, Fayzeh S Alhuniti, Deborah Amrhein, Jose Andara, Terry Anistead, Paul D. Atkisson, Jeff Bailey, Robin Baker, Margaret R. Barz, Luke J Baugh, Jr, Dana J Beatley, Kevin M. Beere, William E Bennet, Roger E. Black, Paul Blair, Naomi Blake, Jessica Blue, Margie E Boswell, Charles L. Bouder, Leo Herman Bourne, III, Jeremy R Bowers, Robert Boxwell, Timothy T Boyd, Chelsea Branch, John S Bridges, Daniel P. Broadus, Anthony A. Brooks, George Brown, Thomas W. Brown, Kenneth Bryant, Anthony Burdelas, Jr, John R. Burgess, Keith C Burks, Michael Burnell, Elizabeth A Cain, William Campbell, Gayle L. Carmichael, Jeffrey L. Carmon, Rosita T. Carpinitieri, Gustavo C. Carruitero, Brian Champagne, Bode O. Coker, Richmond Lee Coleman, Norman Colvin, Oswald Copeland, Philip Deans, Andrea Decatur, Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks, Carrie L DiPaula, Kenneth Dias, Roumen N Dimitrov, Marissa Drury-Jenkins, Drema Dunn-Smith, Latreasa Easley, Yvette Easter, Julisa D Ellington, Richard L. Ericson, Jonathan E. Eyring, Anthony E. Ezenyi, Jamar A. Fenwick, Judy Fioravante, Gail A Foltz, Ebony Michelle Ford, Jessica Lynn Frye, Kelly L. Fullerton-Kay, Kevin Gaddy, Gregory Gaines, Hector M Garcia, Maxine Gianoulos, Walter Goerling, Arnoldo Gomez, Alexander M. Goodwin, Samuel E. Guilford, Linda A. Gunter, Mari A Gussin, Martin Guzman, George Haley, Kevin Harris, Noreen Harris, Jackie Harrison, Hal Byron Hawkins, Gail S. Hebron, Quinton Hill, Jack Ikpe, Patrick M. Ishii, Carmelita A. Jackson, Carmelita A Jackson, Matthew Jamison, Sylvia Jarrett, Terrance Jenkins, Aaron Johnson, Quinn L. Johnson, Robert L. Johnson, Samuel Steve Johnson, Brandon Jones, James Kelly, Mohamed R. Khan, Bahram S. Kia, Katherine Marie Klemkowski, Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson, Mary Dolores Kradz, Carol Ann Kudisch, Mary Ann Landon, Justin Lawrence, Aaron Leventhal, Niesha D. Lewis, Michaela Lintz, Vincent Loving, Margot R. Loys, Aide Luna, Hany Madkour, Alfredo Mallard, Derron Manning, Jean K Manning, Angela Payton Martin, Sharon Martin, Shafik Massis, Crystal Mays, Mark Mazzetta, Jacqueline McClure, Ronnya McIver, William Medley, Jr, Daniel Mendez, Jr, Luis F Mendez, Timothy Mercer, Steffen A Milbry, Mark Miley, Michael L Miller, Hans-Herman Mindermann, Herb Moran, Anthony L. Morris, Patricia J Morris, Thomas Morris, James L Morrow, Michael Needam, Thomas E Nelson, Alfreda Newton, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden, Esomnna Onyeneho, Maria J. Osegueda, Remigius C. Ozor, Byron Julius Palmer, Anthony J Parham, Archie L Parker, Richelle Parsons, Kevin Peoples, Gene Pettit, Kirk Phelps, Fairaz Raja, Shanti Reid, Andrew M. Remavege, Karlos C. Reynolds, Quinton Richards, Charles Richardson, Ralph James Richardson, Douglas Ritchie, Teresa Rodgers, Rene Romero, Janet Ruth, Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III, Shawnkia Savoy, Jennifer Seltzer, Clyde Ray Shank, Jr, Daryl Sisson, Dorothy Renee Sloop, Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson, Jack W Smith, Elizabeth Spessard, Ivan Patrick Stanback, Michelle Talerico, Randall E Taylor, Herbert Thomas, Tawni Thompson-Hudson, Harry N. Ulu, Christopher Walker, Julia K. Walsh, Damon M. Warren, Judy Wells, Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr, Anderson Williams, Catherina Williams, Geraldine Williams, Haley C. Williams, Kelly N Wilt, Deena E. Wise, Celdrick Woodruff, Kinnard Wright, Richard Patrick Wrobel Responses due by 11/12/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
August 13, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Thoeni on behalf of Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC (Thoeni, Parker)
July 29, 2015 Filing 278 NOTICE by Deena E. Wise Consent to be an Opt-In Plaintiff (Wang, Devan)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01114-JMC, 8:14-cv-03242-JMC(kfs, Chambers)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 PAPERLESS ORDER: Adopting the Parties' Joint Proposed Discovery Plan (ECF No. 275). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 3/27/2015. (daws, Chambers)
March 27, 2015 Filing 275 Joint Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Hemmendinger, Eric)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Parties' #273 Request for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan; directing the Parties' Discovery Plan is now due on 3/27/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 3/20/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2015 Filing 273 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File a Discovery Plan (Wang, Devan)
March 4, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE by Charles Richardson Consent to Be a Collective Action Plaintiff (Wang, Devan)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER consolidating JMC-13-1114 and JMC-14-3242 for all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/19/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2015 Telephone Status Conference held on 2/19/2015 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2014 Filing 270 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copy to Judge Coulson of letter request for conference addressed to Judge Grimm (Hemmendinger, Eric)
November 20, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE by Sharon Martin of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE by Remigius C. Ozor of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Filing 267 NOTICE by Carol Ann Kudisch of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Filing 266 NOTICE by Kevin M. Beere of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Filing 265 NOTICE by Kelly L. Fullerton-Kay of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE by George Brown of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 PAPERLESS ORDER: Granting Parties Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement (ECF No. 262) regarding Plaintiffs: Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, Brenda O'Brien, George Haley and Michaela Lintz, with attorneys fees to be decided at a later time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/20/2014. (daws, Chambers)
November 12, 2014 Filing 262 Joint MOTION for Settlement of FLSA Claims by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Michaela Lintz, Brenda O'Brien Responses due by 12/1/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Lanier, James)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM (Letter Opinion) AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #257 Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Accepted Offers of Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/29/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE by Michael L Miller of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
