Houser et al v. Ammco Tools et al
Plaintiff: Frank Houser and Ruth Houser
Defendant: Ammco Tools, CNH America, LLC, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cummins Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, AC&R Insulation Co. Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Palmer International Inc., MCIC Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Rapid American Coporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Higbee, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Elliot Company, Hennessy Industries Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Hampshire Industries, Inc., McCormick Insulation Supply, Inc., The Wallace & Gale Company and SB Decking Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: David Neal
Case Number: 1:2013cv01179
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting #145 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/3/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER approving #149 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/10/2014. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser (Weiner, Jason)
November 7, 2014 Filing 148 STATUS REPORT by SB Decking, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., AC&R, Palmer International, Honeywell International Inc., MCIC, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., CBS Corporation, Higbee, Union Carbide Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Cummins Inc., Wallace & Gale Co. and by Hampshire Industries, Inc.. (Maisano, Clare)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #146 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/29/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser (Weiner, Jason)
October 29, 2014 Filing 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Hampshire Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Grounds & Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Terri)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting #143 Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/21/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk).
October 20, 2014 Filing 143 Consent MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Palmer International, Inc. by Palmer International Inc. Responses due by 11/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting #140 Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/17/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting #139 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/17/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2014 Filing 140 Consent MOTION to Dismiss AC&R Insulation Co., Inc. by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc. Responses due by 11/3/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Marshall, Genevieve)
October 17, 2014 Filing 139 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Cummins Inc. Responses due by 11/3/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goss, Thomas)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting #130 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting #129 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by MCIC Inc.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting #128 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting #127 Consent Motion ofor Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting #126 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting #125 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #124 Joint Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting #123 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/14/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2014 Filing 130 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Hennessy Indutries for Joint Voluntary Dismissal)(Grenzer, Louis)
October 14, 2014 Filing 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MCIC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of MCIC, Inc. to Joint Motion for Dismissal)(Grenzer, Louis)
October 14, 2014 Filing 128 Consent MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Caterpillar Inc. by Caterpillar Inc. Responses due by 10/31/2014 (Cameron, Jennifer)
October 13, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroll, Matthew)
October 13, 2014 Filing 126 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Houser and Defendants by Certainteed Corporation, SB Decking Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loker, F)
October 10, 2014 Filing 125 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by CBS Corporation Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maisano, Clare)
October 10, 2014 Filing 124 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Roberts, Theodore)
October 10, 2014 Filing 123 Consent MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Union Carbide Corporation Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Danielle)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re: Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/22/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine S Duyer terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/16/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Katherine S. Duyer by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Duyer, Katherine)
July 11, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Goodrow Marshall on behalf of AC&R Insulation Co. Inc. (Marshall, Genevieve)
July 8, 2014 Filing 118 Correspondence re: Response to Correspondence dated June 25, 2014 (re-file to add signature line) (Attachments: #1 Draft Consent Scheduling Order)(Maisano, Clare)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/7/2014.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/25/14. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order, #2 Discovery)(apls, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #111 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/24/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2014 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Higbee, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Higbee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Correspondence to Judge)(O Brien, Colleen) Modified on 5/14/2014 (apls, Deputy Clerk).
April 25, 2014 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Higbee Inc. filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. Replies due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Request for Hearing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Weiner, Jason)
April 17, 2014 Filing 112 Supplemental to #111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Higbee, Inc. . (Trasatti, Marisa)
April 8, 2014 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Higbee, Inc. Responses due by 4/25/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Supplement Request for Hearing, #3 Appendix Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Trasatti, Marisa)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/2/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2014 Filing 109 Supplemental to #108 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Higbee, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Trasatti, Marisa)
January 23, 2014 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Higbee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6B)(Trasatti, Marisa)
January 6, 2014 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. Replies due by 1/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Weiner, Jason)
December 20, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Higbee, Inc. Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Trasatti, Marisa)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying #87 Motion of defendant Higbee to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot #102 Motion for Leave to File surreply. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/18/13. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2013 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. (Weiner, Jason)
November 20, 2013 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Higbee, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Higbee, Inc.. Replies due by 12/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, #2 Exhibit Ruling in Tawney, #3 Exhibit ECF - Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Houser, #4 Exhibit Email - unable to offer voluntary dismissal, #5 Exhibit Higbee's Conditional Response to Plts' Proposed Surreply in Opposition to MTD for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #6 Exhibit Deposition of Lawrence Earl Higbee, #7 Exhibit Deposition of James Corbo, #8 Exhibit Higbee's Answers to Plts' Interrogatories on Issues Relating to Jurisdiction, #9 Exhibit Higbee's Responses to Plts' Supplemental RPDs, #10 Exhibit Higbee's Answers to Plts' First Supplemental Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, #12 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Prayer for Jury Trial)(Trasatti, Marisa)
