The Harry and Jeanette Weinberg Foundation, Inc. v. St. Marks Avenue, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Harry and Jeanette Weinberg Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: St. Marks Avenue, LLC, William Spivey, Stacy Smith, Michele Gibson, Paul Archibald, Robert Lee and Delores A. Long-Coleman
Case Number: 1:2015cv03525
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/5/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 2/5/18-das)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the St. Marks Defendants' 151 Bill of Costs; granting their 171 Motion for Leave to File Amended Crossclaim; setting deadline for Smith to file a responsive pleading to the Amended Crossclaim. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/13/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/14/17-das)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 132 Smith's Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 134 Smith's Motion for leave to file second amended counterclaim; The St. Marks Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to Smiths Second Amended Counterclaim within fourteen days. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/27/2017 (c/m 7/27/17 cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/21/2017. (c/m 6/21/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) .
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Smith's 69 and 102 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot The Foundation's and the St. Marks Defendants' 79 and 89 Motions to Dismiss Smith's Counterclaim; granting The Foundation's and the St. Marks Defendants' 120 and 121 Motions to Dismiss Smith's Amended Counterclaim; setting deadline for Smith to move for leave to file a second amended counterclaim, if she so chooses, in compliance with Rule 8 and Local Rule 103.6(c). Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/21/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 4/21/17-das)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice Stacy Smith's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/6/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in party, staying in part St. Mark's 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice The Foundation's 14 , 15 , and 16 Motions for Default Judgment as to Smith, Long-Coleman, and Archibald; denying The F oundations 17 Motion for Default Judgment as to COIL; denying Smith's 19 Motion to Dismiss Default Judgment construed as an opposition. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/16/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m to Smith 5/16/16- das)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Harry and Jeanette Weinberg Foundation, Inc. v. St. Marks Avenue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harry and Jeanette Weinberg Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Peter Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Marks Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores A. Long-Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?