October 13, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE by Randall E Taylor of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 258 RESPONSE to Motion re #257 MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Accepted Offers of Judgment filed by Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. Replies due by 10/20/2014. (Hemmendinger, Eric)
September 17, 2014 Filing 257 MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Accepted Offers of Judgment by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Michaela Lintz, Brenda O'Brien Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. R68 Offer to Pl. Amrhein, #2 Exhibit 2. Pl. Amrhein's Acceptance, #3 Exhibit 3.R68 Offer to Pl. Copeland, #4 Exhibit 4. Pl. Copeland's Acceptance, #5 Exhibit 5. R68 Offer to Pl. O'Brien, #6 Exhibit 6. Pl. O'Brien's Acceptance, #7 Exhibit 7. R68 Offer to Pl. Haley, #8 Exhibit 8. Pl. Haley's Acceptance, #9 Exhibit 9. R68 Offer to Pl. Lintz, #10 Exhibit 10. Pl. Lintz's Acceptance, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
September 15, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE by Carmelita A. Jackson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
September 10, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE by Kelly N Wilt of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PAPERLESSORDER SCHEDULING THE TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR DECEMBER 4, 2014 AT 3:00 P.M. COUNSEL PLEASE CALL THE CHAMBERS FOR THE JUDGE AFTER EVERYONE IS ON LINE - 410-962-4953.Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 08/28/2014. (daw, Chambers)
September 2, 2014 Filing 253 Joint Correspondence re: Request for Postponement of telephonic Scheduling Conference Set for Friday, September 5, 2014 at 3:30 pm (Hemmendinger, Eric)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #157 Motion to Compel Production and Extend the Opt-In Period. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/21/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE by Damon M. Warren of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 11, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE by Jack Ikpe of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 11, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE by Paul Blair of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 11, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE by Richard Patrick Wrobel of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 11, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE by Niesha D. Lewis of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 11, 2014 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE by Quinton Hill of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE by Julia K. Walsh of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE by Teresa Rodgers of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE by Aaron Johnson of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE by Terrance Jenkins of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE by Alexander M. Goodwin of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE by Leo Herman Bourne, III of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE by Gayle L. Carmichael of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 8, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE by Fairaz Raja of Consent to Opt-In (Wang, Devan)
August 7, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Swerdlin on behalf of All Defendants (Swerdlin, Mark)
August 7, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Hemmendinger on behalf of All Defendants (Hemmendinger, Eric)
August 7, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE by Christopher Walker of Consent to Opt-in (Wang, Devan)
August 7, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE by Kenneth Dias of Consent to Opt-in (Wang, Devan)
August 4, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE by Carmelita A Jackson of Consent to Opt-In to Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
August 4, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE by Margot R. Loys of Consent to Opt-In to Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
August 4, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE by Kinnard Wright of Consent to Opt-In to the Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE by Jeffrey L. Carmon of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE by Rene Romero of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE by Charles L. Bouder of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE by William E Bennet of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE by Mary Dolores Kradz of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE by Norman Colvin of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE by Roger E. Black of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE by Gail A Foltz of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE by Mohamed R. Khan of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 25, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE by Harry N. Ulu of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 25, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE by Jessica Lynn Frye of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 25, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE by Andrea Decatur of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE by Samuel Steve Johnson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE by Geraldine Williams of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE by Thomas Morris of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE by Daniel P. Broadus of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE by Dorothy Renee Sloop of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE by Jonathan E. Eyring of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE by Kirk Phelps of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 21, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE by Jamar A. Fenwick of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 9, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE by Haley C. Williams of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 9, 2014 