November 4, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser Responses due by 11/21/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Declaration in Support to File Motion for Leave, #3 Plaintiff's Surreply, #4 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Surreply, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service)(Weiner, Jason)
October 31, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Peter Creticos on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Creticos, Alexander)
July 10, 2013 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Richard D Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2013 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Higbee, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Higbee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F3)(Trasatti, Marisa)
July 5, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation re #23 Notice (Other) Answer to Notice of Intention to Pursue Contribution and Allocation of Shares (Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation re #19 Notice (Other) Answer to Notice of Intention to Pursue Contribution and Allocation of Shares (Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation re #26 Notice (Other) of Answer to Claim for Contribution (Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 95 ANSWER to #31 Crossclaim by Union Carbide Corporation.(Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 94 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Union Carbide Corporation.(Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 93 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, by Union Carbide Corporation.(Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 92 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation.. (Marcus, Danielle)
July 5, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Grilli Marcus on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Marcus, Danielle)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying #71 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/2/13. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2013 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/2/13. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2013 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Higbee, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Higbee Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. Replies due by 7/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Request for Hearing, #11 Declaration of Jason Weiner)(Weiner, Jason)
June 7, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Higbee, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Higbee, Inc. Responses due by 6/24/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Request for Hearing, #6 proposed Order)(Trasatti, Marisa)
May 14, 2013 Filing 86 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cummins Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Cummins Inc... (Goss, Thomas)
May 14, 2013 Filing 85 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hampshire Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent John H. Hampshire, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Hampshire Industries, Inc... (Allen, David)
May 13, 2013 Filing 84 Corrected ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, by Cummins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Blackline comparing original Answer to Corrected Answer)(Goss, Thomas)
May 13, 2013 Filing 83 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Honeywell International, Inc..(Brown, Michael)
May 13, 2013 Filing 82 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SB Decking Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Quaker Chemical Corporation for SB Decking Inc... (McEvoy, Leianne)
May 13, 2013 Filing 81 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation. (McEvoy, Leianne)
May 10, 2013 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Remand filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Weiner, Jason)
May 6, 2013 Filing 79 RESPONSE re #54 Order Concerning Removal filed by CBS Corporation. (Maisano, Clare)
May 6, 2013 Filing 78 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Higbee, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate CHUBB Group of Insurance Companies, Other Affiliate Travelers, Other Affiliate Higbee Realty Dewitt L.L.C., Other Affiliate Higbee Leasing L.L.C. for Higbee, Inc... (Trasatti, Marisa)
May 3, 2013 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Remand filed by CBS Corporation. Replies due by 5/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories Served March 22, 2013, #2 Exhibit B, opinions in the Bing, Garnes, Harper, and Hurley cases)(Maisano, Clare)
May 3, 2013 Filing 76 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation.(McEvoy, Leianne)
May 3, 2013 Filing 75 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint by SB Decking Inc..(McEvoy, Leianne)
May 3, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis E Grenzer, Jr on behalf of Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Grenzer, Louis)
May 3, 2013 Filing 73 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hennessy Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent danaher for Hennessy Industries, Inc... (Grenzer, Louis)
May 3, 2013 Filing 72 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCIC Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for MCIC Inc... (Grenzer, Louis)
May 3, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION to Remand by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser Responses due by 5/20/2013 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Supporting Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Notice of Motion)(Weiner, Jason)
May 2, 2013 Filing 70 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Continental Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate PMA Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company for AC&R Insulation Co. Inc... (Duyer, Katherine)
May 2, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S Duyer on behalf of AC&R Insulation Co. Inc. (Duyer, Katherine)
May 1, 2013 Filing 68 Defendant Hampshire Industries, Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross Claims ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint by Hampshire Industries, Inc..(Brisker, Malcolm)
May 1, 2013 Filing 67 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, #31 Crossclaim , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, #31 Crossclaim , ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, #31 Crossclaim by Cummins Inc..(Brisker, Malcolm)
May 1, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Anne Trasatti on behalf of Higbee, Inc. (Trasatti, Marisa)
April 30, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Schroll on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Schroll, Matthew)
April 29, 2013 Filing 64 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Palmer International Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Palmer (U.K.) Limited for Palmer International Inc... (Alexander, Jennifer)
April 26, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia N Ritchie on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Ritchie, Alicia)
April 26, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Brown on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
April 26, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Wagman on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Wagman, Matthew)
April 25, 2013 Filing 60 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Wagman, Matthew)
April 25, 2013 Filing 59 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Americas, LLC, Corporate Parent Crown Cork & Seal Company USA, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Roberts, Theodore)
April 25, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore F Roberts on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Roberts, Theodore)
April 25, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Mason Richmond on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Richmond, Scott)
April 25, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Henderson Fitzpatrick on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
