Garrison v. Maryland Baltimore Co. BCDC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Garrison
Defendant: Prime Care Health, Inc., Aramark Food Company and Maryland Baltimore Co. BCDC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02381
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2020. (c/m 10/15/2020) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information; Granting Plaintiff 28 days to Supplement Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/31/2020. (c/m 8/31/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Garrison(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aramark Food Company, Maryland Baltimore Co. BCDC, Prime Care Health, Inc., filed by Michael Garrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison v. Maryland Baltimore Co. BCDC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Baltimore Co. BCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?