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete List of Putative Class Members and Extend the Opt-In Period filed by Juan Ramon Abrego, Idrees Ahmad, Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri, Fayzeh S Alhuniti, Deborah Amrhein, Jose Andara, Paul D. Atkisson, Robin Baker, Margaret R. Barz, Luke J Baugh, Jr, Dana J Beatley, Naomi Blake, Jessica Blue, Margie E Boswell, Jeremy R Bowers, Robert Boxwell, Timothy T Boyd, Chelsea Branch, John S Bridges, Anthony A. Brooks, Thomas W. Brown, Kenneth Bryant, Anthony Burdelas, Jr, John R. Burgess, Keith C Burks, Michael Burnell, Elizabeth A Cain, William Campbell, Rosita T. Carpinitieri, Gustavo C. Carruitero, Brian Champagne, Bode O. Coker, Richmond Lee Coleman, Oswald Copeland, Philip Deans, Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks, Carrie L DiPaula, Roumen N Dimitrov, Marissa Drury-Jenkins, Drema Dunn-Smith, Latreasa Easley, Yvette Easter, Julisa D Ellington, Richard L. Ericson, Anthony E. Ezenyi, Judy Fioravante, Ebony Michelle Ford, Kevin Gaddy, Gregory Gaines, Hector M Garcia, Maxine Gianoulos, Walter Goerling, Arnoldo Gomez, Samuel E. Guilford, Linda A. Gunter, Mari A Gussin, Martin Guzman, George Haley, Kevin Harris, Noreen Harris, Jackie Harrison, Hal Byron Hawkins, Gail S. Hebron, Patrick M. Ishii, Matthew Jamison, Sylvia Jarrett, Quinn L. Johnson, Robert L. Johnson, Brandon Jones, James Kelly, Bahram S. Kia, Katherine Marie Klemkowski, Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson, Mary Ann Landon, Justin Lawrence, Aaron Leventhal, Michaela Lintz, Vincent Loving, Aide Luna, Hany Madkour, Alfredo Mallard, Derron Manning, Jean K Manning, Angela Payton Martin, Shafik Massis, Crystal Mays, Mark Mazzetta, Jacqueline McClure, Ronnya McIver, William Medley, Jr, Daniel Mendez, Jr, Luis F Mendez, Timothy Mercer, Steffen A Milbry, Mark Miley, Hans-Herman Mindermann, Herb Moran, Anthony L. Morris, Patricia J Morris, James L Morrow, Michael Needam, Thomas E Nelson, Alfreda Newton, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden, Esomnna Onyeneho, Maria J. Osegueda, Byron Julius Palmer, Anthony J Parham, Archie L Parker, Richelle Parsons, Gene Pettit, Shanti Reid, Andrew M. Remavege, Karlos C. Reynolds, Quinton Richards, Ralph James Richardson, Douglas Ritchie, Janet Ruth, Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III, Shawnkia Savoy, Jennifer Seltzer, Clyde Ray Shank, Jr, Daryl Sisson, Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson, Jack W Smith, Elizabeth Spessard, Ivan Patrick Stanback, Michelle Talerico, Herbert Thomas, Tawni Thompson-Hudson, Judy Wells, Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr, Anderson Williams, Catherina Williams, Celdrick Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
July 8, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE by Esomnna Onyeneho of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 8, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Katherine Marie Klemkowski of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 8, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE by Hal Byron Hawkins of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 8, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE by Ebony Michelle Ford of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 8, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE by Fayzeh S Alhuniti of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 7, 2014 Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete List of Putative Class Members and Extend the Opt-In Period filed by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. Replies due by 7/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Solter, John)
July 3, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE by Linda A. Gunter of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 3, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE by Judy Fioravante of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 1, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE by Brian Champagne of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 1, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE by Robert Boxwell of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
July 1, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE by Margaret R. Barz of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 27, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE by William Medley, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 27, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE by Aide Luna of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 27, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE by Anthony Burdelas, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 27, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE by Chelsea Branch of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by Thomas E Nelson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE by Jackie Harrison of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE by Kevin Harris of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE by Bahram S. Kia of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE by Douglas Ritchie of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE by Philip Deans of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE by Celdrick Woodruff of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE by Thomas W. Brown of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE by Sylvia Jarrett of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE by Quinn L. Johnson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE by Andrew M. Remavege of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by Kenneth Bryant of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE by Anthony E. Ezenyi of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE by Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE by Shanti Reid of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE by Richmond Lee Coleman of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE by Justin Lawrence of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE by Hany Madkour of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE by Shawnkia Savoy of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE by Jose Andara of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Anthony L. Morris of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE by Angela Payton Martin of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE by Martin