Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Bawa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Rising George Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC and Rondor Music International, Inc.
Defendant: Rajpal Singh, Harpal Singh, Bawa Inc. d/b/a Sizzle and Bawa, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03127
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MARGINAL ORDER approving #19 Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/27/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 Status Report Submitted by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music (Stadfeld, Max)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stadfeld, Max)
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/26/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/26/2019. (daws, Chambers)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/26/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 Status Report Submitted by Bawa, Inc., Harpal Singh, Rajpal Singh (Boozer, Frank)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 Status Report Submitted by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music (Stadfeld, Max)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/2/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Bawa, Inc..(Boozer, Frank)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendants Bawa, Inc. d/b/a Sizzle and Rajpal Singh by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music(Stadfeld, Max)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Harpal Singh served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019.(Stadfeld, Max)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc. re #7 Summons Returned Executed, to Withdrawal Proof of Service of Defendant Harpal Singh (Stadfeld, Max)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Harpal Singh served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Rajpal Singh served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Bawa, Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bawa, Inc., Harpal Singh, Rajpal Singh.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Correspondence to Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Stadfeld, Max)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8316777.), filed by Hip City Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Jeff Diggs Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Tokeco Tunes, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Bawa, Inc., #4 Summons Rajpal Singh, #5 Summons Harpal Singh)(Stadfeld, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Bawa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wacissa River Music, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Apple Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rising George Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Meets Girl Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilfrost Publishing
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Diggs Music
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA, LLC
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Max S Stadfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajpal Singh
Represented By: Frank V Boozer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpal Singh
Represented By: Frank V Boozer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bawa Inc. d/b/a Sizzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bawa, Inc.
Represented By: Frank V Boozer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?