Anderson v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Nicole Anderson and Bassem Refaat Ahmed Mohamed
Defendant: Gregory L. Collett, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2019cv02215
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Nicole Anderson, Bassem Refaat Ahmed Mohamed. Gregory L. Collett served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019.(Said, Naima)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued (TO U.S. ATTORNEY) 60 days as to William Barr, Gregory L. Collett, Kevin McAleenan, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crystal Nicole Anderson (Said, Naima)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint, filed by Crystal Nicole Anderson, Bassem Refaat Ahmed Mohamed. **The following attachment is missing - Summons for U.S. Attorney. To correct this problem, file Summons for U.S. Attorney using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for U.S. Attorney to #1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to William Barr, Gregory L. Collett, Kevin McAleenan, Christopher Wray, and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8151570.), filed by Crystal Nicole Anderson, Bassam Refaat Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Said, Naima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Nicole Anderson
Represented By: Naima M Said
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bassem Refaat Ahmed Mohamed
Represented By: Naima M Said
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?