Guzman of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE by Ronnya McIver of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE by Ralph James Richardson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE by Alfredo Mallard of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Gail S. Hebron of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by Catherina Williams of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE by Julisa D Ellington of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE by Jean K Manning of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE by Gustavo C. Carruitero of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE by Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by Arnoldo Gomez of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 25, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by Juan Ramon Abrego of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 23, 2014 Filing 159 Correspondence re: Line: Plaintiffs consented to a 1 week extension for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production and Extend the Opt-in Period (Solter, John)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER in response to Counsel's letter of 6/12/14; directing counsel's attention to #52 Order of 2/18/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 6/17/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2014 Filing 157 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete List of Putative Class Members and Extend the Opt-In Period by Idrees Ahmad, Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri, Deborah Amrhein, Paul D. Atkisson, Robin Baker, Luke J Baugh, Jr, Dana J Beatley, Naomi Blake, Jessica Blue, Margie E Boswell, Jeremy R Bowers, Timothy T Boyd, John S Bridges, Anthony A. Brooks, John R. Burgess, Keith C Burks, Michael Burnell, Elizabeth A Cain, William Campbell, Rosita T. Carpinitieri, Bode O. Coker, Oswald Copeland, Carrie L DiPaula, Roumen N Dimitrov, Marissa Drury-Jenkins, Drema Dunn-Smith, Latreasa Easley, Yvette Easter, Richard L. Ericson, Kevin Gaddy, Gregory Gaines, Hector M Garcia, Maxine Gianoulos, Walter Goerling, Samuel E. Guilford, Mari A Gussin, George Haley, Noreen Harris, Patrick M. Ishii, Matthew Jamison, Robert L. Johnson, Brandon Jones, James Kelly, Mary Ann Landon, Aaron Leventhal, Michaela Lintz, Vincent Loving, Derron Manning, Shafik Massis, Crystal Mays, Mark Mazzetta, Jacqueline McClure, Daniel Mendez, Jr, Luis F Mendez, Timothy Mercer, Steffen A Milbry, Mark Miley, Hans-Herman Mindermann, Herb Moran, Patricia J Morris, James L Morrow, Michael Needam, Alfreda Newton, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden, Maria J. Osegueda, Byron Julius Palmer, Anthony J Parham, Archie L Parker, Richelle Parsons, Gene Pettit, Karlos C. Reynolds, Quinton Richards, Janet Ruth, Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III, Jennifer Seltzer, Clyde Ray Shank, Jr, Daryl Sisson, Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson, Jack W Smith, Elizabeth Spessard, Ivan Patrick Stanback, Michelle Talerico, Herbert Thomas, Tawni Thompson-Hudson, Judy Wells, Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr, Anderson Williams Responses due by 6/30/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Fact and Law, #2 Exhibit 1 for the Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit 2 for the Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit 3 for the Memorandum of Law, #5 Exhibit 4 for the Memorandum of Law, #6 Exhibit 5 for the Memorandum of Law, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE by Jennifer Seltzer of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE by Clyde Ray Shank, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE by Maria J. Osegueda of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE by Alfreda Newton of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE by Luis F Mendez of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Brandon Jones of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE by Patrick M. Ishii of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE by Hector M Garcia of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Gregory Gaines of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Kevin Gaddy of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE by Latreasa Easley of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE by Roumen N Dimitrov of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Michael Burnell of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE by Jessica Blue of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 12, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE by Dana J Beatley of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE by Judy Wells of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE by Ivan Patrick Stanback of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE by Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE by Daryl Sisson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE by Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE by Rosita T. Carpinitieri of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE by Quinton Richards of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE by Richard L. Ericson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE by Karlos C. Reynolds of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE by Byron Julius Palmer of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE by Samuel E. Guilford of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE by Bode O. Coker of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE by John R. Burgess of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE by Jeremy R Bowers of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE by Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE by Hans-Herman Mindermann of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE by Daniel Mendez, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE by Vincent Loving of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE by Drema Dunn-Smith of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE by John S Bridges of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE by Margie E Boswell of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 9, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE by Naomi Blake of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE by Anderson Williams of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE by Elizabeth Spessard