International Refugee Assistance Project et al v. Trump et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Samaneh Takaloo, John Doe 1-4 and Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson and Michael Dempsey
Amicus: Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program, Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs and AMERICAN JEWISH WORLD SERVICE
Case Number: 8:2017cv00361
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Theodore D. Chuang
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 185 Featured Case ORDER of USCA granting the unopposed motion to supplement the record include the "Supplemental Declaration of John Doe #3," executed on May 4, 2017, granting the motion and supplements the record on appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(e) and Local Rule 10(d) as to 160 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rex W. Tillerson, Department of Homeland Security, Daniel Coats, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump (Attachment: # 1 Declaration)(krc, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2017 184 Featured Case ORDER staying 93 Amended Complaint, pending resolution of appellate proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/19/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2017 183 NOTICE by Daniel Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump re 93 Amended Complaint re Intent to File Unopposed Motion to Stay Response Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garg, Arjun)
April 10, 2017 182 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice 177 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction; staying courts resolution of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/10/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2017 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re 177 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Record 1-127)(Keaney, Melissa)
March 31, 2017 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re 177 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 30, 2017 179 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hawaii Preliminary Injunction Order)(Keaney, Melissa)
March 24, 2017 178 STATUS REPORT by Daniel Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Garg, Arjun)
March 24, 2017 177 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed(Espiritu, Nicholas)
March 23, 2017 176 STATUS REPORT by Daniel Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump(Garg, Arjun)
March 23, 2017 175 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER, in light of 174 Notice of Withdrawal, finding as moot 63 Motion for Expedited Discovery and 92 Renewed Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/23/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 23, 2017 174 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed re 92 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Discovery Notice of Withdrawal (Jadwat, Omar)
March 23, 2017 173 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Spencer E Amdur. Directing attorney Spencer E Amdur to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2017 172 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiffs to clarify whether they also intend to withdraw 92 Renewed Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/23/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 22, 2017 171 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed re 63 MOTION for Discovery on an Expedited Basis Notice of Withdrawal (Jadwat, Omar)
March 22, 2017 169 Featured Case ORDER directing parties to submit briefing on issues of the Court's jurisdiction over the proposed motion; continuing the scheduled Motions Hearing. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/22/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2017 170 Case Management Conference held on 3/21/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-KLS-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2017 168 NOTICE of Intent to File a Motion for Preliminary Injunction of EO § 6 by HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe # 2, John Does 1 & 3, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed (Cox, Justin)
March 20, 2017 167 Featured Case ORDER scheduling a telephone status conference for March 21, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/20/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2017 166 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 148 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carlos Singer. Directing attorney Carlos Singer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/20/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2017 165 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 147 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Huang. Directing attorney Katherine Huang to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/20/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2017 164 USCA Case Number 17-1351 for 160 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rex W. Tillerson, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Michael Dempsey, Donald J. Trump. Case Manager - Jeffrey Neal (krc, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2017 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 90 MOTION for Other Relief for Jane Doe #2 to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2017 162 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (C/M 03/17/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2017 161 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 160 Notice of Appeal,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(krc, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2017 160 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 150 Order on Motion for TRO, 149 Memorandum Opinion by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump. (Garg, Arjun)
March 17, 2017 159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Spencer Amdur (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6557021.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Rocah, David)
March 17, 2017 158 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 132 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers) Modified on 3/17/2017 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 17, 2017 157 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 125 Motion for Leave to Add the National Council of Churches of Christ in the USA to Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition's Brief. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 156 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 123 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 155 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 118 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 154 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 116 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 153 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 102 Interfaith Coalition's Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 152 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot 91 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order in light of 95 Amended Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ps2s, Chambers)
March 16, 2017 151 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (TRO Hearing) held on March 15, 2017, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Court Reporter Cindy Davis, Telephone number (301) 344-3228. Total number of pages filed: 87. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2017.(cd, Court Reporter)
March 16, 2017 150 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2017 149 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 148 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carlos A. Singer by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez. The fee has already been paid.(Shebaya, Sirine)
March 15, 2017 147 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine K. Huang by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez. The fee has already been paid.(Shebaya, Sirine)
March 15, 2017 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei on behalf of Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump (Schwei, Daniel)
March 15, 2017 145 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 143 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew R Guy. Directing attorney Andrew R Guy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 144 Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2017 re 95 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: Cindy Davis - 2B) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 143 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Robert Guy by Interfaith Coalition. The fee has already been paid.(Collins, Kevin)
