Johnson v. Chrysler Capital

Plaintiff: Alex Johnson
Defendant: Chrysler Capital
Case Number: 8:2018cv03651
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
0 Judge: Theodore D Chuang
1 Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331ni
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice and CLOSING Case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/3/2019. (c/m to pla 1/3/2019 rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER directing Johnson to show cause within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/10/2018. (c/m 12/10/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/4/2018. (c/m 12/06/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 2 MOTION for Waiver of Prepaid Costs by Alex Johnson(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Chrysler Capital filed by Alex Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice to Take Judicial Notice of: Nunc Pro Tunc, #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Attachment, #7 Notice of Motion, #8 Constitutions of Maryland, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?