of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by Richelle Parsons of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE by Archie L Parker of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE by Michael Needam of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by Crystal Mays of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE by Yvette Easter of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE by Carrie L DiPaula of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 6, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE by Anthony A. Brooks of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE by Janet Ruth of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE by Gene Pettit of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by James L Morrow of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE by Steffen A Milbry of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE by Shafik Massis of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE by Derron Manning of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE by Mary Ann Landon of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE by Robert L. Johnson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by Mari A Gussin of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE by Walter Goerling of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE by Maxine Gianoulos of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE by Marissa Drury-Jenkins of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE by Keith C Burks of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE by Timothy T Boyd of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE by Luke J Baugh, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE by Robin Baker of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE by Paul D Atkisson of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan) Modified on 6/6/2014 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
June 5, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE by Idrees Ahmad of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE by Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE by Herbert Thomas of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE by Jack W Smith of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE by Anthony J Parham of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE by Patricia J Morris of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE by Jacqueline McClure of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE by Elizabeth A Cain of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
June 2, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE by Michelle Talerico of Opt-in as Plaintiff in Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
June 2, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE by Tawni Thompson-Hudson of Opt-in as Plaintiff in Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
May 20, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE by William Campbell of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
May 19, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE by James Kelly of Consent to Opt-In as a Collective Action Member (Wang, Devan)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER setting telephone scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/15/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #79 Motion for Approval of Collective Action Notices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/16/14. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notices by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Noreen Harris, Matthew Jamison, Aaron Leventhal, Michaela Lintz, Mark Mazzetta, Timothy Mercer, Mark Miley, Herb Moran, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MARGINAL ORDER approving #77 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice between Plaintiffs Aaron Leventhal, Herbert Moran, and Matthew Jamison and Defendants Regency Management Services et al.; directing all other Plaintiffs' claims are reserved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/9/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew Jamison, Aaron Leventhal, Herb Moran (Wang, Devan)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #74 Third Joint Motion for approval of settlement; directing Plaintiffs' counsel will receive attorneys' fees and costs pursuant to settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/6/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2014 Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathan A Schacht. Directing attorney Nathan A Schacht to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2014. (kps, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2014 Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Other Relief Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Noreen Harris, Matthew Jamison, Aaron Leventhal, Michaela Lintz, Mark Mazzetta, Timothy Mercer, Mark Miley, Herb Moran, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden Responses due by 5/16/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER setting duration of opt in period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/28/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan A. Schacht ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-4714149.) by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC (Solter, John)
April 28, 2014 Filing 71 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Solter, John)
April 22, 2014 Filing 70 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Wang, Devan)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for approval of settlement as to Matthew Jamison and held sub curia as to Herb Moran and Aaron Leventhal; setting deadline for submission of additional explanation; suspending existing pretrial schedule; staying discovery; directing scheduling conference shall be held at the close of the opt-in-period and counsel shall notify chambers of the date of notice; adopting Plaintiffs' proposed notice as set forth; setting deadline for for Defendants to provide Plaintiffs with the list of putative collective action members as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/21/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2014 Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2014 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (FTR: Nadine Mitter) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE by Herb Moran of Opt-in as Plaintiff in Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