March 15, 2017 142 QC NOTICE: 121 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 141 QC NOTICE: 119 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 140 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 115 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amir H Ali. Attorney Amir H Ali will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 139 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn Bi. Directing attorney Kathryn Bi to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 138 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karun Tilak. Directing attorney Karun Tilak to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 137 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Baker. Directing attorney Michael Baker to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 136 QC NOTICE: 105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interfaith Coalition needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 135 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 104 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alexandra P Grayner. Directing attorney Alexandra P Grayner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 134 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 103 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert D Fram. Directing attorney Robert D Fram to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2017 132 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Immigration Reform Law Institute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief In Support of Defendants and In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hethmon, Michael)
March 14, 2017 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Meriwether Hethmon on behalf of Immigration Reform Law Institute (Hethmon, Michael)
March 14, 2017 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo.(Jadwat, Omar)
March 14, 2017 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Espiritu on behalf of HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Espiritu, Nicholas)
March 14, 2017 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa S Keaney on behalf of HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Keaney, Melissa)
March 14, 2017 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C Tumlin on behalf of HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Tumlin, Karen)
March 14, 2017 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Sung on behalf of HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Sung, Esther)
March 14, 2017 125 MOTION for Leave to File TO ADD THE NATIONAL COUNCIL OF CHURCHES OF CHRIST IN THE USA TO AMICI CURIAE INTERFAITH COALITIONS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Interfaith Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin)
March 14, 2017 124 RESPONSE re 110 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs.(Mills, David)
March 13, 2017 133 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae by Victor Williams (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2017 123 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by Former National Security Officials (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs)(Connolly, John)
March 13, 2017 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 13, 2017 121 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carlos A. Singer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6550055.) by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez(Shebaya, Sirine)
March 13, 2017 120 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Connolly on behalf of Former National Security Officials (Connolly, John)
March 13, 2017 119 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine K. Huang (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6550035.) by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez(Shebaya, Sirine)
March 13, 2017 118 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Kelly Lyttle Hernandez(Shebaya, Sirine)
March 13, 2017 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re 92 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 13, 2017 116 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center by Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Memorandum in Support for Motion for Leave)(Nannis, Veronica)
March 13, 2017 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amir H. Ali (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6549385.) by Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center(Nannis, Veronica)
March 13, 2017 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Byam Nannis on behalf of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center (Nannis, Veronica)
March 13, 2017 113 RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION for Other Relief for Jane Doe #2 to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 13, 2017 112 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot 99 Motion for Leave to File in light of 102 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/13/2017. (nr, Chambers)
March 13, 2017 111 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/13/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
March 13, 2017 110 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 72 Motion of Anti-Defamation League and Jewish Council for Public Affairs For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/13/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
March 13, 2017 109 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/13/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
March 13, 2017 108 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn Bi (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547731.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 107 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Karun Tilak (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547567.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 106 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Baker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547566.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 105 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Robert Guy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547565.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 104 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexandra P. Grayner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547563.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert D. Fram (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6547562.) by Interfaith Coalition(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 102 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Interfaith Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 101 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Zapf, III on behalf of Interfaith Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Zapf, William)
March 12, 2017 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B Collins on behalf of Interfaith Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 99 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Interfaith Coalition Supporting the Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Based on the Language of the Executive Order and the Report of the State Department (Attachments: # 1 Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin)
March 12, 2017 98 RESPONSE in Support re 64 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4.(Keaney, Melissa)
March 12, 2017 97 (FILED IN ERROR- PER COUNSEL REFILED)NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Zapf, III on behalf of Interfaith Coalition Supporting the Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Based on the Language of the Executive Order and the Report of the State Department (Zapf, William) Modified on 3/15/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2017 96 (FILED IN ERROR- PER COUNSEL REFILED)NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B Collins on behalf of Interfaith Coalition Supporting the Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Based on the Language of the Executive Order and the Report of the State Department (Collins, Kevin) Modified on 3/15/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
