Koberstein v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Donald F Koberstein
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00200
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald F Koberstein. United States Of America served on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Herschfeld, Stuart)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/23/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Donald F Koberstein or counsel for Donald F Koberstein are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/6/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald F Koberstein ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7796469.), filed by Donald F Koberstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Herschfeld, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koberstein v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F Koberstein
Represented By: Stuart Neil Herschfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?