April 17, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE by Aaron Leventhal of Opt-in as Plaintiff in Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling a telephone hearing for Monday, April 21, 2014 at 2:30 p.m., on the Joint Request for Modification of Scheduling Order (ECF No. 61), Collective Action Notice Proposals (ECF No. 62) and Joint MOTION for Approval of FLSA Settlement (ECF No. 65). My chambers will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 04/16/14. (bljs, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2014 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Approval of FLSA Settlement by Matthew Jamison, Aaron Leventhal, Herb Moran Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law)(Wang, Devan)
April 4, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Lanier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lanier, James)
April 3, 2014 Filing 63 RESPONSE re #62 Miscellaneous Correspondence filed by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Solter, John)
April 3, 2014 Filing 62 Correspondence re: Collective Action Notice Proposals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
April 2, 2014 Filing 61 Correspondence re: joint request for modification of scheduling order (Solter, John)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER joining stipulatied additional plaintiffs, Aaron Leventhal, Herb Moran and Matthew Jamison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/26/14. (das, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying without prejudice #53 Amended Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement; directing counsel to file an amended and supplemental motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/26/14. (das, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE by Noreen Harris of Opt-in as Plaintiff in Collective Action (Wang, Devan)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #35 Motion to Certify Class as an FLSA Collective Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/20/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2014 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/20/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Michaela Lintz, Mark Mazzetta, Timothy Mercer, Mark Miley, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Devan)
March 5, 2014 Filing 54 Memorandum re #53 Amended MOTION Amended Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Solter, John)
March 5, 2014 Filing 53 Amended MOTION Amended Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC Responses due by 3/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solter, John)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing counsel to file supplemental and joint motion for approval addressing issues raised in the Judge's January 10, 2014 letter order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/18/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2014 Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Scott McIntyre for Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Michael Scott McIntyre for Regency Furniture, Inc., Michael Scott McIntyre for Regency Management Services, LLC. Directing attorney Michael Scott McIntyre to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2014. (kps, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2014 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Certify Class As An FLSA Collective Action filed by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Michaela Lintz, Mark Mazzetta, Timothy Mercer, Mark Miley, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
February 3, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Scott McIntyre ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-4563339.) by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC (Solter, John)
January 30, 2014 Filing 48 Correspondence re: Order dated Jan 24, 2014 (Wang, Devan)
January 29, 2014 Filing 47 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Solter, John)
January 24, 2014 Telephone Status Conference held on 1/24/2014 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing counsel to submit authorities dealing with the employment of Rule 68 to resolve a FLSA case, wihtout Court review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/24/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MARGINAL ORDER granting Plaintiff's #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to #35 MOTION to Certify Class As An FLSA Collective Action; Replies due by 2/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/24/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MARGINAL ORDER granting Defendants' #42 Motion to Modify Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/24/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland, George Haley, Michaela Lintz, Mark Mazzetta, Timothy Mercer, Mark Miley, Brenda O'Brien, Julie Oden Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Wang, Devan)
January 23, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order re #16 Scheduling Order by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Solter, John)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference for January 24, 2014 at 12:00 p.m., regarding my order of January 10, 2014. (ECF No. 39). My chambers will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/23/14. (bljs, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2014 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Certify Class As An FLSA Collective Action filed by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC. Replies due by 1/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion)(Solter, John)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying without prejudice #30 Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreement; directing counsel to file an amended motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/10/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2014 Filing 38 Correspondence re: Line Extending Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective Action - New Deadline - 1/13/14 (Solter, John)
December 23, 2013 Filing 37 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC.(Solter, John)
December 19, 2013 Filing 36 Memorandum re #35 MOTION to Certify Class As An FLSA Collective Action filed by Deborah Amrhein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Wang, Devan)
December 19, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION to Certify Class As An FLSA Collective Action by Deborah Amrhein Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
