Edwin v. Rowe et al

Petitioner: Raheen Tajohn Edwin
Respondent: Major C. Rowe and Maryland Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2018cv03112
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Jawor on behalf of Maryland Attorney General (Jawor, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER directing Major C. Rowe and the Maryland Attorney General to file an Answer within 40 days; directing the Petitioner to file a Reply to Answer within 30 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/9/2018. (c/m&e as directed 11/13/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14637109773 (sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Raheen Tajohn Edwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwin v. Rowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Major C. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maryland Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel John Jawor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raheen Tajohn Edwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?