Oates et al v. Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters et al

Plaintiff: Randolph Wayne Oates and Emanuel David Joshua Oates
Defendant: Andre Davis, Terrance Sheridanin, Woodland Wilson, David Folberauer, Jane Doe, James Monahan, Baltimore County Police Department, Dennis Belp, Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters, Officer Sands, John Doe, Catherine Pugh, Baltimore County, Steve Hiabach, Robert McMcullough, Alexander Jones, Gordan Skinner, John McGann, Daniel Kaliszak and Jay Landsman
Case Number: 1:2019cv01420
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983d
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying (7) Motion of Regina Lewis to Reopen Case; Directing Clerk shall not accept for filing any further pleadings in this case unless it is a Notice of Appeal; Directing Clerk to docket a copy of this order in RDB-19-1420. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/8/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01473-RDB, 1:19-cv-01420-RDB (c/m 7/8/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Dismiss; Granting #9 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; Dismissing #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/21/2019. (c/m 6/21/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice by Randolph Wayne Oates(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters was filed incorrectly. *****Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 -[FILED IN ERROR]- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters (Cherry, Ronald) Modified on 6/20/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Randolph Wayne Oates and Emanuel David Joshua Oates (c/m 6/19/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Emanuel David Joshua Oates and Randolph Wayne Oates (c/m 6/19/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 -[FILED IN ERROR, Incorrect Letter]- Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Randolph Wayne Oates and Emanuel David Joshua Oates (c/m 6/19/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/19/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherry, Ronald)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to either pay the full filing fee or file a motion seeking its waiver;Plaintiff IS GRANTED 28 days to provide evidence of his authority to pursue claims as personal representative of Emanuel Oates's estate;Plaintiff IS GRANTED 28 days to AMEND the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/29/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m of order and IFP form 5.29.19)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore County, Baltimore County Police Department, Dennis Belp, Andre Davis, Jane Doe, John Doe, Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters, David Folberauer, Steve Hiabach, Alexander Jones, Daniel Kaliszak, Jay Landsman, John McGann, Robert McMcullough, James Monahan, Catherine Pugh, Officer Sands, Terrance Sheridanin, Gordan Skinner, Woodland Wilson, filed by Emanuel David Joshua Oates, Randolph Wayne Oates.(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oates et al v. Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Sheridanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Folberauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Belp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Corporate Headquaters
Represented By: Ronald M Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hiabach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McMcullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordan Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kaliszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Landsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Wayne Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel David Joshua Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?