Ivanov v. Jones et al
Petitioner: Ivanov S. Patel and Pavel S. Ivanov
Respondent: Paige C. Jones and Maryland Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2023cv02903
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Elliott Hunter on behalf of Paige C. Jones, Maryland Attorney General (Hunter, William)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that Respondents shall file an Answer to the Petition within 40 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/21/2023. (c/m p and c/em as directed 11/21/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pavel S. Ivanov (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Pavel S. Ivanov (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Release of Prisoner in a Habeas Corpus Proceeding by Pavel S. Ivanov (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Ivanov S. Patel. (c/m p 10/25/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2023 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6317 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ivanov S. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanov v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivanov S. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pavel S. Ivanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paige C. Jones
Represented By: William Elliott Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maryland Attorney General
Represented By: William Elliott Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?