Goff v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Angela N. Goff
Defendant: Angela N Goff and Target Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01921
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Initial Report by Target Corporation(Lanier, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/31/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Target Corporation Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal (Lanier, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Target Corporation Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Lanier, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against Target Corporation, filed by Angela N. Goff.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #3 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Re-file using the Civil Event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Certification Pursuant to Local Rule (Lanier, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #6 Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland by Target Corporation.(Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL-19-15441. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8098526), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goff v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela N Goff
Represented By: Shaketta Ayana Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Daniel R Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela N. Goff
Represented By: Shaketta Ayana Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?