Prasad v. Brennan et al

Plaintiff: Rajendra M. Prasad
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service and Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 1:2018cv03946
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 5:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rajendra M. Prasad. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Paliath, Dilip)
December 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Rajendra M. Prasad re #1 Complaint, Civil cover sheet (Paliath, Dilip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Rajendra M. Prasad was filed missing information. **Please file a civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link civil cover sheet to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rajendra M. Prasad (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General Summons)(Paliath, Dilip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rajendra M. Prasad (Paliath, Dilip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement [1-1] to the complaint, filed by Rajendra M. Prasad, was filed incorrectly. **Please refile disclosure statement under the "Other Documents" category and select the "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" event. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR and the link disabled (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/21/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7744181.), filed by Rajendra M. Prasad. (Attachments: #1 (FILED IN ERROR) Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Summons Megan J. Brennan Summons, #3 Summons U.S. Postal Service Summons)(Paliath, Dilip) Modified on 12/21/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prasad v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajendra M. Prasad
Represented By: Dilip B Paliath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?