March 11, 2017 95 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IRAP Declaration, # 2 Exhibit HIAS Declaration, # 3 Exhibit MESA Declaration, # 4 Exhibit John Doe #1 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit John Doe #3 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Meteab Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Jane Doe #2 Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Mohomed Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Harrison Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt.1, # 11 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt.2, # 12 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt.3)(Jadwat, Omar)
March 11, 2017 94 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo of Corrected Brief and Exhibits (Jadwat, Omar)
March 10, 2017 93 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, International Refugee Assistance Project, Allan Hakky, Samaneh Takaloo, HIAS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint [Redacted])(Keaney, Melissa)
March 10, 2017 92 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Discovery by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4(Jadwat, Omar)
March 10, 2017 91 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IRAP Declaration, # 2 Exhibit HIAS Declaration, # 3 Exhibit MESA Declaration, # 4 Exhibit John Doe 1 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit John Doe 3 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Mateab Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Jane Doe 2 Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Mohomed Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Harrison Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt. 1, # 11 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt. 2, # 12 Exhibit Hausman Declaration Pt. 3)(Jadwat, Omar)
March 10, 2017 90 MOTION for Other Relief for Jane Doe #2 to Proceed Under Pseudonym by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decl. of Jane Doe #2)(Cox, Justin)
March 10, 2017 89 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, International Refugee Assistance Project, Allan Hakky, Samaneh Takaloo, HIAS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint [REDLINED])(Keaney, Melissa) Modified on 3/10/2017 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
March 10, 2017 88 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER correcting 87 Paperless Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym will proceed as a separate Motion. If the Government wishes to oppose the Motion, they will be permitted to file a separate Memorandum in Opposition. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/10/2017. (nr, Chambers)
March 10, 2017 87 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiffs are granted permission to file an oversize brief as to the consolidated Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. The Government is granted permission to file an oversize brief for its consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to that filing. Briefs should not exceed 40 pages and should be in 12-point font, including footnotes, with 1" margins on all sides. Plaintiffs are granted permission to file their renewed Motion for Expedited Discovery as a separate motion, to which the Government will then be entitled to file a separate Memorandum in Opposition. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/10/2017. (nr, Chambers)
March 10, 2017 86 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint by Friday, March 10, 2017 by 5:00 p.m.; granting plaintiffs leave to file motions - deemed timely if filed by Friday, March 10, 2017 by 5:00 p.m.; Motions hearing scheduled for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/10/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2017 85 Case Management Conference held on 3/10/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-KLS-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2017 84 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a telephone Case Management Conference is scheduled for 9:15 a.m. on Friday, May 10, 2017 to discuss 83 Request for Conference. Instructions for the call have been emailed to the parties. (nr, Chambers)
March 9, 2017 83 Request for Conference (Espiritu, Nicholas)
March 8, 2017 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 8, 2017 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 63 MOTION for Discovery on an Expedited Basis filed by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump.(Garg, Arjun)
March 7, 2017 80 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alyssa T Saunders. Directing attorney Alyssa T Saunders to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2017 79 NOTICE by Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump of Filing of Executive Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Michelle)
March 3, 2017 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Bennett on behalf of All Defendants (Bennett, Michelle)
March 3, 2017 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by AMERICAN JEWISH WORLD SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Amicus Brief of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Orgnaizations, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wine, Bradley)
March 3, 2017 76 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Bradley D Wine on behalf of AMERICAN JEWISH WORLD SERVICE(Wine, Bradley)
March 3, 2017 75 Third Party MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alyssa T. Saunders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6533805.) by Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs(Mills, David)
March 3, 2017 74 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jewish Council for Public Affairs (Mills, David)
March 3, 2017 73 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Anti-Defamation League (Mills, David)
March 3, 2017 72 Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Brief of Anti-Defamation League and Jewish Council for Public Affairs, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
March 3, 2017 71 NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Mills on behalf of Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs (Mills, David)
March 3, 2017 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Weaver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weaver, Heather)
March 3, 2017 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mach on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mach, Daniel)
March 2, 2017 68 MOTION for Leave to File Brief As Amicus Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program's Amicus Brief)(Salzman, Donald)
March 2, 2017 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Paul Salzman on behalf of Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program (Salzman, Donald)
March 1, 2017 66 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Doe Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/1/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2017 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo, Allan Hakky, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Certificate of Service)(Jadwat, Omar)
February 22, 2017 64 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Declarations and Exhibits (J.R. 1-166))(Cox, Justin)
February 22, 2017 63 MOTION for Discovery on an Expedited Basis by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Cox, Justin)
February 22, 2017 62 QC NOTICE: 61 Certificate of Service filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2017 61 (FILED IN ERROR)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo re 4 Case Management Order, 1 Complaint, 25 Summons Issued as to USA, (Jadwat, Omar) Modified on 2/22/2017 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 16, 2017 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar C Jadwat on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jadwat, Omar)
February 14, 2017 59 Featured Case ORDER deeming as filed 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms; granting Plaintiffs leave to file Motions; scheduling a Motions hearing for March 28, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/14/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2017 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun Garg on behalf of All Defendants (Garg, Arjun)