December 19, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Oswald Copeland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Devan)
December 19, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Brenda O'Brien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Devan)
December 19, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Deborah Amrhein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Devan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 31 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Solter, John)
December 4, 2013 Filing 30 Joint MOTION For Approval of Settlement Agreement by Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Management Services, LLC Responses due by 12/23/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solter, John)
December 4, 2013 Filing 29 Summons Issued 21 days as to Adbul Ayyad, Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Regency Furniture, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2013 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Regency Management Services, LLC, Regency Furniture, Inc., Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc., Adbul Ayyad, filed by Oswald Copeland, Deborah Amrhein, Timothy Mercer, Julie Oden, George Haley, Brenda O'Brien, Mark Mazzetta, Michaela Lintz, Mark Miley.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MARGINAL ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #19 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/3/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing Counsel to file consent forms and confirming Scheduling Order entered by Judge Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/4/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2013 Filing 25 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Wang, Devan)
November 26, 2013 Filing 24 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Wang, Devan)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re: Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #22 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/25/13. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for all proceedings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/25/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2013 Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2013 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge by Regency Management Services, LLC. (Solter, John)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling a conference call with counsel for Friday, November 22, 2013, at 3:15 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is asked to call Defense counsel and then call Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/21/13. (kfs, Chambers)
November 5, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Deborah Amrhein Responses due by 11/22/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clean Copy of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Striken Copy of Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Summons Ayyad, #14 Exhibit Summons Regency Brandywine, #15 Exhibit Summons Regency Furniture Inc.)(Wang, Devan)
November 1, 2013 Filing 18 Report re: Deposition hours (Wang, Devan)
October 31, 2013 Filing 17 Report re: Deposition hours (Wang, Devan)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/10/2014. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/9/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2013 Filing 15 Status Report Submitted by Deborah Amrhein (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Devan)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER - Parties DIRECTED to file joint status report indicating which parties have settled and which parties will proceed, no later than 10/9/2013. Status report should include proposed amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/2/2013. (Russell, George L.)
September 27, 2013 Settlement Conference held on 9/27/2013 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2013 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Status of Settlement Demands (Wang, Devan)
August 29, 2013 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Document Request Letter to Defendant (Wang, Devan)
August 9, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Devan Michael Wae Wang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wang, Devan)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 06/14/13. (kfs, Chambers)
May 28, 2013 Telephone Conference re:Scheduling held on 5/28/2013 before Judge George Levi Russell, III. (Recorded on Tape) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/28/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER memorializing scheduling teleconference; directing case will be referred to Magistrate Judge for settlement conference and parties will continue informal discovery. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/28/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2013 Filing 7 Correspondence re: in response to Court's May 8, 2013 letter (Solter, John)
May 10, 2013 Set Deadlines: Regency Management Services, LLC answer due 5/15/2013. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2013 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Regency Mgmt. Serv., LLC served on Janet Thomas accepted on behalf of Resident Agent on 04/24/2013, filed by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland. (Mosson, Gregg)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/20/2013; setting telephone conference to discuss schedule. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/8/13. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 standing order on discovery procedures)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2013 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Regency Management Services, LLC. (Solter, John)
May 7, 2013 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Wages Owed by Regency Management Services, LLC.(Solter, John)
April 16, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Regency Management Services, LLC. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regency Management Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14637066436 ), filed by Deborah Amrhein, Oswald Copeland. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amrhein v. Regency Management Services, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idrees Ahmad
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Robinson Wiggins, Jr.