April 24, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Maisano on behalf of CBS Corporation (Maisano, Clare)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/24/13. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2013 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Maisano, Clare)
April 23, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Steinhardt on behalf of Palmer International Inc. (Steinhardt, Jason)
April 23, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Alexander on behalf of Palmer International Inc. (Alexander, Jennifer)
April 22, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 52 Sealed Document. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 51 Notice of filing of state court discovery material (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Answers, #3 Verification)(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 50 ANSWER to Marvin Tawney Complaint by CBS Corporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 49 ANSWER to Frank Houser Complaint, by CBS Corporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint, by CNH America, LLC.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Neal.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge John M. Glynn on 4/2/13. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 44 Notice of filing of state court discovery material (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Interrogatories, #3 Path Report, #4 Reports)(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 42 Consolidation Order and Pre-Trial Schedule Responses due by 5/9/2013 (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM re: Date postponed (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM re: Setting Hearing in Courthouse East Room 528 (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 39 Request for Hearing/Trial (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM re: Setting date for Hearing (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 37 Request for Hearing/Trial (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 36 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Hennessy Industries, Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Welco Manufacturing Company. (apls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (apls, Deputy Clerk).
April 22, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 32 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 31 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 30 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaims of All Defendants, by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 29 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by AC&R Insulation Co. Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 28 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 27 ADOPTION of Opposition re #15 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment and all Oppositions there to filed by Palmer International Inc.. Replies due by 5/9/2013. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 26 CLAIMS FOR CONTRIBUTION OF by Palmer International Inc. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim, Third-Party Complaints and Fourth-Party Complaints, by Palmer International Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 24 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Palmer International Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE OF INTENTION by Elliot Company (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 22 ANSWER to #7 All Crossclaims and Third-Party Complaints by Elliot Company.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 21 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Elliot Company.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 20 HORT FORM ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Rapid American Coporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF INTENTION by Yarway Corporation (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 18 ANSWER to #7 Answer to All Crossclaim and Thrd-Party Complaints, by Yarway Corporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Yarway Corporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frank Houser, Ruth Houser. Replies due by 5/9/2013. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Welco Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 14 CBS CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-44) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (45-52) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY FOR CONSOLIDATE CASE #24X13000205. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 All Cross-Claims and Third Party Claims by Caterpillar Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8 Adoption of Motions by Caterpillar Inc. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 7 CROSS-CLAIM or Third Party Complaint against Ammco Tools, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Cummins Inc., Elliot Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Palmer International Inc., Rapid American Coporation, SB Decking Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation by Caterpillar Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Short Form Complaint, by Caterpillar Inc..(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 5 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ammco Tools, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Cummins Inc., Elliot Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Palmer International Inc., Rapid American Coporation, SB Decking Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation, filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ammco Tools, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Cummins Inc., Elliot Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Palmer International Inc., Rapid American Coporation, SB Decking Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation, filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ammco Tools, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Cummins Inc., Elliot Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Palmer International Inc., Rapid American Coporation, SB Decking Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation, filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser.(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ammco Tools, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Cummins Inc., Elliot Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Palmer International Inc., Rapid American Coporation, SB Decking Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Yarway Corporation, filed by Ruth Houser, Frank Houser. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report, #2 Request for Removal, #3 Inactive Civil Docket Form)(apls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-X-12000850. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14637066556), filed by CBS Corporation.(apls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2013: #1 Notice of Removal) (apls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houser et al v. Ammco Tools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammco Tools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Scott Patrick Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Represented By: Steven Andrew Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Goss
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Grilli Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AC&R Insulation Co. Inc.
Represented By: Genevieve Goodrow Marshall
Represented By: Katherine S Duyer
Represented By: Geoffrey S Gavett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E Cameron
Represented By: Richard P Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer International Inc.
Represented By: Jon W Brassel
Represented By: Jennifer M Alexander
Represented By: Jason A Steinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia N Ritchie
Represented By: Alexander Peter Creticos
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Represented By: Matthew R Schroll
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Brendan Henderson Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee, Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampshire Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Insulation Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wallace & Gale Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking Inc.
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Houser
Represented By: Jason M Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Houser
Represented By: Jason M Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?