February 13, 2017 57 Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-KLS-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 56 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 48 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah Mehta. Directing attorney Sarah Mehta to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 47 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Omar C Jadwat. Directing attorney Omar C Jadwat to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 46 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lee Gelernt. Directing attorney Lee Gelernt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 45 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hugh Handeyside. Directing attorney Hugh Handeyside to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 52 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 44 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hina Shamsi. Directing attorney Hina Shamsi to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 43 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cody Wofsy. Directing attorney Cody Wofsy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 42 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cecillia D Wang. Directing attorney Cecillia D Wang to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 49 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo of Intent to File Motion for Expedited Discovery (Cox, Justin)
February 10, 2017 48 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Mehta by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 47 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Omar Jadwat by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 46 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lee Gelernt by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 45 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hugh Handeyside by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 44 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hina Shamsi by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 43 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cody Wofsy by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 42 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cecillia Wang by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David)
February 10, 2017 41 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE is scheduled to discuss 6 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and 40 Notice of Intent to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction for February 13, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. Instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties. (ps2s, Chambers)
February 10, 2017 40 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Samaneh Takaloo of Intent to File a Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cox, Justin)
February 10, 2017 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Esther Sung. Directing attorney Esther Sung to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melissa S Keaney. Directing attorney Melissa S Keaney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicholas Espiritu. Directing attorney Nicholas Espiritu to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karen C Tumlin. Directing attorney Karen C Tumlin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Mach. Directing attorney Daniel Mach to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Heather Lynn Weaver. Attorney Heather Lynn Weaver will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David D Cole. Directing attorney David D Cole to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 32 QC NOTICE: 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 31 QC NOTICE: 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 30 QC NOTICE: 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 29 QC NOTICE: 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 28 QC NOTICE: 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 27 QC NOTICE: 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2017 26 QC NOTICE: 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by John Doe 1-4, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, International Refugee Assistance Project, Samaneh Takaloo needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2017 25 Summons Issued 60 days as to Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2017 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Esther Sung (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6490240.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Cox, Justin)
February 8, 2017 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa S. Keaney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6490239.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Cox, Justin)
February 8, 2017 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Espiritu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6490237.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Cox, Justin)
February 8, 2017 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Karen C. Tumlin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6490230.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Cox, Justin)
February 8, 2017 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Mach (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489826.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Heather Weaver (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489805.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Cole (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489788.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Mehta (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489739.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hugh Handeyside (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489731.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Omar Jadwat (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489709.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lee Gelernt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489696.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hina Shamsi (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489668.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cody Wofsy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489545.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cecilia Wang (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6489451.) by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 10 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo re 1 Complaint, Summonses (Jeon, Deborah)
February 8, 2017 9 PAPERLESS NOTICE that parties are not required to seek leave from the Court to file motions concerning purely ministerial matters. (ps2s, Chambers)
February 8, 2017 8 NOTICE by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo of Intent to File Pro Hac Vice Motions (Rocah, David)
February 8, 2017 7 QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, International Refugee Assistance Project and Samaneh Takaloo was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file the Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2017 6 NOTICE by Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4 re 5 MOTION for Other Relief for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Cox, Justin)
February 7, 2017 5 MOTION for Other Relief for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4 (Attachments: # 1 Declarations of John Does 1-4 & Jane Doe 1, # 2 Declaration of Nicholas Espiritu & Exhibits A through V, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
February 7, 2017 4 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/7/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2017 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Refugee Assistance Project identifying Corporate Parent Urban Justice Center for International Refugee Assistance Project.(Rocah, David)
February 7, 2017 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HIAS, Inc. (Rocah, David)
February 7, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6486891.), filed by Jane Doe 1, John Doe1-4, Samaneh Takaloo, Allan Hakky, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rocah, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Refugee Assistance Project et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIAS, Inc.
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Hakky
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samaneh Takaloo
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1-4
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: David D Cole
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex W. Tillerson
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dempsey
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
Represented By: Donald Paul Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa T Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Jewish Council for Public Affairs
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa T Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AMERICAN JEWISH WORLD SERVICE
Represented By: Bradley D Wine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?