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Moran
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy T Boyd
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita T. Carpinitieri
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline McClure
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Kudisch
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drema Dunn-Smith
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richelle Parsons
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory DelosSantos-Weeks
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Smalls-Roberson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boxwell
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Payton Martin
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith C Burks
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Ahmadpour-Bahnamiri
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latreasa Easley
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Herman Bourne, III
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Blair
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shafik Massis
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel E. Guilford
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Gunter
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Guzman
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Richards
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Patrick Stanback
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Champagne
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margot R. Loys
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Drury-Jenkins
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julisa D Ellington
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Landon
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celdrick Woodruff
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burnell
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Eyring
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Pettit
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Romero
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Martin
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlos C. Reynolds
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Fullerton-Kay
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Medley, Jr.
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Burdelas, Jr
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Jarrett
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Morrow
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lawrence
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Morris
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo C. Carruitero
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Loving
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Easter
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Miley
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Renee Sloop
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Williams
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena G Konstantinova-Simpson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia K. Walsh
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derron Manning
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Morris
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Marcus Sanchez, III
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita A Jackson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Amrhein
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy R Bowers
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roumen N Dimitrov
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Colvin
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Baker
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Bouder
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mazzetta
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Ray Shank, Jr
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Williams
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Gianoulos
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Ruth
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda O'Brien
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Burgess
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Blake
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hany Madkour
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lynn Frye
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanti Reid
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie L DiPaula
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger E. Black
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Brooks
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Barz
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Patrick Wrobel
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Haley
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Harris
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Wells
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahram S. Kia
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jones
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Oden
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A Cain
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S Bridges
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Ishii
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Abrego
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie E Boswell
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis F Mendez
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana J Beatley
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Leventhal
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Blue
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Needam
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J Parham
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Deans
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esomnna Onyeneho
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Mallard
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinnard Wright
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean K Manning
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kelly
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Ikpe
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Richardson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherina Williams
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Sisson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steffen A Milbry
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richmond Lee Coleman
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mercer
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bryant
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Andara
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke J Baugh, Jr
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry N. Ulu
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria J. Osegueda
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Seltzer
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena E. Wise
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Lintz
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Walker
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail S. Hebron
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed R. Khan
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia J Morris
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Johnson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bode O. Coker
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Julius Palmer
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dias
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Mays
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Byron Hawkins
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Decatur
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph James Richardson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans-Herman Mindermann
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L Miller
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley C. Williams
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Bennet
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mendez, Jr
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Newton
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Goerling
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnya McIver
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Beere
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander M. Goodwin
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Jenkins
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Ritchie
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Thomas
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly N Wilt
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Gaines
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Johnson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Brown
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Ericson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswald Copeland
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector M Garcia
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Marie Klemkowski
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack W Smith
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Ezenyi
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Hill
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Spessard
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari A Gussin
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Remavege
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita A. Jackson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Steve Johnson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remigius C. Ozor
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn L. Johnson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Broadus
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayzeh S Alhuniti
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rodgers
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairaz Raja
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Harrison
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Talerico
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie L Parker
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dolores Kradz
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall E Taylor
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Phelps
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawni Thompson-Hudson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Michelle Ford
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Carmon
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Atkisson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Branch
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Brown
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar A. Fenwick
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail A Foltz
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon M. Warren
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gaddy
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harris
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnkia Savoy
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niesha D. Lewis
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jamison
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Campbell
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fioravante
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aide Luna
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle L. Carmichael
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Nelson
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnoldo Gomez
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adbul Ayyad
Represented By: John Ritchie Solter, Jr
Represented By: Parker Thoeni
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Nathan A Schacht
Represented By: Mark J Swerdlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Represented By: John Ritchie Solter, Jr
Represented By: Parker Thoeni
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Nathan A Schacht
Represented By: Mark J Swerdlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Furniture, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Represented By: John Ritchie Solter, Jr
Represented By: Parker Thoeni
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Nathan A Schacht
Represented By: Mark J Swerdlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Furniture of Brandywine, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Represented By: John Ritchie Solter, Jr
Represented By: Parker Thoeni
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Nathan A Schacht
Represented By: Mark J Swerdlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sheron Terry
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Peoples
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Terry Anistead
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeff Bailey
Represented By: James A Lanier
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?