Borkowski et al v. Baltimore County, Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Anna Borkowski, Katelyn Frank, Kaila Noland, Marcella Fegler and Annemarie Hendler
Defendant: Krystin Richardson, Lane Montgomery, Scott D. Shellenberger, Bernadette Hunton, Lisa Dever, University of Maryland, Baltimore County, The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, Paul Dorfler, Kristen Burrows, Nicholas Tomas, Paul Dillon, Bonnie Fox, Baltimore County Police Department, Baltimore County, Maryland, Morrow Lane, University of Maryland Baltimore County Police Department, Freeman Hrabowski, III, James Johnson, Timothy Lee, Terrence Sheridan, Scott Shellenberger, Kristin Burrows, Rosemarie Brady and Kimberly Montgomery
Case Number: 1:2018cv02809
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants Shellenberger, Dever, Fox and Richardson's response to Plaintiffs' complaint is now due by November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/8/2018. (Chasanow, Deborah)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Scott Shellenberger.(Shiff, Wendy)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendant Dillon's motion for extension of time to answer to November 15, 2018, and APPROVING the parties' stipulation that Defendant Dillon's motion to dismiss is now moot with the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/1/2018. (Chasanow, Deborah)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #5 Amended Complaint, [Consent Motion for Agreed Upon Response Date to the Amended Complaint] filed by Paul Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lord, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Police Department, Baltimore County, Maryland, Rosemarie Brady, Kristin Burrows, Lisa Dever, Paul Dillon, Paul Dorfler, Bonnie Fox, Freeman Hrabowski, III, Bernadette Hunton, James Johnson, Morrow Lane, Timothy Lee, Kimberly Montgomery, Krystin Richardson, Scott Shellenberger, Terrence Sheridan, The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, Nicholas Tomas, University of Maryland Baltimore County Police Department, University of Maryland, Baltimore County.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik James Delfosse on behalf of Paul Dillon, The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, University of Maryland Baltimore County Police Department, University of Maryland, Baltimore County (Delfosse, Erik)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Borkowski, Marcella Fegler, Katelyn Frank, Annemarie Hendler, Kaila Noland re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, Amended (Baldwin, Rignal)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anna Borkowski, Marcella Fegler, Katelyn Frank, Annemarie Hendler, Kaila Noland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Baldwin, Rignal)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All defendants, filed by Anna Borkowski, Katelyn Frank, Marcella Fegler, Annemarie Hendler, Kaila Noland. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Redline/Comparison Copy)(Baldwin, Rignal) Modified on 10/19/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paul Dillon (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Index, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Lord, Christopher)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR)Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Police Department, Baltimore County, Maryland, Kristen Burrows, Lisa Dever, Paul Dillon, Paul Dorfler, Bonnie Fox, Bernadette Hunton, Kriseten Montgomery, Krystin Richardson, Scott Shellenberger, The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, Nicholas Tomas, University of Maryland, Baltimore County.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/12/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Police Department, Baltimore County, Maryland, Kristen Burrows, Lisa Dever, Paul Dillon, Paul Dorfler, Bonnie Fox, Bernadette Hunton, Kriseten Montgomery, Krystin Richardson, Scott Shellenberger, The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, Nicholas Tomas, University of Maryland, Baltimore County.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7551632.), filed by Anna Borkowski, Katelyn Frank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Baldwin, Rignal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borkowski et al v. Baltimore County, Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystin Richardson
Represented By: Wendy L Shiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Shellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Hunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Dever
Represented By: Wendy L Shiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland, Baltimore County
Represented By: Erik James Delfosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland
Represented By: Erik James Delfosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dorfler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Tomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dillon
Represented By: Christopher Bowie Lord
Represented By: Erik James Delfosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Fox
Represented By: Wendy L Shiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrow Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Baltimore County Police Department
Represented By: Erik James Delfosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Hrabowski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Shellenberger
Represented By: Wendy L Shiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Borkowski
Represented By: Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Represented By: Stephen Craig Rigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Frank
Represented By: Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Represented By: Stephen Craig Rigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaila Noland
Represented By: Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Fegler
Represented By: Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annemarie Hendler
Represented By: Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?